Mark Mishak v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Mark Mishak d/b/a INEEDATV.com alleges that Defendants have sold keywords identical to Plaintiff's trademarks--"I Need a TV"--to various third parties and have deliberately manipulated the search engine results so that when consumers use these search engines to find Plaintiff's products and services, the consumers are unwittingly diverted to competitors' products and services.

Plaintiff: Mark Mishak
Defendant: Google, Inc., American Online, Inc., Netscape, Inc., Microsoft Network, Inc., Ask Jeeves, Inc., Excite, Inc., Webcrawler, Inc., Yahoo, Inc., Conversa, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Hotbot Inc., Altavista Inc., Craigstlist Inc., Respond Inc., Infoseek Inc., Yellow Pages Inc., Planetsearch Inc., Pronet Inc., Northernlight Inc., Luckysurf Inc., Comfind Inc., Liquidprice Inc., Earthlink Inc. and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2007cv08258
Filed: December 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: John Charles Rayburn
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2008 Filing 36
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) DISMISSAL BY COURT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES AND FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 5/2/2008, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and orders of this Court as to defendants Microsoft Network, Inc., Excite, Inc., Webcrawler, Inc., Hotbot, Inc., Altavista, Inc., Craigslist, Inc., Respond, Inc., Infoseek, Inc., Planetsearch, Inc., Pronet, Inc., Comfind, Inc., and Liquidprice, Inc., only 35 . A response to the Order to Show Cause was to be filed and served no later than 6/27/2008. As of today's date, no such response has been received by this Court; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE for plaintiff's failure to comply with the Local Rules, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and orders of this Court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
May 2, 2008 Filing 35
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: It Is Ordered that Plaintiff Show Cause in Writing no later than June 27, 2008 Why this Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution as to Defendants Microsoft Network, Inc.; Excite, Inc.; Webcrawler, Inc.; Hotbot, Inc.; Altavista, Inc.; Craigslist, Inc.; Respond, Inc.; Infoseek, Inc.; Planetsearch, Inc.; Pronet, Inc.; Comfind, Inc.; and Liquidprice, Inc., Only. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider a proof of service of summons and first amended complaint on these defendants on or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. (kpa)
April 16, 2008 Filing 34
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Pursuant to plaintiff's filing of dismissal of the First Amended Complaint on 3/26/2008, Defendant Lycos's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for More Definite Statement 28 filed 3/20/2008 and noticed on 4/28/2008 at 10:00 AM is thereby MOOT. Therefore, the parties are not to appear before this Court on 4/28/2008 at10:00 AM. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
March 26, 2008 Filing 33
Notice of Withdrawal of Joinder to Google, Inc., et al.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by defendant American Online, Inc., Netscape, Inc.. (Peters, Kristen)
March 21, 2008 Filing 30
NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Excite, Inc., Webcrawler, Inc., Yahoo, Inc., Conversa, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Hotbot Inc., Altavista Inc., Craigstlist Inc., Respond Inc., Infoseek Inc., Yellow Pages Inc., Planetsearch Inc., Pronet Inc., Northernlight Inc., Luckysurf Inc., Comfind Inc., Liquidprice Inc., Earthlink Inc., Does 1-100, Mark Mishak, Google, Inc., American Online, Inc., Netscape, Inc., Microsoft Network, Inc., Ask Jeeves, Inc., served on 3-20-08. (Agajanian, Roger)
March 20, 2008 Filing 29
APPLICATION for Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Lycos's Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative For More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Lycos, Inc.. (Page, Michael)
March 19, 2008 Filing 27
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 21 filed by Defendants Lycos, Inc., Earthlink Inc., Google, Inc., Ask Jeeves, Inc.. (Page, Michael)
March 7, 2008 Filing 26
JOINDER in MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 21 filed by Defendants American Online, Inc., Netscape, Inc.. (Peters, Kristen)
February 27, 2008 Filing 20
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found: incorrect event. document subkject to manual filing (mmo)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10
ORDER EXTENDING TIME by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: First Stipulation Extending Time to Answer 9 and Complaint 1 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant LYCOS, INC. to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint is extended up to and including 3/20/2008. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mmu)
January 29, 2008 Filing 8
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found: PDF attachment, proposed order, lacks a title page: RE Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Lycos, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed 1/18/2008 4 . (gk)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5
ORDER EXTENDING TIME by Judge Christina A. Snyder upon Stipulation 4 . Defendant Lycos, Inc. answer or response due 2/19/2008. (gk)
January 3, 2008 Filing 3
NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Christina A. Snyder (See Order for further details) (yl)
December 20, 2007 Filing 2
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mark Mishak. (ghap) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2008 (lra, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark Mishak v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mishak
Represented By: Roger J Agajanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Online, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netscape, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ask Jeeves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webcrawler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conversa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycos, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotbot Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altavista Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craigstlist Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Respond Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infoseek Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Pages Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planetsearch Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pronet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northernlight Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luckysurf Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfind Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liquidprice Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthlink Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?