In re Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP
Defendant: Carolina Power & Light Company, Citizens Communications, Time Warner Cable Inc, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Qwest Communications Corporation, Kroger Texas L.P., Charter Communications Operating LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Cinergy Corp, Cincinnati Bell Telephone Company LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Pacificorp, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Chevron USA Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Geico Casualty Company, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Comcast Corporation, Webster Bank N A, Genesys Conferencing Inc, National City Bank, Comdata Corporation, Geico General Insurance Company, US Bancorp, Safeco Corp, Humana Inc, Virginia Electric and Power Co., American General Assurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Group, Frontier Communications of America Inc, Dillard Investment Co Inc, Tel-Drug Inc, Giant Food Inc, Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC, IXC Internet Services Inc, Reliant Energy Retail Services LLC, PPL Gas Utilities Corporation, American General Life Insurance Company, American Airlines Inc, Qwest Broadband Services Inc, Ameren Corporation, National City Corporation, Reliant Energy Inc, AIG Marketing Inc., Citizens Bank NA, Georgia Power Company, PPL Solutions LLC, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Compass Bank, Kohl's Corporation, Cincinnati Bell Any Distance Inc, UAL Loyalty Services, LLC, US Bank National Association, The Southern Company, CapGemini Energy LP, TXU Corp., The Permanente Company LL, Directv Enterprises LLC, Dillard's Inc, United States Cellular Corporation, Citizens Bank of Rhode Island, Huntington National Bank, Continental Airlines Inc, Earthlink Inc, Target National Bank, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, United States Life Insurance Company in City of New York, DirecTV Inc, Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC, Caremark Inc, Fifth Third Bancorp, Cincinnati Bell Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, CMS Energy Corporation, American Electric Power Company Inc, Citizens Bank of Connecticut, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LP, Regions Bank NA, TXU Energy Retail Management Company LLC, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, XM Equipment Leasing LLC, Pepco Holdings Inc, Cox Communications, Inc., Bloomingdale's, Inc., Rite Aid Hdqts. Corp, FirstMerit Corp, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Chevron Corporation, Cincinnati Bell Entertainment Inc, DHL Holdings (USA) Inc, Potomac Electric Power Company, Premiere Global Services Inc, Giant of Maryland LLC, Echostar Satellite LLC, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, FirstMerit Mortgage Corp, Caremark RX LLC, T-Mobile USA Inc, RBS Citizens N.A., TDS Telecommunications Corporation, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Wal-Mart.com Inc, Hartford Life Inc, Caremark RX Inc, Duke Energy Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corp, FirstMerit Bank N A, American Beacon Advisors Inc, Chevron Products Company, Global Crossing Telecommunications Inc, Cigna Corporation, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Charter Communications Inc, TDS Metrocom LLC, AIG Annuity Insurance Company, DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Comcast of Colorado/Pennsylvania/West Virginia LLC, Qwest Communications International Inc, Progress Energy Carolinas Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Wilmington Trust Company, American Teleconferencing Services, Ltd, Sky Financial Services, Inc., Huntington Investment Company, Comerica Securities, Inc., Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, Energy Future Holdings Corp., Citibank FSB, Mileage Plus, Inc., XM Satellite Radio Holdings Inc., Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp, XM Satellite Radio Inc., UAL Corporation, Qwest Wireless LLC, First Hawaiian Bank, American General Indemnity Company, OGE Energy Corporation, Nylife Insurance Company of Arizona, Comerica Bank & Trust, GEICO Corporation, National City Bank of Indiana, CVS Caremark Corporation, Tracfone Wirless Inc, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Geico Indemnity Company, Huntington Insurance Agency Services, Inc., Southern Company Services Inc, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, AIG Federal Savings Bank, Sam's West Inc, General Electric Capital Services Inc, Cincinnati Bell Extended Territories LLC, Central Illinois Light Company, TXU Energy Retail Company LP, Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, UTEL Networks Inc, Regions Financial Corporation, The Kroger Co., Sirius Satellite Radio Inc., Colonial Bank N A, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company, Comcast of Arkansas/Florida/Louisiana/Minnesota/Mississippi/Tennessee Inc., Comcast of Florida/Illinois/Michigan Inc., Aetna Inc, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hope Gas, Inc., Healthy Options Inc, VALIC Retirement Services Company, Comcast of Houston LLC, FedEx Corporation, Comcast of Delmarva Inc., AOL LLC, Ahold USA Inc, Cincinnati Bell Wireless LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc., Citizens Financial Group Inc, Centerpoint Energy Inc, BRCOM Inc, Old National Bank, Public Service Enterprises Group Incorporated, Macy's, Inc., Comcast of New Castle County LLC, Delmarva Power & Light Company, Chevron Credit Bank NA, Old National Bancorp, Oklahoma Gas & Electric Company, CILCORP Inc, Giant Food LLC, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Giant Food Stores LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, CCO Investment Services Corp, Caremark LLC, Comcast of Eastern Shore LLC, Wilmington Brokerage Services Company, Southern Communication Services, Exelon Corp, The Permanente Medical Group Inc, Qwest Interprise America Inc, General Electric Consumer Finance Inc, American International Group Inc., Comcast of California/Colorado LLC, Government Employees Insurance Company, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio), Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Cigna HealthCare of Delaware Inc, Commonwealth Edison Co, Aetna RX Home Delivery LLC, Marriott International Inc, PHI Service Company, The Permanente Federation LLC, Citizens Bank, Humana Military Healthcare Services Inc, Cigna Health Corporation, Energy Future Competitive Holdings Company, XM Radio Inc., New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cricket Communications Inc, The Hartford Mutual Funds Inc, Peoples Natural Gas Co., Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, General Electric Capital Corporation, Directv Holdings LLC, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Aquila Inc, Sam's East Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Consumers Energy Company, General Motors Corporation, Leap Wireless International Inc, Mileage Plus Holdings, Inc., CoxCom Inc, 21st Century Insurance Company, Comcast of California II LLC, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Frontier Subsidiary Telco LLC, American Electric Power WR, Qwest LD Corp, Marriott Worldwide Reservation Services LLC, Teligence Holdings (US) Inc, Florida Power Corporation, Citibank (South Dakota) NA, Sky Bank, Exxon Mobile Corp., American General Life and Accident Insurance Company, Consolidated Edison Company of New York Inc, The East Ohio Gas Co., Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Tel-Drug of Pennsylvania LLC, Central Illinois Public Service Company, AIG Retirement Services Inc., United Parcel Service Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Centerpoint Energy Houston Electric LLC, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Frontier Communications Corporation, NYLIFE Securities LLC, AIG Life Insurance Company, DHL Express (USA) Inc, Citibank USA NA, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, PSEG Services Corporation, Bank of The West, Shopko Stores Operating Co LLC, Rite Aid of Delaware Inc, General Electric Company, FACS Group, Inc., New York Life and Annuity Corporation, Amtrak, Mileage Plus Marketing, Inc., Union Electric Company, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Comerica Incorporated, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc, Charter One Bank NA, Sky Courier Inc., Teligence (US) Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, New York Life Insurance Company, Federal Express Corporation, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, RBC Centura Bank, TD Banknorth Inc., Direct Group North America Inc, Southwestern Electric Power Company, Citizens Bank New Hampshire, Citicorp Investment Services, VALIC Financial Advisors Inc., Comcast of Garden State L.P., AIG SunAmerica Asset Management Corp, RBC Centura Banks Inc, Charter One Insurance Agency Inc, Citibank (West) FSB, Peco Energy Co, Public Service Electric & Gas Company, Echostar Communications Corp.,, United Airlines, Inc., TXU Energy Holdings Company, TXU Energy Company LLC and Atlantic City Electric Company
Petitioner: Target Corporation, Target Bank, Robert Cohn, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Fifth Third Bank Central Ohio and Gale R Peterson
Counter Defendant: Ronald Katz Technology Licensing, L.P., Genesys Telecommunications Laboratories, Inc., Xerox Global Services Inc, Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing L P and Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation
3Rd Party Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation, Intervoice Inc and Aspect Communications Corporation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Macy's Inc, Bloomingdale's Inc, FDS Bank, Bloomingdale's By Mail, Ltd., Sirius XM Radio Inc., PPL Electric Utilities Corporation and FACS Group Inc
Counter Claimant: 21st Century Casualty Company, Randall's Food Markets Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, AIG Retirement Services Inc, Tracfone Wireless Inc, Kroger Texas LP, Randall's Food & Drugs LP, Safeway Inc, TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, Kohl's Corp., AIG Marketing Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, Marriott International Inc, -, Permanente Company LLC, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Inc, Costco Wholesale Corp., Netscape Communications Corporation and Hartford Financial Services Group
Special Master: Martin Quinn and Bernard H Chao
Cross Defendant: International Business Machines Corp
Case Number: 2:2007ml01816
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: XX US, Outside California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2015 Filing 8622 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher J Cox counsel for Defendant American Airlines Inc. Jill J. Schmidt is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Cox, Christopher)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8621 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Echostar Parties #8620 . 1. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claimsasserted by Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P. against the EchoStarDefendants and all counterclaims asserted by the EchoStar Defendants againstRonald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P., in each case, are dismissed withprejudice; 2. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each of the parties shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees associated with the prosecution and defense of this Action; and 3. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that allunresolved pending motions in this Action between these settling parties shall be denied as moot., Echostar Satellite LLC, Echostar Satellite LLC, Echostar Communications Corp., and Echostar Satellite LLC terminated., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
November 17, 2014 Filing 8620 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Echostar Communications Corp.,, Echostar Satellite LLC filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
September 26, 2014 Filing 8619 SUGGESTION OF REMAND TO THE TRANSFEROR COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court SUGGESTS that this action be REMANDED to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas for all remaining proceedings, including trial. Exhibit 1 sets forth a list of the pretrial ruling that the Court has made in this action (excluding orders on nonsubstantive/administrative matters. In connection with this Suggestion of Remand, the Court finds as follows: 1) Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P. ("Katz") filed this patent infringement action in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas on August 21, 2006. (American Airlines Dkt. No.3). (See document for further details) (bp)
September 25, 2014 Filing 8618 NOTICE that Action is Ready to be Remanded for Trial filed by plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order - Suggestion of Remand to Transferor Court, #3 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
September 8, 2014 Filing 8617 Mail Returned addressed to David M Maxwell re Order on Motion for Reconsideration #8614 (shb)
September 8, 2014 Filing 8616 Mail Returned addressed to David M Maxwell re Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 8609 (shb)
September 8, 2014 Filing 8615 Mail Returned addressed to David M Maxwell re Order on Motion for Reconsideration #8614 (shb)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8614 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #8605 MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND CLARIFY THE RULING ON FEDEX'S INDIVIDUAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. (shb)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8613 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER re Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal ExpressCorporation, FedEx Corporate Services Inc, FedEx Customer InformationServices Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for SummaryJudgment (DE 8605) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on August 4, 2014, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances bycounsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (shb)
July 21, 2014 Filing 8612 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 #8605 filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. (Franklin, Darren)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8611 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying #8597 Motion for Review and Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying its Motion to Compel. (shb)
July 10, 2014 Filing 8610 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 #8605 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam M. Pivovar, #2 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8609 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Echostars Motion for Review and Reconsideration of Magistrate Judges Order Denying Motion to Compel #8597 (joined by Fed Ex defendants #8601 ), noticed for hearing on July 14, 2014, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 30, 2014 Filing 8608 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN ECHOSTAR'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ECHOSTAR'S MOTION FOR REVIEW AND RECONSIDERATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER DENYING ECHOSTAR'S MOTION TO COMPEL [MDL D.I. 8607] filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. (Franklin, Darren)
June 30, 2014 Filing 8607 REPLY in support MOTION for Review of And Reconsideration of The Magistrate Judge's Order Denying EchoStar's Motion to Compel re Order on Motion to Compel #8595 #8597 filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Barquist, Charles)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8606 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment previously scheduled for 07/28/2014 at 9:00 am has been CONTINUED TO 08/04/2014 at 9:00 am.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 26, 2014 Filing 8605 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Franklin, Darren)
June 23, 2014 Filing 8604 NOTICE re Case Status filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
June 20, 2014 Filing 8603 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Review of And Reconsideration of The Magistrate Judge's Order Denying EchoStar's Motion to Compel re Order on Motion to Compel #8595 #8597 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
June 18, 2014 Filing 8602 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Jeffrey T. Norberg is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
June 13, 2014 Filing 8601 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION for Review of And Reconsideration of The Magistrate Judge's Order Denying EchoStar's Motion to Compel re Order on Motion to Compel #8595 #8597 filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Franklin, Darren)
June 11, 2014 Filing 8600 Mail Returned addressed to David M Maxwell re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8593 (shb)
June 11, 2014 Filing 8599 Mail Returned addressed to David M Maxwell re Order, Add and Terminate Parties, #8592 (shb)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8598 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference Requirement #8596 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the new deadline for the parties to participate in an additional settlement conference shall be Tuesday, July 15, 2014. (shb)
June 9, 2014 Filing 8597 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of And Reconsideration of The Magistrate Judge's Order Denying EchoStar's Motion to Compel re Order on Motion to Compel #8595 filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix A, #3 Proposed Order)(Barquist, Charles)
June 9, 2014 Filing 8596 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline Extension of Settlement Conference Requirement from June 16, 2014 to July 15, 2014 filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barquist, Charles)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8595 ORDER DENYING ECHOSTAR SATELLITE L.L.C.'s MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: denying #8548 Motion to Compel :(see attached) (jm)
May 27, 2014 Filing 8594 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #8590 e-mailed to Attorney Luis G Zambrano at lzambrano@fulbright.com bounced due to invalid email. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to luis.zambrano@milleregan.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8593 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Citizens Financial Defendants, #8574 . Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A., CCO Investment Services Corp and Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania terminated. (shb)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8592 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF TELIGENCE DEFENDANTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8573 . 1. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claimsasserted by Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P. against the TeligenceDefendants and all counterclaims asserted by the Teligence Defendants againstRonald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P., in each case, are dismissed withprejudice; 2. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each of the parties shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees associated with the prosecution and defense of this Action; and 3. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that allunresolved pending motions in this Action between these settling parties shall be denied as moot. United Airlines, Inc., Teligence (US) Inc and Teligence Holdings (US) Inc terminated. (shb)
May 21, 2014 Filing 8590 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott R Miller counsel for Defendants Ameren Corporation, CILCORP Inc, Central Illinois Light Company, Central Illinois Public Service Company, Union Electric Company. Scott R. Miller will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ameren Corporation, Cilcorp Inc., Union Electric Copany, Central Illinois Public Service Company, and Central Illinois Light Company. (Miller, Scott)
May 20, 2014 Filing 8589 Supplemental Brief Regarding the Duty to Supplement Production After the Close of Discovery BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
May 20, 2014 Filing 8588 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements #8548 filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Barquist, Charles)
May 19, 2014 Filing 8586 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements #8548 filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Boyle)(Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party FedEx Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party FedEx Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party FedEx Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party FedEx Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporate Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporate Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporate Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporate Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporate Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporate Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Customer Information Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Customer Information Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Customer Information Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Customer Information Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Customer Information Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Darren M Franklin added to party Fedex Customer Information Services Inc(pty:cc))(Franklin, Darren)
May 19, 2014 Filing 8585 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney George D Medlock, Jr counsel for Counter Claimants CMS Energy Corporation, Colonial Bank N A, Dillard's Inc, Dillard's Inc, Safeco Corp, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Defendants CMS Energy Corporation, Colonial Bank N A, Dillard's Inc, Safeco Corp, Safeco Insurance Company of America. George D. Medlock, Jr. will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.George D. Medlock, Jr. is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CMS Energy Corporation; Colonial Bank N.A., Dillard's Inc., Dillard's Investment Co., Safeco Corp., and Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Medlock, George)
May 19, 2014 Filing 8584 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard M McDermott counsel for Counter Claimants AOL LLC, AOL LLC, Ahold USA Inc, Ahold USA Inc, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Cinergy Corp, Cinergy Corp, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Duke Energy Corporation, Duke Energy Corporation, Giant Food Inc, Giant Food Inc, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant of Maryland LLC, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, Safeco Corp, Safeco Insurance Company of America, T-Mobile USA Inc, T-Mobile USA, Inc., The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Defendants AOL LLC, Ahold USA Inc, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Cinergy Corp, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Duke Energy Corporation, Giant Food Inc, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant of Maryland LLC, Netscape Communications Corp, Safeco Corp, Safeco Insurance Company of America, T-Mobile USA Inc, T-Mobile USA, Inc., The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Movant T-Mobile USA Inc, Counter Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Richard M. McDermott will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Richard M. McDermott is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant AOL LLC, Ahold USA Inc., Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Charter Communications Operating LLC, Cinergy Corp., Compuserve Interactive Services Inc., Duke Energy Corporation, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant of Maryland LLC, Netscape Communications Corp., Safeco Corp., Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, and Time Warner NY Cable LLC. (McDermott, Richard)
May 19, 2014 Filing 8583 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan W Koppelman counsel for Counter Claimants AOL LLC, AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, United Parcel Service Inc, United Parcel Service Inc, Defendants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, United Parcel Service Inc. Ryan W. Koppelman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Ryan W. Koppelman is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc., Netscape Communications Corp., and United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party AOL LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party AOL LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party AOL LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party AOL LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Compuserve Interactive Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Compuserve Interactive Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Compuserve Interactive Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Compuserve Interactive Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Netscape Communications Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Netscape Communications Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Netscape Communications Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party Netscape Communications Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party United Parcel Service Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Ryan W Koppelman added to party United Parcel Service Inc(pty:cc))(Koppelman, Ryan)
May 16, 2014 Filing 8582 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joel M Freed counsel for Defendants Cigna Corporation, Cigna Health Corporation, Cigna HealthCare of Delaware Inc, Tel-Drug Inc, Counter Claimant Tel-Drug of Pennsylvania LLC. Joel M. Freed will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Joel M. Freed is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Cigna Corporation, Cigna Health Corporation,igna HealthCare of Delaware, Inc., Tel-Drug Inc., and Tel-Drug of Pennsylvania LLC. (Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Cigna Health Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Cigna Health Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Cigna HealthCare of Delaware Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Cigna HealthCare of Delaware Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Tel-Drug Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Tel-Drug Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Tel-Drug of Pennsylvania LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Joel M Freed added to party Tel-Drug of Pennsylvania LLC(pty:cc))(Freed, Joel)
May 16, 2014 Filing 8579 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick J Flinn counsel for Counter Claimants AOL LLC, AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Defendants AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC. Patrick J. Flinn will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Patrick J. Flinn is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Charter Communications Operating LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc., Netscape Communications Corp.,Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, and Time Warner NY Cable LLC. (Flinn, Patrick)
May 16, 2014 Filing 8578 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angela Payne James counsel for Defendants Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Counter Claimants Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC. Angela Payne James will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Angela Payne James is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc., and Charter Communications Operating LLC. (James, Angela)
May 16, 2014 Filing 8577 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Scott Frist counsel for Defendants Dillard Investment Co Inc, Dillard's Inc, Counter Claimants Dillard Investment Co Inc, Dillard's Inc, Dillard's Inc. David Scott Frist will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.David Scott Frist is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Dillard's Inc. and Dillard Investment Co. Inc.. (Frist, David)
May 16, 2014 Filing 8576 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey A Cooper counsel for Counter Claimants Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Defendants Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC. Jeffrey A. Cooper will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Jeffrey A. Cooper is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, and Time Warner Cable Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey A Cooper added to party Time Warner Cable Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Jeffrey A Cooper added to party Time Warner Cable Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Jeffrey A Cooper added to party Time Warner Entertainment Company LP(pty:cc), Attorney Jeffrey A Cooper added to party Time Warner Entertainment Company LP(pty:cc), Attorney Jeffrey A Cooper added to party Time Warner NY Cable LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Jeffrey A Cooper added to party Time Warner NY Cable LLC(pty:cc))(Cooper, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2014 Filing 8575 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Holly S Hawkins counsel for Counter Claimants AOL LLC, AOL LLC, Ahold USA Inc, Ahold USA Inc, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Colonial Bank N A, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Dillard Investment Co Inc, Dillard's Inc, Dillard's Inc, Duke Energy Corporation, Duke Energy Corporation, Giant Food Inc, Giant Food Inc, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant of Maryland LLC, Healthy Options Inc, Healthy Options Inc, Humana Inc, Humana Military Healthcare Services Inc, Kroger Texas L.P., Kroger Texas LP, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, Safeco Corp, Safeco Insurance Company of America, T-Mobile USA Inc, T-Mobile USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Defendants AOL LLC, Ahold USA Inc, Amtrak, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Colonial Bank N A, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Dillard Investment Co Inc, Dillard's Inc, Duke Energy Corporation, Giant Food Inc, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant of Maryland LLC, Healthy Options Inc, Humana Inc, Humana Military Healthcare Services Inc, Kroger Texas L.P., National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Netscape Communications Corp, Safeco Corp, Safeco Insurance Company of America, T-Mobile USA Inc, T-Mobile USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Movant T-Mobile USA Inc, Counter Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Holly S. Hawkins will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Holly S. Hawkins is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ahold USA Inc., Amtrak, AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc., Charter Communications Operating LLC, Colonial Bank N.A., Compuserve Interactive Services Inc., Dillard's Inc., Dillard's Investment Co., Duke Energy Corporation, Giant Food LLC, Giant Food Stores LLC, Giant of Maryland, Healthy Options Inc., Humana Inc., Humana Military Healthcare Services Inc., Kroger Texas L.P., National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Netscape Communications Corp., Safeco Corp., Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Kroger Co., The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attorney Holly S Hawkins added to party T-Mobile USA Inc(pty:bkmov), Attorney Holly S Hawkins added to party T-Mobile USA Inc(pty:bkmov))(Hawkins, Holly)
May 15, 2014 Filing 8574 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants CCO Investment Services Corp, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A. filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
May 15, 2014 Filing 8573 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Teligence (US) Inc, Teligence Holdings (US) Inc, UTEL Networks Inc filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 8591 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: Re #8548 Defendant Echostar's motion to compel: Court orders parties to submit supplemental briefs by May 20, 2014 as stated on the record. Court Recorder: CS 05/13/14. (jm)
May 12, 2014 Filing 8587 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS O and P to Declaration of Matthew A. Chivvis in Support of Local Rule 37-2 Joint Stipulation Re: Echostar's Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8581 SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING ECHOSTAR'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO LOCAL RULE 37-2 JOINT STIPULATION RE EXHOSTAR'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (shb) Modified on 5/16/2014 (shb).
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8580 ORDER GRANTING ECHOSTAR'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO LOCAL RULE 37-2 JOINT STIPULATION RE ECHOSTAR'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, (shb)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8572 ORDER GRANTING ECHOSTAR'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO L.R. 37-2 JOIN STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting #8571 Application to Seal (jm)
May 12, 2014 Filing 8570 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reuben H Chen on behalf of In Re: Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation (Attorney Reuben H Chen added to party Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl), Attorney Reuben H Chen added to party Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation(pty:InRe.mdl))(Chen, Reuben)
April 29, 2014 Filing 8569 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements #8548 filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Barquist, Charles)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8568 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8567 . 1. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claimsasserted by Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P. against the US BankDefendants and all counterclaims asserted by the US Bank Defendants againstRonald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P., in each case, are dismissed withprejudice; 2. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each of the parties shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees associated with the prosecution and defense of this Action; and 3. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that allunresolved pending motions in this Action between these settling parties shall be denied as moot. US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, US Bank National Association, US Bank National Association, US Bancorp and US Bancorp terminated. (shb)
April 24, 2014 Filing 8567 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants US Bancorp, US Bank National Association filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
April 21, 2014 Filing 8566 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian E Ferguson counsel for Defendants Cigna Corporation, Cigna Health Corporation, Cigna HealthCare of Delaware Inc, General Motors Corporation, Tel-Drug Inc, Tel-Drug of Pennsylvania LLC. Brian E. Ferguson will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cigna Corp., Cigna Health Corp., Cigna HealthCare of DE, General Motors Corp., Tel-Drug Inc. and Tel-Drug of PA. (Ferguson, Brian)
April 14, 2014 Filing 8565 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Alan Clark counsel for Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Corporate Services Inc., Fedex Customer Information Services, Inc.. (Clark, Gary)
April 14, 2014 Filing 8564 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Alan Clark counsel for Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. Elizabeth L. DeRieux is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Corporate Services Inc., FedEx Customer Information Services, Inc.. (Clark, Gary)
April 14, 2014 Filing 8563 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Alan Clark counsel for Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. Andrew Wesley Spangler is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services, Inc., FedEx Customer Information Services, Inc.. (Clark, Gary)
April 10, 2014 Filing 8562 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J Cuneo re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8459 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8571 Echostar's application to file under seal documents relating to L.C. 37-2 Joint Stipulation re Echostar's motion to compel production of settlement agreements, filed by Defendant Echostar Communications Corp.,. (jm)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8561 Mail Returned addressed to Richard S Sanders re Mail Returned #8458 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8560 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Mail Returned #8457 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8559 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Westherly re Mail Returned #8458 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8558 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8492 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8557 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R Swits re Exhibit (non-trial), #8460 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8556 Mail Returned addressed to Richard S Sanders re Mail Returned #8454 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8555 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8554 Mail Returned addressed to Richard S Sanders re Mail Returned #8457 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8553 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Order on Application to Continue, #8493 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8552 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8492 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8551 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Mail Returned #8461 (shb)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8550 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC of Application to File Under Seal Documents, etc.; Exhibits O and P to the Declaration of Matthew A. Chivvis In Support of L.R. 37-2 Joint Stipulation, etc.; Proposed Order Granting EchoStar's Application to File Under Seal. (Barquist, Charles)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8549 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements #8548 filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan G. Graves, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jonathan G. Graves, #3 Declaration of Matthew A. Chivvis, #4 Exhibit A through M to the Declaration of Matthew A. Chivvis, #5 Exhibit N through Z to the Declaration of Matthew A. Chivvis)(Barquist, Charles)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8548 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements filed by defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/13/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barquist, Charles)
April 9, 2014 Filing 8535 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Mail Returned #8462 (shb)
April 8, 2014 Filing 8547 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney re Mail Returned #8457 (shb)
April 8, 2014 Filing 8546 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney re Mail Returned #8458 (shb)
April 8, 2014 Filing 8545 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney re Exhibit (non-trial), #8460 (shb)
April 8, 2014 Filing 8544 Mail Returned addressed to David Andrew Segal re Mail Returned #8457 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8543 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J Cuneo re Mail Returned #8462 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8542 Mail Returned addressed to David Andrew Segal re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER TO FILE A CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #8434 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8541 Mail Returned addressed to David Andrew Segal re Mail Returned #8458 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8540 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8459 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8539 Mail Returned addressed to Vandana Koelsch re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8459 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8538 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Mail Returned #8462 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8537 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Mail Returned #8462 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8536 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Mail Returned #8462 (shb)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8534 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to David Andrew Segal re Order on Application for Order #8439 . (jp)
April 4, 2014 Filing 8533 NOTICE of Parties' Compliance with Settlement Conference Requirement filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8532 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #8514 , 1. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims asserted by Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P. against the Charter Defendants and all counterclaims asserted by the Charter Defendants against Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P., in each case, are dismissed with prejudice; 2. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each of the parties shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees associated with the prosecution and defense of this Action; and 3. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all unresolved pending motions in this Action between these settling parties shall be denied as moot. Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC and Charter Communications Holding Company LLC terminated. (shb) Modified on 4/4/2014 (shb).
April 3, 2014 Filing 8531 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G. Weatherly re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8459 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8530 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J. Cuneo re Mail Returned #8461 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8529 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G. Weatherly re Exhibit (non-trial), #8460 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8528 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8459 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8527 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8459 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8526 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao re Exhibit (non-trial), #8460 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8525 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J. Cuneo re Exhibit (non-trial), #8460 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8524 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Mail Returned #8458 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8523 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Mail Returned #8462 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8522 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Mail Returned #8457 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8521 Mail Returned addressed to Vandana Koelsch re Exhibit (non-trial), #8460 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8520 Mail Returned addressed to Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeier re Mail Returned #8461 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8519 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Exhibit (non-trial), #8460 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8518 Mail Returned addressed to David Andrew Segal re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8459 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8517 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R. Swits re Mail Returned #8462 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8516 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R. Swits re Mail Returned #8461 (mku)
April 3, 2014 Filing 8515 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L. DeRieux re Mail Returned #8462 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8514 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pietrantonio, Frank)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8513 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao re Mail Returned #8458 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8512 Mail Returned addressed to Jae H. Kim re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #8452 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8511 Mail Returned addressed to David M. Hill re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8352 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8510 Mail Returned addressed to Jae H. Kim re Mail Returned #8454 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8509 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney re Mail Returned #8454 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8508 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J. Cuneo re Mail Returned #8457 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8507 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J. Cuneo re Mail Returned #8458 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8506 Mail Returned addressed to Vandana Koelsch re Mail Returned #8458 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8505 Mail Returned addressed to Vandana Koelsch re Order on Application for Order, #8439 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8504 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J. Cuneo re Order on Application for Order, #8439 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8503 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #8452 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8502 Mail Returned addressed to Vandana Koelsch re Mail Returned #8457 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8501 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R. Swits re Mail Returned #8457 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8500 Mail Returned addressed to Christopher J. Cuneo re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #8452 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8499 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R. Swits re Mail Returned #8458 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8498 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao re Mail Returned #8454 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8497 Mail Returned addressed to Vandana Koelsch re: Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #8452 (mku)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8496 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao re Mail Returned #8457 (mku)
April 1, 2014 Filing 8495 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julie M Holloway counsel for Counter Claimants GEICO Corporation, GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Defendants GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. Julie M. Holloway will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GEICO Corporation, et al.. (Holloway, Julie)
March 31, 2014 Filing 8494 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8492 , Order on Application to Continue, #8493 e-mailed to Attorney David M Maxwell bounced due to unknown email address. The primary e-mail address dmmaxwell@duanemorris.com associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8493 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #8472 ECHOSTARS APPLICATION FORCONTINUANCE OF MEDIATION DEADLINE UNDER LOCAL RULE 40-1. Upon consideration of this application and good cause appearing, the Court orders a continuance of the mediation deadline up to and including June 16, 2014. (shb)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8492 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss AMEREN Defendants, #8482 , Central Illinois Light Company, Central Illinois Public Service Company, Union Electric Company, Ameren Corporation and CILCORP Inc terminated. (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8491 Mail Returned addressed to David Andrew Segal re Mail Returned #8462 (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8490 Mail Returned addressed to Richard S Sanders re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8489 Mail Returned addressed to Richard S Sanders re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER TO FILE A CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #8434 (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8488 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Miscellaneous Document,, #8463 (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8487 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8405 (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8486 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R Swits re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8485 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 8484 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R Swits re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER TO FILE A CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #8434 (shb) (Main Document 8484 replaced on 3/28/2014) (shb).
March 26, 2014 Filing 8483 REPLY in support of APPLICATION to Continue Mediation Deadline from March 31, 2014 to June 16, 2014 #8472 filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew A. Chivvis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Barquist, Charles)
March 25, 2014 Filing 8482 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Ameren Corporation, CILCORP Inc, Central Illinois Light Company, Central Illinois Public Service Company, Union Electric Company filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pietrantonio, Frank)
March 25, 2014 Filing 8481 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LPto APPLICATION to Continue Mediation Deadline from March 31, 2014 to June 16, 2014 #8472 (Plaintiff's Opposition to Echostar's Application for Continuance of Mediation Deadline) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Graves, #2 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
March 25, 2014 Filing 8480 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen R Mick counsel for Counter Claimants GEICO Corporation, GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Indemnity Company, General Electric Capital Corporation, General Electric Capital Corporation, Defendants GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, General Electric Capital Corporation. Stephen R. Mick will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Stephen R. Mick is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Geico Corp. (Mick, Stephen)
March 25, 2014 Filing 8479 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen R Mick counsel for Counter Claimants GEICO Corporation, GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Indemnity Company, General Electric Capital Corporation, General Electric Capital Corporation, Defendants GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, General Electric Capital Corporation. James Burdett will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.James Burdett is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Geico Corp.. (Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party General Electric Capital Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party General Electric Capital Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party General Electric Capital Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party General Electric Capital Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party General Electric Capital Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party General Electric Capital Corporation(pty:cc))(Mick, Stephen)
March 25, 2014 Filing 8478 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew J Moore counsel for Defendants GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Matthew J. Moore will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Matthew J. Moore is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GEICO Corporation; Government Employees Insurance Company; GEICO General Insurance Company; GEICO Indemnity Company; and GEICO Casualty Company. (Moore, Matthew)
March 24, 2014 Filing 8477 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 24, 2014 Filing 8476 Mail Returned addressed to Vandana Koelsch Howrey re Mail Returned #8454 (shb)
March 24, 2014 Filing 8475 Mail Returned addressed to Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeier re Mail Returned #8458 (shb)
March 24, 2014 Filing 8474 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #8452 (shb)
March 21, 2014 Filing 8472 APPLICATION to Continue Mediation Deadline from March 31, 2014 to June 16, 2014 filed by Defendant Echostar Communications Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MATTHEW CHIVVIS, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Barquist, Charles)
March 19, 2014 Filing 8471 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Mail Returned #8454 (shb)
March 19, 2014 Filing 8470 Mail Returned addressed to Erica N Finnegan re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 19, 2014 Filing 8469 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Mail Returned #8454 (shb)
March 18, 2014 Filing 8473 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #8452 (shb)
March 18, 2014 Filing 8468 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER TO FILE A CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #8434 (shb)
March 18, 2014 Filing 8467 Mail Returned addressed to Lance Lee re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 18, 2014 Filing 8466 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R Swits re Mail Returned #8454 (shb)
March 18, 2014 Filing 8465 Mail Returned addressed to Erica N Finnegan re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER TO FILE A CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #8434 (shb)
March 18, 2014 Filing 8464 Notice of Electronic Filing re Miscellaneous Document,, #8463 e-mailed to jnorberg@cooley.com bounced due to Unknown address error. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to jnorberg@norberglaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sn) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 18, 2014 Filing 8463 Redacted Public Version - Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Jonathan G. Graves [D.I. 8411] In Support Of Plaintiff's Opposition To FedEx's Response To The Court's January 27, 2014 Case Management Order filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc re: Miscellaneous Document, #8411 (Clark, Gary)
March 17, 2014 Filing 8462 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 17, 2014 Filing 8461 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER TO FILE A CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #8434 (shb)
March 14, 2014 Filing 8460 SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF JONATHAN G GRAVES #8411 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO FEDEX'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S JANUARY 27, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Filed filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (shb)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8459 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8434 Ex Parte Application for Order filing documents under seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. the Application is GRANTED; 2. the Clerk of the Court shall seal Exhibit 1 to the Graves Declaration; AND 3. Counsel shall file a redacted public version concurrently. (shb)
March 13, 2014 Filing 8458 Mail Returned addressed to Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeier re Order on Application for Order,, #8439 (shb)
March 13, 2014 Filing 8457 Mail Returned addressed to Sarah Elizabeth Piepmeir re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #8452 (shb)
March 10, 2014 Filing 8455 REPLY filed by Defendants Teligence (US) Inc, Teligence Holdings (US) Inc, UTEL Networks Inc to Statement #8390 OPPOSING REMAND IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS JANUARY 27, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND NOTICE OF JOINDER (Brooks, James)
March 7, 2014 Filing 8456 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G. Weatherly re Order #8363 (bp)
March 6, 2014 Filing 8454 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Substitution of Attorney - Granted, #8396 (shb)
March 5, 2014 Filing 8453 Proof OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #8435 Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Reuben H. Chen, Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application and Exhibit 1 to the Chen Declaration served on March 3, 20014. (Rodriguez, Ricardo)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8452 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING PROOF of SERVICE submitted by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP received on 3/4/2014 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Documents must be filed electronically. (shb)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8451 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Michael E. Williams will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8450 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Robert William Stone will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8449 REPLY filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc to Miscellaneous Document, #8411 In Support Of FedEx's Statement Opposing Remand [D.I. 8394] (Clark, Gary)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8448 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Marshall M. Searcy, III will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8447 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Valerie Roddy will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8446 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. William C. Price will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8445 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Michael D. Powell will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8444 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Joseph M. Paunovich will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8443 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Richard H. Doss will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8442 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Steven M. Anderson will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8441 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard H Doss counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc. Steven M. Anderson will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Richard H. Doss. (Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Customer Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Customer Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Customer Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Customer Services Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Enterprises(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Enterprises(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Group Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Group Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Holding, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Holding, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party DIRECTV Inc(pty:cc))(Doss, Richard)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8440 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam Corey Sherman counsel for Counter Claimants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio), Defendants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio). Adam Corey Sherman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bancorp. (Sherman, Adam)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8439 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8433 Application for Order Sealing Document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The following document is to be filed under seal pursuant to Local Rule 79-5-1 and the Stipulated Protective Order entered in this case by this Court on August 20, 2007: Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jonathan G. Graves in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to the Courts January 27, 2014 Case Management Order [MDL D.I. 8412] [Filed Under Seal]; Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jonathan G. Graves in Support ofPlaintiffs Opposition to the Courts January 27, 2014 Case Management Order [MDL D.I. 8412] [Filed Under Seal]. (shb)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8438 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Wade Richardson counsel for Movants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank Central Ohio, Counter Claimants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio), Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio), Defendants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio). Eric W. Richardson will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bancorp. (Richardson, Eric)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8437 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott Richard Kaspar on behalf of Defendants CCO Investment Services Corp, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A. (Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party CCO Investment Services Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party CCO Investment Services Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party Citizens Financial Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party Citizens Financial Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party RBS Citizens N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Kaspar added to party RBS Citizens N.A.(pty:dft))(Kaspar, Scott)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8436 REPLY filed by Defendants CCO Investment Services Corp, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A. to Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation's Opposition #8414 to Citizens Financial Group Inc., et al's Response to Case Management Order #8399 (Duffy, Robert)
March 3, 2014 Filing 8435 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by In Re: Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation of Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Reuben H. Chen, Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Reuben H. Chen. (Rodriguez, Ricardo)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8433 APPLICATION for Order for Sealing Exhibits 1 & 2 to the Declaration of J. Graves in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to the Courts January 27, 2014 Case Management Order re MDL D.I. 8412 filed by defendants Teligence (US) Inc, Teligence Holdings (US) Inc, UTEL Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, James)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8432 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Bruce Campbell, Jr counsel for Defendant American Airlines Inc. John B. Campbell will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc. (Campbell, John)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8431 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Bruce Campbell, Jr counsel for Counter Claimant American Beacon Advisors Inc, Defendant American Beacon Advisors Inc. Samuel F. Baxter will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Beacon Advisors Inc. (Campbell, John)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8430 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Bruce Campbell, Jr counsel for Counter Claimant Exxon Mobil Corp, Defendant Exxon Mobil Corp. Samuel F. Baxter will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corp. (Campbell, John)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8429 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Bruce Campbell, Jr counsel for Defendant Earthlink Inc, Counter Claimant Earthlink Inc. Samuel F. Baxter will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc. (Campbell, John)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8428 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Bruce Campbell, Jr counsel for Counter Claimant American Airlines Inc, Defendant American Airlines Inc. Samuel F. Baxter will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc. (Campbell, John)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8427 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mike McKool, Jr counsel for Counter Claimant Exxon Mobil Corp, Defendant Exxon Mobil Corp. Mike McKool will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Exxon Mobile Corp. (McKool, Mike)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8426 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mike McKool, Jr counsel for Defendant American Beacon Advisors Inc, Counter Claimant American Beacon Advisors Inc. Mike McKool will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Beacon Advisors Inc. (McKool, Mike)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8425 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mike McKool, Jr counsel for Defendant Earthlink Inc, Counter Claimant Earthlink Inc. Mike McKool will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc. (McKool, Mike)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8424 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mike McKool, Jr counsel for Counter Claimant American Airlines Inc, Defendant American Airlines Inc. Mike McKool will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc. (McKool, Mike)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8423 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92),, #8421 Ex Parte Application For Order To File A Certain Confidential Document Under Seal and [Proposed] Order served on 2-28-2014. (Clark, Gary)
February 28, 2014 Filing 8422 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Courtland L Reichman counsel for Counter Claimant American Airlines Inc, Defendant American Airlines Inc. Courtland L. Reichman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc. (Reichman, Courtland)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8434 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE A CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. Lodged Proposed Order.(shb)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8421 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc of Ex Parte Application For Order To File A Certain Confidential Document Under Seal; and Proposed Order. (Clark, Gary)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8420 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendants Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom Inc. Taylor Higgins Ludlam will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Cox Communications, Inc. and CoxCom, Inc.. (Boice, William)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8419 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendants Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom Inc. Vaibhav P. Kadaba will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Cox Communications, Inc. and CoxCom, Inc.. (Boice, William)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8418 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendants Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom Inc. William H. Boice will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Cox Communications, Inc. and CoxCom, Inc.. (Boice, William)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8417 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendant Earthlink Inc. Taylor Higgins Ludlam will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EarthLink, Inc.. (Boice, William)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8416 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendant Earthlink Inc. Vaibhav P. Kadaba will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EarthLink, Inc.. (Boice, William)
February 27, 2014 Filing 8415 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendant Earthlink Inc. William H. Boice will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EarthLink, Inc.. (Boice, William)
February 25, 2014 Filing 8414 OPPOSITION to Citizens Financial Group Inc., et. al's Response to Case Management Order #8399 filed by In Re: Katz Interactive Call Processing Patent Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reuben Chen, #2 Notice of Manual Filing)(Rodriguez, Ricardo)
February 25, 2014 Filing 8413 JOINDER filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC joining in Reply (non-motion) #8409 . (Barquist, Charles)
February 24, 2014 Filing 8412 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP to Teligence's Response to the Court's January 27, 2014 Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan G. Graves, #2 Notice of Manual Filing - Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Graves Declaration)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 24, 2014 Filing 8411 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP to FedEx's Response to the Court's January 27, 2014 Case Management Order re: Statement,, #8394 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan G. Graves, #2 Notice of Manual Filing - Exhibit 1 to Graves Declaration)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 19, 2014 Filing 8410 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8376 (shb)
February 19, 2014 Filing 8409 REPLY filed by Defendants US Bancorp, US Bank National Association In Support Of U.S. Bank's Response To The January 27, 2014 Case Management Order (Kaspar, Scott)
February 18, 2014 Filing 8408 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8376 (shb)
February 17, 2014 Filing 8407 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory F Ahrens on behalf of Defendants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio) (Ahrens, Gregory)
February 14, 2014 Filing 8406 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eamonn Joseph Gardner counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Carolyn V. Juarez is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Gardner, Eamonn)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8405 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #2414 , Exxon Mobil Corp and Exxon Mobile Corp. terminated. (shb)
February 14, 2014 Filing 8404 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order #8363 (shb)
February 14, 2014 Filing 8403 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8355 (shb)
February 13, 2014 Filing 8402 Opposition to US Bank's Response to the Court's January 27, 2014 Case Management Order (Guske, Sarah)
February 13, 2014 Filing 8401 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. correcting Miscellaneous Document #8400 (Attachments: #1 Corrected Opposition)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 13, 2014 Filing 8400 Plaintiff's Opposition to Echostar's Response to the Court's January 27, 2014 Case Management Order filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP (Graves, Jonathan)
February 13, 2014 Filing 8399 RESPONSE filed by Defendants CCO Investment Services Corp, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A. Response to Case Management Order dated January 27, 2014 (Green, Rachelle)
February 13, 2014 Filing 8398 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants CCO Investment Services Corp, Citibank (South Dakota) NA, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A.. correcting Response (non-motion) #8381 Notice of Errata Re: Defendant Citizens Financial Group, Inc., et al's Response to the January 27, 2014 Case Management Order (Green, Rachelle)
February 11, 2014 Filing 8397 Mail Returned addressed to Sidney Calvin Capshaw re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8358 (shb)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8396 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner Granting MOTION to Withdraw as Track C Liasion Counsel and Substitute Jonathan Spivey as Track C Liaison Counsel #8360 . Substituting attorney Jonathan R Spivey for Liaison Counsel for All Defendants, in place and stead of attorney Richard Scott Mandaro. (shb)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8395 STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Counter Claimants American Airlines Inc, American Airlines Inc, Defendant American Airlines Inc (Campbell, John)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8394 STATEMENT Opposing Remand In Response To The Court's January 27, 2014 Case Management Order filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc re: Order #8363 . (Clark, Gary)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8393 STATEMENT Charter's Statement in Response to the Court's Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Siraj M. Abhyankar in Support of Charter's Statement in Response to the Court's Case Management Order)(Flinn, Patrick)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8392 STATEMENT Suggestion of Remand to the Transferor Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8391 STATEMENT as to the Cablevision Defendants Regarding Case Management Order Dated January 27, 2014 (Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8390 STATEMENT AS TO WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT REMAND filed by Defendants Teligence (US) Inc, Teligence Holdings (US) Inc, UTEL Networks Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, James)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8389 STATEMENT Suggestion of Remand to the Transferor Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8388 STATEMENT Suggestion of Remand to the Transferor Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8387 STATEMENT Suggestion of Remand to the Transferor Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8386 STATEMENT Suggestion of Remand to the Transferor Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8385 STATEMENT Suggestion of Remand to the Transferor Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8384 STATEMENT Suggestion of Remand to the Transferor Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8383 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLCto Order #8363 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED (Barquist, Charles)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8382 STATEMENT Ameren's Statement in Response to the Court's Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Vander Tuig Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - PTAB Decision in 90/011,515, #3 Exhibit 2 - PTAB Decision in 90/008,095, #4 Exhibit 3 - 11/7/13 Federal Circuit Decision)(Vander Tuig, Marc)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8381 RESPONSE filed by Defendant RBS Citizens N.A.to Order #8363 (Duffy, Robert)
February 10, 2014 Filing 8380 RESPONSE filed by Defendants US Bancorp, US Bank National Association to the Court's January 27, 2014 Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Portions of RAKTL's Appellant Brief))(Kaspar, Scott)
February 6, 2014 Filing 8379 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8357 (shb)
February 6, 2014 Filing 8378 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8356 (shb)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8376 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF AMERICAN AIRLINES INC by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8364 , American Airlines Inc, American Airlines Inc and American Airlines Inc terminated. (shb)
January 31, 2014 Filing 8377 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8353 (shb)
January 31, 2014 Filing 8375 NOTICE regarding #8363 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. (Dartt, Stephen)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8374 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8354 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8373 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8358 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8372 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8353 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8371 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8358 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8370 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8355 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8369 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8356 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8368 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8354 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8367 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8357 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8366 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8352 (shb)
January 30, 2014 Filing 8365 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #8352 (shb)
January 29, 2014 Filing 8364 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant American Airlines Inc filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8363 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, (shb)
January 23, 2014 Filing 8362 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, Add and Terminate Parties,, #8351 (shb)
January 23, 2014 Filing 8361 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Order, Add and Terminate Parties,, #8351 (shb)
January 15, 2014 Filing 8360 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw as Track C Liasion Counsel and Substitute Jonathan Spivey as Track C Liaison Counsel filed by Defendant Liaison Counsel for All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandaro, Richard)
January 13, 2014 Filing 8359 NOTICE of Termination of Automatic Stay filed by defendant American Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, John)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8358 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8345 , Earthlink Inc terminated. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8357 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #8344 , DirecTV Inc, Direct Group North America Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC, DIRECTV Customer Services Inc and DIRECTV Group Inc terminated. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8356 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8343 , Netscape Communications Corp, AOL LLC and Compuserve Interactive Services Inc terminated. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8355 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8346 , Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio), Fifth Third Bancorp and Fifth Third Bank terminated. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8354 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8347 , United States Cellular Corporation, TDS Metrocom LLC and TDS Telecommunications Corporation terminated. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8353 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #8349 , FACS Group, Inc., FDS Bank, Macy's, Inc., Bloomingdale's By Mail, Ltd. and Bloomingdale's, Inc. terminated. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8352 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #8348 , Cox Communications, Inc. and CoxCom Inc terminated. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8351 ORDER DISMISSAL OF TIME WARNER DEFENDANTS #8350 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that each of the parties shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees associated with the prosecution and defense of this Action; and ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all unresolved pending motions in this Action between these settling parties shall be denied as moot. (jp)
January 6, 2014 Filing 8350 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
January 2, 2014 Filing 8349 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Bloomingdale's By Mail, Ltd., Bloomingdale's, Inc., FACS Group, Inc., FDS Bank, Macy's, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
January 2, 2014 Filing 8348 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom Inc filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
December 27, 2013 Filing 8347 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants TDS Metrocom LLC, TDS Telecommunications Corporation, United States Cellular Corporation filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
December 26, 2013 Filing 8346 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Fifth Third Bancorp, Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Bank (Central Ohio) filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
December 26, 2013 Filing 8345 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Earthlink Inc filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
December 26, 2013 Filing 8344 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
December 26, 2013 Filing 8343 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
December 26, 2013 Filing 8342 Mail Returned addressed to Mitchell G Weatherly re Order, #8340 (shb)
December 26, 2013 Filing 8341 Mail Returned addressed to Weatherly Kerven & Seigel LLC re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 8339 (shb)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8340 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Joint Stipulation for deadline extension of Settlement Conference Requirement #8338 . The new deadline for the parties to participate in an additional settlement conference shall be Friday, February 28, 2014. (ir)
December 9, 2013 Filing 8339 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #8338 e-mailed to Mitchell G Weatherly bounced due to invalid e-mail address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2013 Filing 8338 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File settlement conference requirement filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mead, Lowell)
November 15, 2013 Filing 8337 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Motion for Reconsideration #8334 (shb)
November 1, 2013 Filing 8336 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Mail Returned #8333 (shb)
November 1, 2013 Filing 8335 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Order, #8330 (shb)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8334 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying #8307 Motion for Reconsideration the Ruling on Fedex's Individual Summary Judgment (shb)
October 9, 2013 Filing 8333 Mail Returned addressed to David M. Hill re Order on Motion for Reconsideration #8318 (bp)
October 3, 2013 Filing 8332 MAIL RETURNED addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux at Brown McCarroll 1127 Judson Road, Suite 220 Longview, TX 75606-3999 re Order #8330 (ir)
October 1, 2013 Filing 8331 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Bruce Campbell, Jr counsel for Defendant American Airlines Inc. Garret Wesley Chambers is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc. (Campbell, John)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8330 ORDER on Second Stipulation for Costs #8329 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court's 8/2/13 Order on Stipulation regarding Award of Costs (DHL Dkt. No 623; MDL Dkt. No. 8253) governs the awards of costs, and Clerk's 9/2/12 Taxation of Costs (MDL Dkt. No. 8328) is mooot in light of the Court's 8/2/12 Order. (ir)
September 17, 2013 Filing 8329 Second STIPULATION for Costs against Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
September 10, 2013 Filing 8328 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 46,301.62 in favor of American International Group, Inc and against Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing, LP. RE: #8261 (mb)
September 4, 2013 Filing 8326 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Barquist counsel for Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Elisabeth S. Traugott will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Elisabeth S. Traugott is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barquist, Charles)
September 4, 2013 Filing 8325 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Barquist counsel for Defendant Echostar Communications Corp.,. Elisabeth S. Traugott is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EchoStar Satellite L.L.C.. (Barquist, Charles)
September 4, 2013 Filing 8324 NOTICE AND REQUEST TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO UPDATE THE COURT DOCKET TO REMOVE ELISABETH S. TRAUGOTT LISTED AS ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT AND COUNTER-CLAIMANT EARTHLINK INC. filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barquist, Charles)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8323 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8307 . The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on September 9, 2013 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rne) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 30, 2013 Filing 8321 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Barquist counsel for Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Jason A. Crotty will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Jason A. Crotty is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EchoStar Satelite L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barquist, Charles)
August 30, 2013 Filing 8320 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Barquist counsel for Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Jason A. Crotty is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EchoStar Satelite L.L.C.. (Barquist, Charles)
August 29, 2013 Filing 8319 NOTICE AND REQUEST TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO UPDATE COURT DOCKET TO REMOVE CERTAIN MORRISON & FOERSTER ATTORNEYS LISTED AS ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT RONALD A. KATZ TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LP filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barquist, Charles)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8318 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying #8257 Motion for Partial Reconsideration. (rne)
August 27, 2013 Filing 8314 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark Andrew Woodmansee counsel for Counter Claimants Target Bank, Target Corporation, Target National Bank, Defendant Target National Bank. John A. Scott will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.John A. Scott is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Target National Bank. (Woodmansee, Mark)
August 27, 2013 Filing 8313 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark Andrew Woodmansee counsel for Counter Claimants Target Bank, Target Corporation, Target National Bank, Defendant Target National Bank. Mark Andrew Woodmansee will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Mark Andrew Woodmansee is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Target National Bank. (Woodmansee, Mark)
August 26, 2013 Filing 8312 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 #8307 filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. (Franklin, Darren)
August 21, 2013 Filing 8317 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order #8305 (shb)
August 19, 2013 Filing 8316 Mail Returned addressed to Brown McCarroll re Notice of Filing Transcript 8300 (shb)
August 19, 2013 Filing 8315 Mail Returned addressed to Brown McCarroll re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 8298 (shb)
August 19, 2013 Filing 8311 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 #8307 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
August 12, 2013 Filing 8310 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendant Earthlink Inc. Tonya R. Deem is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EarthLink, Inc.. (Boice, William)
August 12, 2013 Filing 8309 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William H Boice counsel for Defendants Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom Inc. Tonya R. Deem is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Cox Communications, Inc. and CoxCom, Inc.. (Boice, William)
August 9, 2013 Filing 8308 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. correcting MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 #8307 (Clark, Gary)
August 9, 2013 Filing 8307 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting FedEx Defendants' Motion To Reconsider)(Clark, Gary)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8306 ORDER GRANTING EARTHLINKS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #7667 by Judge R. Gary Klausner (shb)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8305 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING KATZS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EARTHLINKS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(shb).
August 5, 2013 TRANSMISSION of the Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet, Judgment and or order e-mailed to the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals, #8264 (car)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8304 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation for Costs #8281 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. DHL is awarded costs in the amount of$44,328.00. This amount represents a compromise by the parties and should not be construed as an award of any particular item sought by DHL in its bill of costs submitted on July 9, 2013. Both parties have waived the right to move to retax or otherwise challenge on appeal the amount of the $44,328.00 award. 2. Execution of the $44,328.00 award to DHL is stayed pending the determination of all appellate proceedings regarding the Court's judgment in favor of DHL, entered on June 25,2013. DHL shall not be entitled to execute upon this award unless it retains its status as the prevailing party following the resolution of all appellate proceedings regarding the June 25, 2013 judgment. (shb)
August 1, 2013 Filing 8303 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz counsel for Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC. Filed by Defendant Benjamin Hershkowitz. (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
July 31, 2013 Filing 8302 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document #8273 (shb)
July 31, 2013 Filing 8300 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, November 14, 2011; 9:00 AM re Transcript #8299 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Lanza, Theresa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2013 Filing 8299 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, November 14, 2011; 9:00 AM. Court Reporter: THERESA LANZA, phone number www.theresalanza.com, 951-274-0844. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2013. (Lanza, Theresa)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8298 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of Order (DE 8257), noticed for hearing on August 5, 2013, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 30, 2013 Filing 8301 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Application for Order #8274 (shb)
July 30, 2013 Filing 8297 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Justin P.D. Wilcox and Thomas F. Poche is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 30, 2013 Filing 8296 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Justin P.D. Wilcox, Thomas F. Poche, Carolyn V. Juarez, Christine K. Shieh and Linda A.F. Callison is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 30, 2013 Filing 8295 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Justin P.D. Wilcox, Thomas F. Poche and Chad Takashi Nitta is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 30, 2013 Filing 8294 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Justin P.D. Wilcox, Thomas F. Poche, Chad Takashi Nitta is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 30, 2013 Filing 8293 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Thomas F. Poche and Chad Takashi Nitta is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 30, 2013 Filing 8292 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Thomas F. Poche and Adam M. Pivovar is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 30, 2013 Filing 8291 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Garwood Graves counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Thomas F. Poche, Christen MR Dubois and Erica C. Tierney is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 29, 2013 TRANSMISSION of the Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet, Judgment and or order e-mailed to the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals, #8286 (car)
July 29, 2013 Filing 8290 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Siraj M Abhyankar counsel for Defendants Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Counter Claimants Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC. Scott P Amy is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC; Charter Communications Holding Company LLC; Charter Communications Inc.; Charter Communications Operating LLC. (Abhyankar, Siraj)
July 29, 2013 Filing 8289 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Siraj M Abhyankar counsel for Counter Claimants AOL LLC, AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Defendants AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC. Jessica E Jacob is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC; Charter Communications Holding Company LLC; Charter Communications Inc.; Time Warner Cable Inc.; Time Warner Entertainment Company LP; Time Warner NY Cable LLC; AOL LLC; Compuserve Interactive Services Inc.; Netscape Communications Corp; Netscape Communications Corporation. (Abhyankar, Siraj)
July 29, 2013 Filing 8288 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP Court Reporter. Court will contact Sarah Guske at sguske@cooley.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Attachments: #1 Amended Attachment A)(Guske, Sarah)
July 26, 2013 Filing 8286 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. Appeal of Order #7592 , Order on Motion to Strike #8172 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8174 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #7437 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8245 , Order on Motion to Strike #8054 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-12461512 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Epstein, Daniel)
July 26, 2013 Filing 8285 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Supplemental filed by Defendants Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Counter Claimants Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC (Flinn, Patrick)
July 26, 2013 Filing 8284 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8244 #8257 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 25, 2013 Filing 8283 Mail Returned addressed to James Gerard McCarney Howrey re Judgment, #8253 (shb)
July 25, 2013 Filing 8282 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP Court Reporter. Court will contact Sarah Guske at sguske@cooley.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Guske, Sarah)
July 24, 2013 Filing 8281 STIPULATION for Costs against Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
July 24, 2013 Filing 8280 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John S Kyle counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. JOHN S. KYLE is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF RONALD A. KATZ TECHNOLOGY LICENSING L.P.. (Kyle, John)
July 22, 2013 Filing 8279 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP #8261 filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, DHL Holdings (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. (Epstein, Daniel)
July 22, 2013 Filing 8277 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order. (Graves, Jonathan)
July 19, 2013 Filing 8276 REPLY - SUR-REPLY in Opposition to MOTION to Strike Portions of Earthlink's Motion for Summary Judgment #8139 filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Boice, William)
July 18, 2013 Filing 8278 SEALED DOCUMENT - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER (shb)
July 18, 2013 Filing 8275 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document #8273 , Order on Application for Order #8274 e-mailed to cjuarez@cooley.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8274 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8260 Application for Order to File Under Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order. (rne)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8273 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8146 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Katz's Motion to Strike. (rne)
July 18, 2013 Filing 8272 OBJECTIONS to APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP #8261 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori R. Mason, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Mason, Lori)
July 17, 2013 Filing 8271 Mail Returned addressed to DAVID ANDREW SEGAL re Judgment, #8253 (rne)
July 16, 2013 Filing 8266 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Judgment, #8253 (shb)
July 15, 2013 Filing 8270 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order, Add and Terminate Parties, #8251 (shb)
July 15, 2013 Filing 8269 Mail Returned addressed to Richard S Sanders re Judgment, #8253 (shb)
July 15, 2013 Filing 8268 Mail Returned addressed to Brown McCarroll re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 8254 (shb)
July 15, 2013 Filing 8267 Mail Returned addressed to Deanna R Swits re Judgment, #8253 (shb)
July 15, 2013 Filing 8265 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8244 #8257 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Direct Group North America Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC. (Roddy, Valerie)
July 12, 2013 Filing 8264 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Appeal of Order #7592 , Order on Motion to Strike #8172 , Judgment, #8253 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #7437 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8245 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Graves, Jonathan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 8262 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis G.X. Pileggi counsel for Defendants GEICO Corporation, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Francis G.X. Pileggi, Esquire will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants GEICO. (Pileggi, Francis)
July 9, 2013 Filing 8263 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8246 (bp)
July 9, 2013 Filing 8261 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. Application set for hearing on 7/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Epstein, #2 Exhibit A to Epstein Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Epstein Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Epstein Decl. (Part 1), #5 Exhibit C to Epstein Decl. (Part 2), #6 Exhibit C to Epstein Decl. (Part 3))(Epstein, Daniel)
July 8, 2013 Filing 8260 APPLICATION for Order for Sealing (Pursuant to Filing Under Seal Pilot Program and Court's May 7, 2009 Second Administrative Order Regarding Ex Parte Applications to Seal, Part B) Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P.'s Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order, filed conditionally under seal on July 3, 2013 filed by defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DirecTV Inc, Direct Group North America Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roddy, Valerie)
July 3, 2013 Filing 8259 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8244 . (jp)
July 3, 2013 Filing 8258 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order (FILED UNDER SEAL). (Graves, Jonathan)
July 3, 2013 Filing 8257 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8244 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Graves, Jonathan)
July 3, 2013 Filing 8256 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Judge R. Gary Klausner is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at RGK_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 25, 2013 Filing 8255 Mail Returned addressed to ELIZABETH L DERIEUX re Order on Motion to Vacate #8249 . (rne)
June 25, 2013 Filing 8254 Notice of Electronic Filing re Judgment, #8253 e-mailed to sharyn.castle@kattenlaw.com and fpileggi@foxrothschild.com bounced due to unknown address; recipient not found. Primary e-mail address for Sharyn Castle was removed, she no longer works for the firm. The primary email address for Francis Pileggi was corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to fpileggi@eckertseamans.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 25, 2013 Filing 8253 JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Licensing, L.P., shall take nothing from Defendants DHL Express (USA), Inc. and Sky Courier, Inc. (collectively "DHL Defendants"), that judgment for DHL Defendants is granted, and that DHL Defendants shall recover their costs of suit. (ir)
June 21, 2013 Filing 8252 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8245 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Epstein, Daniel)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8251 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation #8250 . All claims asserted by Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P. against the Cablevision Defendants and all counterclaims asserted by the Cablevision Defendants against Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P., in each case, are dismissed with prejudice;Each of the parties shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees associated with the prosecution and defense of this Action; and All unresolved pending motions in this Action between these settling parties are denied as moot. (ir)
June 20, 2013 Filing 8250 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendants-Counterclaim Plaintiffs CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice)(Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8249 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Joint Motion to Vacate #8226 . The Court's 5/1/09 Order ruling on General Motors' Individual Summary Judgment Motion and the Court's 5/22/09 Judgment are hereby vacated. (ir)
June 12, 2013 Filing 8248 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order #8228 . (lom)
June 12, 2013 Filing 8247 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao re Order #8227 (bp)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8246 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Denying in part and Granting in part the FEDEX Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #7659 . (ir)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8245 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Granting in part and Denying in part DHL Defendant's Second Individual Motion for Summary Judgment #7649 . (ir)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8244 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DIRECTVSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #7670 (ir)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8243 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Joint Motion to Vacate Courts May 1, 2009 Ruling on General Motors MSJ and Judgment (DE 8226), noticed for hearing on June 17, 2013, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 10, 2013 Filing 8242 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Valerie Roddy counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Direct Group North America Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC. David A. Sergenian is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The DirecTV Group et al.. (Roddy, Valerie)
June 10, 2013 Filing 8241 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Valerie Roddy on behalf of Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Direct Group North America Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC, Counter Claimants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Enterprises, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DIRECTV Holding, LLC, DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC (Roddy, Valerie)
June 7, 2013 Filing 8240 Notice of Electronic Filing re Reply #8236 e-mailed to David Sergenian bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2013 Filing 8236 REPLY Joint MOTION to Vacate #8226 filed by Defendants US Bancorp, US Bank National Association. (Kaspar, Scott)
June 5, 2013 Filing 8239 Mail Returned addressed to ELIZABETH L DERIEUX re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #8224 . (rne)
June 5, 2013 Filing 8238 Mail Returned addressed to ELIZABETH L DERIEUX re Order #8227 . (rne)
June 5, 2013 Filing 8237 Mail Returned addressed to ELIZABETH L DERIEUX re Order #8228 . (rne)
June 3, 2013 Filing 8235 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Joint MOTION to Vacate #8226 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
May 29, 2013 Filing 8234 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #8224 (shb)
May 28, 2013 Filing 8233 Mail Returned addressed to JAMES GERARD MCCARNEY HOWREY re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (rne)
May 27, 2013 Filing 8231 OPPOSITION to Joint MOTION to Vacate #8226 filed by Defendants US Bancorp, US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Denying The Joint Motion To Vacate)(Kaspar, Scott)
May 22, 2013 Filing 8232 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #8224 (shb)
May 21, 2013 Filing 8230 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Courtland L Reichman counsel for Counter Claimants American Airlines Inc, American Airlines Inc, Defendant American Airlines Inc. Adding John Bruce Campbell Jr. as attorney as counsel of record for American Airlines Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc. (Reichman, Courtland)
May 21, 2013 Filing 8229 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Courtland L Reichman counsel for Counter Claimants American Airlines Inc, American Airlines Inc, Defendant American Airlines Inc. Adding Courtland L. Reichman as attorney as counsel of record for American Airlines Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Airlines Inc. (Reichman, Courtland)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8228 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, DENYING Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), #7634 RE ECHOSTAR'S INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOLLOWING THE COURT'S CONSTRUCTION OF DNIS (shb)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8227 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Notice of Manual Filing re Cablevision's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non Infringement and Invalidity of CLaim 11 of US Patent No 6,292,547. (G-92), #7810 (shb)
May 17, 2013 Filing 8226 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Vacate filed by plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Joint Motion to Vacate, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
May 9, 2013 Filing 8225 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel Brian Epstein on behalf of Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc. (Epstein, Daniel)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8224 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTS AOL's partial motion for non-infringement #7653 (ir)
May 7, 2013 Filing 8223 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order, #8199 (shb)
May 6, 2013 Filing 8625 MANDATE of Federal Circuit Court of Appeals filed Federal Case CCA # 09-1407 and 1408. Motion to withdraw is granted. Each side shall bear its own costs. All other pending motions are moot. Late Docketing due to Clerk's Office Error. (mat)
April 22, 2013 Filing 8222 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (rne)
April 22, 2013 Filing 8221 Mail Returned addressed to VANDANA KOELSCH re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (rne)
April 22, 2013 Filing 8220 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion to Strike,,, #8198 (rne)
April 22, 2013 Filing 8219 Mail Returned addressed to CHRISTOPHER J CUNEO re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (rne)
April 22, 2013 Filing 8218 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (rne)
April 16, 2013 Filing 8217 NOTICE of Change of address by Bita Rahebi attorney for Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Changing attorneys address to Morrison & Foerster LLP, 707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 6000, Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543. Filed by Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. (Rahebi, Bita)
April 11, 2013 Filing 8216 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement, Invalidity, and Collateral Estoppel #7659 (Notice Of Supplemental Authority) filed by Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Counter Claimants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporate Services Inc, Fedex Corporation, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc, Fedex Customer Information Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Franklin, Darren)
April 3, 2013 Filing 8215 Mail Returned addressed to Richard S Sanders re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (shb)
March 13, 2013 Filing 8213 Mail Returned addressed to MICHAEL CHARLES SMITH re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (rne)
March 11, 2013 Filing 8214 Mail Returned addressed to DEANNA R SWITS re Order on Motion to Strike, #8200 (rne)
March 6, 2013 Filing 8212 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order #8191 (shb)
March 6, 2013 Filing 8211 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 8190 (shb)
March 6, 2013 Filing 8210 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 8193 (shb)
March 6, 2013 Filing 8209 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 8192 (shb)
March 6, 2013 Filing 8208 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, #8189 (shb)
March 1, 2013 Filing 8207 Mail Returned addressed to ELIZABETH L DERIEUX re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,, 8190 (rne)
February 27, 2013 Filing 8202 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LPto Supplement(Motion related), #8188 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graves, Jonathan)
February 26, 2013 Filing 8206 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order #8191 (shb)
February 26, 2013 Filing 8205 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 8193 (shb)
February 26, 2013 Filing 8204 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, #8189 (shb)
February 26, 2013 Filing 8203 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 8192 (shb)
February 21, 2013 Filing 8201 MAIL RETURNED addressed to Lisa K Hsiao at Howrey LLP 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue NW Washington, DC 20004 re Order on Motion to Strike #8187 (ir)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8200 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART The AOL Defendants' Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiff's Opposition To AOL's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting in part and denying in part #7804 Motion to Strike. (bm)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8199 ORDER GRANTING COX's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. This Court GRANTS Cox's motion for summary judgment #7646 and finds that Katz may not recover any damages for activity that occurred on or after December 21, 2005. (lom)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8198 ORDER DENYING KATZ'S MOTION TO STRIKE Portions Of Cablevision's Motion For Summary Judgment And Granting In Part And Denying In Part Cablevision's Motion to Strike Portions Of Katz's Summary Judgment Opposition by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting in part and denying in part #7930 Motion to Strike; denying #7933 Motion to Strike. (bm)
February 14, 2013 Filing 8197 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Charles S Barquist counsel for Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. John Scott will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.John A. Scott is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant EchoStar Satellite, L.L.C. (Barquist, Charles)
February 14, 2013 Filing 8196 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Charles S Barquist counsel for Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Elisabeth Traugott will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Elisabeth Traugott is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant EchoStar Satellite, L.L.C. (Barquist, Charles)
February 14, 2013 Filing 8195 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Charles S Barquist counsel for Defendant Echostar Satellite LLC. Jason A. Crotty will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Jason A. Crotty is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant EchoStar Satellite, L.L.C. (Barquist, Charles)
February 8, 2013 Filing 8194 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Motion to Strike, #8187 (shb)
February 8, 2013 Filing 8193 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order #8191 e-mailed to Brian D Siff bounced due to invalid e-mail address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 8, 2013 Filing 8192 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order #8191 e-mailed to Thomas C Wright bounced due to invalid e-mail address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8189 ORDER DENYING CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., ET AL.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF DNIS CLAIMS UNDER THE DOCTRINE OF EQUIVAQULENTS (U.S. PATENT NOS. '285,'707.'863) AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Since there is no evidence to suggest that the VDNs found in Citizens' systems literally satisfy the DNIS limitation, this Court DENIES Katz's motion for reconsideration #7676 (See document for further details) (bp)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8191 ORDER RE SUGGESTION OF REMAND TO DISTRICT OF DELAWARE by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re 07-cv-6996-RGK. The court grants the request and the action of case 07-cv-6996 is remanded to the US District Court, District of Delaware at Wilmington. (shb)
January 31, 2013 Filing 8190 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, #8189 , Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) #8188 e-mailed to John P Moy bounced due to invalid e-mail address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2013 Filing 8188 SUPPLEMENT to Second MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity and Noninfringement DHL DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #7649 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dartt, Stephen)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8187 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order DENYING Without Prejudice GEICO Defendants Motion to Strike Improper Supplementation of Dr. Kelly's Expert Report On Infringment by Judge R. Gary Klausner: This Court DENIES the GEICO defendants' motion without prejudice. When this case is remanded, GEICO may raise this issue with the trial court #7608 (bp)
January 15, 2013 Filing 8186 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Request for Order, #8171 (rne)
January 10, 2013 Filing 8185 NOTICE of Suggestion of Remand filed by plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
January 9, 2013 Filing 8184 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel A DeVito re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Reconsideration #8176 . (lom)
January 9, 2013 Filing 8183 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Motion to Strike #8172 . (lom)
January 3, 2013 Filing 8287 Mail Returned addressed to DANIEL J THOMASCH re Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting,, #8086 (rne)
January 3, 2013 Filing 8182 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #8174 (rne)
January 3, 2013 Filing 8181 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, #8149 (rne)
January 3, 2013 Filing 8180 Mail Returned addressed to ELIZABETH L DERIEUX re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, #8149 (rne)
January 3, 2013 Filing 8179 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings,, #8145 (rne)
January 3, 2013 Filing 8178 Mail Returned addressed to MICHAEL J SCHEER re Order on Motion to Strike #8054 (rne)
January 3, 2013 Filing 8177 Mail Returned addressed to JULIE A TENNYSON re Order on Motion to Strike #8054 (rne)
December 19, 2012 Filing 8175 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Peter J Ayers counsel for Defendant American Airlines Inc. Peter J. Ayers will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Peter J. Ayers is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant American Airlines, Inc. (Ayers, Peter)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8176 ORDER GRANTING CHARTER'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING KATZ'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PRIOR INVALIDITY RULING Docket Entries #7630 and #7721 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: This Court GRANTS Charter's motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity and finds that claim 1 of 223 patent is invalid as indefinite. This Court also DENIES Katz's motion for reconsideration of the prior invalidity ruling. (bp)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8174 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Denying Defendants' Collective Motion for Judgment of Patent Invalidity as a Matter of Law #7652 . (ir)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8173 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Granting in part and denying in part Katz' Motion to strike portions of Directv's Motion for Summary Judgment #7795 . (ir)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8172 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Granting in part and Denying in part Katz' Motion to strike portions of DHL's Motion for Summary Judgment #7802 . (ir)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8171 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: re Suggestion of Remand Order and finding as moot #8170 Request for Status Conference. Plaintiff shall submit the document to Defendants for approval of form and content, then submit the Suggestion of Remand to the Court no later than January 10, 2013. (rne)
December 4, 2012 Filing 8170 REQUEST for Order for Request for Status Conference filed by plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
November 30, 2012 Filing 8169 Mail Returned addressed to ELIZABETH L DERIEUX re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings,, #8145 (rne)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8149 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: taking under advisement #8146 Earthlinks Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Katzs Motion to Strike Portions of Earthlinks Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (shb)
November 5, 2012 Filing 8168 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8093 (rne)
November 5, 2012 Filing 8167 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Application for Order #8106 (rne)
November 5, 2012 Filing 8166 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings #8134 (rne)
November 5, 2012 Filing 8165 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, #8133 (rne)
November 5, 2012 Filing 8164 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Application for Order #8135 (rne)
November 5, 2012 Filing 8156 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Application for Order, #8129 (rne)
October 29, 2012 Filing 8147 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Strike #8146 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Mead, Lowell)
October 19, 2012 Filing 8146 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Taylor H. Ludlam, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order)(Boice, William)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8145 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #8139 TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EARTHLINK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on10/22/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
October 15, 2012 Filing 8144 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Gregory S Norrod attorney for Defendants Charter One Bank NA, Citizens Bank, Citizens Bank NA, Citizens Bank of Rhode Island, Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A., US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, Counter Claimants Citizens Bank, Citizens Bank of Rhode Island, Citizens Financial Group Inc, US Bancorp, US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, US Bank National Association, Movant Citizens Financial Group Inc. Changing firm name to Stahl Cowen Crowley Addis and address to 55 West Monroe, Suite 1200, Chicago, IL 60603. Filed by Defendants Charter One Bank NA, Citizens Bank, Citizens Bank NA, Citizens Bank of Rhode Island, Citizens Financial Group Inc, RBS Citizens N.A., US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, Counter Claimants Citizens Bank, Citizens Bank of Rhode Island, Citizens Financial Group Inc, US Bancorp, US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, US Bank National Association, Movant Citizens Financial Group Inc. (Norrod, Gregory)
October 8, 2012 Filing 8143 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike Portions of Earthlink's Motion for Summary Judgment #8139 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
October 1, 2012 Filing 8142 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Portions of Earthlink's Motion for Summary Judgment #8139 filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boice, William)
September 28, 2012 Filing 8141 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment #7660 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sergenian, David)
September 12, 2012 Filing 8139 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Earthlink's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Motion set for hearing on 10/22/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D part 1, #7 Exhibit D part 2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(Graves, Jonathan)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8163 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #8037 (rne)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8162 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,, #8036 (rne)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8161 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion to Strike #8054 . (rne)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8160 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting,, #8086 (rne)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8159 Mail Returned addressed to UNKNOWN re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings,, #8059 (rne)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8158 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Application to Seal (document) #8062 (rne)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8157 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Washington, DC 2004 re Order on Application to Seal (document) #8039 (bp)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8155 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20004 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings,, #8059 (bp)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8154 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao, 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20004 re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #8041 (bp)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8153 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao, 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20004 re Order on Application for Order #8063 (bp)
September 7, 2012 Filing 8148 Mail Returned addressed to David M Hill re Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting,, #8086 (shb)
September 6, 2012 Filing 8137 REPLY support MOTION to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers #7930 (REDACTED) filed by Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC. (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
September 5, 2012 Filing 8136 REPLY In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike re Cablevision's Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED) filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Graves, Jonathan)
August 31, 2012 Filing 8152 MAIL RETURNED addressed to Lisa K Hsiau at Howrey LLP 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004 re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #8057 (ir)
August 31, 2012 Filing 8151 MAIL RETURNED addressed to Lisa K Hsiao at Howrey LLP 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue NW Washington, DC 20004 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #8060 (ir)
August 31, 2012 Filing 8150 MAIL RETURNED addressed to Lisa K Hsiao at Howrey LLP 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004 re Order on Ex Parte Application to Seal (Document) #8058 (ir)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8134 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of RAKTLs Summary Judgment Opposition Papers #7930 . the above-referenced motion, set for hearing on September 10, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. (rne)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8133 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiffs Motion to Strike a Portion of Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment #7933 the above-referenced motion, set for hearing on September 10, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. (rne)
August 30, 2012 Filing 8140 SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY IN SUPPORT of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Re: Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8135 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8130 Application for Order to File Under Seal Reply In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Cablevision's Motion for Summary Judgment. (rne)
August 29, 2012 Filing 8138 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Strike #7930 filed by Defendant Cablevision Systems Corporation. (vdr)
August 29, 2012 Filing 8132 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Anne M. Champion in Further Support of the Cablevision Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers. Exhibit F filed Under Seal. (mat)
August 29, 2012 Filing 8131 SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers. (mat)
August 29, 2012 Filing 8130 JOINT APPLICATION for Order for TO FILE UNDER SEAL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE RE CABLEVISION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Lodged Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(shb)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8129 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8109 Application for Order to File Under Seal Cablevision's Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of its Motion to Strike Portion of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Oppostiion Papers and Exhibit F to the Champion Declaration. (rne)
August 29, 2012 Filing 8110 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of Reply in support of Plaintiffs Motion to Strike re Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment. (Graves, Jonathan)
August 29, 2012 Filing 8108 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of Joint Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal Reply In Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Strike re Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mead, Lowell)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8128 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux Re: Order on Ex Parte Application #8057 . (vdr)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8127 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel A DeVito Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #8059 . (vdr)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8126 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #8060 . (vdr)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8109 JOINT APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal Cablevision's Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of its Motion to Strike Portion of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Oppostiion Papers and Exhibit F to the Champion Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rne)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8107 SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff's Opposition to Cablevision's Motion to Strike a Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers. (mat)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8106 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8105 Application for Order to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Cablevision's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers. (rne)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8104 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth Traugott re Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, #8085 (shb)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8103 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel A DeVito re Order on Application to Seal (document) #8039 (shb)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8102 Mail Returned addressed to Elizabeth L DeRieux re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #8037 (shb)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8101 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel A DeVito re Minutes of In Chambers Order, #8014 (shb)
August 28, 2012 Filing 8100 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel A DeVito re Minutes of In Chambers Order, #8013 (shb)
August 27, 2012 Filing 8097 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Strike, Exhibit F to the Declaration of Anne Champion, Joint Ex Parte Application to Seal and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne Champion in Further Support of the Cablevision Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers, #2 Proof of Service)(Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8125 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Application to Seal #8038 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8124 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Application to Seal #8022 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8123 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Application to Seal #8021 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8122 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Application to Seal #8019 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8121 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Application to Seal #8018 .(vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8120 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #8017 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8119 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #8016 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8118 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #8015 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8117 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #8014 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8116 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #8013 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8115 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Application to Seal #8011 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8114 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Ex Parte Application to Seal #8010 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8113 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K. Hsiao Re: Order on Ex Parte Application to Seal #8000 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8112 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Order on Application #7982 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8111 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #7943 . (vdr)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8105 JOINT APPLICATION for Order allowing Under Seal Filing of Plaintiff's Opposition to Cablevision's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rne)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8096 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of Cablevision's Individual Motion for Summary Judgment (Redacted) Opposition re: MOTION to Strike a Portion of Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment #7933 Opposition (Redacted) filed by Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC. (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
August 24, 2012 Filing 8095 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of Joint Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Cablevision's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers. (Mead, Lowell)
August 23, 2012 Filing 8094 STATEMENT of In Response To The Court's Request For Clarification MOTION for Ruling to Apply the Court's Invalidity Ruling Regarding Claim 49 of U.S. Patent No. 5,351,285 Across the Entire Multidistrict Litigation #7628 filed by Defendants US Bancorp, US Bank National Association. (Kaspar, Scott)
August 22, 2012 Filing 8099 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS 1-4 to Declaration of Anne M. Champion in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike a Portions of Cablevision's Individual Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
August 22, 2012 Filing 8098 SEALED DOCUMENT- CABLEVISION Defendants' MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike a Portions of Cablevision's Individual Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8093 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8087 Cablevision Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal Cablevision's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike re Cablevision's Motion for Summary Jdugment and Exhibits 1-4 to Champion Declaration. (rne) Modified on 8/23/2012 (rne).
August 20, 2012 Filing 8092 DECLARATION of J. Adam Suppes in opposition to MOTION to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers #7930 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Graves, Jonathan)
August 20, 2012 Filing 8091 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of Plaintiff's Opposition to Cablevision's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers. (Graves, Jonathan)
August 20, 2012 Filing 8090 REDACTED REPLY re Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement and Invalidity #7672 filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc. (Boice, William)
August 20, 2012 Filing 8089 NOTICE of filing of Motion to Withdraw Justin P.D. Wilcox As Counsel of Record filed by plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Pietrantonio, Frank)
August 20, 2012 Filing 8088 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mitra Melisa Eskandari-Azari on behalf of Defendants AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Counter Claimants AOL LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Entertainment I LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Holding Company LLC, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Inc, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Cable Inc, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner Entertainment Company LP, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, AOL LLC (Eskandari-Azari, Mitra)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8086 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner ORDERING Ex Parte Application, Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law In Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion, Declaration of Anne M Champion submitted by Defendants Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC received on 8/15/2012 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (shb)
August 17, 2012 Filing 8080 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike re Cablevision's Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED) filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Mead, Lowell)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8085 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE RE KATZ'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CABLEVISION'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION PAPERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearing, #8040 . The hearings re Motion is continued for hearing on 9/10/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.) (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8087 CABLEVISION DEFENDANTS' AND PLAINTIFF'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TOFILE UNDER SEAL CABLEVISION'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AND EXHIBITS 1-4 TO THE DECLARATION OF ANNE CHAMPION filed by Defendants Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC and Plaintiff Ronald A Katz.(shb) Modified on 8/17/2012 (shb).
August 15, 2012 Filing 8079 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document), #7706 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8078 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 7947 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8077 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order, #7945 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8076 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order, #7941 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8075 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application for Order, #7950 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8074 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, #7976 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8073 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order #7953 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8072 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7952 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8071 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 7972 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8070 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Ex Parte Application to Seal (Document) #7993 (shb)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8069 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael K Plimack counsel for Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. ROBERT T. HASLAM, ANDREW C. BYRNES, MICHAEL K. PLIMACK, AND DALE A. RICE will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.ROBERT T. HASLAM, ANDREW C. BYRNES, MICHAEL K. PLIMACK, AND DALE A. RICE is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, L.P. (Plimack, Michael)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8068 SEALED DOCUMENT- AOL's REPLY to Raktl's Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact Re: Opposition to AOL Defendants' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8063 ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION #8053 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (vdr)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8062 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT by Judge R. Gary Klausner RE: Application #8009 to Seal. (vdr)
August 14, 2012 Filing 8084 SEALED DOCUMENT- MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Re: Cablevision's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
August 14, 2012 Filing 8083 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S Opposition to Defendants Citizens Financial Group, Inc., et al's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
August 14, 2012 Filing 8082 SEALED DOCUMENT- STATEMENT of Genuine Issues. (mat)
August 14, 2012 Filing 8081 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS A and B to the Declaration of Lowell D. Mead in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Re: Cablevision's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7)(mat)
August 14, 2012 Filing 8061 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC of Cablevision's Memorandum of Law, Exhibits 1-4 to the Declaration of Anne Champion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne Champion in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of Cablevision's Individual Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8060 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner Re: AOL, Compuserve, Netscapes' Motion #7804 to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 8/20/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8059 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner Re: Plaintiff's Motion #7802 to Strike Portions of DHL's Second Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 8/20/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8058 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8008 Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal (shb)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8057 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8056 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRILE RE CABLEVISION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; EXHIBITS A AND B TO THE DECLARATION OF LOWELL D MEAD (shb)
August 13, 2012 Filing 8049 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order #7904 (shb)
August 13, 2012 Filing 8042 REDACTED MEMORANDUM in Support of the DHL DEFENDANTS' SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re Second MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity and Noninfringement DHL DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #7649 filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of DHL Defendants' Second Individual Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 REDACTED Declaration of Ivan Zatkovich in Support of DHL Defendants' Second Individual Motion for Summary Judgment)(Dartt, Stephen)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8054 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #7723 Motion to Strike portions of B-Track Defendant Collective Motion for Judgment of Patent Invalidity as a Matter of Law. (shb)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8041 ORDER DENYING U.S. BANCORP AND U.S. BANK'S MOTION TO APPLY THE COURT'S INVALIDITY RULING REGARDING CLAIM 49 OF THE '285 PATENT ACROSS THE ENTIRE MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Judge R. Gary Klausner: This Court DENIES U.S. Bank's motion in its entirety #7627 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (bp) .
August 10, 2012 Filing 8040 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Strike (Dkt. 7933) from September 4, 2012 to September 10, 2012 Re: MOTION to Strike a Portion of Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment #7933 filed by Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Strike (Dkt. 7933))(Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
August 9, 2012 Filing 8067 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S Opposition to AOL's MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (mat)
August 9, 2012 Filing 8066 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT 1 to the Declaration of Lowell D. Mead in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
August 9, 2012 Filing 8065 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS I and J to the Declaration of Lowell Mead in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of DHL's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
August 9, 2012 Filing 8053 APPLICATION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL PERTAINING TO AOL'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by Defendants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp. Lodged Proposed Order. (shb)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8039 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #7951 Application to File Certain Confidential Documents Under Seal (shb)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8038 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #7998 Application to File Documents Under Seal (shb)
August 9, 2012 Filing 8031 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of David J Teece, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5)(mg)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8037 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: taking under submission #7671 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on August 13, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (shb)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8036 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: taking under submission #7670 Motion for Summary Judgment.; taking under submission #7795 Motion to Strike. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motions, noticed for hearing on August 13, 2012, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submittedpleadings. (shb)
August 8, 2012 Filing 8035 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Christian G Kessler III (mg)
August 8, 2012 Filing 8034 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Siraj M Abhyankar in Support of AOL's MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and to Strike Portions of the Supporting Kelly Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition (mg)
August 8, 2012 Filing 8033 SEALED DOCUMENT-REPLY in Support of Earthlink's MOTION for Summary Judgment (mg)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8022 ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION #7959 TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT IN SUPPORT OF AOL'S MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (vdr)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8021 ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION #7960 FOR ORDER TO FILE CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (vdr)
August 8, 2012 Filing 8020 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Counter Claimants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, AOL LLC of Joint Application to File Confidential Document Under Seal Pertaining to AOL's Reply ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Flinn, Patrick)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8017 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: MOTION #7653 FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NON-INFRINGEMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 8/13/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8016 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: MOTION #7630 FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO INVALIDITY by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 8/13/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8015 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: MOTION #7659 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 8/13/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8014 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: MOTION #7672 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 8/13/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8013 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Re: MOTION #7654 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 8/13/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8052 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order #7908 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8051 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application for Order #7907 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8050 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, #7905 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8048 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order, #7902 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8047 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order #7901 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8046 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Notice of Clerical Error (G-11) #7871 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8045 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #7870 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8044 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7838 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8043 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Ex Parte Application to Seal (Document) #7865 (shb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8030 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT Q to the Supplemental Declaration of Anne M Chamption in Further Support of Cablevision Defendants' Individual MOTIONS for Summary Judgment as to non-infringement and invalidity of claim 11 of U.S. Patent No. 6,292,547 (mg)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8024 SEALED DOCUMENT-THE CABLEVISION DEFENDANTS' REBUTTAL to Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to the Cablevision Defendants' Individual Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of Claim 11 of USA patent Number 6, 292,547. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(mg)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8023 SEALED DOCUMENT-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF the Cablevision Defendants' Individual MOTION for Summary Judgment as to non-infringement and invalidity of claim 11 of U.S. Patent No. 6,292,547 (mg)
August 7, 2012 Filing 8012 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Robert T De Bouver in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' Individual MOTIONS for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement and Invalidity of Claim 11 of US Patent Number 6,292,547 (mg)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8011 DENIED ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying without prejudice #7958 Application to Seal. (vdr)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8010 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING Cablevision Defendants' and Plaintiff's Joint Ex Parte Application to file Confidential documents under seal #7957 . Cablevision must file a public version of its reply memorandum redacting any confidential material it specifically identified in this application. (ir)
August 6, 2012 Filing 8007 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike Portions of DHL's Second Motion for Summary Judgment #7802 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Mead, Lowell)
August 6, 2012 Filing 8006 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and to Strike Portions of the Supporting Kelly Declaration #7804 filed by Defendants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Counter Claimants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, AOL LLC. (Flinn, Patrick)
August 3, 2012 Filing 8056 JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRILE RE CABLEVISION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; EXHIBITS A AND B TO THE DECLARATION OF LOWELL D MEAD filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Lodged Proposed Order.(shb)
August 3, 2012 Filing 8055 CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., et al'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Defendants CCO Investment Services Corp, Citizens Bank, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, RBS Citizens N.A..(shb)
August 3, 2012 Filing 8009 JOINT APPLICATION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP.Lodged Proposed Order. (vdr)
August 3, 2012 Filing 8008 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Defendants CCO Investment Services Corp, Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania, Citizens Financial Group Inc and RBS Citizens N.A.Lodged Proposed Order.(Attachments: #1 Part 2)(vdr)
August 3, 2012 Filing 8001 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa H Hsiao re Order on Application for Order #7845 (shb)
August 3, 2012 Filing 7999 REDACTED REPLY in Support of DHL DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re EXPARTE APPLICATION to Seal #7992 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE DHL DEFENDANTS' SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. (Dartt, Stephen)
August 3, 2012 Filing 7998 JOINT APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP.Lodged Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vdr)
August 3, 2012 Filing 7991 REPLY In Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement #7653 filed by Defendants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Counter Claimants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, AOL LLC. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED VERSION AOL's Reply to RAKTL's Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact re Opposition to AOL Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Flinn, Patrick)
August 3, 2012 Filing 7990 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Counter Claimants AOL LLC, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Compuserve Interactive Services Inc, Netscape Communications Corp, Netscape Communications Corporation, Netscape Communications Corporation, AOL LLC of Joint Application to File Confidential Document Under Seal Pertaining to AOL's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Exhibits A and B, thereto, [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Application to File Confidential Document Under Seal; and AOL's Reply to RAKTL's Statement of Genuine Issue of Material Fact re Opposition to AOL Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Flinn, Patrick)
August 3, 2012 Filing 7989 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Citizens Financial Group Inc of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Citizens Financial Group, Inc., et al.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Statement of Genuine Issues; Citizens Financial Group, Inc., et al.'s Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal; Exhibits A and B thereto; and [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal. (Green, Rachelle)
August 3, 2012 Filing 7988 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of Joint Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal Katzs Motion To Strike Regarding Cablevisions Motion For Summary Judgment; Exhibits A and B To The Declaration Of Lowell D. Mead. (Mead, Lowell)
August 2, 2012 Filing 8005 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT D to the Declaration of Ann M Champion in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' MOTION to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers #7930 .(mg)
August 2, 2012 Filing 8004 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT C to the Declaration of Ann M Champion in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' MOTION to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers #7930 . (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(mg)
August 2, 2012 Filing 8003 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT B to the Declaration of Ann M Champion in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' MOTION to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers #7930 . (mg)
August 2, 2012 Filing 8002 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Ann M Champion in Support of the Cablevision Defendants' MOTION to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers #7930 . (mg)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8000 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #7956 Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff and the Cablevision Defendants to File Confidential Documents Under Seal. (mg)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7997 SEALED DOCUMENT- CONSOLIDATED SEPARATE STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of Directv's MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7996 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS A, B, and C to Reply Declaration of David A. Sergenian in Support of Directv's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7995 SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER granting Directv's Application to File Certain Confidential Documents Under Seal. (mat) Modified on 8/3/2012 (mat).
August 2, 2012 Filing 7994 SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY Memorandum in Support of Directv's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7993 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION #7992 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (vdr)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7992 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DHL DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO ITS SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc and Sky Courier Inc.(vdr)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7985 SEALED DOCUMENT- REPLY Memorandum in Support of the DHL DEFENDANTS' SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (mat)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7983 DECLARATION of Lowell D. Mead in Opposition to MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and to Strike Portions of the Supporting Kelly Declaration #7804 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Mead, Lowell)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7982 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #7883 Application TO DEEM AOLs PAPERS AS TIMELY FILED. (rne)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7981 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7744 . (rne)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7980 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7765 (shb)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7979 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7750 (shb)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7978 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Order on Motion to Strike #7747 . (rne)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7977 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #7751 (shb)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7976 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying #7848 CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., ET AL.'s Ex Parte Application for Order to File Under Seal re Plaintiff's Opposition to Citizens Financial Group's MSJ; Statement of Genuine Issues. Application fails to particularly identify what the parties consider to be confidential. (rne)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7975 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7771 (shb)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7974 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #7758 (shb)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7973 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #7752 (shb)
August 2, 2012 Filing 7965 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7773 (shb)
August 1, 2012 Filing 8032 SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of DAVID LUCANTONI, Ph.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION to Earthlink's MOTION for Summary Judgment. (mg) Modified on 8/9/2012 (mg).
August 1, 2012 Filing 8029 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT H-T to the Declaration of Scott A Cole in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Earthlink's MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17)(mg)
August 1, 2012 Filing 8028 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT A-G to the Declaration of Scott A Cole in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Earthlink's MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5)(mg)
August 1, 2012 Filing 8026 SEALED DOCUMENT-STATEMENT of GENUINE ISSUES in Opposition to Earthlink's MOTION for Summary Judgment (mg)
August 1, 2012 Filing 8025 SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION to Earthlink's MOTION for Summary Judgment (mg)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8018 ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION #7890 TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (vdr)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7971 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Ex Parte Application to Seal (Document) #7777 , Fax Number (shb)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7970 Mail Returned addressed to LISA K HSIAO re Notice of Errata. (rne)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7969 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Ex Parte Application for Order #7843 (shb)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7968 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re OOrder on Ex Parte Application to Seal (Document) #7778 (shb)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7967 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Notice of Clerical Error (G-11) #7761 (shb)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7966 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7780 (shb)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7964 Mail Returned addressed to Lisa K Hsiao re Order on Application to Seal (document) #7785 (shb)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7960 JOINT APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP.Lodged Proposed Order. (vdr)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7952 DENIED ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying without prejudice #7899 Application. (vdr)
August 1, 2012 Filing 7946 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc of Joint Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal Defendant EarthLink, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Christian G. Kessler III. (Boice, William)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7945 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: re: MOTION to Strike Portions of B-Track Defendants' Collective Motion for Judgment of Patent Invalidity as a Matter of Law MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity of Claims 96, 98, and 99 of the '863 Patent #7723 . The above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on August 6, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. (rne)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7943 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #7721 . The above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on August 6, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. (rne)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7941 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #7295 #7727 . The above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on August 6, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. (rne)
July 31, 2012 Filing 7957 CABLEVISION DEFENDANTS' AND PLAINTIFF'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Defendants Cablevision Systems Corporation.Lodged Proposed Order.(vdr)
July 31, 2012 Filing 7956 UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF AND THE CABLEVISION DEFENDANTS TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Defendants Cablevision Systems Corporation.Lodged Proposed Order.(vdr)
July 31, 2012 Filing 7947 Notice of Electronic Filing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,, #7943 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal #7942 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,, #7941 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminate Hearings, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,, #7945 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #7944 , Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) #7940 e-mailed to jwilcox@cooley.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2012 Filing 7940 REPLY In Support MOTION for Summary Judgment as to non-infringement and invalidity of claim 11 of U.S. Patent No. 6,292,547, etc. #7654 Reply Memorandum of Law in support of the Cablevision Defendants' Individual Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rebuttal to Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to the Cablevision Defendants' Individual Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Reply Declaration of Robert De Bouver in support of the Cablevision Defendants' Individual Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Supplemental Declaration of Anne Champion in Further Support of the Cablevision Defendants' Individual Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit Q (Sealed) to the Supplemental Declaration of Anne Champion, #5 Exhibit R to the Supplemental Declaration of Anne Champion)(Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
July 31, 2012 Filing 7939 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC of Joint Ex Parte Application to Seal and Proposed Order, Reply Memorandum of Law, Statement Pursuant to FRCP 56.1, Sealed Exhibits. (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7944 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal #7942 served on 7/30/2012. (shb)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7942 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file under seal filed by Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc. Lodged Proposed Order.(shb) Modified on 8/1/2012 (shb).
July 30, 2012 Filing 7938 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and to Strike Portions of the Supporting Kelly Declaration #7804 filed by Counter Defendant Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing L P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lowell Mead)(Mead, Lowell)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7937 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Defendant Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing L P of Application to File Documents Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Application; Plaintiffs Opposition to AOLs Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Opposition to AOLs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; Exhibit 1 to the Mead Declaration. (Mead, Lowell)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7936 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Portions of DirecTV's Motion for Summary Judgment #7795 filed by Counter Defendant Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing L P. (Mead, Lowell)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7935 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Strike Portions of DHL's Second Motion for Summary Judgment #7802 DHL DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO RAKTL'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DHL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Stephen Dartt, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Dartt, Stephen)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7934 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP of Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Strike re Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits A - B to the Mead Declaration. (Mead, Lowell)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7933 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike a Portion of Cablevisions Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. Motion set for hearing on 9/4/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, #2 Proposed Order)(Mead, Lowell)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7932 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Counter Claimants CSC Holdings Inc, CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC of Sealed Exhibits. (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7931 REPLY EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO RAKTL'S OPPOSITION TO DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC. (Sergenian, David)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7930 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of RAKTL's Summary Judgment Opposition Papers filed by Defendant CSC Holdings Inc, Cablevision Systems Corporation, Cablevision Systems New York City Corporation, Cablevision of Brookhaven Inc, Cablevision of Connecticut Corporation, Cablevision of Hudson County Inc, Cablevision of Litchfield Inc, Cablevision of Monmouth Inc, Cablevision of New Jersey Inc, Cablevision of Oakland LLC, Cablevision of Rockland/Ramapo LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of Cablevision Defendant's Motion to Strike, #2 Declaration of Anne Champion in support of Cablevision Defendant's Motion to Strike, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Anne Champion, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Anne Champion, #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Anne Champion, #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Anne Champion, #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Anne Champion, #8 Proposed Order Granting the Cablevision Defendant's Motion to Strike)(Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7929 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 CONSOLIDATED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 REPLY DECLARATION OF DAVID A. SERGENIAN IN SUPPORT OF DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #3 Exhibit A - C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sergenian, David)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7928 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc of Reply in Support of EarthLink, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration of Christian G. Kessler III. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Boice, William)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7927 DECLARATION of Taylor H. Ludlam In Support of EarthLink, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement and Invalidity #7672 filed by Defendant Earthlink Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22 to Ludlam Declaration, #2 Exhibit 23 to Ludlam Declaration)(Boice, William)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7926 REPLY in Support of Second MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity and Noninfringement DHL DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #7649 filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bart Prieve, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Bart Prieve, #3 Proof of Service)(Dartt, Stephen)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7925 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants DIRECTV Customer Services Inc, DIRECTV Group Inc, DirecTV Inc, Directv Enterprises LLC, Directv Holdings LLC of REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [FILED UNDER SEAL]; CONSOLIDATED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [FILED UNDER SEAL]; REPLY DECLARATION OF DAVID A. SERGENIAN IN SUPPORT OF DIRECTV'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [FILED UNDER SEAL]; EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER' SEAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DIRECTVS APPLICATION TO FILE CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Sergenian, David)
July 30, 2012 Filing 7924 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants DHL Express (USA) Inc, Sky Courier Inc. of Unopposed Ex Parte Application to File under Seal DHL Defendants' Reply in Support of Second Individual Motion for Summary Judgment; [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Ex Parte Application; Reply Memorandum in Support of DHL Defendants' Second Individual Motion for Summary Judgment. (Dartt, Stephen)
July 26, 2012 Filing 8064 SEALED DOCUMENT- PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DHL SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (mat)
July 26, 2012 Filing 8027 SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT of GENUINE ISSUES in Opposition to DHL's MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6)(mg)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8019 ORDER GRANTING JOINT APPLICATION #7889 TO FILE UNDER SEAL KATZ'S OPPOSITION by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (vdr)
July 26, 2012 Filing 7987 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT LL-NNN and PPP-SSS to the Declaration of Sarah J. Guske in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to DHL'S SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13, Part 14, Part 15)(mat)
July 26, 2012 Filing 7986 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT A-KK to the Declaration of Sarah J. Guske in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to DHL's SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13, Part 14, Part 15, Part 16)(mat)
July 26, 2012 Filing 7984 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support of Plaintiff Ronald A. Katz Technology Licensing, LP's Opposition to DHL SECOND INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (mat)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7907 ORDER GRANTING Joint Application to File Under Seal Confidential Document in support of AOL'S Motion to Strike #7900 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jp)
July 26, 2012 Filing 7906 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT A to Declaration of Siraj M. Abhyankar in Support of AOL's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to AOL's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and to Strike Portions of the Supporting Kelly Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition. (mat)
July 25, 2012 Filing 7908 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity of Claims 96,98 and 00 of the 863 Patent #7652 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 7/30/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (jp)
July 25, 2012 Filing 7905 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): DHL Defendants' Motion and Second Individual Motion for Summary Judgment (DE7649) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Relates to: CV07-2192-RGK(FFMx): Katz v. American International Group, Inc. (DE533). The Court advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on July 30, 2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings #7649 Motion for Summary Judgment. (bp)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7904 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner RE: Motion #7676 for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motion, noticed for hearing on 7/30/2012, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. (vdr)
July 25, 2012 Filing 7903 REPLY In support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #7295 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #7295 #7727 #7759 filed by Plaintiff Ronald A Katz Technology Licensing LP. (Rodriguez, Ricardo)