Ronnie Clayton et al v. Ronald Fisher et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Elias, Timothy D Malczynski, James C Dodd, Paul Aarnio, William L Leigon, Raul Barrile, Hossein Nebati, Bobby J Hamby, Jr, William Leigon an Associates, Inc., Jeffery Glaser, Maria Bortis, Andrew Micklos, Vasile Bortis, Henry Montgomery, Robert L Gale, Eduardo Ramirez, Precision Relocation LLC, Jean Hogue, Premier Office Services, LLC, Leigon Leigon, Thomas St. Clair, Eshrat Thobani, Douglas Piersant, The Willis Ballet, Inc., Provident Medical Management Group, Inc., White and Yellow Cab, Inc, Pinnacle Disposal and Environmental Services, Inc., Shawn Dodd, Dijamaan, Inc., Olena Hanby, Ronnie Clayton, Azim Thobani, Kirk O'Gilvy, Daphney Montgomery, Malibu Farms Inc, PSCA, Inc., Diana Rodriguez, DDS Robert Houchin, Peggy Willis and Mc Cormic Fresh Herbs, LLC
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding III, CMC Lease Funding 2001-3, Inc., Guardian Capital XV, LLC, RLI Insurance, Comercial Servicing Corporation, CMC Lease Funding 2001-2, Inc., CASH Recovery, LLC, Guardian Capital Financial, Inc., CMC Lease Funding II, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Bank of Waukegan, Diversity Capital II, LLC, CMC Lease Funding, LLC, Bluebonnet Savings Bank, FSB, Ronald Fisher, CMC Lease Funding 2000-2, Inc., CMC Lease Funding 1998-1, LLC, Guardian Capital V, LLC, Safeco Surety Company, U.S. Bancorp, The Huntington National Bank, The Second National Bank, Royal and Sun Alliance USA, Sterling Wayne Pertle, Citibank, N.A.,, The Metropolitan Bank & Trust, Lakeland Bank, DOES 1 through 720, inclusive, Footbridge Limited Trust, CMC Lease Funding 2001-1, Inc., Riverway Bank, Sky Bank, Ameriana Bank & Trust of Indiana, Stuart Allan, Mark Fisher, Guardian Capital VIII, LLC, CMC Lease Funding 2000-1, Inc., Epic Funding Corporation, Amwest Surety Insurance Company, Inc., Netbank, Inc., Frontier Insurance Company, American Motorists Insurance Company, United Security Bank, CMC Lease Funding 2000-220, L.P., Guardian Capital XVIII, LLC, Atlantic Coast Federal, Guardian Capital VI, LLC, Guardian Capital IX, LLC., Commercial Money Center, Inc. and Illinois Union Insurance Company
Petitioner: Ranger Insurance Company
Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2008cv01755
Filed: March 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Victor B Kenton
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2008 Filing 58 RECEIPT of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court received by Los Angeles County Superior Court (ir)
July 8, 2008 TRANSMITTAL of documents - mailed certified copy of Order remanding with Civil Docket Sheet to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (bm)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING THE FDIC AS A PARTY AND REMANDING ACTION TO COURTS OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #35 : The Court having reviewed and considered the plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss the FDIC as a party to this action and to Remand the action to the California Court, the documents filed in support of and opposition thereto and the argument of counsel thereon, and finding good cause therefore: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. All of the plaintiffs' claims against the FDIC are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs; and 2. This action is remanded to the Courts of California due to the lack of Federal subject matter jurisdiction after the dismissal of the FDIC. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: #1 Letter CV-103) (bm)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez on APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Jeffrey L Galliher for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #55 GRANTED. FEE PAID. (ir)
June 18, 2008 Filing 54 MINUTES: (In Chambers); Plaintiffs Notice of Motion to dismiss FDIC and to Remand Action to California Courts based upon lack of Federal Jurisdiction #35 ; Counsel are advised that the above-referenced motion set for hearing on Monday, June 23, 2008 at 1:30 p.m. is taken Under Submission and off calendar. Accordingly, no appearance by counsel is necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of the submitted pleadings by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (ir)
June 17, 2008 Filing 55 APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Jeffrey L Galliher for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and local counsel James R. Ballard filed by Defendants Bank of Waukegan, Riverway Bank. FEE PAID. Lodged Order. (ir)
June 9, 2008 Filing 53 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #35 STATEMENT OF POSITION OF INDIFFERENCE BY DEFENDANTS THE HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK, FOR ITSELF AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BY MERGER TO DEFENDANTS THE METROPOLITAN BANK & TRUST CO., THE SECOND NATIONAL BANK OF WARREN and SKY BANK CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Defendant The Huntington National Bank. (Broderick, James)
June 9, 2008 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Dale Prough on behalf of Defendant RLI Insurance (Prough, Michael)
June 9, 2008 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Dale Prough on behalf of Defendant RLI Insurance (Prough, Michael)
June 9, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael Dale Prough counsel for Defendant RLI Insurance. Changing address to 1550 Parkside Drive, Third Floor. Filed by Defendant RLI Insurance Company (Prough, Michael)
June 9, 2008 Filing 49 STATEMENT of Position MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #35 filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marum, J)
June 5, 2008 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: account information was not updated in ECF system RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #47 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
June 5, 2008 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Stephen P Soskin counsel for Defendant Epic Funding Corporation Netbank, Inc.. Filed by Cross-Complainant Epic Funding Corporation (Soskin, Stephen)
June 5, 2008 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin Saeko Kubota on behalf of Defendant Footbridge Limited Trust (Kubota, Erin)
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION #34 FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING OR VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND POSTPONING OR ELIMINATING THE REQUIREMENTS FOR AN EARLY MEETING OF COUNSEL AND THE ASSOCIATED DISCLOSURES AND REPORTS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: June 23, 2008 status conference is vacated. At least for the present time, parties exempted from the requirements under FRCP 26(f) and 26(a). (ps)
June 3, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jonathan D Rapore counsel for Defendant Atlantic Coast Federal. Adding Jonathan Rapore as attorney as counsel of record for Atlantic Coast Federal for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Atlantic Coast Federal (Rapore, Jonathan)
May 30, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Service of Subsequent Document Filings-Proof of Service RE: Miscellaneous Document, #37 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (es)
May 30, 2008 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice-Notice/Certificate Notice of Interested Parties RE: Miscellaneous Document, #36 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (es)
May 30, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Service of Subsequent Document Filings/Proof of Service RE: Miscellaneous Document, #38 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (es)
May 30, 2008 Filing 40 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: account information wasn't updated RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #39 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
May 30, 2008 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Christian J Gascou counsel for Defendant American Motorists Insurance Company. Adding Ronald W. Hopkins as attorney as counsel of record for American Motorists Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Motorists Insurance Company (Gascou, Christian)
May 30, 2008 Filing 38 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Miguel Elias, Diana Rodriguez, Vasile Bortis, The Willis Ballet, Inc., Peggy Willis, Paul Aarnio, Provident Medical Management Group, Inc., Shawn Dodd, James C Dodd, Pinnacle Disposal and Environmental Services, Inc., Timothy D Malczynski, Robert L Gale, Maria Bortis, Andrew Micklos, Raul Barrile, Dijamaan, Inc., Eshrat Thobani, Azim Thobani, Henry Montgomery, Daphney Montgomery, Ronnie Clayton, Malibu Farms Inc, Jeffery Glaser, Mc Cormic Fresh Herbs, LLC, Precision Relocation LLC, Premier Office Services, LLC, Kirk O'Gilvy, Douglas Piersant, Bobby J Hamby, Jr, Olena Hanby, White and Yellow Cab, Inc, Hossein Nebati, Thomas St. Clair, Jean Hogue, William Leigon an Associates, Inc., William L Leigon, Leigon Leigon, Robert Houchin, PSCA, Inc., Eduardo Ramirez Proposed Order re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 23, 2008 to August 25, 2008 #34 (McCurnin, Thomas)
May 29, 2008 Filing 37 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Miguel Elias, Diana Rodriguez, Vasile Bortis, The Willis Ballet, Inc., Peggy Willis, Paul Aarnio, Provident Medical Management Group, Inc., Shawn Dodd, James C Dodd, Pinnacle Disposal and Environmental Services, Inc., Timothy D Malczynski, Robert L Gale, Maria Bortis, Andrew Micklos, Raul Barrile, Dijamaan, Inc., Eshrat Thobani, Azim Thobani, Henry Montgomery, Daphney Montgomery, Ronnie Clayton, Malibu Farms Inc, Jeffery Glaser, Mc Cormic Fresh Herbs, LLC, Precision Relocation LLC, Premier Office Services, LLC, Kirk O'Gilvy, Douglas Piersant, Bobby J Hamby, Jr, Olena Hanby, White and Yellow Cab, Inc, Hossein Nebati, Thomas St. Clair, Jean Hogue, William Leigon an Associates, Inc., William L Leigon, Leigon Leigon, Robert Houchin, PSCA, Inc., Eduardo Ramirez re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 23, 2008 to August 25, 2008 #34 (McCurnin, Thomas)
May 29, 2008 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Miguel Elias, Diana Rodriguez, Vasile Bortis, The Willis Ballet, Inc., Peggy Willis, Paul Aarnio, Provident Medical Management Group, Inc., Shawn Dodd, James C Dodd, Pinnacle Disposal and Environmental Services, Inc., Timothy D Malczynski, Robert L Gale, Maria Bortis, Andrew Micklos, Raul Barrile, Dijamaan, Inc., Eshrat Thobani, Azim Thobani, Henry Montgomery, Daphney Montgomery, Ronnie Clayton, Malibu Farms Inc, Jeffery Glaser, Mc Cormic Fresh Herbs, LLC, Precision Relocation LLC, Premier Office Services, LLC, Kirk O'Gilvy, Douglas Piersant, Bobby J Hamby, Jr, Olena Hanby, White and Yellow Cab, Inc, Hossein Nebati, Thomas St. Clair, Jean Hogue, William Leigon an Associates, Inc., William L Leigon, Leigon Leigon, Robert Houchin, PSCA, Inc., Eduardo Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCurnin, Thomas)
May 29, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Ronnie Clayton. Motion set for hearing on 6/23/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(McCurnin, Thomas)
May 29, 2008 Filing 34 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 23, 2008 to August 25, 2008 filed by plaintiff Ronnie Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(McCurnin, Thomas)
May 28, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James H Broderick, Jr on behalf of Defendant The Huntington National Bank (Broderick, James)
May 23, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Paul A Guelpa counsel for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. Adding Paul A. Guelpa as attorney as counsel of record for Illinois Union Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service By Mail)(Guelpa, Paul)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER On Notice of Unavailability of geraldine A Valdez for Scheduling Conference by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Ms. Valdez may be excused from appearing at the June 23, 2008 scheduling conference. For the purpose of the June 23, 2008 scheduling conference only, Ryan C. Caplan, an associate at Procopio, may appear on Ms. Valdezs behalf. Mr. Caplan shall be familiar with the case and shall be prepared to discuss any matters that may arise in the course of the scheduling conference that are related thereto. (es)
May 20, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order On Notice Of Unavailability of Geraldine A. Valdez For Scheduling Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Proof of Service)(Valdez, Geraldine)
May 19, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Dougan Vogel on behalf of Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vogel, Karin)
May 8, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Defendant Lakeland Bank (Davis, Susan)
May 7, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Geraldine Valdez counsel for Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation. Changing E-mail to gav@procopio.com. Adding Geraldine A. Valdez as attorney as counsel of record for General Electric Capital Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Valdez, Geraldine)
May 6, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE of Unavailability for Scheduling Conference; Declaration of Geraldine A. Valdez in Support filed by Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation. (Valdez, Geraldine)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez that this matter is set for a scheduling conference on Monday, June 23, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. (bm)
April 28, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Valdez, Geraldine)
April 24, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE of change of attorney information filed by defendant Ronald Fisher. (Solomon, Richard)
April 11, 2008 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Thomas E McCurnin counsel for Plaintiff Ronnie Clayton. Changing address to 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2200, Los Angeles, CA 90071-3485. Filed by All Plaintiffs Barton Klugman & Oetting LLP (McCurnin, Thomas)
April 11, 2008 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error docket entry item NO. 12 is a Double entry of docket item No. 11 Re: Exhibit to Notice of Removal 1: [Part 10 of 14] (car)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. All counsel are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, particularly Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16, 26, and the Local Rules of the Central District of California, this Court's Order for Jury Trial, and this Court's Order for Court Trial. See document for details. (es)
March 20, 2008 Filing 19 NOTICE OF LODGING filed CD-Rom Containing Electronic Copies of Removal Papers (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marum, J)
March 14, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Sherri D Martinelli, Robert C Niesley is (949) 261-0771. (car)
March 14, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Richard A Solomon, Stephen M Spinella, Rochelle Stanford is (858) 793-8263. (car)
March 14, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Fred R Puglisi is (310) 228-3701. (car)
March 14, 2008 FAX number for Attorney Maureen F Hallahan, J Barrett Marum, Karin Dougan Vogel is (619) 234-3815. (car)
March 14, 2008 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE filed in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/29/04, served on 1/29/04.filed by Defendant General Electric Capital Corporation, re Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 14, 2008 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER filed in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/5/02 filed by Defendants Commercial Money Center, Inc., Comercial Servicing Corporation, Ronald Fisher, Sterling Wayne Pertle, Safeco Surety Companyto Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 14, 2008 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER Filed in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/5/01 to Notice of Removal #1 filed by Defendant Frontier Insurance Company.(car)
March 14, 2008 Filing 18 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; (California Court of Appeal Pleadings filed in Case No. B179134) filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 17 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; (California Court of Appeal Briefs filed in case No. B179134 filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 16 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 14 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 15 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 13 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 14 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 12 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 13 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 11 of 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. [Attachment of CONFORMED COPY OF Proof of Service filed in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/29/04 as Exhibit 170](car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 12 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 10 of 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car)
March 14, 2008 Filing 11 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 10 of 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2008 (lra, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2008 (lra, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 10 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 9 of 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 9 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 7 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Modified on 3/19/2008 (car, ). Modified on 3/19/2008 (car, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 8 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 8 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 7 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 6 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 6 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 5 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 5 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 4 OF 14] filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2008 (cbr, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 4 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 3 OF 14] Filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2008 (hha, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 3 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 2 TO 14], filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. [CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMERCIAL MONEY CENTER, INC.; RONALD FISCHER, STERLING WAYNE PIRTLE; COMMERCIAL SERVICING CORPORATION AND SAFECO SURETY COMPANY ATTACHED FILED ON 3/5/2002 TO EXHIBIT 33.] (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2008 (hha, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 2 EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ; [PART 1 TO 14], filed by Receiver Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. [CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 6/27/2001 AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED FILED ON 8/2/2001. AND CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FRONTIER INSURANCE COMPANYS ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 7.] (car) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2008 (tdo, ).
March 14, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC 253169. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Victor B Kenton, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for NetBank, FSB.(car) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2008 (tdo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronnie Clayton et al v. Ronald Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Elias
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy D Malczynski
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Dodd
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Aarnio
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L Leigon
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Barrile
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hossein Nebati
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby J Hamby, Jr
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Leigon an Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Glaser
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bortis
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Micklos
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasile Bortis
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Montgomery
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Gale
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Relocation LLC
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Hogue
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Office Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigon Leigon
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas St. Clair
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eshrat Thobani
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Piersant
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Willis Ballet, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Medical Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White and Yellow Cab, Inc
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Disposal and Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Dodd
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dijamaan, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olena Hanby
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Clayton
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azim Thobani
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk O'Gilvy
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphney Montgomery
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Farms Inc
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSCA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDS Robert Houchin
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Willis
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mc Cormic Fresh Herbs, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E McCurnin
Represented By: Mark A Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding 2001-3, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital XV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance
Represented By: Michael Dale Prough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comercial Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Richard A Solomon
Represented By: Rochelle Stanford
Represented By: Stephen M Spinella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding 2001-2, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASH Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Capital Corporation
Represented By: Maureen F Hallahan
Represented By: Geraldine A Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Waukegan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Galliher
Represented By: James R Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversity Capital II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluebonnet Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Eric A Gressler
Represented By: Mark E Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Fisher
Represented By: Richard A Solomon
Represented By: Rochelle Stanford
Represented By: Stephen M Spinella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding 2000-2, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding 1998-1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital V, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Surety Company
Represented By: Richard A Solomon
Represented By: Rochelle Stanford
Represented By: Stephen M Spinella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: James H Broderick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Second National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal and Sun Alliance USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Wayne Pertle
Represented By: Richard A Solomon
Represented By: Rochelle Stanford
Represented By: Stephen M Spinella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Metropolitan Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Bank
Represented By: Susan Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 720, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Footbridge Limited Trust
Represented By: Erin Saeko Kubota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding 2001-1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverway Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey L Galliher
Represented By: James R Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriana Bank & Trust of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital VIII, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding 2000-1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Funding Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amwest Surety Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netbank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert C Niesley
Represented By: Sherri D Martinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Motorists Insurance Company
Represented By: Christian J Gascou
Represented By: Ronald W Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Security Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Lease Funding 2000-220, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital XVIII, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Coast Federal
Represented By: Jonathan D Rapore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital VI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital IX, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Money Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A Solomon
Represented By: Rochelle Stanford
Represented By: Stephen M Spinella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul A Guelpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: J Barrett Marum
Represented By: Fred R Puglisi
Represented By: Karin Dougan Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ranger Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?