Jackson Browne v. John McCain et al Featured Case

Jackson Browne is suing John McCain for using \"Running on Empty\" in his 2008 Presidential Campaign.

Plaintiff: Jackson Browne
Defendant: John McCain, The Republican National Committee and The Ohio Republican Party
Case Number: 2:2008cv05334
Filed: August 14, 2008
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Eick
Presiding Judge: Klausner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2009 87 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 59 filed by John McCain, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 63 filed by The Republican National Committee, CCA # 09-55357, 09-55358. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. Mandate received in this district on 8/04/9. (lr)
August 4, 2009 86 Featured Case ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, granting Stipulation to Dismiss Case 84 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear his or its own attorneys fees and costs, except as otherwise allocated in the parties' settlement agreement., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
July 31, 2009 85 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 84 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Iser, Lawrence)
July 31, 2009 84 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the FRCP filed by plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Iser, Lawrence)
May 19, 2009 83 Featured Case ORDER TO EXTEND THE TIME TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: (See order for further details) (yl)
May 12, 2009 82 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Defendant John McCain. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
April 20, 2009 81 Featured Case ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner: (See Order for further details) (yl)
April 20, 2009 80 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Case called. Court and counsel confer. The Scheduling Conference is held. The Court sets thefollowing dates: (see minute order for further details) Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (yl, )
April 18, 2009 79 NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3); parties request to appear before a retired judicial officer or other dispute resolution body for mediation type settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steinsapir, Jonathan)
April 1, 2009 78 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lincoln D Bandlow counsel for Defendant John McCain. Changing Address to 1888 Century Park East, Suite 1000, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Changing Fax Number to 310-789-4601. Filed by Defendant John McCain (Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 26, 2009 77 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is: Trial and Pretrial Documents - Joint 26(f) Report Discovery Plan RE: Miscellaneous Document 76 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (shb)
March 25, 2009 76 Joint Report re Early Meeting of Cousenl filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne, Defendants John McCain, The Republican National Committee, The Ohio Republican Party (Iser, Lawrence)
March 20, 2009 75 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee. Filed On: March 10, 2009; Entered On: March 10, 2009; (Klein, Howard)
March 20, 2009 74 First AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Defendant John McCain. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 59 Filed On: March 10, 2009; (Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 12, 2009 73 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-55358, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 63 as to Defendant The Republican National Committee. (car)
March 12, 2009 72 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-55357, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 59 as to Defendant John McCain. (car)
March 12, 2009 70 NOTICE OF APPEAL NOTIFICATION form issued regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 63 as to Defendant The Republican National Committee. (dmap)
March 12, 2009 69 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Defendant John McCain, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 59 . (dmap)
March 11, 2009 71 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 59 as to Defendant John McCain; Receipt Number: 116682 in the amount of $455. (dmap)
March 10, 2009 68 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant John McCain.(Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 10, 2009 67 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant John McCain. correcting Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 66 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 10, 2009 66 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee.(Klein, Howard)
March 10, 2009 65 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from Defendant The Republican National Committee forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 63 (Klein, Howard)
March 10, 2009 64 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 63 . (Klein, Howard)
March 10, 2009 63 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee. (Filing fee $455, receipt number 09730000000005013485.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Klein, Howard)
March 10, 2009 62 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant John McCain.(Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 10, 2009 61 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from Defendant John McCain forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 59 (Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 10, 2009 60 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 59 . (Bandlow, Lincoln)
March 10, 2009 59 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant John McCain. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 58 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, 56 . (Filing Fee Not Paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Representation Statement)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
February 20, 2009 58 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 . (shb)
February 20, 2009 57 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: DENYING MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 . (shb)
February 20, 2009 56 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: DENYING MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 . In light of the foregoing, the Court DENIES Senator McCains Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffsclaims for Copyright Infringement, Vicarious Copyright Infringement, and Violation of the Lanham Act. The Court addresses Senator McCains grounds for dismissal of Plaintiffs California Common Law Right of Publicity claim in its Order Re Senator McCains Special Motion to Strike. IT IS SO ORDERED (shb)
February 20, 2009 55 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: re: Notice (Other) 27 . In light of the foregoing, the Court DENIES RNCs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs claims for Copyright Infringement, Vicarious Copyright Infringement, and Violation of the Lanham Act. The Court addresses RNCs grounds for dismissal of Plaintiffs California Common Law Right of Publicityclaim in its Order Re RNCs Special Motion to Strike. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
February 20, 2009 54 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 ., The Ohio Republican Party terminated. (shb)
February 20, 2009 53 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2009 at 9:00 am. See document for details. (sw)
January 29, 2009 52 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court hereby advises counsel that the above-referenced motions set for hearing on February 2, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and taken off the motion calendar. Furthermore, no appearance by counsel is necessary and the Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of the submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
January 21, 2009 51 Objections to the Declarations of Miller, Noyes and Steinsapir in support of re: MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 , MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee. (Klein, Howard)
January 21, 2009 50 DECLARATION of John McClelland in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 & Motion to Strike filed by Defendant The Ohio Republican Party. (Connolly, Rebecca)
January 21, 2009 49 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 & Motion to Strike filed by Defendant The Ohio Republican Party. (Connolly, Rebecca)
January 21, 2009 48 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee. (Klein, Howard)
January 21, 2009 47 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee. (Klein, Howard)
January 21, 2009 46 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 filed by Defendant John McCain. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
January 21, 2009 45 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 pursuant to the Anti-SLAPP statute filed by Defendant John McCain. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
January 7, 2009 44 DECLARATION of Jonathan P. Steinsapir in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 & RNC's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 27) filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Steinsapir, Jonathan)
January 7, 2009 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 & RNC's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 27) filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Steinsapir, Jonathan)
January 7, 2009 42 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne of Evidence in Support of the Opposition of Plaintiff to Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Iser, Lawrence)
January 7, 2009 41 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Evidence re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 37 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 36 (Iser, Lawrence)
January 7, 2009 40 DECLARATION of Jonathan Noyes in Support of Consolidated Oppositions to MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 , MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Iser, Lawrence)
January 7, 2009 39 DECLARATION of Donald Miller in Support of Consolidated Opposition to MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 , MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Iser, Lawrence)
January 7, 2009 38 Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Mauk and McClelland Declarations Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Iser, Lawrence)
January 7, 2009 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Iser, Lawrence)
January 7, 2009 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 , MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 [Consolidated Opposition] filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Iser, Lawrence)
January 5, 2009 35 NOTICE Of Change Of Firm Name filed by Defendant John McCain. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 21, 2008 34 Featured Case ORDER ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND SET BRIEFINGSCHEDULE ON MOTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Having reviewed the Joint Stipulation to Continue the Hearing on Motions and Set Briefing Schedule Filed by all parties, and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Senator McCain's Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure, 425.16 and Motion to Dismiss, the Ohio Republican Party's Special Motion to Strike and and Motion to Dismiss or Transfer shall be heard on 2/2/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner (See Order for further details) (yl)
November 19, 2008 33 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearings on Defendants' Motions from 12/9/08 to 2/2/09 Re: MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 , MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 , MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 , Notice (Other) 27 filed by Plaintiff (Joint Filing) Jackson Browne. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steinsapir, Jonathan)
November 18, 2008 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is: Motion Related Filings/ Responses/Replies /Memorandum in Support of Motion. In response to this notice the court may order: (1) an amended or corrected document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. RE: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion) 30 . (mg)
November 18, 2008 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is: Motions / Dismiss Case. Hearing was not set. In response to this notice the court may order: (1) an amended or corrected document to be filed, (2) the document stricken, or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. RE: Notice (Other) 27 . (mg)
November 17, 2008 30 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by DEFENDANT The Republican National Committee. Re: MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint 29 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dang, Sang)
November 17, 2008 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike the Fourth Claim of the Complaint filed by DEFENDANT The Republican National Committee. Motion set for hearing on 12/8/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Dang, Sang)
November 17, 2008 28 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by DEFENDANT The Republican National Committee. Motion to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) Re: Notice (Other) 27 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dang, Sang)
November 17, 2008 27 NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by DEFENDANT The Republican National Committee. (Dang, Sang)
November 17, 2008 26 DECLARATION of Jason Mauk in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Defendant The Ohio Republican Party. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Connolly, Rebecca)
November 17, 2008 25 DECLARATION of John McClelland in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Defendant The Ohio Republican Party. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1, # 2 Exhibit #2, # 3 Exhibit #3)(Connolly, Rebecca)
November 17, 2008 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) 23 filed by Defendant The Ohio Republican Party. (Connolly, Rebecca)
November 17, 2008 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Federal Rule 12(b)(2), (3) & (6) filed by Defendant The Ohio Republican Party. Motion set for hearing on 12/8/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Connolly, Rebecca)
November 17, 2008 22 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant John McCain of DVD and Compact Disc. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 17, 2008 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 filed by Defendants John McCain, The Republican National Committee, The Ohio Republican Party. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 17, 2008 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) 19 filed by Defendant John McCain. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 17, 2008 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant John McCain. Motion set for hearing on 12/8/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 17, 2008 18 DECLARATION of John McCain In Support Of MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 filed by Defendant John McCain. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 17, 2008 17 DECLARATION of Lincoln Bandlow In Support Of MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 filed by Defendant John McCain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 13, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15, # 12 Exhibit 16, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Exhibit 18, # 15 Exhibit 19, # 16 Exhibit 20, # 17 Exhibit 21, # 18 Exhibit 22)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 17, 2008 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 15 filed by Defendant John McCain. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 17, 2008 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike The Fourth Claim Of The Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant John McCain. Motion set for hearing on 12/8/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
October 20, 2008 14 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Pursuant to the Joint Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by defendants JOHN MCCAIN, THE REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, and THE OHIO REPUBLICAN PARTY (collectively Defendants),and good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby Ordered that the deadline forDefendants to respond to the complaint is extended to November 17, 2008. 11 (yl)
October 15, 2008 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Time to Respond to Complaint from October 27, 2008 to November 17, 2008 Re: Complaint - (Discovery) 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities 11 filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (Steinsapir, Jonathan)
October 14, 2008 12 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Ohio Republican Party, (Connolly, Rebecca)
October 14, 2008 11 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Time to Respond to Complaint from October 27, 2008 to November 17, 2008 Re: Complaint - (Discovery) 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants John McCain.(Bandlow, Lincoln)
September 24, 2008 10 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee, (Dang, Sang)
September 15, 2008 9 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant John McCain, (Bandlow, Lincoln)
September 15, 2008 8 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to John McCain answer now due 10/24/2008, filed by Defendant John McCain.(Bandlow, Lincoln)
September 15, 2008 7 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Republican National Committee answer now due 10/13/2008, filed by Defendant The Republican National Committee.(Dang, Sang)
September 15, 2008 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sang N Dang on behalf of Defendant The Republican National Committee (Dang, Sang)
September 15, 2008 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sang N Dang on behalf of Defendant The Republican National Committee (Dang, Sang)
September 15, 2008 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sang N Dang on behalf of Defendant The Republican National Committee (Dang, Sang)
August 26, 2008 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Read This Order Carefully. It Controls This Case. (See Order for Further Details). (sch)
August 14, 2008 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (et) (ds).
August 14, 2008 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants John McCain, The Republican National Committee, The Ohio Republican Party. (et)
August 14, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants John McCain, The Republican National Committee, The Ohio Republican Party. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Jackson Browne. (et) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson Browne v. John McCain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Browne
Represented By: Jonathan P Steinsapir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republican National Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Republican Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?