David Hirsch v. Afshin Corporation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Hirsch
Defendant: Calmet Services, Inc., Koosed Enterprises, Inc., Brotman Medical Center, Western Waste Industries, Temple Emanuel, Grand-Way Fabri-Graphics Inc., Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., TTT Metals of California, Bull's Truck Wash, Plumrose USA, Inc., Amorient Petroleum Company, California, Precision Automotive Products, Inc., Thermo Securities Corp., Norwalk Car Wash, Chromalloy Gas Turbine Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services, Princess Cruise Lines, Fairchild Corp., Whittaker Corporation, Elro Manufacturing Company, Consolidated Aluminum Corporation, D-M-E Company, Ralphs Grocery Company, Spence Electro Plating Company, Afshin Corporation, Inc., Ryder Systems, Inc., Crescenta Valley Water District, Cariker & Associates, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Welex, Inc., GlobalSantaFe corporation, Marco Manufacturing, Inc., Halliburton Company, Wilsey Bennett, Inc., Brunswick Corporation, The Termo Company, Farmer Bros. Co., Masonite Corporation, Solar Turbines International Company, Great Lakes Chemical Corporation, Food 4 Less of Southern California, Inc., Alco Cad-Nickel Planting Corp., Murcole, Inc., Jacob Stern & Sons, Inc., Wolf Tank Lines, Inc., Dorrane of California, LP, Whittaker Development Co., Certified Caterers Corp., Lorber Industries of California, Lee Pharmaceuticals, ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Axis Petroleum Company, Los Angeles Car Wash Corp., Washington Mutual, Inc., McGregor II, LLC, L and R Auto Parts, Inc., LeFiell Manufacturing Company, Mercedes-Benz Hollywood, Inc., Baker Hughes Incorporated, Cummins Engine Company, Inc., Scope Products, Inc., Alant Corp. and Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv06782
Filed: October 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2010 Filing 139 JUDGMENT by Judge George H Wu, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff, DAVID HIRSCH, Trustee of OII Eighth Partial Consent Decree WorkEscrow Account, be entered, against the Defendant, SPENCE ELECTRO PLATING COMPANY, in the amount of $11,298.00. #137 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (pj)
March 22, 2010 Filing 138 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULTJUDGMENT BY THE COURT (filed 02/23/10) #137 held before Judge George H Wu:; Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer.For reasons stated on the record, the Plaintiff's Amended Application for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court is granted. Court signs the judgment.All remaining defendants in this matter are dismissed without prejudice. Amorient Petroleum Company, California, Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc., Crescenta Valley Water District, Cummins Engine Company, Inc., D-M-E Company, Dorrane of California, LP, Fairchild Corp., Farmer Bros. Co., GlobalSantaFe corporation, Grand-Way Fabri-Graphics Inc., Great Lakes Chemical Corporation, Lorber Industries of California, Marco Manufacturing, Inc., McGregor II, LLC, Plumrose USA, Inc., Temple Emanuel, Welex, Inc., Western Waste Industries, Afshin Corporation, Inc. and Alant Corp. terminated.Court Reporter: Sandra Becerra. (pj)
February 23, 2010 Filing 137 Amendment to APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Norwalk Car Wash and Spence Electro Plating Company #132 filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
February 22, 2010 Filing 136 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Norwalk Car Wash. (White, Michael)
February 16, 2010 Filing 135 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Norwalk Car Wash #134 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as proof of service filed on 12/29/09 does not have due diligence attempts re the corporation prior substituted service. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered.. (pj)
February 8, 2010 Filing 134 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Norwalk Car Wash filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
January 13, 2010 Filing 133 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Norwalk Car Wash #127 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as Proof of Service is lacking required information Request forwarded to assigned Judge for consideration. The complaint identifies the defendant as corporation. Re submitted the request and proof of service does not have due diligence attempts re the corporation prior substituted service. The second proof shows substituted service for the owner by serving a General Partner. Clerk is unable to determine if substituted service on a General Partner is acceptable. (pj)
January 13, 2010 Filing 132 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Norwalk Car Wash and Spence Electro Plating Company filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. Application set for hearing on 2/1/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (White, Michael)
January 11, 2010 Filing 131 MINUTES of Motion Hearing by Judge George H Wu: Proceedings: Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Judgment #126 against Defendants Los Angeles Car Wash, Norwalk Car Wash, Precision Automotive Products, Inc, and Spence Electro Plating Company. The tentative circulated is hereby adopted as the Court's final ruling (attached). Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court is DENIED without prejudice. Counsel for plaintiff is to file a corrected application and accompanying declaration by 2/1/10. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (mg)
January 8, 2010 Filing 130 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Thomas P Friedman counsel for Defendant ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Thomas P. Friedman is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Terminated Defendant ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Friedman, Thomas)
January 7, 2010 Filing 128 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Los Angeles Car Wash Corp.. (White, Michael)
January 6, 2010 Filing 129 SPECIAL APPEARANCE DECLARATION of Paul R. Salerno Opposing Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Judgment against Defendant Los Angeles Car Wash Corporation #126 on the ground of lack of jurisdiction; filed by Defendant Los Angeles Car Wash Corp. (mg)
January 6, 2010 Filing 127 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Norwalk Car Wash filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. Request set for hearing on 1/11/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (White, Michael)
December 31, 2009 Filing 126 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Los Angeles Car Wash, Norwalk Car Wash, Precision Automotive Products, Inc, and Spence Electro Plating Company filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. Application set for hearing on 1/11/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (White, Michael)
December 30, 2009 Filing 125 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to LeFiell Manufacturing Company. (White, Michael)
December 29, 2009 Filing 124 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed David Hirsch, upon Norwalk Car Wash served on 11/19/2009, answer due 12/10/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by California Code of Civil Procedure statute, upon General Partner. Due Dilligence declaration No.. Original Summons Not returned. (White, Michael)
November 12, 2009 Filing 123 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Bull's Truck Wash. (White, Michael)
November 9, 2009 Filing 122 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Motion for default judgment is due by 12/31/2009 and the hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment is set on 1/11/10 at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pp)
November 6, 2009 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Suzanne B. Lanzone Pursuant to the Court's Order Requesting a Final Status of Case APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash , Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc., Lee Pharmaceuticals, Los Angeles Car Wash Corp., Norwalk Car Wash, Precision Automotive Products, Inc. and Spence Electro Plating Company100 filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
October 29, 2009 Filing 120 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. of Status Conference (White, Michael)
October 29, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Lee Pharmaceuticals. (White, Michael)
October 20, 2009 Filing 118 MINUTES Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer as to the remaining defendants. The Status Conference is CONTINUED to 11/9/2009 at 8:30 AM. Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding a final resolution of the case. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jp)
October 16, 2009 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Suzanne B. Lanzone Status of Defendants REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash #90 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Lee Pharmaceuticals #92 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Los Angeles Car Wash Corp. #93 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Norwalk Car Wash #96 , APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash , Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc., Lee Pharmaceuticals, Los Angeles Car Wash Corp., Norwalk Car Wash, Precision Automotive Products, Inc. and Spence Electro Plating Company100 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash #95 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc. #91 filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge George H Wu having read the Stipulation for Extension of Time to File and serve an answer or motion under Rule 12 #115 . Defendant Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc.s deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to October 19, 2009. (ir)
October 12, 2009 Filing 115 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File and Serve an Answer or Motion Under Rule 12 filed by defendant Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Extension of Time for Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc.)(Daniels, Robert)
October 5, 2009 Filing 114 NOTICE Amended Notice of Status Conference filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
October 5, 2009 Filing 113 NOTICE of Status Conference filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
October 1, 2009 Filing 112 MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer as to the remaining defendants. For reasons indicated on the record, a Status Conference is set for October 19, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Report as to which remaining defendants and their status will be filed by noon on October 16, 2009. Counsel for plaintiff may appear telephonically, if notice is given to the clerk within two business days. Counsel for defendants are ordered to appear in person on October 19, 2009. The Court Trial set for October 13, 2009, is taken off calendar. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (pj)
September 29, 2009 Filing 110 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document(s) is/are accepted as filed. Counsel will give careful attention to the deficiency/ies. Further use of incorrect events will result in your documents being stricken for failure to follow CM/ECF procedures. RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #108 (pj)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AND SERVE AN ANSWER OR MOTION UNDER RULE 12 by Judge George H Wu: Having read the foregoing and having found good cause therefor, the Court hereby makes the following order: [See document for details.] #108 (ake)
September 28, 2009 Filing 109 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; combined stipulation and order format is not applicable in e-filing. Proposed orders for Judge's approval are to be formally and separately prepared and submitted as a separate attachment to main document. RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #108 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
September 25, 2009 Filing 108 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Motion under Rule 12 filed by Defendant Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc..(Daniels, Robert)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu vacating #100 Application for Default Judgment. Counsel will resubmit the application for default judgment as to all defendants, once the deficiencies on the requests to enter default are corrected. (rj)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissedwithout prejudice as to Defendant, Precision Automotive Products, Inc. only. #105 (ake)
September 8, 2009 Filing 105 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Precision Automotive Products, Inc.. (White, Michael)
September 1, 2009 Filing 104 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Defendants Precision Automotive Products, Inc., Spence Electro Plating Company* (pj)
September 1, 2009 Filing 103 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: of as to Corporate defendants ( REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash #90 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Lee Pharmaceuticals #92 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Los Angeles Car Wash Corp. #93 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Norwalk Car Wash #96 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc. #91 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as Proof of Service is lacking required information. Lacking due diligence as to Bulls Truck Wash, Carmentia Ford Truck Sales Inc, Lee Pharmaceuticals, Los Angeles Car Wash Corp, Norwalk Car Wash. Also Bulls Truck Wash, Lee Pharmaceuticals sub-service on a Jane Doe is not acceptable for a corporation. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered.. (pj)
August 31, 2009 Filing 102 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Defendant Alant Corp.* (es)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Default be entered as against the Defendant, ALANT CORP., pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(a)(1)(A), for its failure to timely respond to the properly served Summons and Complaint. #94 (es)
August 24, 2009 Filing 100 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash , Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc., Lee Pharmaceuticals, Los Angeles Car Wash Corp., Norwalk Car Wash, Precision Automotive Products, Inc. and Spence Electro Plating Company filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. Application set for hearing on 9/14/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (White, Michael)
August 21, 2009 Filing 99 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Alant Corp.. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 98 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Precision Automotive Products, Inc. filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 97 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Spence Electro Plating Company filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 96 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Norwalk Car Wash filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 95 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 94 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Alant Corp. filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 93 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Los Angeles Car Wash Corp. filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 92 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Lee Pharmaceuticals filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 91 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc. filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 90 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Bull's Truck Wash filed by Plaintiff Bull's Truck Wash. (White, Michael)
August 20, 2009 Filing 89 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Alant Corp. filed by Plaintiff Alant Corp.. (White, Michael)
July 16, 2009 Filing 88 MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. Counsel for plaintiff notifies the Court that a settlement has been reached with the Defendant Farmer Brothers and indicates that only the defaulted defendants remain. Plaintiff is ordered to file dismissals on all unserved parties. The Court sets a hearing on Plaintiffs Application for Default Judgment by the Court for September 14, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiff will file initiating briefs by no later than August 24, 2009. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
June 29, 2009 Filing 87 MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu: Counsel for plaintiff is not present. Mr. Bailey informs the Court that a settlement has been reached. The Post-Mediation Status Conference is continued to July 16, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the Status Conference will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss, with a proposed order, is filed by no later than 12:00 p.m. on July 15, 2009. Counsel for defendant will give notice.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge George H Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendants, only: Brotman Medical Center (es)
May 5, 2009 Filing 85 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Brotman Medical Center. (White, Michael)
April 27, 2009 Filing 84 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document is accepted as filed RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #76 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #77 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #73 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #78 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #74 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #79 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #75 (pj)
April 24, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Wrong event: service of summons and complaint executed 30 days (event for only Freedom of Information cases); Correct Specific Event: Service of summons and complaint returned executed 20 days. RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #76 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #77 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #73 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #78 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #74 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #79 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) #75 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc)
April 23, 2009 Filing 82 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Temple Emanuel served on 11/11/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal Service service, by Federal statute, upon Ellis Kirschenbaum, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 81 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Spence Electro Plating Company served on 2/20/2009, answer due 3/12/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal Service service, by State Statute statute, upon Dennis G. Cosso, Authorized Agent. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 80 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Precision Automotive Products, Inc. served on 11/17/2008, answer due 12/7/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal Service service, by Federal statute, upon Sam Marhanian. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 79 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Norwalk Car Wash served on 11/25/2008, answer due 12/25/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by State Statute statute, upon Don Hammond, Agent. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Los Angeles Car Wash Corp. served on 11/18/2008, answer due 12/18/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by State Statute statute, upon Robert Bush, Agent. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff Lee Pharmaceuticals, upon Lee Pharmaceuticals served on 11/18/2008, answer due 12/18/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by State Statute statute, upon Ronald G. Lee, President. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc. served on 11/13/2008, answer due 12/13/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by State Statute statute, upon Robert Zapotosky, Agent. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Bull's Truck Wash served on 11/18/2008, answer due 12/18/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by State Statute statute, upon Francisco DelToro, Owner. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Brotman Medical Center served on 11/16/2008, answer due 12/16/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by California Code of Civil Procedure statute, upon Dale Miller, Agent. Due Dilligence declaration Not attached. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 23, 2009 Filing 73 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch, upon Alant Corp. served on 3/4/2009, answer due 4/23/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Substitute Service service, by Federal statute, upon Randall Hite, Agent. Due Dilligence declaration not attahced. Original Summons not returned. (White, Michael)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant, Whittaker Development Co., only, re #70 . (lom)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant, Whittaker Corporation, only. Re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #69 . (mg)
April 16, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Whittaker Development Co.. (White, Michael)
April 16, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Whittaker Corporation. (White, Michael)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendant,Cariker & Associates, Inc. (lom)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendant, Elro Manufacturing Company. (lom)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendant, Koosed Enterprises, Inc. (lom)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendant Princess Cruise Lines. (lom)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendant Thermo Securities Corp. (lom)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendant, TTT Metals of California. (lom)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendant Wolf Tank Lines, Inc. (lom)
April 9, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Wolf Tank Lines, Inc.. (White, Michael)
April 9, 2009 Filing 60 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to TTT Metals of California. (White, Michael)
April 9, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Thermo Securities Corp.. (White, Michael)
April 9, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Princess Cruise Lines. (White, Michael)
April 9, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Koosed Enterprises, Inc.. (White, Michael)
April 9, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Elro Manufacturing Company. (White, Michael)
April 9, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Cariker & Associates, Inc.. (White, Michael)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant, ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. only. #47 ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. terminated. (ake)
March 31, 2009 Filing 53 REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Cariker & Associates, Inc. filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
March 24, 2009 Filing 52 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended orThe document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by no later than 24 hours of this notice; Parties will use the correct event(s) as indicated on the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies filed on March 23, 2009. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #47 (pj)
March 24, 2009 Filing 51 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. Document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by no later than 24 hours of this notice; Parties will use the correct event(s) as indicated on the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies filed on March 23, 2009 RE: REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Cariker & Associates, Inc. #46 (pj)
March 24, 2009 Filing 50 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alant Corp. answer now due 4/23/2009, filed by Defendant Alant Corp..(Hite, Randall)
March 23, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing; RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #47 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
March 23, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.VOLUNTARY DISMSISAL OF PARTIES PURSUANT TO FRCP to 41a(1) under NOTICES RE: REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Cariker & Associates, Inc. #46 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
March 19, 2009 Filing 47 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch.(White, Michael)
March 19, 2009 Filing 46 REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Cariker & Associates, Inc. filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
March 9, 2009 Filing 45 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer now due 4/8/2009, filed by Defendant ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Friedman, Thomas)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge George H Wu that document : Request to Dismiss #42 filed on 2/19/09 is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document no later than 24 hours of this notice RE: Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court #42 . (lom)
February 23, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Voluntary dismissal of Parties pursuant to FRCP to 41a(1) under NOTICES RE: REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Masonite Corporation #41 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
February 19, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Entry of Ruling filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael) (Stricken per order re #44 )
February 19, 2009 Filing 41 REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Masonite Corporation filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
February 12, 2009 Filing 40 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu. The Court sets the following dates: Last day to add parties and/or amend pleadings - February 27, 2009; Mediation cutoff - June 26, 2009; Post-Mediation Status Conference - June 29, 2009 at 8:30 a.m.; Discovery cutoff - July 20, 2009; Expert discovery cutoff - August 5, 2009; Motion hearing cutoff - September 3, 2009; Pretrial Conference October 1, 2009 at 8:30 a.m.; Court Trial October 13, 2009 at 9:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (lom)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge George H Wu: re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #37 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the actionis hereby dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Wilsey Bennett Co only. Wilsey Bennett, Inc. terminated. (pj)
February 6, 2009 Filing 38 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents REGARDING: 1/30/2009 and 2/5/2009 documents number #32 , and #35 are ACCEPTED as filed. Voluntary Dismissal of Parties pursuant to FRCP 41(a)1) under NOTICES. (jp)
February 5, 2009 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Wilsey Bennett, Inc. filed by pLAINTIFF David Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(White, Michael)
February 5, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Voluntary dismissal of Parties pursuant to FRCP to 41a(1) under NOTICES RE: Notice (Other) #35 , Notice (Other) #32 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
February 5, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary and Partial Dismissal by Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
February 5, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Continuance of Scheduling Conference Hearing filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
February 4, 2009 Filing 33 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The document is accepted as filed; Further errors will result in your document(s) being stricken for failure to follow CM/ECF procedures. RE: Notice (Other) #29 (pj)
January 30, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE of Partial Dismissal by Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
January 30, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Voluntary dismissal of Parties pursuant to FRCP to 41a(1) under NOTICES RE: Notice (Other) #29 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
January 29, 2009 Filing 31 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu, Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer re discovery. Plaintiff will forward initial disclosures to counsel for defendants Farmer Bros. Co., and Wilsey Bennett, Inc. by no later than February 12, 2009. The Scheduling Conference is continued to February 12, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
January 29, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Partial Dismissal by filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
January 20, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE Of Partial and Voluntary Dismissal by filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
January 15, 2009 Filing 27 Joint Scheduling Conference REPORT of Counsel filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Signatures)(White, Michael)
January 12, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary and Partial Dismissal by Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
January 9, 2009 Filing 24 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Murcole, Inc., (Mollis, Charles)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #19 The Court having considered Plaintiff David Hirsch, Trustee of OII EighthPartial Consent Decree Work Escrow Account Trusts (Plaintiff) and DefendantAlco Cad-Nickel Plating Corp.s (Alco) Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Alco to Respond to Complaint (Stipulation), for good cause shown therein, theCourt hereby grants the parties Stipulation and application to extend the time forAlco to respond to the Complaint up to and including February 3, 2009. ) #19 by Judge George H Wu (pj)
January 8, 2009 Filing 23 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. Counsel will file the Notice of Certification of Interested Parties within 24 hours of this notice RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #20 (pj)
January 7, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary and Partial Dismissal filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
January 6, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies; The event is: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties under NOTICES RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #20 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
December 31, 2008 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Farmer Bros. Co..(Bailey, Robert)
December 30, 2008 Filing 19 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 2/3/09 re First Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #13 , Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by Defendant Alco Cad-Nickel Planting Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Langa, Brian)
December 17, 2008 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 15, 2009 filed by Defendant Murcole, Inc. Calmet Services, Inc., Murcole, Inc..(Mollis, Charles)
December 16, 2008 Filing 17 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George H Wu: Scheduling Conference is set for January 29, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than January 15, 2009. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to all parties that haveappeared in this action, and is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (lc)
December 12, 2008 Filing 16 NOTICE Notice of Bankruptcy filed by Defendant Washington Mutual, Inc.. Notice of Bankruptcy (Hull, Gregory)
December 9, 2008 Filing 14 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Farmer Bros. Co. answer now due 1/2/2009, filed by defendant Farmer Bros. Co..(Bailey, Robert)
December 5, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory D Hull on behalf of Defendant Washington Mutual, Inc. (vh)
December 4, 2008 Filing 13 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alco Cad-Nickel Planting Corp. answer now due 1/2/2009, filed by Defendant Alco Cad-Nickel Planting Corp..(Langa, Brian)
December 2, 2008 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wilsey Bennett, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,,,,,,, #11 , Answer to Complaint, #10 served on 12/01/08. (Epstein, David)
December 2, 2008 Filing 11 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wilsey Bennett, Inc., identifying David Hirsch, Trustee of the OII Eighth Partial Consent Decree Work Escrow Account Trust; OII Eighth Partial Consent Decree Work Escrow Account Trust; Afshin Corporation, Inc.; Alant Corp.; Alco Cad-Nickel Plating Corp.; Amorient Petroleum Company, California; Axis Petroleum Company; Baker-Hughes Incorporated; Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.; Brotman Medical Center; Bull's Truck Wash; Brunswick Corporation; Calmet Services, Inc.; Cariker & Associates, Inc.; Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc.; Carrier Corporation; Certified Caterers Corp.; Chromalloy Gas Turbine Corporation; Consolidated Aluminum Corporation; Crescenta Valley Water District; Cummins Engine Company, Inc.; D-M-E Company; Doranne of California, L.P.; Elro Manufacturing Company; Fairchild Corp. f/k/a The Glidden Company; Farmer Bros. Co.; Food 4 Less of Southern California, Inc.; GlobalSantaFe Corporation; Grand-Way Fabri-Graphic, Inc.; Great Lakes Chemical Corporation; Halliburton Company; Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.; ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Jacob Stern & Sons, Inc.; Koosed Enterprises, Inc.; L&R Auto Parts, Inc.; Lee Pharmaceuticals; Lefiell Manufacturing Company; Lorber Industries of California; Los Angeles Car Wash Corp.; Marco Manufacturing, Inc.; Masonite Corporation; McGregor II, LLC; Mercedes-Benz Hollywood, Inc.; Murcole, Inc.; Norwalk Car Wash; Olson Farms, Inc.; Plumrose USA, Inc.; Precision Automotive Products, Inc.; Princess Cruise Lines; Ralphs Grocery Company; Ryder System, Inc.; Scope Products, Inc.; Solar Turbines International Company; Spence Electro Plating Company; Temple Emanuel; Thermo Securities Corp.; TTT Metals of California; The Termo Company; Washington Mutual, Inc.; Welex, Inc.; Western Waste Industries; Whittaker Corporation; Whittaker Development Co.; Wolf Tank Lines, Inc.; United States Environmental Protection Agency; California Environmental Protection Agency; California Department of Toxic Substance Control. (Epstein, David)
December 2, 2008 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by Defendant Wilsey Bennett, Inc..(Epstein, David)
November 20, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary and Partial Dismissal by Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
November 20, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice of Voluntary and Partial Dismissal By Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu: You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See document for details.) (ake)
November 10, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by PLAINTIFF David Hirsch. (White, Michael)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 05-7612 GW (Ex). Case transferred from Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 08-6782 GW (Ex).Signed by Judge George H Wu (rn)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 01-11162 RSWL (JWJx) (rn)
October 15, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. Related Case(s): CV 88-7196 MRP (Kx) and other cases (rn)
October 15, 2008 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch. (et) (ds).
October 15, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., Brotman Medical Center, Bull's Truck Wash, Brunswick Corporation, Calmet Services, Inc., Cariker & Associates, Inc., Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Certified Caterers Corp., Chromalloy Gas Turbine Corporation, Consolidated Aluminum Corporation, Crescenta Valley Water District, Cummins Engine Company, Inc., D-M-E Company, Dorrane of California, LP, Elro Manufacturing Company, Fairchild Corp., Farmer Bros. Co., Food 4 Less of Southern California, Inc., GlobalSantaFe corporation, Grand-Way Fabri-Graphics Inc., Great Lakes Chemical Corporation, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jacob Stern & Sons, Inc., Koosed Enterprises, Inc., L and R Auto Parts, Inc., Lee Pharmaceuticals, LeFiell Manufacturing Company, Lorber Industries of California, Los Angeles Car Wash Corp., Marco Manufacturing, Inc., Masonite Corporation, McGregor II, LLC, Mercedes-Benz Hollywood, Inc., Murcole, Inc., Norwalk Car Wash, Plumrose USA, Inc., Afshin Corporation, Inc., Precision Automotive Products, Inc., Princess Cruise Lines, Ralphs Grocery Company, Ryder Systems, Inc., Scope Products, Inc., Solar Turbines International Company, Spence Electro Plating Company, Temple Emanuel, Thermo Securities Corp., TTT Metals of California, Alant Corp., The Termo Company, Washington Mutual, Inc., Welex, Inc., Western Waste Industries, Whittaker Corporation, Whittaker Development Co., Wilsey Bennett, Inc., Wolf Tank Lines, Inc., Alco Cad-Nickel Planting Corp., Amorient Petroleum Company, California, Axis Petroleum Company, Baker Hughes Incorporated. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff David Hirsch.(et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2008: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , Notice of Assignment & Summons) (ds).
October 15, 2008 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., Brotman Medical Center, Bull's Truck Wash, Brunswick Corporation, Calmet Services, Inc., Cariker & Associates, Inc., Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Certified Caterers Corp., Chromalloy Gas Turbine Corporation, Consolidated Aluminum Corporation, Crescenta Valley Water District, Cummins Engine Company, Inc., D-M-E Company, Dorrane of California, LP, Elro Manufacturing Company, Fairchild Corp., Farmer Bros. Co., Food 4 Less of Southern California, Inc., GlobalSantaFe corporation, Grand-Way Fabri-Graphics Inc., Great Lakes Chemical Corporation, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jacob Stern & Sons, Inc., Koosed Enterprises, Inc., L and R Auto Parts, Inc., Lee Pharmaceuticals, LeFiell Manufacturing Company, Lorber Industries of California, Los Angeles Car Wash Corp., Marco Manufacturing, Inc., Masonite Corporation, McGregor II, LLC, Mercedes-Benz Hollywood, Inc., Murcole, Inc., Norwalk Car Wash, Plumrose USA, Inc., Afshin Corporation, Inc., Precision Automotive Products, Inc., Princess Cruise Lines, Ralphs Grocery Company, Ryder Systems, Inc., Scope Products, Inc., Solar Turbines International Company, Spence Electro Plating Company, Temple Emanuel, Thermo Securities Corp., TTT Metals of California, Alant Corp., The Termo Company, Washington Mutual, Inc., Welex, Inc., Western Waste Industries, Whittaker Corporation, Whittaker Development Co., Wilsey Bennett, Inc., Wolf Tank Lines, Inc., Alco Cad-Nickel Planting Corp., Amorient Petroleum Company, California, Axis Petroleum Company, Baker Hughes Incorporated. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Hirsch v. Afshin Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calmet Services, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A Mollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koosed Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotman Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Waste Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temple Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand-Way Fabri-Graphics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTT Metals of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull's Truck Wash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plumrose USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amorient Petroleum Company, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Automotive Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwalk Car Wash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chromalloy Gas Turbine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elro Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Aluminum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-M-E Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralphs Grocery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spence Electro Plating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afshin Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescenta Valley Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cariker & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlobalSantaFe corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilsey Bennett, Inc.
Represented By: David B Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Termo Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmer Bros. Co.
Represented By: Robert A Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masonite Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Turbines International Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food 4 Less of Southern California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alco Cad-Nickel Planting Corp.
Represented By: Brian D Langa
Represented By: Michael Anthony Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murcole, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A Mollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Stern & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf Tank Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorrane of California, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Development Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Caterers Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorber Industries of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Petroleum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Car Wash Corp.
Represented By: Paul R Salerno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Daniel Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGregor II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L and R Auto Parts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeFiell Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Hollywood, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Engine Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scope Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alant Corp.
Represented By: Randall L Hite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmenita Ford Truck Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hirsch
Represented By: Suzanne B Lanzone
Represented By: Michael R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?