Arnie T. Pike v. Placentia Library District et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Arnie T. Pike
Defendant: Placentia Library District and DOES
Case Number: 2:2008cv08582
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Orange
Referring Judge: Rosenberg
Presiding Judge: Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2009 18 Featured Case CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT OF INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND PLAINTIFF'S MONETARY CLAIMS by Judge George H Wu: [SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS] ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (ake)
August 12, 2009 17 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Miscellaneous Document 16 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Consent Decree)(Barbosa, Patricia)
August 12, 2009 16 Consent Decree and [Proposed] Order For Settlement of Injunctive Relief and Plaintiff's Monetary Claims filed by Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike (Barbosa, Patricia)
June 4, 2009 15 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Parties inform the Court that settlement in this matter is pending. A Status Conference re Settlement is set for August 27, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the status conference will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that the Consent Decree is filed by 12:00 p.m. on August 25, 2009. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (lom)
May 21, 2009 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike.. (Byrne Ikeda, Margaret)
April 24, 2009 13 Featured Case MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge George H Wu: On the Court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for June 4, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than May 21, 2009. (lom)
April 17, 2009 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Placentia Library District.(Smith, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2009 11 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Placentia Library District, identifying Special District Risk Management Authority. (Smith, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2009 10 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Placentia Library District answer now due 4/17/2009, filed by Defendant Placentia Library District.(Smith, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2009 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike, upon Placentia Library District served on 3/11/2009, answer due 3/31/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Alex Hernandez - Authorized to Accept Service of Process for Placentia Library District. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (Byrne Ikeda, Margaret)
February 23, 2009 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Placentia Library District, DOES 1-10 inclusive amending Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike (pj) (pj).
February 13, 2009 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Patricia Barbosa counsel for Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike. Filed by plaintiff Arnie T. Pike (Barbosa, Patricia)
February 12, 2009 6 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. The First Amended Complaint 4 is stricken. Counsel will file the First Amended Complaint at the Court's Civil Intake Department. (mg)
February 11, 2009 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: nitiating documents * are NOT to be e-filed, but Manually filed with Civil Intake Section. After which, a conformed copy e-mailed to :CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourt.gov) RE: Amended Document (Non-Motion) 4 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
February 10, 2009 4 (STRICKEN pursuant to 2/12/09 Response by the Court) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike. First Amended Complaint (Byrne Ikeda, Margaret) Modified on 2/13/2009 (mg).
January 14, 2009 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H Wu. (lom)
December 29, 2008 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike. (et) (ds).
December 29, 2008 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Placentia Library District, DOES 1-10, Inclusive. (et)
December 29, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Placentia Library District, DOES 1-10, Inclusive. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Arnie T. Pike. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2009: # 1 Summons & Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice of Assignment) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnie T. Pike v. Placentia Library District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnie T. Pike
Represented By: Jordon Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placentia Library District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?