Pom Wonderful LLC v. Tropicana Products, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Pom Wonderful LLC
Defendant: DOES and Tropicana Products, Inc.
Attorney Settlement Officer: Attorney Settlement Officer
Case Number: 2:2009cv00566
Filed: September 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Dale S. Fischer
Presiding Judge: Carolyn Turchin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2010 Filing 88 (In Chambers) Order Continuing Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: On the Courts own motion, the hearing Defendants motions for summary judgment, currently set for August 23, 2010, is continued to September 13, 2010, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs opposition papers are now due August 16, 2010. Defendants reply is due August 23, 2010. (ake)
July 27, 2010 Filing 87 APPLICATION TO SEAL RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF UNCLEAN HANDS filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 8/23/2010 at 01:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Lodged Proposed order. (shb)
July 27, 2010 Filing 86 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to on Preclusion Grounds 79 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Lodging)(Shackelford, Rick)
July 27, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re Separate Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to On Affirmative Defense of Unclean Hands 80 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Lodging)(Shackelford, Rick)
July 27, 2010 Filing 84 Notice of Withdrawal of Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 82 filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Withdrawal Re Separate Statement)(Shackelford, Rick)
July 27, 2010 Filing 83 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, 80 filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Withdrawal)(Shackelford, Rick)
July 26, 2010 Filing 82 [DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN] - STATEMENT of Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Affirmative Defense of Unclean Hands MOTION for Summary Judgment as to On Affirmative Defense of Unclean Hands 80 filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Shackelford, Rick) Modified on 7/28/2010 (shb).
July 26, 2010 Filing 81 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to On Affirmative Defense of Unclean Hands 80 filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judical Notic)(Shackelford, Rick)
July 26, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to On Affirmative Defense of Unclean Hands filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Newman Decl, # 4 Exhibit B-C to Newman Decl, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Declaration, # 7 Declaration, # 8 Declaration, # 9 Exhibit)(Shackelford, Rick)
July 26, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to on Preclusion Grounds filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Ppoints and Authorities in Support, # 2 Separate Statement in Support, # 3 Declaration of Rick L. Shackelford in Support, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Rick L. Shackelford's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Rick Shackelford's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Rick L. Shackelford's Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Rick L. Shackelford's Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Rick L. Shackelford's Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 & 7 to Rick L. Shackelford's Declaration, # 10 Proposed Order)(Shackelford, Rick)
July 26, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc. of Brief and Separate Statement Re Tropicana's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Shackelford, Rick)
July 26, 2010 Filing 77 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc. of Brief and Supporting Documents Re Tropicana's Motion for Summary Judgment Re Unclean Hands. (Shackelford, Rick)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: denying 71 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (shb)
April 26, 2010 Filing 75 REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Leave to file [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint , Declaration of Daniel A. Beck (attached) MOTION for Leave to file [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint , Declaration of Daniel A. Beck (attached) 71 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Beck, Daniel)
April 16, 2010 Filing 74 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Leave to file [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint , Declaration of Daniel A. Beck (attached) MOTION for Leave to file [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint , Declaration of Daniel A. Beck (attached) 71 DEFENDANT TROPICANA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Newman Decl ISO Tropicana's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-C ISO Newman Declaration)(Shackelford, Rick)
April 9, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue 72 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
April 8, 2010 Filing 72 STIPULATION to Continue Expert Witness Discovery Cutoff from August 16, 2010 to August 30, 2010 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC.(Beck, Daniel)
April 7, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint , Declaration of Daniel A. Beck (attached) filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beck, Daniel)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin: granting 65 Motion to Compel Responses regarding defendant's profits ( 2) denying Tropicana's Request for Judicial Notice; and (3) Taking hearing set for March 29, 2010, off calender. (sbu)
March 15, 2010 Filing 69 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses 65 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Beck, Daniel)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART POM WONDERFUL'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES REGARDING DEFENDANT'S JUICE PRODUCT; AND TAKING 3/22/10 HEARING OFF CALENDAR by Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin: granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Compel (dam)
March 8, 2010 Filing 67 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Regarding Defendant's Juice Product 64 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Beck, Daniel)
March 8, 2010 Filing 66 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses 65 IN CONNECTION WITH TROPICANA'S PORTION OF THE L.R. 37-2 JOINT STATEMENT TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1 to Tropicana's Request for Judicial Notice)(Shackelford, Rick)
March 8, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/29/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Beck, # 2 Exhibit A - I to Beck Declaration, # 3 Exhibit J - R to Beck Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Silverman, Daniel)
March 1, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Regarding Defendant's Juice Product filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Beck, # 2 Proposed Order)(Silverman, Daniel)
January 4, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Daniel Scott Silverman counsel for Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. Changing FIRM NAME to ROLL LAW GROUP PC. Changing PHONE NUMBER AND FAX NUMBER to PHONE: 310-966-8400; FAX: 310-966-8810. Filed by Plaintiff POM WONDERFUL LLC (Silverman, Daniel)
December 17, 2009 Filing 62 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike, 57 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Silverman, Daniel)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES 60 ) by Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin: The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the reasons set forth below. (See document for further details.) (pcl)
December 14, 2009 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Request for Attorneys Fees filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Beck, # 2 Exhibit A - C to Decl. of D. Beck, # 3 Exhibit D to Decl. of D. Beck, # 4 Exhibit E - J to Decl. of D. Beck, # 5 Exhibit K - N to Decl. of D. Beck, # 6 Declaration of Rick Shackelford, # 7 Exhibit 1 - 7 to Decl. of R. Shackelford, # 8 Proposed Order)(Silverman, Daniel)
December 10, 2009 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Daniell K. Newman In Support of Defendant's Opposition MOTION to Strike Unclean Hands Allegations From Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 56 MOTION to Strike Unclean Hands Allegations From Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 56 57 Declaration of Daniell K. Newman In Support of Oppostion to Motion to Strike Unclean Hands Allegations filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Shackelford, Rick)
December 10, 2009 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Strike Unclean Hands Allegations From Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 56 MOTION to Strike Unclean Hands Allegations From Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 56 57 DEFENDANT TROPICANA PRODUCTS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF POM WONDERFUL LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE UNCLEAN HANDS ALLEGATIONS filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Shackelford, Rick)
November 24, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Unclean Hands Allegations From Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 56 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beck, Daniel)
November 4, 2009 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 33 with JURY DEMAND DEFENDANT TROPICANA PRODUCT INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc..(Shackelford, Rick)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 43 Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to the state law claims and DENIED with respect to the Lanham Act claims. (mg)
October 9, 2009 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Reply to Memo to Mtn to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Reply Memo Re Mtn to Dismiss)(Shackelford, Rick)
September 28, 2009 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 43 (CORRECTED) filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Exhibits A, B, C, and D))(Silverman, Daniel)
September 28, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 51 (Silverman, Daniel)
September 28, 2009 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 43 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Exhibits A, B, C, and D))(Silverman, Daniel)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT FOR DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin re Stipulation for Protective Order 49 (dam)
September 15, 2009 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order re: Stipulation re: Protective Order)(Silverman, Daniel)
September 4, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE of Amended Hearing Re Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Shackelford, Rick)
September 3, 2009 Filing 47 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING PARTIES' REQUEST TO SIGN STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE held before Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin: re: Stipulation for Protective Order 46 . (dam)
September 2, 2009 Filing 46 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order re: Stipulation re: Protective Order)(Silverman, Daniel)
September 1, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rick L Shackelford counsel for Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Rick Shackelford (Shackelford, Rick)
August 21, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Attorney Settlement Officer. Robert J Steinberger has been assigned to serve as Attorney Settlement Officer. (mb)
August 20, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc., DOES. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Tropicana Product Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6))(Shackelford, Rick)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer The document is accepted as filed RE: Stipulation for Settlement 40 (shb)
August 11, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: ADR Mediation Docs - Stipulation re Attorney Settle RE: Stipulation for Settlement (ADR-2) 40 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (shb)
August 10, 2009 Filing 40 STIPULATION for Settlement Officer Selection filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC.(Silverman, Daniel)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING JURY TRIAL AND DEADLINES by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2009., Discovery cut-off 8/16/2010., Motions due by 8/23/2010., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/30/2010., Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2010 03:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer., Jury Trial set for 11/2/2010 08:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (shb)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, case ordered to Attorney Settlement Officer Panel for a Local Rule 16-15 settlement conference. Within 10 days, plaintiff shall notify the ADR Program Coordinator of name of Attorney Settlement Officer who will conduct the settlement conference. (shb)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court, having taken off-calendar the Scheduling Conference set on Monday, August 10, 2009 at 11:00 a.m., establishes the case management dates as proposed by the parties in their Joint Rule 26(f) Report, and as further describedin the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) (shb)
August 3, 2009 Filing 36 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure ; estimated length of trial 8-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC.. (Silverman, Daniel)
August 3, 2009 Filing 35 JOINT ADR PILOT PROGRAM QUESTIONNAIRE filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC.(Silverman, Daniel)
July 22, 2009 Filing 34 Proof of Service of First Amended Complaint of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC (Silverman, Daniel)
July 17, 2009 Filing 33 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc., DOES amending Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC (shb)
July 9, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 06/29/2009; 1:35 p.m. (Seijas, Pamela)
July 9, 2009 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 06/29/2009; 1:35 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter at www.pamelabatalo.com or through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2009. (Seijas, Pamela)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING in Part Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) (Docket No. 12) and Ordering a More Definite Statement by Judge Dale S. Fischer: For these reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion in part and orders that Plaintiff provide a more particular and definite statement of its claims. ( See minute order for further details) IT IS SO ORDERED.granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss (yl)
June 29, 2009 Filing 29 MINUTES OF Motion To Dismiss held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: The matter is called and counsel states their appearances. The Court hears oral argument. A written ruling will follow. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (yl)
June 24, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Documents - Supplement RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 14 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (shb)
June 23, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF POM WONDERFUL'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TROPICANA PRODUCTS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by PLAINTIFF Pom Wonderful LLC. (Asch, Andrew)
June 17, 2009 Filing 26 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: GRANTING REQUEST for Leave of Pom Wonderful LLC to Appear to Request for Oral Argument 25 . Motion to Dismiss reset for hearing on 6/29/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (shb)
May 28, 2009 Filing 25 REQUEST for Leave of Pom Wonderful LLC to Appear to Request for Oral Argument filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. Request set for hearing on 6/1/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Asch, Andrew)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: taking under advisement 12 Motion to Dismiss (sce)
May 21, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: account information (for Daniel Silverman) was not updated in the ECF system RE: Notice of Appearance 22 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
May 20, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew Eric Asch on behalf of Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC (Asch, Andrew)
May 18, 2009 Filing 21 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) 11 , MOTION to Dismiss 12 filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Shackelford, Rick)
May 13, 2009 Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Proceedings: Order Re: Electronic Filing, Submission of Chambers Copies, and Emailing Proposed Documents. On May 4, 2009, Plaintiff filed an Opposition to Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. However, Plaintiff failed to supply the Court with chambers copies, as required by the rules discussed below. The Court reminds the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d)(3), Local Rule 5-4, and General Order 08-02 (G.O. 08-02 ), all criminal and civil filings must be electronically filed. (See document for further details). (mg)
May 4, 2009 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Christopher Van Gundy Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 12 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Asch, Andrew)
May 4, 2009 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 12 filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Asch, Andrew)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Clerk of Court The document is accepted as filed. RE: MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) 11 , MOTION to Dismiss 12 (shb)
April 14, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. COrrect event to be used is: Motions and Related filings - Motion to dismiss re document #12; Incorrect event selected. COrrect event to be used is: Motions & Related filings - Responses/Replies and Other Related Documents - Memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion to dismiss re document #11 RE: MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) 11 , MOTION to Dismiss 12 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (shb)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer. This matter is set for ascheduling conference on the above date. If plaintiff has not already served the operative complaint on all defendants, plaintiff shall promptly do so and shall file proofs of service within three days thereafter. Defendants also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three days thereafter. For record-keeping purposes, the Court will dismiss all remaining fictitiously-named defendants (i.e., those who have not been named) at the scheduling conference. The Court will also set a date by which motions to amend the pleadings or add parties must be heard. (See order for further details). (shb)
April 13, 2009 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc., identifying Pepsico, Inc.. (Shackelford, Rick)
April 13, 2009 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) 11 filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Shackelford, Rick)
April 13, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION and MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) 11 filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Shackelford, Rick) Modified on 4/15/2009 (shb).
April 13, 2009 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Tropicana Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Shackelford, Rick) Modified on 4/15/2009 (shb).
March 26, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC (Campbell, Mark)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge S. James Otero, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 08-6237 SJO (JTLx) (rn)
February 6, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Walter Allan Edmiston on behalf of Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC (Edmiston, Walter)
February 6, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED BY THE COCA-COLA COMPANY filed by PLAINTIFF Pom Wonderful LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Objections)(Campbell, Mark)
February 5, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Non-Party Coca-Cola Company. Related Case(s): CV 08-6237 SJO, CV 09-0565 DDP & CV 09-0567 AHM (rn)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, the document-Notice of Related Case filed by defendant Coca-Cola is a non-party to this case is to be filed and processed. (sce)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, (yl)
January 27, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (et) (ds).
January 23, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 23, 2009 20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Tropicana Products, Inc., DOES 1-10, inclusive. (et)
January 23, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Tropicana Products, Inc., DOES 1-10, inclusive.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Pom Wonderful LLC. (et) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pom Wonderful LLC v. Tropicana Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Attorney settlement officer: Attorney Settlement Officer
Represented By: Robert A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Represented By: Rick L Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Products, Inc.
Represented By: Rick L Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pom Wonderful LLC
Represented By: Andrew Eric Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?