Sean David Morton et al v. Bennett Ellenbogen et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sean David Morton and Melissa Morton
Defendant: Bennett Ellenbogen, Tim Johnson, Eric Holder, Jr. and Thomas P. O'Brien
Case Number: 2:2009cv01875
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Anderson
Referring Judge: Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2009 21 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 13 , CCA # 09-56041. The Decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Mandate received in this district on 10/07/09. (lr)
September 15, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 13 filed by Melissa Morton, Sean David Morton, CCA # 09-56041. A review of the record and the response to the July 9, 2009 order to show cause indicates that the questions raised in this appeal are so insubstantial as no to require further argument. See United States v. Hooton, 693 F. 2d 857, 858 (9th Cir. 1982)(per curiam)(stating standard). Accordingly, we summarily affirm the district court's judgment. AFFIRMED. Order received in this district on 9/15/09. (lr)
July 9, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice 18 filed by Melissa Morton, Sean David Morton, CCA # 09-56041. The ORDER received in this district on 07/09/2009. A review of the record demonstrates that this appeal may be appropriate for summary disposition because the questions on which the decision in the appeal depends may be so insubstantial as not to justify further proceedings. Within 21 days from entry of this order, appellants' shall show cause why the judgment in this appeal should not be summarily affirmed. Appellees may file a reply to appellants' response within ten days from service of the response. Appellants' failure to comply with this order shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. (lra)
July 7, 2009 18 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56041, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 13 as to Plaintiffs Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton. (lra)
July 6, 2009 16 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 13 filed by Melissa Morton, Sean David Morton ; (car)
July 6, 2009 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL NOTIFICATION form issued regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 13 as to Plaintiffs Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton. (car)
July 6, 2009 14 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiffs Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 13 (car)
July 2, 2009 17 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 13 as to Plaintiffs Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton; Receipt Number: 726, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr)
June 29, 2009 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiffs Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, 12 Filed On: 6/15/09; Entered On: 6/17/09; Filing fee $ 455, billed. cc: Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton; Leon W. Weidman and Richard Park, Assistant United States Attorneys (car)
June 15, 2009 12 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court finds that Defendants Bennett Ellenbogen, Tim Johnson, Eric Holder, Jr., and Thomas P. O'Brien's Motion to Dismiss 10 is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for 6/15/2009, is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Although it is somewhat difficult to decipher Plaintiffs' rambling and confusing Complaint, the Court concludes that the Complaint falls well below the "plausibility" standard established in Twombly, 550 U.S. at 570, 127 S. Ct. at 1974. Plaintiffs' theories and allegations do not state viable claims for relief, nor could they even if Plaintiffs were granted leave to amend. Accordingly, the Court dismisses this action with prejudice. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 9, 2009 11 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case Or In The Alternative For A More Definite Statement; 10 filed by Plaintiff Sean David Morton. (es)
May 18, 2009 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Or In The Alternative For A More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with proof of service filed by Defendants Bennett Ellenbogen, Tim Johnson, Eric Holder, Jr, Thomas P. O'Brien. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Park, Richard)
March 24, 2009 4 Featured Case SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se. This Order is intended to bring certain aspects of law and motion practice to your attention at an early stage in the litigation to remedy problems commonly associated with pro se pleadings. See document for details. (gk)
March 24, 2009 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R.Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (lom)
March 23, 2009 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Sean David Morton and Melissa Morton, upon Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office, Central District of California; Bennett Ellenbogen, U.S. SEC, NY Regional Office; Thomas P. O'Brien, U.S. Attorney, Central District of California; Eric Holder, Jr., U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice; and Tim Johnson, U.S. SEC, NY Regional Office served on 3/18/2009, answer due 5/17/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by certified mail. Return receipt not attached. Original Summons not returned. (gk)
March 23, 2009 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Sean David Morton and Melissa Morton, upon Bennett Ellenbogen. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered or certified mail, by Federal statute. Date of mailing is not indicated, return receipt not attached, proof of service signed on 3/19/2009. Original Summons not returned. (gk)
March 23, 2009 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Sean David Morton and Melissa Morton, upon Eric Holder, Jr., U.S. Attorney General. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered or certified mail, by Federal statute. Date of mailing is not indicated, return receipt not attached, proof of service signed on 3/19/2009. Original Summons not returned. (gk)
March 23, 2009 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Sean David Morton and Melissa Morton, upon Thomas P. O'Brien, U.S. Attorney General. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered or certified mail, by Federal statute. Date of mailing is not indicated, return receipt not attached, proof of service signed on 3/19/2009. Original Summons not returned. (gk)
March 23, 2009 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Sean David Morton and Melissa Morton, upon Tim Johnson. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered or certified mail, by Federal statute. Date of mailing is not indicated, return receipt not attached, proof of service signed on 3/19/2009. Original Summons not returned. (gk)
March 18, 2009 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton. (ghap)
March 18, 2009 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Bennett Ellenbogen, Tim Johnson, Eric Holder, Jr, Thomas P. O'Brien. (ghap)
March 18, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Bennett Ellenbogen, Tim Johnson, Eric Holder, Jr, Thomas P. O'Brien. (Filing fee $ 350: FEE PAID.), filed by plaintiffs Sean David Morton, Melissa Morton.(ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sean David Morton et al v. Bennett Ellenbogen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean David Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Ellenbogen
Represented By: Richard M. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Johnson
Represented By: Richard M. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Richard M. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. O'Brien
Represented By: Richard M. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?