Jeffrey Lee Allen v. Labor Ready Southwest, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lee Allen
Defendant: Labor Ready Southwest, Inc. and Does
Case Number: 2:2009cv04266
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Pregerson
Referring Judge: Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2016 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT, ATTORNEYS FEES, AND INTERVENTION 220 , 221 , 256 , 257 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Court GRANTS preliminary approval to the settlement. The Court also preliminarily approves a payment of $18,750 by Defendant Labor Ready to the State of California, Labor & Workforce Development Agency, in satisfaction of PAGA penalties owed to the State of California. The Court confirms Theirman Buck LLP, Aequitas Law Group, LawOffice of Shaun Setareh, Law Of fices of Louis Benowitz, and CanlasLaw Group as Class Counsel as described in the Motion for Attorneys Fees.The Court confirms Jeffrey Lee Allen as the Class Representative and preliminarily approves a service award of $5,000.00 for Allen. The Court DENIES the Motion to Intervene. (SEE DOCUMENT RE Schedule of Dates for Further Proceedings and other specifics) (lc)
September 2, 2015 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE 203 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc). Modified on 9/2/2015 (lc).
December 15, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the Court Granted in part and Denied in part Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing all remaining claims for lack of jurisdiction by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (see document for specifics); related to order 108 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Lee Allen v. Labor Ready Southwest, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lee Allen
Represented By: Mark R Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labor Ready Southwest, Inc.
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?