Asia Economic Institute et al v. Xcentric Ventures LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras and Raymond Mobrez
Defendant: Badbusinessbureau.com LLC, Does, Edward Magedson and Xcentric Ventures LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01360
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Stephen V. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2010 183 Featured Case IN CHAMBERS ORDER re PLAINTIFFS' RULE 56(f) MOTION 173 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court finds that Plaintiffs' Motion is suitable to a determination on the briefs and without an oral hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). Accordingly, the November 29, 2010 hearing is VACATED. Order to issue. (pc)
November 15, 2010 182 REPLY In support of MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion 173 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 (September 27 2010 email), # 2 Exhibit 6 (Oct 12 2010 email), # 3 Exhibit 7 (Oct 17 2010 email), # 4 Exhibit 8 (pages from Magedson Deposition), # 5 Exhibit 9 (pages from Magedson Deposition), # 6 Exhibit 10 (Swift v. Zynga), # 7 Exhibit 11 ((pages from Magedson Deposition))(Borodkin, Lisa)
November 8, 2010 181 DECLARATION of Maria Speth In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion 173 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
November 8, 2010 180 DECLARATION of Justin Crossman In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion 173 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
November 8, 2010 179 DECLARATION of James Rogers In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion 173 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
November 8, 2010 178 DECLARATION of David Gingras In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion 173 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
November 8, 2010 177 DECLARATION of Ben Smith In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion 173 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
November 8, 2010 176 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion 173 And Defendants' Cross-Motion For Sanctions filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
November 5, 2010 174 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 09/20/2010; 1:40 p.m. (baq)
November 1, 2010 175 MINUTES: Proceedings: (1) 145 Motion for Summary Judgment 145 ; (2) Special Motion to Strike and Motion to Require Rico Case Statement ]153]; (3) Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint 154 ; (4) Motion for sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 11 157 ; (5) Second Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 11 158 before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Hearing held. The motions are submitted. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Margaret Babykin. (jp)
November 1, 2010 173 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Under Rule 56(f) to Take Discovery and Continue Determination of Defendants' SUmmary Judgment Motion filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Transcript of Sept. 20, 2010), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Def's Discovery Responses to RFD July 22, 2010), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Draft Powerpoint for Verified Safe and CAP Program), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Sept. 23 2010 emails))(Borodkin, Lisa)
October 25, 2010 172 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 164 AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting 164 Request to Waive (bp)
October 18, 2010 171 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint Amended Complaint, 100 154 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
October 13, 2010 170 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint Amended Complaint, 100 153 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (September 23, 2010 email), # 2 Exhibit 2 (September 24, 2010 email))(Borodkin, Lisa)
October 13, 2010 169 REQUEST to Waive Oral Argument filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Request set for hearing on 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
October 12, 2010 168 REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
October 11, 2010 167 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/20/2010 1:40. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle, phone number 213 620-1149. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through court reporter Deborah K. Gackle PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2011. (Gackle, Deborah
October 7, 2010 166 REPLY In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Request For Enlargement Of Time filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
October 6, 2010 165 Opposition to Request to Waive Oral Argument in opposition to re: REQUEST to Waive Oral Argument On Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment 164 and Request for Enlargement of Time to FIle Brief filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
October 6, 2010 164 REQUEST to Waive Oral Argument On Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Request set for hearing on 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
October 6, 2010 163 STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Summaruy Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
October 5, 2010 162 DECLARATION of Lisa J. Borodkin in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Transcript of June 2 2010 Deposition of Xcentric), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Transcript of 6 8 10 Deposition of Edward Magedson), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Transcript of August 6 2010 Proceedings on Order of Preservation of ESI))(Borodkin, Lisa)
October 4, 2010 161 DECLARATION of Iliana Llaneras in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
October 4, 2010 160 DECLARATION of Raymond Mobrez in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
October 4, 2010 159 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Jusicial Notice (November 10, 2009 Transcript of Proceedings in Blockowicz v. Williams), # 2 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice (Dismissal of Ninth Circuit Appeal in Xcentric v. Bird), # 3 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice (Transcript of Sept. 21, 2010 oral argument in Xcentric v. Richeson), # 4 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice (Dec of Justin Crossman in Russo v. Xcentric))(Borodkin, Lisa)
September 30, 2010 158 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Speth, Maria)
September 30, 2010 157 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Speth, Maria)
September 29, 2010 156 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Sanctions 135 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 155 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike 153 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 154 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint Amended Complaint, 100 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint Amended Complaint, 100 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 152 DECLARATION of Lynda Craven In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 151 DECLARATION of Kim Jordan In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 150 DECLARATION of Ed Magedson In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 149 DECLARATION of David Gingras In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 148 DECLARATION of Ben Smith In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 147 DECLARATION of Amy Thompson In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 146 STATEMENT of Facts In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 145 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 27, 2010 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
September 20, 2010 144 MINUTES OF 1. MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS 110 (fld 08/06/10)2. MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRSTAMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFFS 115 (fld 8/16/10)3. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BYPLAINTIFFS 116 (fld 8/16/10)4. MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE ORDER #94 FILED BY PLAINTIFFS [118)(fld 8/16/10)5. MOTION TO STRIKE MATERIAL FROM DOCUMENTS 118 AND 121 AND MOTIONFOR SANCTIONS 124 held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson:Hearing held. The motion reconsideration 118 is denied. Order to issue. The RICO claims arestricken. The first amended complaint is the operative document. The Court sets the following schedule: Filing of Motion for Summary Judgment. September 27, 2010 Opposition.. October 4, 2010Reply.. October 12, 2010Hearing.. November 1, 2010 at 1:30 p.m.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (pj)
September 14, 2010 143 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Notice of Errata Re DN-141, DN-142 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Errata (Corrected Opposition to Defendants' Rule 11 Motion [DN-135]))(Borodkin, Lisa)
September 14, 2010 142 Opposition (with exhibits) Opposition re: MOTION for Sanctions Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 135 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Borodkin, Lisa)
September 13, 2010 141 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Sanctions Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 135 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
September 7, 2010 140 Featured Case RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson The motion is stricken. The hearing is vacated. (rs)
September 7, 2010 139 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Second MOTION for Sanctions Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 134 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rs)
September 7, 2010 138 REPLY in support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 , MOTION for Leave to file Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Suppor tof Motion for Reconsideration 127 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
September 7, 2010 137 REPLY in support MOTION to Strike Material from Documents 118 and 121 and Motion for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 121 MOTION to Strike Material from Documents 118 and 121 and Motion for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 121 124 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
September 7, 2010 136 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 110 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
September 3, 2010 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Speth, Maria)
September 3, 2010 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION for Sanctions Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Speth, Maria)
August 31, 2010 133 DECLARATION of Daniel F. Blackert in Further Support of MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 116 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (July 30, 2010 email), # 2 Exhibit B (August 14, 2010 email), # 3 Exhibit C (August 18, 2010 email))(Blackert, Daniel)
August 31, 2010 132 OPPOSITION in Opposition to re: MOTION to Strike Material from Documents 118 and 121 and Motion for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 121 MOTION to Strike Material from Documents 118 and 121 and Motion for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 121 124 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
August 30, 2010 131 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Speth, Maria)
August 30, 2010 130 OBJECTIONS to Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,, 119 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Speth, Maria)
August 30, 2010 129 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 116 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
August 25, 2010 128 NOTICE filed by Asia Economic Institute, Raymond Mobrez, and Iliana Llaneras Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Blackert, Daniel)
August 24, 2010 127 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Suppor tof Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Memo, # 2 Exhibit 7 to Supp Dec. of Lisa Borodkin, # 3 Exhibit 8 to Supp. Dec. Lisa Borodkin)(Blackert, Daniel)
August 23, 2010 126 DECLARATION of Tina Norris in support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Rip-off Report 242952), # 2 Exhibit C (June 9, 2010 email))(Blackert, Daniel)
August 23, 2010 125 DECLARATION of Daniel F. Blackert in support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Kent Hutcherson, Esq.), # 2 Exhibit 2 (May 15, 2010 Settlement Agreement), # 3 Exhibit 3 (July 28, 2010 takedown letter), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Agust 3, 2010 email), # 5 Exhibit 5 (August 6, 2010 Ripoff Report), # 6 Exhibit 6 (July 14, 2010 Declaration of David Gingras), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Attachment to July 14, 2010 Gingras Declaration))(Blackert, Daniel)
August 23, 2010 124 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Material from Documents 118 and 121 and Motion for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 121 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
August 18, 2010 123 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Second Amended Complaint 122 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2 Initiating documents *are NOT to be e-filed, but Manually filed with Civil Intake Section. Afterwards, e-mail a conformed copy to CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
August 17, 2010 122 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Amendment to Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion), Amended Document (Non-Motion) 96 PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit)(Blackert, Daniel)
August 17, 2010 121 DECLARATION of Lisa J. Borodkin in support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 ("Second Questionnaire" for CAP applicants, # 2 Declaration Exhibit 2 (Declaration of Kenton Hutcherson and Exhibits), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Non-confidential Settlement Agreement), # 4 Exhibit 4 (August 3, 2010 email), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Report dated August 6, 2010))(Blackert, Daniel)
August 17, 2010 120 DECLARATION of Raymond Mobrez in support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
August 16, 2010 119 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 118 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice - Jury Instructions in U.S. v. Sypher for extortion in violation of 18 U.S.C. 875(d), # 2 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice - Order of Conviction in U.S. v. Sypher for extortion in violation of 18 U.S.C. 875(d))(Blackert, Daniel)
August 16, 2010 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order,, 94 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Blackert, Daniel)
August 16, 2010 117 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 116 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint)(Blackert, Daniel)
August 16, 2010 116 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Blackert, Daniel)
August 16, 2010 115 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffss' First Amended Complaint filed by aei, rAYMOND mOBREZ, iLIANA lLANERAS Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Blackert, Daniel)
August 16, 2010 114 DECLARATION of Daniel F. Blackert regarding Defendants' motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
August 13, 2010 113 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8-6-10 2:09 p.m. (ha)
August 13, 2010 112 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8-6-10 2:09 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2010. (ha)
August 6, 2010 111 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and protective order, which the Court interprets as a motion for a protective order. The motion is denied for the reasons set forth in the hearing, 101 .Court Recorder: CS 08/06/2010. (ca)
August 6, 2010 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
August 4, 2010 109 DECLARATION of Justin Crossman In Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
August 4, 2010 108 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gingras, David)
August 4, 2010 107 DECLARATION of Lisa J. Borodkin in further support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16 (March 2009 emails), # 2 Exhibit 17 (Transcript of June 24, 2010 hearing page 35))(Borodkin, Lisa)
August 3, 2010 106 DECLARATION of Daniel F. Blackert in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blackert, Daniel)
August 3, 2010 105 OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 103 , Notice of Lodging,,,, 104 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 102 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 served on August 3, 2010. (Borodkin, Lisa)
August 3, 2010 104 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Plaintiffs' Ex PArte Application for a TRO to Preserve ESI and for Protective Order Preventing Interference with Witnesses)(Borodkin, Lisa)
August 3, 2010 103 DECLARATION of Jan Smith in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jan Snith (January 15, 2009 email), # 2 Exhibit B to to Declaration of Jan Smith (January 16, 2009 email), # 3 Exhibit C to to Declaration of Jan Smith (November 9, 2009 email), # 4 Exhibit D to to to Declaration of Jan Smith (April 10, 2010 email))(Borodkin, Lisa)
August 3, 2010 102 DECLARATION of Joe Reed in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) 101 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joe Reed (Professional Resume), # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Joe Reed (Order in GW Equity), # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Joe Reed (Google Search Results March 4, 2009 and July 30, 2010), # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Joe Reed (Report 41793 January 7, 2010 and July 30, 2010), # 5 Exhibit E to to Declaration of Joe Reed (Want to Sue Ripoff Report June 26, 2009 and July 30, 2010), # 6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Joe Reed (absence of Report and category))(Borodkin, Lisa)
August 3, 2010 101 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Temporary Restraining Order for Preservation of Electronically Stored Information (ESI), EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Preventing Interference with Witnesses filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (April 22, 2010 email), # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (April 27, 2010 email), # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (April 27, 2010 email), # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (Rule 26(f) Report), # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (March 2009 Google results), # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (August 2010 Google results), # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (May 28, 2010 email), # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (May 29, 2010 email), # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (May 30, 2010 email), # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (May 30, 2010 email), # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (Plaintiffs' RFPs), # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodki (July 14, 2010 email), # 13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (Defendants' Responses to RFPs), # 14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (July 30, 2010 emails), # 15 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (Declaration of Kenton Hutcherson), # 16 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin (Demand letter fron Defendants))(Borodkin, Lisa)
July 29, 2010 98 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez.. (Blackert, Daniel)
July 28, 2010 100 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC, Bad Business Bureau LLC; Party Badbusinessbureau.com LLC terminated amending Notice of Removal, 1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Raymond Mobrez, Iliana Llaneras (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Par 7, # 7 Part 8)(pj)
July 28, 2010 99 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson ORDERING first amended complaint submitted by Plaintiffs received on 7/28/10 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (pj)
July 27, 2010 97 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blackert, Daniel)
July 27, 2010 96 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 22 Exhibit 22 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 23 Exhibit 23 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 24 Exhibit 24 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 25 Exhibit 25 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 26 Exhibit 26 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # 27 Exhibit 27 to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Blackert, Daniel)
July 20, 2010 95 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh:The Court met with the parties to discuss the deposition of Edward Magedson. The Court concludes that the deposition is foreclosed by Judge Wilson's Order of the previous day. Court Recorder: CS 07/20/2010. (ca)
July 19, 2010 94 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE RICO CLAIMS TO THE EXTENT THOSE CLAIMS ARE BASED ON PREDICATE ACTS OF EXTORTION 40 ; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION UNDER RULE 56(f) 87 ; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AS TO THE RICO CLAIMS BASED ON PREDICATE ACTS OF WIRE FRAUD; AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A BENCH TRIAL 50 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. See Attached Order. (rs)
July 13, 2010 93 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh:The Court met and conferred with the parties regarding the settlement conference scheduled for Wednesday, July 14, 2010. The Court takes the matter off calendar. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to send Defendants counsel an email setting forth what claims Plaintiff intends to pursue in light of the Courts ruling on Defendant's summary judgment motion. The parties are ordered to meet and confer when they next meet in person at the deposition of Defendant's principal in Arizona. The parties should attempt to resolve the case at that time. If they are unable to do so, the Court will conduct a settlement conference and attempt to settle the case.Court Recorder: CS 07/13/2010. (ca)
July 12, 2010 92 MINUTES OF ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AS TO THE RICO CLAIMS TO THE EXTENT SUCH CLAIMS ARE BASED ON EXTORTION 40 ; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION UNDER RULE 56(f) 87 ; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ORAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AS TO THE WIRE FRAUD ALLEGATIONS; AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A BENCH TRIAL 50 , 40 , 87 . Plaintiff are given until Tuesday, July 27, 2010 to file an amended complaint, Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson:Court Reporter: N/A. (bp)
July 9, 2010 91 REPLY Support EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Order to Compel Continued Deposition of Defendant Edward Magedson EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Local Rule 83.7, Local Rule 37-4, and this Court's inherent authority EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 87 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 2 Exhibit 39 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 3 Exhibit 40 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 4 Exhibit 41 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 5 Exhibit 42 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 6 Exhibit 43 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 7 Exhibit 44 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 8 Exhibit 45 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 9 Exhibit 46 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 10 Exhibit 47 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 11 Exhibit 48 to Supplemental Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin)(Borodkin, Lisa)
July 9, 2010 90 DECLARATION of David S. Gingras In Support of Defendants' Opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Order to Compel Continued Deposition of Defendant Edward Magedson EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Local Rule 83.7, Local Rule 37-4, and this Court's inherent authority EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 87 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs First Set of Requests For Production, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Initial Requests For Production, # 3 Exhibit Tentative Ruling)(Gingras, David)
July 9, 2010 89 Opposition re Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion For Rule 56(f) And Related Relief re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Order to Compel Continued Deposition of Defendant Edward Magedson EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Local Rule 83.7, Local Rule 37-4, and this Court's inherent authority EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 87 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
July 8, 2010 88 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Order re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Order to Compel Continued Deposition of Defendant Edward Magedson EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Local Rule 83.7, Local Rule 37-4, and this Court's inherent authority EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 87 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Borodkin, Lisa)
July 8, 2010 87 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the determination of, or denying, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from July 12, 2010 to At the Court's discretion Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Order to Compel Continued Deposition of Defendant Edward Magedson, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Local Rule 83.7, Local Rule 37-4, and this Court's inherent authority filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 22 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 23 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 24 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 25 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 26 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 27 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 28 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 29 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 30 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 31 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 32 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 33 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 34 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 35 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 36 Exhibit 36 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 37 Exhibit 37 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin)(Borodkin, Lisa)
July 2, 2010 86 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/24/10 11:06am (Lopez, Margarita)
July 2, 2010 85 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/24/10 11:06am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2010. (Lopez, Margarita)
June 29, 2010 84 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/19/10 2:15 PM (Gackle, Deborah)
June 29, 2010 83 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/19/10 2:15 pm. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle, phone number 213 620-1149. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through COURT REPORTER DEBORAH K. GACKLE OR PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2010. (Gackle, Deborah)
June 24, 2010 82 Featured Case MINUTES ORDER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION BIFURCATE DISCOVERY, ETC. by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Before the Court is Plaintiffs motion to bifurcate discovery, compel the deposition of Defendant Edward Magedson, allow the deposition of Defendant Magedson to go forward without a protective order, and to have the Court enter an order regarding the conduct of counsel at thedepositions. (Docket No. 52.) For the following reasons, Plaintiffs'requests are granted in part and denied in part, 52 . SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (ca)
June 24, 2010 81 IN CHAMBERS ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A BENCH TRIAL 40 50 held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court on its own motion continues the hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 40) and Plaintiffs' Motion for a Bench Trial (Docket No. 50) to Monday, July 12, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. (pc)
June 24, 2010 80 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 65 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 24, 2010 79 DECLARATION of Ben Smith In Support of Defendants' Reply Re: Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 24, 2010 78 DECLARATION of Ed Magedson In Support of Defendants' Reply Re: Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 24, 2010 77 DECLARATION of David S. Gingras Defendants' Reply Re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 24, 2010 76 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL FACTS re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 24, 2010 75 OPPOSITION /Response to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 24, 2010 74 REPLY MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 21, 2010 73 REPLY and Notice of Defendants' Non-Opposition in Further Support of MOTION to Enforce Waiver of Right to Jury Trial 50 and Request to Waive Oral Argument filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
June 15, 2010 72 NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING THE DECLARATION OF DANIEL F. BLACKERT, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING THE DECLARATION OF DANIEL F. BLACKERT, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
June 15, 2010 71 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 64 Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 of Plaintiffs' Notice of Errata)(Blackert, Daniel)
June 15, 2010 70 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 69 for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 of Plaintiffs' Notice of Errata)(Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law)(Borodkin, Lisa)
June 14, 2010 68 DECLARATION of Iliana Llaneras DECLARATION OF ILIANA LLANERAS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 DECLARATION OF ILIANA LLANERAS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2006 AEI tax returns, # 2 Exhibit 2-2007 AEI tax returns, # 3 Exhibit 3-2008 AEI tax returns, # 4 Exhibit 4-2008 amended AEI tax returns)(Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 67 EXHIBIT Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Patricia Brast to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 Notice of Manual Filing pursuant to Local Rule 11-5.1 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 66 DECLARATION of Kristi Jahnke in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 65 DECLARATION of Daniel F. Blackert in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 Declaration in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Exhibit 10-21, # 3 Exhibit 22-32, # 4 Exhibit 33-38, # 5 Exhibit 39-46)(Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 64 Statem,ent of Genuine Issues in Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 63 DECLARATION of Lisa J. Borodkin In Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 5 Exhibit 5 to to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin)(Borodkin, Lisa)
June 14, 2010 62 DECLARATION of Justin Lin in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 61 PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
June 14, 2010 60 DECLARATION of Israel Rodriguez in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 Declaration in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 59 DECLARATION of Charlie Yan in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 Declaration in support of Plaintiffs' filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 58 DECLARATION of Patricia Brast In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 of Brast Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 of Brast Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 of Brast Declaration)(Blackert, Daniel)
June 14, 2010 57 DECLARATION of Tina Norris In opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 Declaration supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 of Norris Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 of Norris Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 of Norris Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 of Norris Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 of Norris Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 of Norris Declaration)(Blackert, Daniel)
June 11, 2010 56 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Edward Magedson MOTION for Order for To Bifurcate Discovery and Regarding Conduct at Depositions MOTION for Protective Order for Confidentiality or Ordering Discovery Without Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality 52 Supplemental Memorandum of Law pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37-2.3 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Borodkin, Lisa)
June 10, 2010 55 NOTICE of New Motion Hearing Date filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Berra, Paul)
June 4, 2010 54 DECLARATION of David S. Gingras Re: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Edward Magedson MOTION for Order for To Bifurcate Discovery and Regarding Conduct at Depositions MOTION for Protective Order for Confidentiality or Ordering Discovery Without Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality 52 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
June 4, 2010 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez, re MOTION to Compel Deposition of Edward Magedson MOTION for Order for To Bifurcate Discovery and Regarding Conduct at Depositions MOTION for Protective Order for Confidentiality or Ordering Discovery Without Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality 52 served on 06/04/2010. (Borodkin, Lisa)
June 4, 2010 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Edward Magedson, MOTION for Order for To Bifurcate Discovery and Regarding Conduct at Depositions, MOTION for Protective Order for Confidentiality or Ordering Discovery Without Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Motion set for hearing on 6/25/2010 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin)(Borodkin, Lisa)
May 31, 2010 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Asia Economic Institute, re MOTION to Enforce Waiver of Right to Jury Trial 50 served on May 31, 2010. (Borodkin, Lisa)
May 31, 2010 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Waiver of Right to Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Asia Economic Institute. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lisa J. Borodkin)(Borodkin, Lisa)
May 28, 2010 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Statement (Motion related) 41 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 56-1 proposed Judgment lacking. Other error(s) with document(s): Statement of uncontroverted facts, document number 41, in support of Motion for Summary Judgment should be lodged and not e-filed. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (vh)
May 24, 2010 48 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' "Corrected" Declarations filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 47 DECLARATION of David S. Gingras In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Raymond Mobrez Deposition Transcript, # 2 Exhibit Screenshot of Report 417493, # 3 Exhibit Text of Report 417493, # 4 Exhibit Screenshot of Report 423987, # 5 Exhibit Text of Report 423987, # 6 Exhibit Screenshot of Report 457433, # 7 Exhibit Text of Report 457433, # 8 Exhibit Screenshot of Report 502429, # 9 Exhibit Text of Report 502429, # 10 Exhibit Screenshot of Report 564331, # 11 Exhibit Screenshot of Report 571232, # 12 Exhibit Text of Report 571232, # 13 Exhibit Links Exchange, # 14 Exhibit Page from asiabusinessinstitute.com, # 15 Exhibit February 15, 2009 email, # 16 Exhibit April 28, 2009 email, # 17 Exhibit May 5, 2009 email, # 18 Exhibit May 5, 2009 email, # 19 Exhibit May 12, 2009 email, # 20 Exhibit May 3, 2010 Declaration of Raymond Mobrez, # 21 Exhibit Phone Bills, # 22 Exhibit Index of Recordings)(Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 46 DECLARATION of Lynda Craven In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 45 DECLARATION of Kim Jordan In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 44 DECLARATION of Amy Thompson In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 43 DECLARATION of Ben Smith In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 42 DECLARATION of Edward Magedson In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 41 STATEMENT of Facts In Support of Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case 40 filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David)
May 24, 2010 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Case filed by Defendant Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David)
May 20, 2010 38 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. correcting Affidavit 36 , Affidavit 37 NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING THE MAY 20, 2010 AFFIDAVITS OF RAYMOND MOBREZ AND ILIANA LLANERAS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND MOBREZ PURSUANT TO THE COURTS ORDER ON APRIL 19, 2010 REGARDING PLAINTIFFS RICO AND EXTORTION CAUSES OF ACTION)(Blackert, Daniel)
May 20, 2010 37 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Raymond Mobrez CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT OF RAYMOND MOBREZ PURSUANT TO THE COURTS ORDER ON APRIL 19, 2010 REGARDING PLAINTIFFS RICO AND EXTORTION CAUSES OF ACTION filed by Plaintiff Raymond Mobrez (Blackert, Daniel)
May 20, 2010 36 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Iliana Llaneras CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT OF ILIANA LLANERAS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS ORDER ON APRIL 19, 2010 REGARDING PLAINTIFFS RICO AND EXTORTION CAUSES OF ACTION filed by Plaintiff Iliana Llaneras (Blackert, Daniel)
May 20, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting 33 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Maria Crimi Speth on behalf of Defendant XCentric Ventures, LLC and Edward Magedson, designating Paul S. Berra as local counsel. (pj)
May 19, 2010 39 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court, having reviewed the accompanying Application of Maria Crimi Speth for permission to appear and participate in teh above-entiled action on behalf of Defendant XCentric Ventures, LLC and Edward Magedson and the designation of Paul S. Berra, as local counsel and hereby ORDERS the application be GRANTED. (yl)
May 18, 2010 34 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for attorney Maria Crimi Speth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6967951 paid.) 33 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berra, Paul)
May 18, 2010 33 APPLICATION for attorney Maria Crimi Speth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6967951 paid.) filed by Defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Berra, Paul)
May 11, 2010 32 Featured Case MINUTES OF ORDER Setting Settlement Conference (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: This matter having been referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for a settlement conference, IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference be held on July 14, 2010, at 11:00 a.m., 312 N. Spring Street, Courtroom 827B (8th Floor), Los Angeles, CA. The parties, lead trial counsel, and persons whose consent is necessary to conclude a settlement are required to attend the settlement conference. If a proposed settlement must be presented for approval to a board or committee, the person who is responsible for making a recommendation to the board or committee must be present (or available by telephone if granted permission by the court). Each side shall submit a settlement conference statement directly to Judge Walsh's chambers by fax (213) 894-5734) not later than two (2) court days before the conference. These statements are to be exchanged with opposing counsel. (ca)
May 11, 2010 31 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Ed Magedson re Declaration (non-motion) 28 , Declaration (non-motion) 27 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson (Gingras, David)
May 10, 2010 30 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Asia Economic Institute.. (Borodkin, Lisa)
May 6, 2010 29 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. correcting Declaration (non-motion) 28 of Raymond Mobrez (Blackert, Daniel)
May 3, 2010 28 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Raymond Mobrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through H, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits I though L, # 3 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Blackert, Daniel)
May 3, 2010 27 DECLARATION of Iliana Llaneras filed by Plaintiff Iliana Llaneras. (Blackert, Daniel)
April 27, 2010 25 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lisa J Borodkin counsel for Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Adding Lisa J. Borodkin as attorney as counsel of record for Asia Economic Institute LLC, Raymond Mobrez, Iliana Llaneras for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, LLC, Raymond Mobrez, Iliana Llaneras (Borodkin, Lisa)
April 22, 2010 24 Featured Case CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (Jury Trial set for 8/3/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson, Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2010 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.) See Order for specific details. (im)
April 20, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Denying Defendants' 9 Motion to Strike Under Section 425.16. Defendant's request for an order requiring Plaintiffs to submit a RICO case statement is also Denied. (mg)
April 19, 2010 26 MINUTES OF 1. DEFENDANTS XCENTRIC & MAGEDSON'S SPECIAL MOTION TOSTRIKE & MOTION TO REQUIRE RICO CASE STATEMENT 9 (fld03/22/10)2. NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Hearing and conference held. The motion is denied. Order to issue. The case is set for jury trialon August 3, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Pretrial Conference is set for 3:30 p.m. Within two weeks, plaintiff shall file a declaration describing meetings with any representative of defendant regarding extortion. Defendant, within ten days of receipt of plaintiffs declaration, shall file a declaration on the same issue. Also, within ten days, the parties shall meet and confer to exchange initial disclosures. The Court bifurcates damages and RICO claims. The trial will only address extortion. Motions for summary judgment may be filed anytime prior to the trial. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (pj)
April 14, 2010 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC was INCORRECTLY docketed as Xcentric Ventlures LLC. All entries have been corrected to reflect the correct spelling "VENTURES." (esa)
April 13, 2010 22 MINUTES OF New Case Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson:Status conference held. The matter will proceed on April 19, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. with DefendantsXcentric & Magedson's Special Motion to Strike & Motion to Require Rico Case Statement 9 (fld03/22/10). Court Reporter: N/A. (pj)
April 8, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson GRANTING Notice of Withdrawing 12 Motion to Remand Case to State Court. (pp)
April 7, 2010 19 NOTICE Notice of Errata and Notice of Filing Amended Reply in support of Defendants' Special Motion to Strike filed by Defendants Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David) Modified on 4/14/2010 (esa).
April 7, 2010 18 REPLY (Amended) in support of MOTION to Strike Complaint 9 filed by Defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David) Modified on 4/14/2010 (esa).
April 7, 2010 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, 12 filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. (Blackert, Daniel)
April 5, 2010 16 DECLARATION of Edward Magedson in support of Defendants' Opposition to First MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court 12 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson. (Gingras, David)
April 5, 2010 15 DECLARATION of David S. Gingras in support of Defendants' Opposition to First MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court 12 filed by Defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David) Modified on 4/14/2010 (esa).
April 5, 2010 14 OPPOSITION to First MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court 12 filed by Defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David) Modified on 4/14/2010 (esa).
April 5, 2010 13 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike Complaint 9 filed by Defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC. (Gingras, David) Modified on 4/14/2010 (esa).
March 29, 2010 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Asia Economic Institute, Iliana Llaneras, Raymond Mobrez. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Blackert, Daniel)
March 29, 2010 11 OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE Opposition re: MOTION to Strike Complaint 9 Opposition is filed by Plaintiff Asia Economic Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits D-H, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits I-J, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 5 Affidavit Affidavit of Raymond Mobrez)(Blackert, Daniel)
March 22, 2010 10 DECLARATION of Edward Magedson In Support Of MOTION to Strike Complaint 9 filed by Defendant Edward Magedson. (Gingras, David)
March 22, 2010 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint filed by Defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gingras, David) Modified on 4/14/2010 (esa).
March 4, 2010 8 NEW CASE ORDER. This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson. See attachment for further details. (vh)
March 4, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Conference be set for Monday, April 12, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. before the Honorable Stephen V. Wilson. The attorneys attending this conference MUST be those who are in charge of the conduct of the trial. Attendance is mandatory. (vh)
March 3, 2010 6 Featured Case ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 08-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 10-01360 SVW(PJWx). (rn)
February 24, 2010 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(esa)
February 24, 2010 4 ANSWER to Complaint, 1 filed by defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventlures LLC.(esa) (ds).
February 24, 2010 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by defendant Xcentric Ventlures LLC identifying Corporate Parent Creative Business Investment Concepts Inc for Xcentric Ventlures LLC. (esa) (ds).
February 24, 2010 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventlures LLC. (esa) (ds).
February 24, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of CA, Los Angeles County, case number SC106603 with CONFORMED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Walsh; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendants Xcentric Ventlures LLC, Edward Magedson.(esa) (ds). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2010: # 1 Exhibit) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asia Economic Institute et al v. Xcentric Ventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Economic Institute
Represented By: Daniel F Blackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iliana Llaneras
Represented By: Daniel F Blackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Mobrez
Represented By: Daniel F Blackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badbusinessbureau.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Magedson
Represented By: Paul S Berra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures LLC
Represented By: Paul S Berra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?