YRC Inc v. Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc et al
Plaintiff: YRC Inc and Roadway Express, a Delaware corporation
Defendant: Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc and Patricia Wade
Case Number: 2:2010cv07037
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: A Howard Matz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2011 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP rule 41(a)(1) filed by defendant Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc.(Covner, Andrew)
August 31, 2011 Filing 20 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Case called. Counsel make their appearances. The court hears discussion. Parties retire to chambers to proceed with the settlement conference. Settlement is reached. Court Recorder: Courtsmart. (sp)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Stipulation for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Based upon the Stipulation for Protective Order concurrently filed on 8/17/11, regarding the handling of documents, deposition transcripts, and other materials filed, produced or otherwise disclosed in this matter, and finding good cause therefor, it is hereby ordered that: The Stipulation for Protective Order is hereby Granted. (sp)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Stipulation for Use of Certain Depositions and Transcripts of Same in Present Action by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The Stipulation for Use of Certain Depositions and Transcripts of Same in Present Action is hereby Granted. (sp)
August 17, 2011 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff YRC Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Dawn)
August 17, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Discovery as to For use of certain depositions and transcripts of same in present action filed by Plaintiff YRC Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Dawn)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The settlement conference is set for Wednesday, 8/31/11 at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 20, U.S. Courthouse, 312 N. Spring St., Los Angeles, CA. A settlement conference statement of each party must be submitted directly to the chambers of the settlement judge, (Room 342), or, in the alternative, faxed directly to the chambers of the settlement judge, (213-894-3335), no later than 5:00 p.m. on 8/24/11. (sp)
April 29, 2011 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT re Referral to Magistrate Judge for Settlement and Presumptive Schedule filed by Plaintiff YRC Inc. (Kennedy, Dawn)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2012 at 11:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 1/24/2012 at 8:00 AM. (kbr)
March 7, 2011 Filing 12 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge A. Howard Matz. Court orders the parties to exchange letters by not later than March 28, 2011 wherein defendants will provide their contentions and/or legal position regarding disclosure and plaintiff will provide the same but on the issue of duty. Each side must respond to the letter by not later than April 4, 2011. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (kbr)
March 7, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Amended Presumptive Schedule of Pretrial Dates, Exhibit A, re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #9 , Notice of Lodging #10 (Kennedy, Dawn)
March 4, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Presumptive Schedule of Pretrial Dates, Exhibit A, re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #9 (Kennedy, Dawn)
February 24, 2011 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 to 6 days, filed by Plaintiff YRC Inc.. (Kennedy, Dawn)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge A. Howard Matz. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2011 at 1:30 PM. (kbr)
December 30, 2010 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #4 JURY DEMAND. filed by defendant Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc.(Covner, Andrew)
December 13, 2010 Filing 6 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED filed by plaintiff YRC Inc as to defendant Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc. (jp)
December 10, 2010 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff YRC Inc, upon Defendant Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc served on 12/9/2010, answer due 12/30/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edward Banman, M.D., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kennedy, Dawn)
December 7, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #4 as to Defendant Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc. (lom)
December 7, 2010 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #1 against Defendant Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc filed by Plaintiff YRC Inc. (lom) (jp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2010: #1 Summons Issued) (lom).
September 22, 2010 Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MATZ: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve this Order on all defendant and/or their counsel along with the summons and complaint, or if that is not practicable as soon as possible thereafter. If this case was assigned to this Court after being removed from State Court, the defendant who removed the case shall serve this Order on all other parties. (kbr)
September 21, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff YRC Inc. (esa) (ds).
September 21, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to defendants Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc, Patricia Wade. (esa)
September 21, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc, Patricia Wade. Case assigned to Judge A. Howard Matz for all further proceedings; Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F Eick; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID); filed by plaintiff YRC Inc.(esa) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YRC Inc v. Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YRC Inc
Represented By: Dawn Kennedy
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadway Express, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Dawn Kennedy
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Medical Group of Ventura County Inc
Represented By: Andrew Howard Covner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?