Oleg Pogrebnoy v. Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Oleg Pogrebnoy
Defendant: News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., MMAP Inc., NTS, Vitaly Matusov, Alexander Ginsburg and John & Jane Doe
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Erica Bristol
Case Number: 2:2010cv08532
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 233 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #222 CCA # 17-56583. The judgment of this Court, entered November 09, 2018, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $403.10. [See USCA Memorandum #232 AFFIRMED.] (mat)
November 9, 2018 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #222 filed by Oleg Pogrebnoy. CCA # 17-56583. The decision of the district court is AFFIRMED. (mrgo)
March 26, 2018 Filing 231 Mail Returned addressed to Oleg Pogrebnoy re Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) #223 . (lom)
March 22, 2018 Filing 230 Mail Returned addressed to Oleg Pogrebnoy re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting #216 . (lom)
March 22, 2018 Filing 229 Mail Returned addressed to Oleg Pogrebnoy re Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law #219 . (lom)
March 22, 2018 Filing 228 Mail Returned addressed to Oleg Pogrebnoy re Minutes of In Chambers #220 . (lom)
March 22, 2018 Filing 227 Mail Returned addressed to Oleg Pogrebnoy re Order on Motion to Bifurcate #218 . (lom)
March 21, 2018 Filing 226 Mail Returned addressed to Oleg Pogrebnoy re Minutes of In Chambers Order #211 . (lom)
November 15, 2017 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #222 as to Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy; Receipt Number: LA163060 in the amount of $505. (cma)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #222 filed by Oleg Pogrebnoy. CCA # 17-56583. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. (car)
October 19, 2017 Filing 224 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56583 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #222 as to plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (mrgo)
October 18, 2017 Filing 223 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #222 . (mat)
October 16, 2017 Filing 222 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Appeal of Judgment #221 and all related orders, Filed On: 10/2/17; Entered On: 10/4/17; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat)
October 2, 2017 Filing 221 JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Percy Anderson. In accordance with the Courts October 2, 2017 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, it is nor ORDERED, ADJUDGE, and DECREED that: Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoys (Pogrebnoy) claim for cancellation of a federal trademark registration pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 1064 is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; (SEE JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) and MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (yl)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson:The Court has reviewed the parties post-Mandate briefs and concludes that those briefs are adequate for the Courts determination of the issues the Ninth Circuit has ordered this Court to reconsider. The Court will accept no further briefs, motions, or evidence in support of the parties positions on the issues currently before the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
October 2, 2017 Filing 219 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Percy Anderson. (cr)
September 15, 2017 Filing 217 DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO BIFURCATE DAMAGES opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Bifurcate DAMAGES, WHICH OCCURRED AFTER JUNE 6, 2011, DISCOVERY CUTOFF, UNTIL COURT RULES ON LIABILITIES #213 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #213 MOTION to Bifurcate. Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy ("Plaintiff") has filed a "Motion to Bifurcate Damages" and a "Motion to Admit Plaintiff's Trial and Additional Exhibits." Neither Motion contains the statement required by Local Rule 7-3 that Plaintiff contacted opposing counsel to discuss the Motions at least seven days prior to the filing of the Motions. The Court therefore orders the Motions stricken. The "Motion to Admit Plaintiff's Trial and Additional Exhibits" includes copies of exhibits including certain of defendants' banking records. These exhibits include financial account numbers and other sensitive and private information in violation of the redaction requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Rule 5.2. The Court therefore orders that the Motion and supporting exhibits be stricken for this additional reason and that the offending document be returned to Plaintiff without being filed. The Court orders that images of the Motion and exhibits shall not appear on the Court's docket. (mrgo)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Percy Anderson, ORDERING Motion for Leave of Court to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Brief on Remand submitted by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy received on 9/13/17 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 7-3, counsel did not meet and confer with opposing counsel. (mrgo)
September 5, 2017 Filing 215 BRIEF ON REMAND, PURSUANT TO IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER, DATED 8/7/17, filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Case Reopened, #211 . (mrgo)
September 5, 2017 Filing 214 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Bifurcate DAMAGES, WHICH OCCURRED AFTER JUNE 6, 2011, DISCOVERY CUTOFF, UNTIL COURT RULES ON LIABILITIES #213 served on 9/5/17. (mrgo)
September 5, 2017 Filing 213 [DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 218] MOTION TO BIFURCATE DAMAGES, WHICH OCCURRED AFTER JUNE 6, 2011, DISCOVERY CUTOFF, UNTIL COURT RULES ON LIABILITIES filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo) Modified on 9/15/2017 (mrgo).
September 5, 2017 Filing 212 BRIEF filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Case Reopened, #211 . (Barnhill, Steven)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: USCA Mandate, #210 . In light of the Ninth Circuit's Memorandum Opinion, the Court orders the parties to file briefs by no later than September 5, 2017, with argument concerning the issues the Ninth Circuit has instructed this Court to reconsider. (See document for details) (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (mrgo)
August 4, 2017 Filing 210 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #205 CCA # 15-55127. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered July 13, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #209 AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, AND REMANDED.] (mat)
July 13, 2017 Filing 209 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 filed by Oleg Pogrebnoy. CCA # 15-55127. AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, AND REMANDED. Each party shall pay its own costs on appeal. (mat)
February 4, 2015 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 ; Receipt Number: LA110987 in the amount of $505. (iv)
January 23, 2015 Filing 207 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-55127, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #205 as to plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (mat)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 filed by Oleg Pogrebnoy, CCA # 15-55127. A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. Order received in this district on 1/22/15. [See document for all detail] (mat) Modified on 1/23/2015 (mat).
January 20, 2015 Filing 206 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #205 . (mat)
January 16, 2015 Filing 205 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Appeal of Order on Application to Withdraw as Attorney #98 Judgment #202 Order on Motion for Order Order on Ex Parte Application for Leave #199 Filed On: 2/26/l3, 10/24/l4, 12/18/14; Entered On: 12/26/2013, 10/24/2014, 12/19/14; Filing fee $ 505 will be billed. (mat)
January 8, 2015 Filing 204 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment. Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (jloz)
December 18, 2014 Filing 202 JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson: In accordance with the Court's 12/18/2014 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, which concluded that plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy had failed to sustain his evidentiary burden in support of any of his claims asserted against defendants Russian Newspaper Distribution, Inc., MMAP, Inc., Vitaly Matusov, and Alexander Ginzburg, the Court has resolved all of the claims pending in this action. It is therefore now ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Defendants shall have judgment in their favor on all of Pogrebnoy's claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Pogrebnoy take nothing and that Defendants shall have their costs of suit. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk)
December 18, 2014 Filing 201 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Percy Anderson. See document for details. (gk)
October 27, 2014 Filing 200 REASONS FOR OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(gk)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Audio Recording #181 . Because the Court will not consider the audio recording, Defendants' Ex Parte Application and Request for Judicial Notice #193 are not relevant. The Court therefore denies Defendants' Ex Parte Application and Request for Judicial Notice. The Court will not consider the evidence of which Defendants sought to have the Court take judicial notice when it rules on Defendants' pending Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings, or, if such a ruling would not dispose of the entire action, issues its Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
October 24, 2014 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to file verified request for judicial notice in support of defendant's opposition at docket #184 #193 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (jloz)
October 23, 2014 Filing 197 PROPOSED ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to file verified request for judicial notice in support of defendant's opposition at docket #184 #193 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Zalomiy, Olga)
October 23, 2014 Filing 196 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., re Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, #195 served on 10/23/2014. (Zalomiy, Olga)
October 23, 2014 Filing 195 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to file verified request for judicial notice in support of defendant's opposition at docket #184 #193 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit exhibit 7)(Zalomiy, Olga)
October 23, 2014 Filing 194 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to file verified request for judicial notice in support of defendant's opposition at docket #184 #193 served on 10/23/2014. (Zalomiy, Olga)
October 23, 2014 Filing 193 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to file verified request for judicial notice in support of defendant's opposition at docket #184 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit exhibit 2)(Zalomiy, Olga)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is an Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy ("Plaintiff")(Docket No. 189). Plaintiff seeks to continue the deadline for him to file his Objections to Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Reasons for Objections from October 20, 2014, to October 27, 2014. Defendants Russian Newspaper Distribution, Inc., MMAP, Inc., Vitaly Matusov, and Alexander Ginzburg (collectively "Defendants") have not filed a timely Opposition to the Ex Parte Application. The Court therefore grants Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application and continue the deadline for Plaintiff's filings to October 27, 2014. Also before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings (Docket No. 179) and Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Admit into Evidence Audio Recording (Docket No. 181). Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that these matters are appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for November 3, 2014, is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. After October 27, 2014, the Court will review the parties' post-trial filings and either rule on the pending Motions, or, if such a ruling would not dispose of the entire action, issue its Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (bp)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #189 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File. (jloz)
October 20, 2014 Filing 190 REPLY to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's MOTION for Order for to Admit into Evidence an Audio Recording #181 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (jloz)
October 20, 2014 Filing 189 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Objections and Reasons for Objections to the Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jloz)
October 20, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Lodging #183 , Order,, #170 (Attachments: #1 Marked copy of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Reasons for Objectioins to Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Barnhill, Steven)
October 17, 2014 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings, pursuant to FRCP 52(c) #179 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (gk)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #185 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Permit Filing of Reply Memorandum Fourteen Pages Long. (rne)
October 14, 2014 Filing 185 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to For an Order To Permit Filing Of Reply Memorandum Fourteen Pages Long filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Lodged Memorandum)(jloz)
October 13, 2014 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for to Admit into Evidence an Audio Recording #181 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
October 6, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE OF LODGING Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jloz)
October 6, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Defendants' [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Order,, #170 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnhill, Steven)
October 1, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Admit into Evidence an Audio Recording filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Motion set for hearing on 11/3/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (jloz)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: To guide the parties' discussions concerning potential revisions to the post-trial briefing schedule, as it said following the conclusion of the Court Trial, the Court will allow Plaintiff to file a Motion to Admit Audio Tape into Evidence. The Parties should meet and confer as required by Local Rule 7-3. Any such Motion shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rules and set for a hearing no later than November 17, 2014. Plaintiff also states that he intends to seek to file a motion to supplement the factual record submitted at trial. The Court will not entertain such a Motion. As the Court's Civil Trial Order made clear, in this Court Trial, direct testimony was to be presented in the form of trial declarations. The Court reiterated this fact at the pretrial conference. In response to that warning, Plaintiff submitted Supplemental Declarations. With the possible exception of the audio tape that is the subject of Plaintiff's contemplated Motion, the factual record is closed. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
September 24, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings, pursuant to FRCP 52(c) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
September 22, 2014 Filing 178 OPPOSITION to Defendant's Ex Parte Application #172 and REQUEST for to Set Filing and Opposition Due Dates for a Motion for Order to Admit Audio Tape into Evidence filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (gk)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND THE FILING DEADLINES ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PARTIAL FINDINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 52(C) by Judge Percy Anderson: Defendants' Ex Parte Application #172 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to file the written Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) is hereby extended to and through 9/29/2014. The deadline for Plaintiff to file an opposition to Defendants Rule52(c) Motion, if any, is hereby extended to and through 10/13/2014. (gk)
September 19, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2014-02-25, 2014-09-02, 2014-09-03 re Transcript #175 , #173 , #174 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Amber, Leandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 19, 2014 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Wednesday, September 3, 2014; 9:32 a.m.. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2014. (Amber, Leandra)
September 19, 2014 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Tuesday, September 2, 2014; 9:18 a.m.. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2014. (Amber, Leandra)
September 19, 2014 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Tuesday, February 25, 2014; 1:05 p.m.. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2014. (Amber, Leandra)
September 19, 2014 Filing 172 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for judgment on partial findings pursuant to FRCP 52(c) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc..(Zalomiy, Olga)
September 3, 2014 Filing 203 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (jloz)
September 3, 2014 Filing 171 MINUTES OF Court Trial (3rd Day) held and completed before Judge Percy Anderson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Defendant(s) rest. Case submitted. Motion for Judgment/Directed Verdict by Defendants is submitted. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Counsel stipulate to the return of exhibits upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. Court and counsel confer as stated on the record. An order will issue regarding post trial briefs. Russian interpreter, Zoya Spivakovsky, present. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 IN CHAMBERS- COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The parties shall file their revised proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions no later than October 6, 2014. The parties shall file their Reasons for Objections to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law no later than October 20, 2014. At trial, defendants made a Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 52(c). Defendants may file a written Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of their Rule 52(c) Motion no later than September 22, 2014. Plaintiff may file a written Opposition to the Rule 52(c) Motion no later than October 6, 2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
September 2, 2014 Filing 169 MINUTES OF Court Trial (2nd day) held before Judge Percy Anderson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. The defendant makes an oral motion for a Direct Verdict. The Court reserves ruling. Bench Trial continued to 9/3/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Report concerning the resumption of the Court trial. Because this is a Court trial, and the direct testimony has already been submitted by declaration, there is no reason that Michael Mirochnik must be plaintiff's next witness. However, the Court will accommodate the travel plans of that witness. The Court Trial will therefore resume on September 2, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. The presentation of all testimony will continue, if necessary, on September 3, 2014, and conclude no later than September 4, 2014. The Court cautions the parties that if they run out of witnesses prior to the end of a trial day, the Court will consider that party's case to have rested even if that party had intended to have additional witnesses available to testify on the next day. (pso)
July 30, 2014 Filing 167 JOINT REPORT of available dates for trial filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
July 22, 2014 Filing 166 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court orders the parties to meet and confer no later than 7/31/2014, to discuss possible dates for the resumption of the Court Trial in this matter. No later than 8/4/2014, the parties shall file a Joint Report with the Court in which they indicate dates in August and September in which they and their witnesses would be available to resume and complete the Court Trial. Once the Court reviews the parties' Joint Report, the Court will set a date for the Court Trial to resume. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is an Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy ("Plaintiff") (Docket No. 164). Plaintiff requests to continue the trial, which is currently set to begin on April 23, 2014, for at least three weeks. The Court vacates the current trial date of April 23, 2014. The Court has a multi-defendant criminal trial set to begin on May 13, 2014, that is estimated to last approximately four weeks. The Court therefore does not currently know when it will have time available to try this case. The Court will notify the parties as soon as it has identified a date certain for the trial to begin. #164 (pso)
April 15, 2014 Filing 164 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ADJOURNMENT OF TRIAL DATE CURRENTLY SET ON APRIL 23, 2014 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy.(bp)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court Trial in this matter shall commence on April 23, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. The Court anticipates that the trial will continue on the morning of April 24, 2014, and will conclude no later than April 25, 2014. If any party is unavailable on those dates, that party must file a notice with the Court no later than 12:00 p.m. on April 3, 2014. #160 (pso)
March 24, 2014 Filing 162 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #110 , CCA # 14-55039. The Appeal is dismissed. Mandate received in this district on 3/24/14. (mat)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #110 filed by Oleg Pogrebnoy CCA # 14-55039. This appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Order received in this district on 2/26/2014. (dmap)
February 25, 2014 Filing 160 MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL (1ST Day) held before Judge Percy Anderson: Witneses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified. The Court will issue an order notifying the parties of the further trial date. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (rne)
February 24, 2014 Filing 159 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court and counsel confer concerning plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Court Order to Take the Testimony of Maksim Pestun on February 25, 2014 (Docket No.158). The Court grants the application. Witness Maksim Pestun shall testify on February 25, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. #158 Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (bp)
February 24, 2014 Filing 158 EX PARTE APPLICATION for a Court Order to Take Testimony of Maksim Pestun on 2/25/2014, or in the Alternative to Allow Him Testify at Trial Via Skype Video Option filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (gk)
February 21, 2014 Filing 157 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court's calendar remains congested with criminal trials that have scheduling priority over the Court Trial in this civil matter. As a result, the Court will not be able to commence the Court Trial in this matter on 2/25/2014. The Court therefore orders that the Court Trial in this matter will trail the pending criminal trials. Once sufficient time in the Court's calendar becomes available, the Court will provide the parties with a minimum of 48 hours notice of the trial date in this matter. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 20, 2014 Filing 156 Final Joint Witness Estimate Form filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 20, 2014 Filing 155 Final Exhibit List filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc... (Barnhill, Steven)
February 20, 2014 Filing 154 Witness List filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc... (Barnhill, Steven)
February 20, 2014 Filing 153 Final PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits (as Revised). (Barnhill, Steven)
February 20, 2014 Filing 152 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report in compliance with the Court'sFebruary 13, 2014 Minute Order filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is an Ex Parte Application to Reconsider and Modify the Court's February 7, 2014 Minute Order filed by filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy ("Plaintiff") #149 . Plaintiff seeks relief from the Court's order that the parties "exchange" trial exhibits at a conference of counsel that the Court ordered the parties to conduct no later than February 12, 2014. Plaintiff, who is appearing pro se, did not attend the conference and claims that the cost of producing a copy of his trial exhibits for counsel for defendants is prohibitive. Plaintiff must provide a copy of his trial exhibits to defendants. However, the Court will not require him to provide two sets of exhibits for defendants. The Court therefore orders the parties to meet and confer no later than February 19, 2014. At this meeting, the parties are to provide a complete set of their trial exhibits to the other side. This exchange shall qualify as the set of binders that the parties are to prepare for the other side that would otherwise be exchanged on the first day of trial. No party will be allowed to introduce at trial any exhibit or page of an exhibit that is not given to the other side at the meeting of counsel that must occur no later than February 19, 2014. Additionally, the failure to appear at this meeting of counsel, conduct a good faith conference, or provide a copy of the exhibits for the opposing party that the opposing party may keep, may result in the imposition of sanctions that couldinclude the dismissal of the action or the striking of a defendant's answer and entry of default. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than February 20, 2014, in which the parties summarize the meeting of counsel, any progress that has been made concerning disputes concerning exhibits, and any other problems concerning the admission of evidence at trial the parties anticipate. REFER TO DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS OF THE COURT'S ORDER. (pso)
February 13, 2014 Filing 150 Final PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits . (Barnhill, Steven)
February 12, 2014 Filing 149 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reconsider and Modification Civil Minutes Order Dated 2/7/14 #133 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(pso)
February 12, 2014 Filing 147 DECLARATION re Pretrial Conference - Final,, #133 Declaration of Steven M. Barnhill in Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Reconsider/Modify Minute Order Dated February 7, 2014 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #2 Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Pt 1, #3 Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Pt 2)(rne)
February 11, 2014 Filing 146 ADDITION TO DECLARATION of Oleg Pogrebnoy re Declaration of Oleg Pogrenbnoy #131 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (rne)
February 11, 2014 Filing 142 Notice of Lodging Defendants' Marked-up Copy of Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 141 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has a criminal trial that will begin on 2/18/2014. The criminal trial has scheduling priority over the Court Trial in this civil matter. The Court therefore continues the Court Trial in this matter to 2/25/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 11, 2014 Filing 140 DECLARATION re Objections - non-motion #137 , Objections - non-motion #134 , Objections - non-motion #136 , Objections - non-motion #135 , Objections - non-motion, #139 , Objections - non-motion #138 Declaration of Steven M. Barnhill filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 139 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (non-motion) #131 Exhibit S (Declaration of Svetlana Yavorsky) attached to theTrial Declaration of Oleg Pogrebnoy filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 138 OBJECTIONS to Trial Declaration of Maksim Pestun filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 137 OBJECTIONS to Trial Declaration of Michael Mirochnik filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 136 OBJECTIONS to Trial Declaration of Irina Subacheva filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 135 OBJECTIONS to Additional Trial Declaration of Oleg Pogrebnoy filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 11, 2014 Filing 134 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (non-motion) #131 (Declaration of Oleg Pogrebnoy) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 7, 2014 Filing 133 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: The Court orders plaintiff to file his amended trial declarations and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by no later than noon, on 2/11/2014. Plaintiff shall serve defendants with a copy of the documents by 3:00 PM on 2/10/2014. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and exchange trial exhibits by no later than 2/12/2014. The parties should also discuss whether they can agree to have the Court try the case based solely on trial declarations and stipulated facts. The parties shall notify the Court, by noon on 2/13/2014, regarding their decision. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
February 4, 2014 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Maksim Pestun filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (gk)
February 4, 2014 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Michael Mirochnik filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(gk)
February 4, 2014 Filing 143 DECLARATION of Irina Subacheva filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (gk)
February 4, 2014 Filing 131 DECLARATION of Oleg Pogrebnoy filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(gk)
February 4, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Preclude Evidence of Transfer of Trademark from Kurier Weekly Inc. to VPP Inc. #122 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): It appears that this filing was submitted after the deadline to file Motions in Limine.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 4, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude Late Disclosed Documents #121 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): It appears that this filing was submitted after the deadline to file Motions in Limine.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 4, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Preclude Late Disclosed Witnesses #120 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): It appears that this filing was submitted after the deadline to file Motions in Limine.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 4, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Appeal Fees Paid #117 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): It appears that this filing was submitted after the deadline to file Motions in Limine. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 4, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude Opinion testimony #118 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): It appears that this filing was submitted after the deadline to file Motions in Limine.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 4, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE Notice of Lodging Defendants' [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnhill, Steven)
February 4, 2014 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Vitaly Matusov in compliance with Civil Trial Order (page 5, paragraphs 6 & 7) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 4, 2014 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Alexander Ginzburg in compliance with Civil Trial Order (page 5, paragraphs 6 & 7) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
February 2, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Preclude Evidence of Transfer of Trademark from Kurier Weekly Inc. to VPP Inc. filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.(Barnhill, Steven)
February 2, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude Late Disclosed Documents filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.(Barnhill, Steven)
February 2, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Preclude Late Disclosed Witnesses filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.(Barnhill, Steven)
February 2, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Preclude Evidence of Damages filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.(Barnhill, Steven)
February 2, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude Opinion testimony filed by Defendant Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.(Barnhill, Steven)
January 31, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE OF LODGING of Proposed Final Pre-Trial Conference Order filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(gk)
January 22, 2014 Filing 117 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #110 as to Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy; Receipt Number: LA087987 in the amount of $505. (car)
January 14, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Change of address by Steven M Barnhill attorney for Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 11400 W Olympic Blvd., Suite 200, Los Angeles, CA 90064. Filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
January 14, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE of Change of address by Olga Zalomiy attorney for Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 11400 W Olympic Blvd., Suite 200, Los Angeles, CA 90064. Filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Zalomiy, Olga)
January 8, 2014 Filing 114 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-55039, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #110 as to Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (car)
January 7, 2014 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Appeal #108 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
January 7, 2014 Filing 111 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #110 . (dmap)
January 6, 2014 Filing 113 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is Plaintiff's "Ex Parte Application for Revision of Civil and Scheduled Orders andModification of the Existing Due Dates" #107 and Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Stay Pending Appeal #108 . The Court denies Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Stay Pending Appeal. The Court will, however, allow Plaintiff additional time to prepare the required pretrial documents. The Court therefore orders Plaintiff to meet and confer with counsel for defendants concerning the preparation of the required pretrial documents no later than 1/17/2014. The required pretrial documents shall be filed no later than 1/31/2014. Failure to file the required pretrial documents may result in the imposition of sanctions, including the dismissal of the action. The pretrial conference is continued to 2/7/2014, at 1:30 PM. The Court Trial will remain set for 2/18/2014. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 6, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Appeal of Order on Application to Withdraw as Attorney #98 . Filed On: 12/26/2013; Entered On: 12/26/2013; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (dmap)
January 6, 2014 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Revision of Civil and Scheduled Orders and Modification of the Existing Due Dates #107 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
January 6, 2014 Filing 108 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Appeal filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy.(pso)
January 3, 2014 Filing 107 EX PARTE APPLICATION For Revision of Civil and Scheduled Orders and Modification of the Existing Due Dates filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Lodged Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bp)
January 3, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnhill, Steven)
January 3, 2014 Filing 105 Defendants' WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
January 3, 2014 Filing 104 Witness List filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc... (Barnhill, Steven)
January 3, 2014 Filing 103 First PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits (Defendants' Trial Exhibits). (Barnhill, Steven)
January 3, 2014 Filing 102 Exhibit List filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc... (Barnhill, Steven)
January 3, 2014 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
January 3, 2014 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Steven M. Barnhill Re Filing of Required Pre-Trial Documents filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Barnhill, Steven)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se. This Order is intended to bring certain aspects of law and motion practice to your attention at an early stage in the litigation to remedy problems commonly associated with pro se pleadings. See document for details. (gk)
December 26, 2013 Filing 98 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court grants Counsel Jai Rho's Second Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy #93 . Counsel is relieved of any further obligations to represent Plaintiff in this matter. The Clerk is ordered to substitute Plaintiff as attorney of record. Counsel shall inform Plaintiff when and where he may pick up the case file, including copies made by the attorney if originals are not delivered. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson, ORDERING Opposition submitted by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy received on 12/23/2013 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (gk)
December 20, 2013 Filing 95 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Erica Bristol: Mediation held on 12-20-13. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Bristol, Erica)
December 19, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed Oleg Pogrebnoy (Rho, Jai)
December 19, 2013 Filing 93 Second APPLICATION of Jai H. Rho to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Attorney Rho Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rho, Jai)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is an Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy (Plaintiff) filed by Jai Rho (Counsel) (Docket No. 89). According to Counsels Ex Parte Application, counsel for defendants Russian Newspaper Distribution, Inc., MMAP, Inc. Vitaly Matusov, and Alexander Ginzburg (collectively Defendants) does not oppose the Ex Parte Application. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Unless and until this Court authorizes Counsel to withdraw, he continues to have an obligation to represent Plaintiff. Because of Counsel's failures to comply with the requirements of Local Rule 83-2.9.2.1, and the Court's inability, on this record, to conclude that Plaintiff has in fact breached an obligation to pay Counsel's fees, the Court denies Counsel's Ex Parte Application without prejudice. To the extent Counsel and Plaintiff are unable to resolve their differences, and Counsel later seeks to file another Ex Parte Application to Withdraw, he may support the request to withdraw with a declaration, signed under penalty of perjury, that explains, in a general fashion, the nature and severity of the conflict between him and Plaintiff. The declaration should be filed in camera and under seal. Counsel must provide a copy of any such declaration filed in camera and under seal to Plaintiff but shall not provide a copy to Defendants. Refer to document for details of the Court's Order. #89 (pso)
December 18, 2013 Filing 91 Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION of Jai H. Rho to Withdraw as Attorney #89 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (pso)
December 17, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION of Jai H. Rho to Withdraw as Attorney #89 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Withdrawal as Attorney of Record)(Rho, Jai)
December 16, 2013 Filing 89 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Jai H. Rho to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rho, Jai)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for January 17, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. ; and 2. Setting Court Trial Date of February 18, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. Refer to document for details of the Court's order. (pso)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (pso)
November 18, 2013 Filing 86 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the Ninth Circuit's Mandate #85 . At the time this Court issued its Order granting defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court had already issued its Scheduling Order and the Discovery and Motion Cut-Off dates had passed. In light of the Ninth Circuit's Mandate, the Court concludes that this case should proceed expeditiously to the Court Trial the parties elected, and hereby issues the revised "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The revised Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates restores to the parties more time than remained when the Court issued its Order granting defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment to conduct a settlement conference and prepare the required pretrial documents. Bench Trial set for 2/18/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation 2/13/2014. Hearing on Motions in Limine at 1:30 PM 2/10/2014. File Finding of Fact & Conclusions of Law 2/10/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/17/2014. Lodge Pretrial Conference Order & Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation by 1/3/2014. File Contentions of Fact & Law 1/3/2014. Exhibit List due by 1/3/2014. Witness List due by 1/3/2014. File Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement by 1/3/2014. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/23/2013. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 14, 2013 Filing 85 MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 , CCA # 11-56264. The decision of the District Court is REVERSED and REMANDED. Mandate received in this district on 11/14/13. (mat) Modified on 1/29/2014 (mat).
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 filed by Oleg Pogrebnoy, CCA # 11-56264. Russian Newspaper Distribution, Inc.'s petition for panel rehearing is denied. Order received in this district on 11/4/13. (car)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 filed by Oleg Pogrebnoy, CCA # 11-56264. A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $455.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fess for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. Any motion to proceed in forma pauperis must include a financial declaration such as the attached Form 4. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Order received in this district on 8/01/2011. (lr)
July 29, 2011 Filing 82 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 as to Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy; Receipt Number: LA022048, PAID in the amount of $455. (lr)
July 29, 2011 Filing 81 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 . (dmap)
July 27, 2011 Filing 80 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 11-56264, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 as to Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (lr)
July 27, 2011 Filing 79 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 . (dmap)
July 26, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiffOleg Pogrebnoy. Appeal of Judgment #74 . Filed On: 06/28/2011; Entered On: 06/29/2011; Filing fee $ 455 billed. (dmap); Modified on 7/27/2011 (dmap).
July 19, 2011 Filing 77 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 5801.16 in favor of Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc, et al. and against Oleg Pogrebnoy. RE: #74 , #75 (mb)
July 1, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs #75 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing should be set before the Clerk. See Bill of Costs Handbook in the Court's web site under General Information regarding procedures on setting the hearing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mg)
June 30, 2011 Filing 75 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy re: Judgment, #74 , filed by Defendants Vitaly Matusov, MMAP Inc., Alexander Ginsburg, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Barnhill, Steven)
June 28, 2011 Filing 74 JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Defendants shall have judgment in their favor on all of Pogrebnoy's claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Pogrebnoy take nothing and that Defendants shall have their costs of suit. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mg)
June 28, 2011 Filing 73 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting Defendants' #34 Motion for Summary Judgment ; Denying Pogrebnoy's #37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will issue a judgment consistent with this Order. (mg)
June 17, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Attorney Settlement Officer Proceeding Report (ADR-3) filed 6/15/2011 #62 . The following error(s) was found: PDF image is rotated. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 17, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit Q to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed 6/14/2011 #60 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 17, 2011 Filing 70 OBJECTION in support of re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 (Objections to Plaintiff's Opposition Declaration of Svetlana Yavorsky) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
June 17, 2011 Filing 69 OBJECTION in support of re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 (Objections to Plaintiff's Opposition Declaration of Irina Subacheva) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
June 17, 2011 Filing 68 OBJECTION in support of re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 (Objections to Plaintiff's Opposition Declaration of Michael Mirochnik) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
June 17, 2011 Filing 67 OBJECTION in support of re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 (Objections to Plaintiff's Opposition Declaration of Oleg Pogrebnoy) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
June 17, 2011 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Steven M. Barnhill in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 (Supplemental Declaration) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
June 17, 2011 Filing 65 REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
June 16, 2011 Filing 64 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Jai H. Rho on behalf of Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy (Rho, Jai)
June 16, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jai H Rho on behalf of Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy (Rho, Jai)
June 15, 2011 Filing 62 ATTORNEY SETTLEMENT OFFICER PROCEEDING REPORT Filed by Attorney Settlement Officer Erica Bristol: Settlement Proceedings were held on June 3, 2011. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Bristol, Erica)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court denies Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File an Amended Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues #59 . The Court orders Docket Entries 57 and 58 stricken from the Docket. Although the Court has warned Plaintiff that any future failure to timely file a document with the Court or other violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court's Orders, or the Local Rules may result in the imposition of sanctions, the Court will nevertheless consider the documents Plaintiff has already filed in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment despite Plaintiff's admitted failure to file those documents in compliance with the requirements of the Local Rules and the Court's Orders. The Court also notes that this Ex Parte Application, as well as Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment, were filed electronically through the Court's CM/ECF system utilizing the user access information of attorney Jai Rho. Jai Rho is not Plaintiff's attorney of record in this matter. Instead, Plaintiff is appearing pro se. Unless Plaintiff obtains leave of court to file documents through the CM/ECF system, or an attorney appears in this action on his behalf, the Court will not accept any additional electronic filings from Plaintiff and any future such filings will be stricken. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 14, 2011 Filing 60 SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT Q to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Rho, Jai)
June 13, 2011 Filing 59 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement Statement of Genuine Issues and Amend Opposition re Statement (Motion related) #56 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #57 for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amended Opposition and Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues)(Rho, Jai)
June 13, 2011 Filing 58 STATEMENT of Genuine Issues MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Rho, Jai) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO CIVIL MINUTES OF 6/14/2011 #61 ** Modified on 6/14/2011 (gk).
June 13, 2011 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 Amended filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Rho, Jai) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO CIVIL MINUTES OF 6/14/2011 #61 ** Modified on 6/14/2011 (gk).
June 11, 2011 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Signature)(Rho, Jai)
June 10, 2011 Filing 56 STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #34 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (kpa)
June 10, 2011 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Irina Subacheva in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition #51 to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (kpa)
June 10, 2011 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Michael Mirochnik in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition #51 to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (kpa)
June 10, 2011 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Svetlana Yavorsky in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition #51 to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (kpa)
June 10, 2011 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Oleg Pogrebnoy in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition #51 to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (kpa)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy's Ex Parte Application for Extension to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #48 . Although Defendants correctly point out that Plaintiff should not have waited until more than a week after expiration of the deadline within which he was required to file his Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment before seeking additional time to oppose that Motion, the Court will nevertheless continue the hearing date for the cross-motions for summary judgment and consider Plaintiff's untimely Opposition to Defendants' Motion. The Court therefore continues the hearing on the cross-motions for summary judgment #34 , #37 to 6/27/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff's Opposition, if any, must be filed by 6/10/2011. Defendants' Reply shall be filed by 6/17/2011. The Court notes that Plaintiff's Reply in support of his summary judgment should have been filed no later than 5/31/2011. Because Plaintiff did not file his Reply by that date, and did not request an extension of time within which to file it, the Court will not consider a Reply filed in support of Plaintiff's Motion. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 1, 2011 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Oleg Pogrebnoy in Support of the Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application #48 filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (gk)
June 1, 2011 Filing 48 EX PARTE APPLICATION for the Order of Non-Consideration of the Defendants' MSG or Order to Re-File Defendants' MSJ or Extension of Time to Plaintiff to File Opposition to the Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. Lodged Proposed Order.(gk)
June 1, 2011 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Defendant Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Re Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Extension to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Barnhill, Steven)
May 26, 2011 Filing 46 Amendment to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 Amended Proof of Service filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
May 23, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnhill, Steven)
May 23, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Porposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re MOTION for Summary Judgment #37 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnhill, Steven)
May 23, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed 5/12/2011 #35 . The following error(s) was found: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to the Motion, document number 34, or a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 23, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment filed 5/12/2011 #34 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Document noticed a hearing date of 6/13/2011, and was erroneously set for 1/13/2011. Local Rule 56-1 Proposed Judgment/Order lacking. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 23, 2011 Filing 41 OBJECTION in opposition to re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #37 (Defendant's Written Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
May 23, 2011 Filing 40 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment #37 (Defendant's Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
May 23, 2011 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Steven M. Barnhill in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment #37 (Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Barnhill, Steven)
May 23, 2011 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment #37 (Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
May 16, 2011 Filing 37 Plaintiff's Notice and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2011 at 1:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Declaration Declaration of Oleg Pogrebnoy)(kpa)
May 12, 2011 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Steven M. Barnhill in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Barnhill, Steven)
May 12, 2011 Filing 35 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims #34 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
May 12, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Barnhill, Steven)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: denying #31 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Stay of Production, etc. (see Order for specifics). (dhl)
May 9, 2011 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for a Stay Production of Requested Bank Documents #31 filed by Defendant Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. (Barnhill, Steven)
May 6, 2011 Filing 31 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for a Stay Production of Requested Bank Documents Pending Resolution of Motion filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy.(jy)
April 14, 2011 Filing 30 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., re Notice of Association of Counsel, #29 served on 04/14/2011. (Barnhill, Steven)
April 14, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Steven M. Barnhill on behalf of Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc. (Barnhill, Steven)
March 16, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Attorney Settlement Officer. Erica Bristol has been assigned to serve as Attorney Settlement Officer. (mb)
March 10, 2011 Filing 27 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Attorney Settlement Officer Filed; Parties stipulate that Erica Bristol may serve as Attorney Settlement Officer for a Local Rule 16-15 Settlement Conference. Filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.(Zalomiy, Olga)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson: Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of 6/6/2011; Setting Motion Cutoff date of 6/13/2011; Setting Final Pretrial Conference for 7/15/2011, at 1:30 PM; Setting Court Trial Date of 8/16/2011 at 9:00 AM. (gk)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court's procedures and requirements for civil trials are set forth in this order. (vdr)
March 2, 2011 Filing 25 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for 3/7/2011 at 10:30 AM is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. The Court refers the parties to the Attorney Settlement Officer Panel for a Local Civil Rule 16-15 Settlement Conference. Within ten days, the parties shall: obtain the consent of the Attorney Settlement Officer who will conduct the settlement conference; notify the ADR Program Office of the consent; and file form ADR-2, Stipulation Regarding Selection of Attorney Settlement Officer. Bench Trial set for 8/16/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation 8/11/2011. Hearing on Motions in Limine and File Finding of Fact & Conclusions of Law 8/1/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Motions in Limine to be filed by 7/15/2011. Lodge Pretrial Conference Order & Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation by 7/1/2011. File Contentions of Fact & Law 7/1/2011. Exhibit List due by 7/1/2011. Witness List due by 7/1/2011. File Status Report Regarding Settlement by 7/1/2011. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 6/20/2011. Last Day for Hearing Motions 6/13/2011. Discovery cut-off 6/6/2011. Last Day for Hearing on Motion to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties by 5/30/2011. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 21, 2011 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT of of the parties planning meeting pursuant to Rule 26(f) filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Rabinovich, Mark)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of U.S. District Judge Percy Anderson. A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/7/2011 at 10:30 AM. Counsel shall meet at least 21 days in advance of the Scheduling Conference to prepare a jointly signed report for the court to be submitted no less than 14 days before the Scheduling Conference. *See order for procedures and requirements.* (vdr)
January 10, 2011 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., re Answer to Complaint #20 served on 01/10/2011. (Zalomiy, Olga)
January 10, 2011 Filing 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #18 filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc..(Zalomiy, Olga)
December 27, 2010 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, upon Defendants Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov and Alexander Ginsburg served on 12/22/2010. Service of the Amended Complaint were executed upon Law Office of Mark Rabinovich by mail, statute not specified. (gk)
December 27, 2010 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., MMAP Inc., News-Type Service, Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe 1 through 10; amending Complaint #1 ; filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (gk)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Defendants' Motion #14 to Dismiss is denied as moot. The Court is in receipt of an Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. The hearing calendared for 1/3/2011 is vacated. (vdr)
December 3, 2010 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., (Rabinovich, Mark)
December 3, 2010 Filing 15 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc., re MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #14 served on 12/03/2010. (Rabinovich, Mark)
December 3, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/3/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mark Rabinovich in support of the motion to dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Mark Rabinovich, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Mark Rabinovich, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Mark Rabinovich, #6 Proposed Order Proposed order granting the motion)(Rabinovich, Mark)
November 19, 2010 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, re Order #4 served on 11/17/2010. (ag)
November 19, 2010 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, upon Defendant Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc. served on 11/19/2010, answer due 12/10/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alexander Ginsburg, agent for service. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (ag)
November 19, 2010 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, upon Defendant Alexander Ginsburg served on 11/19/2010, answer due 12/10/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alexander Ginsburg in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (ag)
November 19, 2010 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, upon Defendant MMAP Inc. served on 11/19/2010, answer due 12/10/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alexander Ginsburg, agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (ag)
November 19, 2010 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (ag)
November 19, 2010 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy, upon Defendant Vitaly Matusov served on 11/12/2010, answer due 12/3/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alexander Ginsburg in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (kbr)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER (See document for further details) by Judge Percy Anderson. (ir)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER (See document for further details) by Judge Percy Anderson. (ir)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 08-01080 PA (SSx). Case transferred from Judge A. Howard Matz and Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 10-08532 PA (SSx).Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz (se)
November 9, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: #1 Form AO-120) (et)
November 9, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (et)
November 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe 1 through 10, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc. Case assigned to Judge A. Howard Matz for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff Oleg Pogrebnoy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(et)
November 9, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Alexander Ginsburg, John & Jane Doe, MMAP Inc., Vitaly Matusov, News-Type Service, Inc., Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oleg Pogrebnoy v. Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News-Type Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russian Newspaper Distribution Inc.
Represented By: Mark Rabinovich
Represented By: Steven M Barnhill
Represented By: Anthony P Malecki
Represented By: Maxim Vaynerov
Represented By: Olga Zalomiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMAP Inc.
Represented By: Mark Rabinovich
Represented By: Steven M Barnhill
Represented By: Anthony P Malecki
Represented By: Maxim Vaynerov
Represented By: Olga Zalomiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitaly Matusov
Represented By: Mark Rabinovich
Represented By: Steven M Barnhill
Represented By: Anthony P Malecki
Represented By: Maxim Vaynerov
Represented By: Olga Zalomiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Ginsburg
Represented By: Mark Rabinovich
Represented By: Steven M Barnhill
Represented By: Anthony P Malecki
Represented By: Maxim Vaynerov
Represented By: Olga Zalomiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleg Pogrebnoy
Represented By: Jai H Rho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Erica Bristol
Represented By: Erica Bristol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?