The Weather Underground, Inc. v. Basic Fusion, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: The Weather Underground, Inc.
Defendant: Basic Fusion, Inc., Connexus Corp., Domain Name Proxy, LLC, Epic Media Group, Inc. and First Look, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv08677
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
Presiding Judge: John F. Walter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2010 Filing 15 OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc., served on 12/10/10. (Facchetti, Adrianos)
November 27, 2010 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Enrico Schaefer re: Compliance WIth General Order Authorizing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc.. (Facchetti, Adrianos)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony Patti on behalf of Plaintiff The Weather Underground Inc, designating Adrianos Facchetti as local counsel 8 . (jp)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian A Hall on behalf of Plaintiff The Weather Underground Inc, designating Adrianos Facchetti as local counsel 7 . (jp)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Enrico C Schaefer on behalf of Plaintiff The Weather Underground Inc, designating Adrianos Facchetti as local counsel 6 . (jp) Modified on 11/18/2010 (jp).
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES; Memoranda of Points and Authorities in support of or in opposition to motions shall not exceed 25 pages; replies shall not exceed 12 pages. Counsel are ORDERED to deliver 2 courtesy copies of all documents filed electronically in this action to Chambers. For each document filed electronically, one courtesy copy shall be marked CHAMBERS COPY and the other shall be marked COURTESY COPY. The courtesy copies shall be delivered to Chambers no later than 10:00 a.m. on the next business day after the document was electronically filed (see document for further details). (jp)
November 12, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 12, 2010 Filing 8 APPLICATION for attorney ANTHONY P. PATTI to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (et)
November 12, 2010 Filing 7 APPLICATION for attorney BRIAN A. HALL to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (et)
November 12, 2010 Filing 6 APPLICATION for attorney ENRICO C. SCHAEFER to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (et)
November 12, 2010 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Weather Underground, Inc. (et)
November 12, 2010 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Weather Underground, Inc. (et)
November 12, 2010 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc. (et) (mg).
November 12, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc. (et) (mg).
November 12, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Basic Fusion, Inc., Connexus Corp., Domain Name Proxy, LLC, Epic Media Group, Inc., First Look, Inc. (et)
November 12, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Basic Fusion, Inc., Connexus Corp., Domain Name Proxy, LLC, Epic Media Group, Inc., First Look, Inc. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff The Weather Underground, Inc. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2010: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Weather Underground, Inc. v. Basic Fusion, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basic Fusion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connexus Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domain Name Proxy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Look, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Weather Underground, Inc.
Represented By: Adrianos Matthew Facchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?