Vernon Maxwell et al v. National Football League Featured Case

Plaintiffs former NFL players and certain of their wives alleged that the NFL Defendants failed to warn and protect NFL players against the long-term brain injury risks associated with football-related concussions, failed to enact league-wide guidelines and mandatory rules regulating post-concussion medical treatment and return-to-play standards for players who suffer a concussion, and fraudulently misrepresented that there was no link between concussions and later life cognitive/brain injury.

Related Cases:

Plaintiff: Ottis Anderson, Wanda Anderson, Donald Bessillieu, Susan Bradley, William C Bradley, Jeff Burris, Christopher Calloway, Shante Carver, Kimberley Clayborn, Raymond Clayborn, Anthony Collins, Trudy Collins, Anthony Covington, W Vernon Dean, Mark S Duper, Barbara Fredrickson, Robert J Fredrickson, Duane Galloway, Antonio Gibson, Betty Gibson, Geneva Goeddeke, George Goeddeke, Chris Goode, Kerry Goode, Tanja Goode, Rory Graves, Andetria Hampton, Rodney Hampton, Anthony Hancock, Paula Hancock, Anthony Hargain, Joe Harris, Lydia Harris, Sharon Hawkins, Wayne Hawkins, Patrick Heenan, Sharron Heenan, Lanita Hill, Lonzell Hill, Bonita Hood, James Hood, Bryan Hooks, Brian Ingram, Sarca Ingram, Carolyn Jackson, Harold L Jackson, Carmel James, Roland James, Arnella Jamison, George Jamison, Javoni Jenkins, Melvin Jenkins, Shannon Johnson, Todd Johnson, Anthony Jones, Broderick Jones, Gary Jones, Kirk Cameron Jones, Tina Jones, Valerie Jones, Larry Kaminski, Linda Kaminski, Kelly Kirchbaum, David Kocourek, Mary Lee Kocourek, Karelis Korte, Steve Korte, Edward P Lee, Susan Lee, Bonnie Lewis, David Lewis, Ronnie Lippett, Sheryl Lippett, Teresa Mandley, William H Mandley, Vernon Maxwell, Fred McNeil, Tia McNeil, Richard Mercier, Yadira Mercier, Charles E Miller, Lyvonia A Mitchell, Alvin Moore, Odetta Moore, Angela Nelson, Steve Nelson, Edward Payton, Rica Payton, Evelyn Randolph, Thomas C Randolph, II, Marilyn Reese, Steve Reese, Derrick S Reynolds, Mike C Richardson, James E Robbins, Shaneeta Robbins, Reginald Rogers, Sr, Brett Romberg, Emily Romberg, Leonard Russell, Tasha Russell, Beverlee Schnitker, James Michael Schnitker, Gail Smith, Philip Smith, Kathy Tillman, Lewis D Tillman, George Visger, Kristie Visger, Bruce Walker, Vanisha Walker, Denise Weathers, Robert Weathers, David M White, Monica White, Ingrid Williams, Kendall Williams, Newton Williams, James E Willis, Shalane Willis, Terry Wright, Toby L Wright, Renard Young, Vanessa Young, Steven Zabel and Susan Zabel
Defendant: All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, John Does, NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc and Riddell Sports Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv08394
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Margaret A. Nagle
Presiding Judge: Manuel L. Real
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendants All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc.(Cereghini, Paul)
October 17, 2011 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Graham B LippSmith on behalf of Plaintiffs Ottis Anderson, Wanda Anderson, Donald Bessillieu, Susan Bradley, William C Bradley, Jeff Burris, Christopher Calloway, Shante Carver, Kimberley Clayborn, Raymond Clayborn, Anthony Collins, Trudy Collins, Anthony Covington, W Vernon Dean, Mark S Duper, Barbara Fredrickson, Robert J Fredrickson, Duane Galloway, Antonio Gibson, Betty Gibson, Geneva Goeddeke, George Goeddeke, Chris Goode, Kerry Goode, Tanja Goode, Rory Graves, Andetria Hampton, Rodney Hampton, Anthony Hancock, Paula Hancock, Anthony Hargain, Joe Harris, Lydia Harris, Sharon Hawkins, Wayne Hawkins, Patrick Heenan, Sharron Heenan, Lanita Hill, Lonzell Hill, Bonita Hood, James Hood, Bryan Hooks, Brian Ingram, Sarca Ingram, Carolyn Jackson, Harold L Jackson, Carmel James, Roland James, Arnella Jamison, George Jamison, Javoni Jenkins, Melvin Jenkins, Shannon Johnson, Todd Johnson, Anthony Jones, Broderick Jones, Gary Jones, Kirk Cameron Jones, Tina Jones, Valerie Jones, Larry Kaminski, Linda Kaminski, Kelly Kirchbaum, David Kocourek, Mary Lee Kocourek, Karelis Korte, Steve Korte, Edward P Lee, Susan Lee, Bonnie Lewis, David Lewis, Ronnie Lippett, Sheryl Lippett, Teresa Mandley, William H Mandley, Vernon Maxwell, Fred McNeil, Tia McNeil, Richard Mercier, Yadira Mercier, Charles E Miller, Lyvonia A Mitchell, Alvin Moore, Odetta Moore, Angela Nelson, Steve Nelson, Edward Payton, Rica Payton, Evelyn Randolph, Thomas C Randolph, II, Marilyn Reese, Steve Reese, Derrick S Reynolds, Mike C Richardson, James E Robbins, Shaneeta Robbins, Reginald Rogers, Sr, Brett Romberg, Emily Romberg, Leonard Russell, Tasha Russell, Beverlee Schnitker, James Michael Schnitker, Gail Smith, Philip Smith, Kathy Tillman, Lewis D Tillman, George Visger, Kristie Visger, Bruce Walker, Vanisha Walker, Denise Weathers, Robert Weathers, David M White, Monica White, Ingrid Williams, Kendall Williams, Newton Williams, James E Willis, Shalane Willis, Terry Wright, Toby L Wright, Renard Young, Vanessa Young, Steven Zabel, Susan Zabel (LippSmith, Graham)
October 14, 2011 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to NFL Properties LLC answer now due 11/17/2011; National Football League answer now due 11/17/2011, filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC; National Football League.(Rappaport, John)
October 14, 2011 17 NOTICE filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Notice of Assisgnment and Other Court-Generated Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rappaport, John)
October 14, 2011 16 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, of Notice of Removal of Action to USDC served on 10-11-2011. (Rappaport, John)
October 14, 2011 15 L.R. 7.1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc, (Cereghini, Paul)
October 14, 2011 14 JOINDER filed by Defendants All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc joining in Notice of Removal, 1 . (Cereghini, Paul)
October 14, 2011 13 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to John T. Tierney, III for Plaintiffs. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
October 14, 2011 12 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jason E. Luckasevic for Plaintiffs. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
October 14, 2011 11 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Robert Borrello for Plaintiffs. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
October 14, 2011 10 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Herman Russomanno for Plaintiffs. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
October 14, 2011 9 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Lynn B. Bayard for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
October 14, 2011 8 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Theodore V. Wells, Jr. for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
October 14, 2011 7 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Brad S. Karp for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
October 13, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Manuel L. Real. (lom)
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant Riddell Inc served on 9/12/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Deanna Dillon, Person Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) Modified on 10/14/2011 (esa).
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant RBG Holdings Corp on 9/13/11. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant NFL Properties LLC served on 9/9/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott LaScala, Managing Agent, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant National Football League served on 9/12/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doug Paoletti, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) Modified on 10/14/2011 (esa).
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant EB Sports Corp on 9/9/11. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) Modified on 10/14/2011 (esa).
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant Easton-Bell Sports LLC on 9/9/11. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) Modified on 10/14/2011 (esa). Modified on 10/14/2011 (esa).
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant Easton-Bell Sports Inc on 9/9/11. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Inc, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) Modified on 10/14/2011 (esa).
October 11, 2011 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vernon Maxwell et al, upon Defendant All American Sports Corporation dba Riddell All American on 9/9/11. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) Modified on 10/14/2011 (esa).
October 11, 2011 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, re Notice of Removal, 1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 2 , Certification and Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Notice of Related Cases 4 served on 10/11/11. (esa) (yl).
October 11, 2011 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS filed by defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Related Cases: NONE. (See USDC for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania) (esa) (yl).
October 11, 2011 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (esa) (yl).
October 11, 2011 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League identifying Other Affiliate NFL Ventures LP for NFL Properties LLC. (esa) (yl).
October 11, 2011 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of CA, Los Angeles County, case number BC465842 with CONFORMED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real, discovery to Magistrate Judge Margaret A Nagle; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendants National Football League, NFL Properties LLC.(esa) (yl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernon Maxwell et al v. National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Sports Corporation
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Represented By: Ryan A McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB Sports Corp
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Represented By: Ryan A McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easton-Bell Sports Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Represented By: Ryan A McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easton-Bell Sports LLC
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Represented By: Ryan A McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Properties LLC
Represented By: Lynn B Bayard
Represented By: Bruce Birenboim
Represented By: Brad S Karp
Represented By: Ronald L Olson
Represented By: John Michael Rappaport
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Represented By: Beth A Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Lynn B Bayard
Represented By: Bruce Birenboim
Represented By: Brad S Karp
Represented By: Ronald L Olson
Represented By: John Michael Rappaport
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Represented By: Beth A Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBG Holdings Corp
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Represented By: Ryan A McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Represented By: Ryan A McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell Sports Group Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Represented By: Ryan A McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ottis Anderson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Anderson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bessillieu
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bradley
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Bradley
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Burris
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Calloway
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shante Carver
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Clayborn
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Clayborn
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Collins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Collins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Covington
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W Vernon Dean
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S Duper
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Fredrickson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Fredrickson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Galloway
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Gibson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Gibson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Goeddeke
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Goeddeke
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Goode
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Goode
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanja Goode
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Graves
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andetria Hampton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Hampton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hancock
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Hancock
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hargain
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Harris
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Harris
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Heenan
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Heenan
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanita Hill
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonzell Hill
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Hood
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hood
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Hooks
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ingram
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarca Ingram
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jackson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold L Jackson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel James
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland James
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnella Jamison
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jamison
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javoni Jenkins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jenkins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jones
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broderick Jones
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Jones
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Cameron Jones
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Jones
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Jones
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kaminski
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kaminski
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Kirchbaum
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kocourek
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Kocourek
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karelis Korte
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Korte
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward P Lee
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lee
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Lewis
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lewis
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lippett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Lippett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Mandley
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Mandley
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Maxwell
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred McNeil
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia McNeil
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mercier
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Mercier
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Miller
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyvonia A Mitchell
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Moore
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odetta Moore
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Nelson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Nelson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Payton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rica Payton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Randolph
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C Randolph, II
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Reese
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Reese
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick S Reynolds
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike C Richardson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Robbins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaneeta Robbins
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Rogers, Sr
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Romberg
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Romberg
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Russell
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Russell
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverlee Schnitker
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Schnitker
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Smith
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Smith
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Tillman
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis D Tillman
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Visger
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Visger
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Walker
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanisha Walker
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Weathers
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Weathers
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M White
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica White
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Williams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Williams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newton Williams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Willis
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalane Willis
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Wright
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby L Wright
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renard Young
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Young
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Zabel
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Zabel
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?