Dave Pear et al v. National Football League et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs former NFL players and certain of their wives alleged that the NFL Defendants failed to warn and protect NFL players against the long-term brain injury risks associated with football-related concussions, failed to enact league-wide guidelines and mandatory rules regulating post-concussion medical treatment and return-to-play standards for players who suffer a concussion, and fraudulently misrepresented that there was no link between concussions and later life cognitive/brain injury.

Related Cases:

Plaintiff: Bobby E Abrams, Jr, Stephanie Abrams, Patrice Adams, Stefon Adams, Chelonda Barnett, Fred Barnett, Lindsay Barnett, Timothy Barnett, Marc Boutte, Tananjalyn Boutte, Marty Carter, Horace Copeland, Tangela Copeland, Denise Craig, Francisco Craig, Andrea Crump, Harry Crump, Lional Dalton, Lorenzo Davis, Janet Dorsett, Tony Dorsett, Monique Dotson, Santana Dotson, James Elrod, Marlene Elrod, Bernard Ford, Barry Foster, Teray Foster, Karen Gann, Michael Gann, Lorenzo Hampton, Marcia Hampton, Dwight Harrison, Keith Henderson, Catherine Key, Wade Key, Emanuel King, Kendra King, Henry Lawrence, Debra Lush, Michael Lush, Anthony Marshall, Leonard Marshall, Maryann Marshall, Emanuel Martin, Eric W Martin, Stacy Martin, Deems May, Susan May, Fred McCray, Nerma McCray, Antonio McGee, Sue McGee, Reggie Moore, Zefross Moss, John L Outlaw, Linda Outlaw, Dave Pear, Heidi Pear, James Pruitt, Johnny Rembert, Earline Richardson, Willie Richarson, Lee Rouson, Lisa Rouson, David Sims, Lance Smith, Merita Suci, Robert Suci, Broderick Thomas, Yvonne Thomas, Carmen Tyler, Wendell Tyler, James Vanwagner, Kelley Vanwagner, Calvin Williams and Charese Williams
Defendant: All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, John Does, NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc and Riddell Sports Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv08395
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Margaret A. Nagle
Presiding Judge: Manuel L. Real
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendants EB Sports Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc, All American Sports Corporation, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, RBG Holdings Corp.(Cereghini, Paul)
October 17, 2011 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Graham B LippSmith on behalf of Plaintiffs Bobby E Abrams, Jr, Stephanie Abrams, Patrice Adams, Stefon Adams, Chelonda Barnett, Fred Barnett, Lindsay Barnett, Timothy Barnett, Marc Boutte, Tananjalyn Boutte, Marty Carter, Horace Copeland, Tangela Copeland, Denise Craig, Francisco Craig, Andrea Crump, Harry Crump, Lional Dalton, Lorenzo Davis, Janet Dorsett, Tony Dorsett, Monique Dotson, Santana Dotson, James Elrod, Marlene Elrod, Bernard Ford, Barry Foster, Teray Foster, Karen Gann, Michael Gann, Lorenzo Hampton, Marcia Hampton, Dwight Harrison, Keith Henderson, Catherine Key, Wade Key, Emanuel King, Kendra King, Henry Lawrence, Debra Lush, Michael Lush, Anthony Marshall, Leonard Marshall, Maryann Marshall, Emanuel Martin, Eric W Martin, Stacy Martin, Deems May, Susan May, Fred McCray, Nerma McCray, Antonio McGee, Sue McGee, Reggie Moore, Zefross Moss, John L Outlaw, Linda Outlaw, Dave Pear, Heidi Pear, James Pruitt, Johnny Rembert, Earline Richardson, Willie Richarson, Lee Rouson, Lisa Rouson, David Sims, Lance Smith, Merita Suci, Robert Suci, Broderick Thomas, Yvonne Thomas, Carmen Tyler, Wendell Tyler, James Vanwagner, Kelley Vanwagner, Calvin Williams, Charese Williams (LippSmith, Graham)
October 14, 2011 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to National Football League answer now due 11/17/2011; NFL Properties LLC answer now due 11/17/2011, filed by Defendants National Football League; NFL Properties LLC.(Rappaport, John)
October 14, 2011 16 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jason E Luckasevic for All Plaintiffs. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
October 14, 2011 15 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Robert Borello for All Plaintiffs. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
October 14, 2011 14 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Herman Russomanno for All Plaintiffs. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
October 14, 2011 13 NOTICE filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Notice of Assignment and Other Court-Generated Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rappaport, John)
October 14, 2011 12 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, of Notice of Removal of Action to USDC served on 10-11-2011. (Rappaport, John)
October 14, 2011 11 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Theodore V. Wells Jr. for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
October 14, 2011 10 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Lynn B. Bayard for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
October 14, 2011 9 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Brad S. Karp for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
October 14, 2011 5 L.R. 7.1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc, (Cereghini, Paul)
October 14, 2011 3 JOINDER filed by Defendants All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc joining in Notice of Removal, 1 . (Cereghini, Paul)
October 11, 2011 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 11, 2011 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, re Disclosure Statement 4 , Notice of Removal, 1 , Notice of Related Case(s) 6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 and civil cover sheet served on 10/11/2011. (et) (yl).
October 11, 2011 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Related Case(s): Not Indicated. (et) (yl).
October 11, 2011 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (et) (yl).
October 11, 2011 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (et) (yl).
October 11, 2011 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant Easton-Bell Sports LLC Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews-Managing Agent/Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [Filed in State Court on 9/27/2011 submitted attached to Notice of Removal] (et)
October 11, 2011 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant All American Sports Corporation served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Mathews-Managing Agent/Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [Filed in State Court on 9/27/2011 submitted attached to Notice of Removal] (et)
October 11, 2011 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant NFL Properties LLC served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott LaScala-Managing Agent authorized to accept service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [Filed in State Court on 9/27/2011 submitted attached to noticed of removal] (et)
October 11, 2011 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number LC094453 with Conformed Filed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Gary A. Feess, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Filing fee $ 350 Paid. ), filed by Defendants National Football League, NFL Properties LLC. (et) (yl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dave Pear et al v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby E Abrams, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Abrams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Adams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefon Adams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelonda Barnett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Barnett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Barnett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Barnett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Boutte
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tananjalyn Boutte
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Carter
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Copeland
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangela Copeland
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Craig
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Craig
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Crump
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Crump
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lional Dalton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Davis
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Dorsett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Dorsett
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Dotson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santana Dotson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Elrod
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Elrod
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Ford
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Foster
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teray Foster
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gann
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gann
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Hampton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Hampton
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Harrison
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Henderson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Key
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Key
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel King
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra King
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lawrence
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lush
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lush
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Marshall
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Marshall
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Marshall
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Martin
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric W Martin
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Martin
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deems May
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan May
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred McCray
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nerma McCray
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio McGee
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue McGee
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie Moore
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zefross Moss
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Outlaw
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Outlaw
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Pear
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Pear
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pruitt
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Rembert
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earline Richardson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Richarson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Rouson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rouson
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sims
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Smith
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merita Suci
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Suci
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broderick Thomas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Thomas
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Tyler
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Tyler
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Vanwagner
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Vanwagner
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Williams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charese Williams
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Girardi
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Sports Corporation
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB Sports Corp
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easton-Bell Sports Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easton-Bell Sports LLC
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Properties LLC
Represented By: Lynn B Bayard
Represented By: Bruce Birenboim
Represented By: Brad S Karp
Represented By: Ronald L Olson
Represented By: John Michael Rappaport
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Represented By: Beth A Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Lynn B Bayard
Represented By: Bruce Birenboim
Represented By: Brad S Karp
Represented By: Ronald L Olson
Represented By: John Michael Rappaport
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Represented By: Beth A Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBG Holdings Corp
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell Sports Group Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?