Robert Potter et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Angela Mastromonico, Anthony Armand, Joseph Gordon, Antonio Bersamira, Robert De Vico, Nicole Peterson, Diane Truong, Patricia Meier, Thomas Baird, Betty Maxwell, Jack Flemington, Michael Man, Ferdinand Paragas, Marilyn Jordan, Fernando Montelongo, Anthony Bland, Irma Bennett, Javier Zuniga, Victoria Lyons, Jerry Rogge, Connie Nhan, Joseph Earle, Litaun Lewis, Maybelle Rivera, Carol Weisskopf, Madonna Gionta, Elias Fuentes, Edith Campbell, Stirling Hale, Victor Alvarado, Randeleigh Harris, Larry Jordan, Rudy Standerfer, Irma Castillo, Jerome Grant, Wendy Iriberri, Tasso Bravos, Pertch Toukhladjian, Judith Martino, Fabian Bitanga, Enriqueta Flores, Paul Saunders, Kevin Badiei, Robert Herod, Debra Lynn Klein, Sandra Fernandez, Prescilla Weaver, Judy Earle, Christian Silver, Sydney C Beame, Theresa Moreno, Efren Duarte, Marilyn Michalak, Zenaida Bersamira, Leticia Velazquez, Josephine Paragas, Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Ramon Mejia, Douglas Randall, Connie Cameron, Sally Miller, Carol Hildreth, Alice Collins, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Timothy Anusiem, Noel Ezekiel, Maria De La Cruz, Hattie Perry, Isabel Meija, Magg Hernandez, Guadalupe Fuentes, Steven Scott Newton, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Melba Saunders, Gerardo Rivera, Miguel Velazquez, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Maria Zepeda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Laura McPheeters, Patricia Blue, Gene Michalak, Johnny Tuan Tran, Roberta Doucet, Theodore William Voigtlander, Jacqueline Baird, Anita Chavez, James Cox, Mahmood Timbo, Chantel Foti, Mary Gordon, Michelle Martinez, Otis McKinney, Jerry Hildreth, Harinder Chhokar, Jeremy Foti, Cecilia Ezekiel, Fidel Covarrubias, David Lee Dawson, Tiffany Truong Tran, Fausto Mancilla, Larry Nahlen, Donald Scott, Esperanza Garcia, Connie Soto, Christopher Grieves, Kristin Witzenburg, Mariam Javadzadeh, Tony McPheeters, Averill Stanley, Dennis F Beame, Ramiro Negrete, Karie Wasinack, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Manuel Domingo, Kevin Murray, Cathy Cox, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Behzad Javadzadeh, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Cabrera Maldonado, Jeanne Tatum, Cristina Magana, Daniel Houston, Felix Garcia, Cheryl Soto, Isaiah Lyons, Mari Weston, Abdullah Aslami, Jim Fox, Dyvan Srey, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Marietta Bland, Caitlin McLean, Jeanie Zuo, Barry Stanley, Marlene Bacon, Sherell Lewis, Chester Campbell, Jesus Villegas, Debra May, John Petros, Richard Tatum, Kim Collier, Craig White, Robert Perry, Magda Chavez, Gerald Szillinsky, John Ferles, Carol Nahlen, Pete Castillo, Simona Bakker, Sandra Velazquez, Teresita Bitanga, Angel Lomeli, Pablo Maldonado, David Bennett, Jesus Juarez, Robert Potter, Lolita Randall, Walter Harris, Robert Rositano, Kristie Greenleaf, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Madeline Brigante, Richard Comer, Rochelle Herod, Linda Brice, Aswin Reddy, Martin Chavez, Willie Collins, Meier Pamela, Judy Lim, Polly McKinney, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Nahid Pebdani, Guadalupe Garcia, Joan Potter, Francesca Bravos, Michelle Hale, Robert Miller, Robert Messner, Gloria Martinez, Janine Tavoularis, Teri ORourke, Frederick Heavner, Quan Tran, Vladimir Miskevich, Jesse Herrera, Carol Curtis, Jonathan Weston, Nancy Vizcarra, Cecilia Davalos, Oscar Salas, Placido Urioste, Curtis Blue, Cesar Salas and Jay Pebdani
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company, Priority Posting and Publication, LPS Default Title and Closing, Chase Home Finance LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, EMC Mortgage LLC, Long Beach Mortgage Company, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC and Does 1 through 1000, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2011cv10255
Filed: December 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2012 Filing 37 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (filed 12/19/2011) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND (filed 01/12/2012) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS plaintiffs' Motion to Remand the action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court #6 . The Court DENIES defendants' Motion to Dismiss as moot. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: #1 CV-103 Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court) (jp)
March 26, 2012 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiff Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Torchia, Vito)
March 26, 2012 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Torchia, Vito)
March 14, 2012 Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder Re Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Submission In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #18 . On 3/5/2012, at oral argument, the Court requested that defense council address whether a class action of similar factual allegations has been pursued against any of the defendants in this case in the three-year period preceding this action so as to prevent the application of the local controversy exception to the Class Action Fairness Act ("CAFA") #33 . Defense counsel argued that two cases, Foti v. JPMorgan Chase Bank and Kennedy v. Ally Bank involved similar allegations. The Court requested that defense counsel submit a supplemental filing in which she included the complaints from those two cases as well as a short statement as to why those cases barred the application of the local controversy exception. On 3/7/2012, defendants submitted their supplemental filing in which they submitted the complaints from seven cases, which they argue are similar to this case, as well as arguments concerning whether significant relief is sought from defendant California Reconveyance Company and whether CAFA's amount-in-controversy requirement is met #31 . Thereafter, plaintiffs objected to defendants' filing on the basis that it exceeded the scope of the Court's request #32 . The Court does not believe it appropriate to strike the entirety of defendants' submission. Insofar as defendants have submitted the complaints from and argument concerning cases that could bar the application of the local controversy exception, the Court will consider such materials. Plaintiffs are directed to explain why, in their view, the seven cases defendants have raised do not bar the application of the local controversy exception. However, the Court has already determined that plaintiffs seek significant relief from California Reconveyance Company and that defendants fail to meet CAFA's amount-in-controversy requirement. It declines to reconsider these findings. Accordingly, plaintiffs need not address these points. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
March 7, 2012 Filing 32 OBJECTIONS to Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #31 to Defendants' Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Torchia, Vito)
March 7, 2012 Filing 31 Supplemental Submission in Opposition re: MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Garcia, Norma)
March 5, 2012 Filing 33 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The court takes Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. for Itself and as Successor by Merger to Chase Home Finance, LLC, EMC Mortgage LLC, incorrectly sued as EMC Mortgage Corporation, and the Bear Stearns Companies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #6 and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #18 under submission, subject to defendants' Supplemental Brief to be filed no later than 3/7/2012. Thereafter, counsel will be notified by the Court if further briefing is necessary, as discussed in Court and on the record. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
February 21, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Priority Posting and Publication. (Torchia, Vito)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder #6 . The hearing on defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #6 (filed December 19, 2011), and plaintiffs Motion to Remand #18 (filed on January 12, 2012), is hereby continued to March 5, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are ordered to appear on this new date. (im)
February 13, 2012 Filing 28 OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Norman D. Shaw in support of Defendants Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Torchia, Vito)
February 13, 2012 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plainitff Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Torchia, Vito)
February 13, 2012 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Deron Colby in support of Plaintiffs reply in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo, Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Torchia, Vito)
February 13, 2012 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Vito Torchia, Jr. in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo, Defendant EMC Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Torchia, Vito)
February 13, 2012 Filing 24 REPLY in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Torchia, Vito)
February 13, 2012 Filing 23 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo, Defendant Does. (Torchia, Vito)
February 6, 2012 Filing 22 Opposition re: MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by Defendants EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Garcia, Norma)
February 3, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Robert Potter pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to LPS Default Title and Closing. (Torchia, Vito)
January 12, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Torchia, Vito)
January 12, 2012 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #18 filed by plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice)(Torchia, Vito)
January 12, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torchia, Vito)
January 9, 2012 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #6 In Support of Reply to Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Garcia, Norma)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder re Stipulation to Continue #12 : the hearing date and subsequent briefing on Chase, EMC, and Bear Stearns' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint shall be continued from January 23, 2012 to February 27, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. (smom)
January 9, 2012 Filing 14 REPLY JPMorgan Chase, EMC Mortgage LLC and The Bear Stearns Companies' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #6 filed by Defendants EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Garcia, Norma)
January 6, 2012 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susan J. Miller Overbey to appear on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., for itself and as successor by merger to Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage LLC (incorrectly sued as EMC Mortgage Corporation), and The Bear Stearns Companies LLC, and designating Norma V. Garcia as local counsel. (PHV FEE PAID.) Lodged Proposed Order. (gk)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Granting by Susan J. Miller Overbey to appear on behalf of Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC.Norma V. Garcia is designated as local counsel. Fee PAID. (lt)
January 6, 2012 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Chase, EMC and Bear Stearns' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #6) from January 23, 2012 to February 27, 2012 Re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #6 filed by Defendant EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Norma)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H Wu, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 11-03487 GW(JCx) (rn)
January 5, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC of Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case;Order on App[lication of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case. (Attachments: #1 Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, #2 Proposed Order Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Garcia, Norma)
January 3, 2012 Filing 9 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #6 filed by Plaintiffs Maria Yolanda Alvarado, Victor Alvarado, Timothy Anusiem, Anthony Armand, Abdullah Aslami, Marlene Bacon, Kevin Badiei, Jacqueline Baird, Thomas Baird, Simona Bakker, Dennis F Beame, Sydney C Beame, David Bennett, Irma Bennett, Antonio Bersamira, Zenaida Bersamira, Fabian Bitanga, Teresita Bitanga, Anthony Bland, Marietta Bland, Curtis Blue, Patricia Blue, Francesca Bravos, Tasso Bravos, Linda Brice, Madeline Brigante, Elsa Burgos-Mancilla, Connie Cameron, Chester Campbell, Edith Campbell, Grace Caruth-Johnson, Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda, Irma Castillo, Pete Castillo, Anita Chavez, Magda Chavez, Martin Chavez, Harinder Chhokar, Kim Collier, Alice Collins, Willie Collins, Richard Comer, Fidel Covarrubias, Cathy Cox, James Cox, Carol Curtis, Cecilia Davalos, David Lee Dawson, Maria De La Cruz, Robert De Vico, Manuel Domingo, Roberta Doucet, Efren Duarte, Joseph Earle, Judy Earle, Cecilia Ezekiel, Noel Ezekiel, John Ferles, Sandra Fernandez, Pamela Ferriera-Petros, Jack Flemington, Enriqueta Flores, Chantel Foti, Jeremy Foti, Jim Fox, Elias Fuentes, Guadalupe Fuentes, Esperanza Garcia, Felix Garcia, Guadalupe Garcia, Madonna Gionta, Joseph Gordon, Mary Gordon, Jerome Grant, Kristie Greenleaf, Christopher Grieves, Yvonne Margarret Guillory, Michelle Hale, Stirling Hale, Randeleigh Harris, Walter Harris, Frederick Heavner, Magg Hernandez, Robert Herod, Rochelle Herod, Jesse Herrera, Carol Hildreth, Jerry Hildreth, Daniel Houston, Joe Iriberri, Jr, Wendy Iriberri, Behzad Javadzadeh, Mariam Javadzadeh, Larry Jordan, Marilyn Jordan, Jesus Juarez, Debra Lynn Klein, Litaun Lewis, Sherell Lewis, Judy Lim, Angel Lomeli, Isaiah Lyons, Victoria Lyons, Cristina Magana, Cabrera Maldonado, Pablo Maldonado, Michael Man, Fausto Mancilla, Gloria Martinez, Michelle Martinez, Judith Martino, Angela Mastromonico, Betty Maxwell, Debra May, Otis McKinney, Polly McKinney, Caitlin McLean, Laura McPheeters, Tony McPheeters, Patricia Meier, Isabel Meija, Ramon Mejia, Robert Messner, Gene Michalak, Marilyn Michalak, Robert Miller, Sally Miller, Vladimir Miskevich, Fernando Montelongo, Theresa Moreno, Kevin Murray, Carol Nahlen, Larry Nahlen, Ramiro Negrete, Steven Scott Newton, Connie Nhan, Teri ORourke, Meier Pamela, Ferdinand Paragas, Josephine Paragas, Jay Pebdani, Nahid Pebdani, Hattie Perry, Robert Perry, Nicole Peterson, John Petros, Joan Potter, Robert Potter, Douglas Randall, Lolita Randall, Aswin Reddy, Gerardo Rivera, Maybelle Rivera, Jerry Rogge, Robert Rositano, Cesar Salas, Oscar Salas, Melba Saunders, Paul Saunders, Donald Scott, Maria M Segura, Juan Diaz Serrano, Alice Amalia Shiotsugu, Christian Silver, Cheryl Soto, Connie Soto, Dyvan Srey, Rudy Standerfer, Averill Stanley, Barry Stanley, Gerald Szillinsky, Jeanne Tatum, Richard Tatum, Janine Tavoularis, Tom Harry Tavoularis, Mahmood Timbo, Pertch Toukhladjian, Johnny Tuan Tran, Quan Tran, Tiffany Truong Tran, Diane Truong, Placido Urioste, Leticia Velazquez, Miguel Velazquez, Sandra Velazquez, Jesus Villegas, Nancy Vizcarra, Theodore William Voigtlander, Karie Wasinack, Prescilla Weaver, Carol Weisskopf, Jonathan Weston, Mari Weston, Craig White, Kristin Witzenburg, Maria Zepeda, Javier Zuniga, Jeanie Zuo. (Torchia, Vito)
December 22, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel are advised that the Court expects strict compliance with the provisions of the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for details. (smom)
December 19, 2011 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #6 filed by DEFENDANTS EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proof of Service (By Mail))(Garcia, Norma)
December 19, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by DEFENDANTS EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service (By Mail))(Garcia, Norma)
December 16, 2011 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, re Notice to Parties of ADR Program (ADR-8) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #2 , Notice of Removal,, #1 served on December 12, 2011. (Garcia, Norma)
December 16, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Susan Miller Overbey for Defendants California Reconveyance Company, EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa)
December 12, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed.(esa)
December 12, 2011 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants California Reconveyance Company, EMC Mortgage LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC, identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for California Reconveyance Company, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC; Other Affiliate Bear Stearns for EMC Mortgage LLC. (esa) (mg).
December 12, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number BC459627 with copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder, discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage LLC, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC.(esa) Modified on 12/16/2011 (esa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2011: #1 part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Potter et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mastromonico
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Armand
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gordon
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Bersamira
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert De Vico
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Peterson
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Truong
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Meier
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Baird
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Maxwell
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Flemington
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Man
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferdinand Paragas
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Jordan
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Montelongo
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bland
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Bennett
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Zuniga
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Lyons
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Rogge
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Nhan
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Earle
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Litaun Lewis
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maybelle Rivera
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Weisskopf
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madonna Gionta
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Fuentes
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Campbell
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stirling Hale
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Alvarado
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randeleigh Harris
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jordan
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Standerfer
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Castillo
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Grant
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Iriberri
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasso Bravos
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pertch Toukhladjian
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Martino
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Bitanga
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enriqueta Flores
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Saunders
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Badiei
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Herod
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lynn Klein
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Fernandez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prescilla Weaver
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Earle
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Silver
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney C Beame
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Moreno
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Duarte
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Michalak
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenaida Bersamira
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Velazquez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Paragas
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Yolanda Alvarado
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Mejia
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Randall
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Cameron
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Miller
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hildreth
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Collins
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Harry Tavoularis
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Anusiem
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Ezekiel
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De La Cruz
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Perry
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Meija
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magg Hernandez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Fuentes
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Scott Newton
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Caruth-Johnson
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba Saunders
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Rivera
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Velazquez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Amalia Shiotsugu
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zepeda
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gumersindo Castaneda
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McPheeters
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Blue
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Michalak
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Tuan Tran
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Doucet
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore William Voigtlander
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Baird
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Chavez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cox
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmood Timbo
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Foti
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gordon
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Martinez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis McKinney
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hildreth
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harinder Chhokar
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Foti
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Ezekiel
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Covarrubias
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Dawson
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Truong Tran
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto Mancilla
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Nahlen
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Scott
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Garcia
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Soto
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Grieves
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Witzenburg
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam Javadzadeh
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony McPheeters
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Averill Stanley
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis F Beame
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Negrete
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karie Wasinack
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Margarret Guillory
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Domingo
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Murray
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Cox
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria M Segura
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Diaz Serrano
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behzad Javadzadeh
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Burgos-Mancilla
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cabrera Maldonado
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Tatum
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Magana
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Houston
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Garcia
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Soto
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Lyons
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari Weston
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullah Aslami
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Fox
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyvan Srey
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa Castaneda
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marietta Bland
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin McLean
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Zuo
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Stanley
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Bacon
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherell Lewis
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Campbell
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Villegas
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra May
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Petros
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tatum
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Collier
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig White
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Perry
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magda Chavez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Szillinsky
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ferles
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Nahlen
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Castillo
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simona Bakker
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Velazquez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Bitanga
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Lomeli
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Maldonado
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bennett
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Juarez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Potter
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lolita Randall
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Harris
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rositano
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Greenleaf
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Iriberri, Jr
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Brigante
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Comer
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Herod
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brice
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aswin Reddy
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Chavez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Collins
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meier Pamela
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Lim
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly McKinney
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Ferriera-Petros
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahid Pebdani
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Garcia
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Potter
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca Bravos
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hale
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Messner
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Martinez
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Tavoularis
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri ORourke
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Heavner
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quan Tran
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Miskevich
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Herrera
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Curtis
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Weston
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Vizcarra
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Davalos
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Salas
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Placido Urioste
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Blue
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Salas
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Pebdani
Represented By: Sasan K Behnood
Represented By: Vito Torchia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: Susan Miller Overbey
Represented By: Shannon Z Petersen
Represented By: Norma V Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Posting and Publication
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPS Default Title and Closing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Susan Miller Overbey
Represented By: Shannon Z Petersen
Represented By: Norma V Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Susan Miller Overbey
Represented By: Shannon Z Petersen
Represented By: Norma V Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Susan Miller Overbey
Represented By: Shannon Z Petersen
Represented By: Norma V Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bear Stearns Companies LLC
Represented By: Susan Miller Overbey
Represented By: Shannon Z Petersen
Represented By: Norma V Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?