Robbins Research International Inc v. NeedBasedApps LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robbins Research International Inc
Defendant: Does and NeedBasedApps LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00797
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Presiding Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 208 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin re Notice of Lodging 85 . ***NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT*** (mr)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, on or before October 29, 2012, counsel for defendant NBA, Rebecca A. Cucu, ("counsel") shall show cause, if any there be, why she should not be sanctioned for violating Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(g). (See document for further details). (mr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins Research International Inc v. NeedBasedApps LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NeedBasedApps LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey B Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbins Research International Inc
Represented By: Eric J Lorenzini
Represented By: Jeffrey K Riffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?