William S Rademacher et al v. National Football League et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Matthew L Monger and William S Rademacher
Defendant: All American Sports Corporation, Bell Sports LLC, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, John Does, NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc and Riddell Sports Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv05012
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Margaret A. Nagle
Presiding Judge: Manuel L. Real
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2012 16 NOTICE of Judge S. James Otero's Initial Standing Order filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rappaport, John)
June 12, 2012 Featured Case NOTICE RE INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge S. James Otero. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Otero's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. It governs this case and differs in some respect from the Local Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2012 15 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Decision to Transfer to MDL Panel filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rappaport, John)
June 12, 2012 14 NOTICE of Assignment and Other Court-Generated Documents filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rappaport, John)
June 12, 2012 13 Certificate OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, of Removal of Action to USDC and Accompanying Documents served on June 8, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rappaport, John)
June 11, 2012 12 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Lynn B. Bayard for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
June 11, 2012 11 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Beth A. Wilkinson for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
June 11, 2012 10 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Theodore V. Wells Jr. for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
June 11, 2012 9 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Brad S. Karp for Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et)
June 8, 2012 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 8, 2012 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 2 , Notice of Related Case(s) and Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings 3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 6 , Notice of Removal, 1 and civil cover sheet served on 6/8/2012. (et) (mg).
June 8, 2012 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League identifying Corporate Parent NFL Ventures LP for NFL Properties LLC. (et) (mg).
June 8, 2012 5 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Riddell Inc, Corporate Parent All American Sports Corporation for Riddell Sports Group Inc; Corporate Parent EB Sports Corp for Easton-Bell Sports LLC; Corporate Parent Riddell Sports Group Inc for Easton-Bell Sports Inc; Corporate Parent RBG Holdings Corp for EB Sports Corp; Corporate Parent Easton Bell Sports Inc for RBG Holdings Corp. (et) (mg).
June 8, 2012 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO AND JOINDER in Notice of Removal, 1 ,filed by Defendants RBG Holdings Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Riddell Inc, All American Sports Corporation, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, Riddell Sports Group Inc. (et) (mg).
June 8, 2012 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. Related Case(s): CV 11-08394 R (MANx); CV 11-08395 R (MANx); and CV 11-08396 R (MANx); CV 12-0524 R (MANx); CV 12-4759 R (MANx); Notice of Pendency of other Actions or Proceedings and Notice of Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (et) (mg).
June 8, 2012 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (et) (mg).
June 8, 2012 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Matthew L Monger, William S Rademacher, upon Defendants Riddell Inc served on 5/16/2012, answer due 6/6/2012; Riddell Sports Group Inc dba Riddell Sports Group Inc, served on 5/16/2012, answer due 6/6/2012, Easton-Bell Sports Inc; All American Sports Corporation dba Riddell/all America; Easton-Bell Sports, Inc; Easton-Bell Sports LLC; EB Sports Corp and RBG Holdings Corp. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Deanna Dillon, Operation Specialist-at Illinois Corp Service Co in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [Filed in State Court on 5/25/2012 Submitted Attached to Exhibit A page 112 to Notice of Removal.] (et)
June 8, 2012 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Matthew L Monger, William S Rademacher, upon Defendant NFL Properties LLC served on 5/11/2012, answer due 6/1/2012; National Football League served on 5/11/2012, answer due 6/1/2012. in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [Filed in State Court on 5/16/2012 Submitted Attached to Notice of Removal.] (et)
June 8, 2012 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All American Sports Corporation, Bell Sports LLC, EB Sports Corp, Easton-Bell Sports Inc, Easton-Bell Sports LLC, John Does, NFL Properties LLC, National Football League, RBG Holdings Corp, Riddell Inc, Riddell Sports Group Inc amending Complaint 1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Matthew L Monger, William S Rademacher. [Filed in State Court on 5/4/2012 Submitted Attached to Notice of Removal.] (et)
June 8, 2012 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number LC096597 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Walsh. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID. ), filed by Defendants NFL Properties LLC, National Football League. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2012: # 1 Ntc of Asgmt, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William S Rademacher et al v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Sports Corporation
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Sports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB Sports Corp
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easton-Bell Sports Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easton-Bell Sports LLC
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Properties LLC
Represented By: Ronald L Olson
Represented By: John Michael Rappaport
Represented By: John W Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Ronald L Olson
Represented By: John Michael Rappaport
Represented By: John W Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBG Holdings Corp
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell Sports Group Inc
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: Vincent Galvin, Jr
Represented By: Marion V Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew L Monger
Represented By: David A Rosen
Represented By: Kevin P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S Rademacher
Represented By: David A Rosen
Represented By: Kevin P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?