Garcia et al v. Google Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Cindy Lee Garcia
Defendant: Malid Ahlawi, Nicola Bacily, Robert Bacily, Yousseff M Basseley, Sobhi Bushra, Daniel K Caresman, Kritbag Difrat, Does, Google Inc, Ahmed Hamdy, Amal Nada, Abanob Basseley Nakoula, Nakoula Basseley Nakoula, Matthew Nekola, Erwin Salameh, Thomas J Tanas, YouTube LLC and Mark Basseley Youssef
Case Number: 2:2012cv08315
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Presiding Judge: Victor B. Kenton
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 46 filed by Occupy Los Angeles, CCA # 12-57333. This appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to the order of this court dated January 18, 2013. Order received in this district on 3/6/13. (mat)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: denying 41 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. Garcia may re-submit a motion to prosecute her appeal IFP with the proper supporting documentation under Rule 24. (kbr)
February 5, 2013 Filing 50 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 39 , filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia previously scheduled for 02/11/13 at 10:30 am is hereby taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 46 filed by Occupy Los Angeles CCA # 12-57333. The scope of this appeal is limited to a review of the November 15, 2012 order denying appellant's motion to intervene. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $455.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. See the order for all of the details. Order received in this district on 1/18/2013. (dmap)
December 28, 2012 Filing 48 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 12-57333, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 46 as to Movant Occupy Los Angeles. (mat)
December 27, 2012 Filing 47 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Movant Occupy Los Angeles re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 46 . (dmap)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 42 filed by Cindy Lee Garcia CCA # 12-57302. The appeal filed December 21, 2012 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire remains due December 28, 2012. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than January 18, 2013; the answering brief is due February 15, 2013 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier, and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the clerk for failure to prosecute. Order received in this district on 12/21/2012. (dmap)
December 21, 2012 Filing 44 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 12-57302 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 42 . (dmap)
December 21, 2012 Filing 43 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 42 as to Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia; Receipt Number: LA060407 in the amount of $455. (car)
December 21, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 39 (Appeal fee of $455 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Representation Statement)(Armenta, M)
December 17, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Movant Occupy Los Angeles. Appeal of Order on Motion to Intervene 31 and Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 39 . Filed On: 11/15/2012 and 11/30/2012; Entered On: 11/15/2012 and 11/30/2012; Filing fee $ 455, billed. (dmap)
December 7, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 39 , filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. (Armenta, M)
November 30, 2012 Filing 40 DECLARATION of James A. Blanco Objection to Declaration of Alger and Youssef EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please coMOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion 12 filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald: denying 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Accordingly, the hearing set for December 3, 2012, is removed from the Court's calendar. (kbr)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald: ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CROSS-EXAMINE 35 . (kbr)
November 30, 2012 Filing 37 Objection to and Request to Strike Declarations of Alger and Youssef Objection re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please coMOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion 12 filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
November 30, 2012 Filing 36 OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other) 35 OBJECTIONS OF GOOGLE INC. AND YOUTUBE, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF REQUEST UNDER CENTRAL DISTRICT LOCAL RULE 7-8 TO CROSS-EXAMINE DECLARANTS filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Alger, Timothy)
November 29, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Request Under Central District Local Rule 7-8 To Cross Examine Declarants Submitted by Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube LLC filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
November 28, 2012 Filing 34 DECLARATION of TIMOTHY L. ALGER re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, 22 filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Alger, Timothy)
November 28, 2012 Filing 33 DECLARATION of MARK BASSELEY YOUSSEF re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, 22 filed by Defendant YouTube LLC. (Alger, Timothy)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. Counsel are hereby notified that the hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12 set for December 3, 2012 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby rescheduled for December 3, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. (kbr)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald: denying 19 Motion to Intervene. "Occupy Los Angeles et al." has not demonstrated any basis for intervention as of right, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a), or permissive intervention, Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). (kbr)
November 5, 2012 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANT MARK BASSELEY YOUSSEF AKA NAKOULA BASSELEY NAKOULA served on November 5, 2012. (Bali, Sunita)
November 5, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please coMOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion 12 Response to Objections of Google Inc. and YouTube, LLC filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
November 5, 2012 Filing 28 Objection to Evidence Submitted by Defendant YouTube and Google In Support Of re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please coMOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion 12 filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
November 5, 2012 Filing 27 REPLY In Support of Motion EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please coMOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion 12 filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE YOUTUBE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 21 by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. The Court hereby orders that the time for Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube, LLC to respond to the FAC, whether by answer, motion, or otherwise, shall be continued to and including 30 days after entry of the Court's decision on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (kbr)
October 29, 2012 Filing 25 OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC, re Objections - non-motion, 24 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion) 23 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, 22 PROOF OF SERVICE served on 10/29/2012. (Alger, Timothy)
October 29, 2012 Filing 24 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 14 OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT filed by Defendant YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alger, Timothy)
October 29, 2012 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition Re: Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,, 13 (Alger, Timothy)
October 29, 2012 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please coMOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion 12 filed by Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibit A to C to Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Alger, Timothy)
October 26, 2012 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Amended Complaint,, 5 filed by defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order ON STIPULATION RE YOUTUBE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Alger, Timothy)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 18 by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. The Court hereby orders that the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction shall be continued to December 3, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. (kbr)
October 22, 2012 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION from November 19, 2012 to December 3, 2012 Re: Order on Ex Parte Application for TRO,,, 15 filed by defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)(Alger, Timothy)
October 19, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene with Request for Judicial Notice of Joinder, TRO and Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. (kbr)
October 18, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy L Alger on behalf of Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Alger, Timothy)
October 18, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy L Alger on behalf of Defendants Google Inc, YouTube LLC (Alger, Timothy)
October 18, 2012 Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald: On 10/17/2012, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment 12 . The Application is DENIED. For the reasons stated above and given that the alleged infringement seems to have commenced almost three months ago on 7/2/2012 (see Application at 2), the Court declines to consider this Application on an ex parte basis. Instead, the Court CONSTRUES the Application as a MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the following: Defendants shall file any opposition brief on or before 10/29/2012. Garcia shall file any reply brief on or before 11/5/2012. The hearing on Garcia's motion for preliminary injunction is hereby scheduled for 11/19/2012 at 10:00 AM. (jp)
October 17, 2012 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Garcia, Sutter, Flynn, Fadl, Levine, Hardy, Armenta In Support of Ex Parte Application for TRO EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please co 12 filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Levine, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Hardy, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Armenta)(Armenta, M)
October 17, 2012 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining ORder and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please co 12 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
October 17, 2012 Filing 12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Temporary Restraining Order has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Ex Parte Application filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia.(Armenta, M). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion on 10/18/2012 (jp).
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENIED Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit Under Local Rule 11-6 8 by Judge Michael W Fitzgerald. (jp)
October 12, 2012 Filing 10 DECLARATION of M. Cris Armenta In Support of Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation for an Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction and an Order for Impoundment 8 filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
October 11, 2012 Filing 9 DECLARATION of M. Cris Armenta In Support of Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation for an Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction and an Order for Impoundment 8 filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
October 11, 2012 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation for an Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction and an Order for Impoundment filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia.(Armenta, M)
October 9, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia, upon Defendant Google Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2012, answer due 12/3/2012; YouTube LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2012, answer due 12/3/2012. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Timothy Alger, Attorney. (Armenta, M)
October 9, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Filing Re Copyright filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (Armenta, M)
October 4, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint 5 as to defendants Malid Ahlawi, Nicola Bacily, Robert Bacily, Yousseff M Basseley, Sobhi Bushra, Daniel K Caresman, Kritbag Difrat, Google Inc, Ahmed Hamdy, Amal Nada, Abanob Basseley Nakoula, Nakoula Basseley Nakoula, Matthew Nekola, Erwin Salameh, Thomas J Tanas, YouTube LLC, Mark Basseley Youssef. (jp)
October 4, 2012 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Google Inc, Nakoula Basseley Nakoula, YouTube LLC, Mark Basseley Youssef, Abanob Basseley Nakoula, Matthew Nekola, Ahmed Hamdy, Amal Nada, Daniel K Caresman, Kritbag Difrat, Sobhi Bushra, Robert Bacily, Nicola Bacily, Thomas J Tanas, Erwin Salameh, Yousseff M Basseley, Malid Ahlawi, Does 1 through 10 amending Complaint 1 with JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2012: # 1 21 Days Summons Issued) (jp).
September 26, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 26, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO121) (et)
September 26, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia. (et) (mg).
September 26, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Google Inc, Nakoula Basseley Nakoula, YouTube LLC. (et)
September 26, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Google Inc, Nakoula Basseley Nakoula, YouTube LLC. Case assigned to Judge Michael W Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Cindy Lee Garcia.(et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2012: # 1 Ntc of Asgmt) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Google Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malid Ahlawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicola Bacily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bacily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yousseff M Basseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sobhi Bushra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel K Caresman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kritbag Difrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Timothy L Alger
Represented By: Sunita Bali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Hamdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amal Nada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abanob Basseley Nakoula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nakoula Basseley Nakoula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Nekola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erwin Salameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Tanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Timothy L Alger
Represented By: Sunita Bali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Basseley Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Lee Garcia
Represented By: M Cris Armenta
Represented By: Credence E Sol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?