Paul Olds v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Paul Olds
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc, Lockheed Martin Corporation, M7 Aerospace LLC, Mack Trucks Inc, Maremont Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Navistar Inc, Paccar Inc, Parker Aerospace Group, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Prysmian Power Cables and Systems USA LLC, Simmonds Precisions Products Inc, Thermo King Corporation, Umeco Structural Materials CA Inc, Umeco Structural Materials OK Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Honeywell International Inc, Henkel Corporation, Harco Laboratories Inc, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goodrich Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Ford Motor Company, GE Aviation Systems LLC, General Electric Company, Eaton Corporation, Elbit Systems of America LLC, Eaton Aeroquip LLC, Eaton Aerospace LLC, Dana Companies LLC, Does, Cummins Inc, Curtiss Wright Corporation, Caterpillar Inc, Carlisle Companies Incorporated, CFM International Inc, CRA Trailers Inc, Boeing Company, Borg Warner Corporation, 3M Company and BASF Performance Products LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv08539
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Wilner
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 460 JUDGMENT RE: DEFENDANT CUMMINS,INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION by Judge Manuel L. Real, Related to: Order 458 IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant Cummins, Inc. shall have judgment against Pl aintiff Paul Olds (Plaintiff);IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the judgment entered against the Plaintiff herein and any other judgments entered heretoforeor hereafter in this action against any other Plaintiff are several as to each such defendant unless otherwise expressly stated in the judgment to be joint andseveral as to the particular defendants; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there is no just reason for delay in entryof this final judgment against Defendant herein and the Court expressly directsthat the Clerk of the Court enter this separate judgment against said Plaintiffherein pursuant to FRCP rule 54 notwithstanding whether this action remainspending against other Defendants. (pj)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 453 JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO EATON AEROQUIP LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO EATON AEROQUIP INC. F/K/A AEROQUIP CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff take nothing from defendant Aeroquip with respect to plaintiffs claims for relief asserted in his complaint, and judgment is entered in favor of defendant Aeroquip. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed with prejudice on the merits as to Aeroquip. (pj)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 443 JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the judgment entered against plaintiff herein and any other judgments entered heretofore or hereafter in this action with respect to any other defendant are several as to each such defendant unless expressly stated in the judgment to be joint and several as to the particular defendants; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there is no just reason for delay in entry of this final judgment against plaintiff and in favor o f United Technologies Corporation and, finding that good cause exists for entry of a separate judgment under Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court expressly directs that the Clerk of the Court enter this separate judgment in favor of United Technologies Corporation and against plaintiff herein pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54 notwithstanding whether this action remains pending against other defendants. (pj)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 414 JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT PRYSMIAN POWER & CABLE SYSTEMS USA, a/k/a PRYSMIAN CABLES &SYSTEMS USA, LLC by Judge Manuel L. Real, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff Paul Olds shall take nothing pursuant to his Complaint in th is Action, and that Judgment shall be, and hereby is, entered in favor of defendant Prysmian Power & Cable Systems USA, a.k.a. Prysmian Cables & Systems USA, LLC. Further, defendant Prysmian Power & Cable Systems USA, a.k.a. Prysmian Cables &Systems USA, LLC is the prevailing party, and therefore shall recover its costs of suit as against Plaintiff Paul Olds in a sum to be determined pursuant to L.R. 54-2 and F.R.Civ.P.54(d). (pj)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 377 JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, 345 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff take nothing from defendant Eaton Corporation with respect to plaintiffs claims for relief asserted in his complaint, and judgment is entered in favor of defendant Eaton Corporation. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed with prejudice on the merits as to Eaton Corporation. (pj)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Abex and against Plaintiff Paul Olds. Plaintiff shall take nothing from Abex with respect to Plaintiffs complaint, and Plaintiffs entire complaint is dismissed withprejudice a s to Abex. It is FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Abex be awarded costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (pj)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, in favor of Parker Hannifin Corporation against Paul Olds. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff take nothingfrom defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation with respect to plaintiffs claims forrelief asserted in his complaint, and judgment is entered in favor of defendantParker Hannifin Corporation. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed with prejudice onthe merits as to Parker Hannifin Corporation. (shb)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 JUDGMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation and againstPlaintiff Paul Olds. Plaintiff shall take nothing by reason of his Complaint herein against Lockheed Martin Corporation. Plaintiffs Complaint herein is dismissed on the merits and with prejudice as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (see attached for further details) (pj)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real (pj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Olds v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Bobbie R Bailey
Represented By: Lisa K Rauch
Represented By: Henry D Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Maria Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M7 Aerospace LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Inc
Represented By: Paul Lannus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa Marie Petrovsky
Represented By: Kirsten Hicks Spira
Represented By: John Patrick Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar Inc
Represented By: Paul Lannus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc
Represented By: Madeline L Buty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Aerospace Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Craig S Barnes
Represented By: Steven D DI Saia
Represented By: Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Represented By: Robert Kum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: DeHay and Elliston LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prysmian Power Cables and Systems USA LLC
Represented By: Peter Q Ezzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmonds Precisions Products Inc
Represented By: David M Glaspy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo King Corporation
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umeco Structural Materials CA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umeco Structural Materials OK Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: William J Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: John K Son
Represented By: Lance Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Lisa R Ackley
Represented By: Elizabeth L Huynh
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Quon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Represented By: Arezou Khonsari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harco Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Elan N Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Russell W Schatz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: David M Glaspy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Gasket Corporation
Represented By: Karen Mayann Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Sandra Meeyoun Ko
Represented By: Steven D Smelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Aviation Systems LLC
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S Johnson
Represented By: Charles T Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S Johnson
Represented By: Charles T Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Danielle Ochi Renzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbit Systems of America LLC
Represented By: Meghan Lynn Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip LLC
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Danielle Ochi Renzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aerospace LLC
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Danielle Ochi Renzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Celeste M Brecht
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: William J Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc
Represented By: Anthony C Chiosso
Represented By: Gabriel A Jackson
Represented By: Jackson Jenkins Renstrom LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss Wright Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Marla Talina Almazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Companies Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFM International Inc
Represented By: Charles T Sheldon
Represented By: Derek S Johnson
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRA Trailers Inc
Represented By: Steven D Smelser
Represented By: Sandra Meeyoun Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: James C Pettis
Represented By: Bo W Kim
Represented By: Linda C Hsu
Represented By: Oliver M Gold
Represented By: Bryan Cave LLP
Represented By: David T Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: P Gerhardt Zacher
Represented By: Thomas A Packer
Represented By: Kristine Michelle Futoran
Represented By: Mordecai D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Performance Products LLC
Represented By: John E Dittoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Olds
Represented By: Jennifer L Bartlett
Represented By: Tyson Brannan Gamble
Represented By: Robert Allen Green
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?