Underwood and Wong Produce Inc et al v. F and F Business Management Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Morita Produce Co Inc and Underwood and Wong Produce Inc
Defendant: F and F Business Management Services Inc and Farshad Hedayati
Case Number: 2:2012cv10123
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margaret M. Morrow
Presiding Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFFS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, in favor of Morita Produce Co Inc, Underwood and Wong Produce Inc against F and F Business Management Services Inc, Farshad Hedayati: On June 13, 2009, Underwood and Wong Produce, Inc. and Mori ta Produce Co., Inc. filed a motion for entry of default judgment under Rule 55(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. On September 10, 2013, the court issued an order granting plaintiffs' motion. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED 1. That plaintiffs recover unpaid principal in the amount of $83,238.60 ($40,343.20 to Underwood and $42,895.40 to Morita); 2. That plaintiffs recover prejudgment interest in the amount of $22,879.76 ($10,996.63 to Underwo od and $11,883.13 to Morita); 3. That plaintiffs recover attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,722,37; 4. That plaintiffs recover costs in the amount of $863.64; 4. That the judgment bear post-judgment interest at a rate of 18% per year; and 5. That the action be, and it hereby is, dismissed. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bm)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 9 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (ah)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/13/2013. (ah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood and Wong Produce Inc et al v. F and F Business Management Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F and F Business Management Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farshad Hedayati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morita Produce Co Inc
Represented By: Lois E Rubin
Represented By: R Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underwood and Wong Produce Inc
Represented By: Lois E Rubin
Represented By: R Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?