Lupi Edwards et al v. Ford Motor Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: R. S. A. and Lupi Edwards
Defendant: Does 1 to 200 Inclusive and Ford Motor Company
Claimant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv10994
Filed: December 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2017 Filing 303 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Ford Motor Company and against Lupi Edwards in the principal amount of $ 0, interest in the amount of $ 0, attorneys fees of $ 0, costs of $ 52,497.58. RE: Judgment, #301 (yl)
November 2, 2017 Filing 302 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: The amount(s) listed in writ/abstract do(es) not coincide with the amount(s) in the judgment/order. The $52,497.58 should be placed into the "Costs" section. (yl)
April 19, 2017 Filing 301 AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, in favor of Ford Motor Company against Lupi Edwards, R. S. A. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: 1. That plaintiffs recover nothing; 2. That the action is dismissed with prejudice; and 3. Defendant shall have its costs of suit in the amount of $52,497.58. (mrgo)
April 18, 2017 Filing 300 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company re Bill of Costs (CV-59) #276 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Judgment)(Rodman, Daniel)
April 17, 2017 Filing 299 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken. Per Local Rule 5-4.4, "the proposed order or other proposed document shall be in PDF format and included, as an attachment, to the main electronically filed document (e.g., stipulations, applications, motions)" Or "electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging." (cr)
April 17, 2017 Filing 298 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Document (Non-Motion) #297 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment.: Per Local Rule 5-4.4, "the proposed order or other proposed document shall be in PDF format and included, as an attachment, to the main electronically filed document (e.g., stipulations, applications, motions). Or electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (cr)
April 17, 2017 Filing 297 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER DATED 04/17/2017** AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Amendment to Bill of Costs (CV-59) #276 [PROPOSED] AMENDED JUDGMENT (Rodman, Daniel) Modified on 4/18/2017 (cr).
April 11, 2017 Filing 296 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order #295 , CCA # 15-55577. The judgment of this Court, entered March 20, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (car)
March 20, 2017 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 filed by Lupi Edwards. CCA # 15-55577. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (mat)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 filed by Lupi Edwards. CCA # 15-55577. The district court has reported, however, and this court has confirmed that all transcripts for the February 25 and March 4 proceedings were filed before this court issued the September 15, 2015 order, and that the court reporter identified in appellants' filings was not responsible for the partial transcript in any event. The November 30, 2015 order is vacated. Appellants' counsel are admonished and warned that future failure to provide accurate information will result in the imposition of sanctions. [See document for all details] (mat)
December 8, 2015 Filing 293 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jamie Kristine Rinehart counsel for Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. Jamie K. Rinehart is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Jamie Rinehart. (Rinehart, Jamie)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 filed by Lupi Edwards. CCA # 15-55577. This appeal is remanded to the district court on a limited basis to permit appellant to move the district court to conduct a hearing to determine whether the reporter should be held in contempt. This order shall be provided to Court Reporter Leandra Amber, Chief District Judge George H. King, District Judge Percy Anderson, District Court Clerk Kiry K. Gray and Acting Court Reporter Supervisor Hilda Avila. Acting Court Reporter Supervisor Hilda Avila is directed to provide a copy of this order to Court Reporter Leandra Amber via commercial carrier. [See document for all details](mat)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson, the Court has reviewed its docket. The entirety of the March 4, 2015 transcript having been filed prior to the issuance of the September 15, 2015 order, it appears that this matter was remanded to this Court in error. This Court will not conduct a contempt hearing under these circumstances. It is expected that the Appellate Commissioner will vacate his November 30 order. [See document for complete details] (mat)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 filed by Lupi Edwards. CCA # 15-55577. The transcripts were due August 3, 2015. Appellants state that as of August28, 2015, the transcripts for the hearings of February 25, 2015 and March 4, 2015 have not been filed. This order shall be provided to Court Reporter Supervisor Blanca Carvajalalong with appellants' motion. (car)
August 3, 2015 Filing 289 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 03-03-15 8:03 AM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 288 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-26-15 8:06 AM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 287 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-25-15 1:52 PM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 03-02-15 8:05 AM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3-5-15 8:46 AM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-27-15 8:07 AM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 283 PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3-3-15 8:12 AM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
August 3, 2015 Filing 282 PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3-3-15 12:59PM & 3-4-15 8:34AM. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (pfb)
July 16, 2015 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2015; 2:02 P.M.. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Amber, Leandra)
July 16, 2015 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 13, 2015; 1:39 P.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2015. (Amber, Leandra)
June 30, 2015 Filing 278 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/20/2013 1:30pm re Transcript #277 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kleeger, Sheri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 30, 2015 Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/20/2013 1:30pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sheri Kleeger, phone number 213-894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. (Kleeger, Sheri)
June 2, 2015 Filing 275 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT - VOLUME 2 (Closing statements) filed for proceedings 3/4/2015 at 9:46 a.m. re Transcript #274 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2015 Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT - VOLUME 2 (Closing Statements) for proceedings held on 3/4/2015 at 9:46 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra Ponce, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015. (Ponce, Myra)
June 1, 2015 Filing 276 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 52,497.58 in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. RE: #268 (mb)
April 27, 2015 Filing 273 REPLY to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Application to Clerk to Tax Costs; Declaration of Neal Vanacker in support of APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs #268 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Neal Vanacker, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Rodman, Daniel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 272 Objection to Defendant's Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs Opposition re: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs #268 filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Attorney David A Rosen added to party Lupi Edwards(pty:pla))(Rosen, David)
April 21, 2015 Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Lupi Edwards Court Reporter. Court will contact Jamie K. Rinehart at j.rinehart@rkmlaw.net with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 2/25/15 by Leandra Amber. Opening Statement by Plaintiff on 2/25/15. Opening Statement by Defendant on 2/25/15. Closing Argument by Plaintiff on 3/4/15. Closing Argument by Defendant on 3/4/15. Opinion of the Court on 4/7/15. Jury Instructions on 3/5/15. Testimony of: Trial: 2/26/15 through 3/4/15. Pre-Trial Proceeding: Pretrial Conferences 12/20/13, 1/10/14, 4/11/14, 11/7/14, 12/8/14, 2/13/15, 2/18/15. Other: Trial 2/26/15, 2/27/15, 3/2/15, 3/3/15, 3/4/15. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Rosen, David)
April 20, 2015 Filing 270 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Lupi Edwards Court Reporter. Court will contact Jamie K. Rinehart at j.rinehart@rkmlaw.net with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 2/25/15 by Leandra Amber. Opening Statement by Plaintiff on 2/25/15. Opening Statement by Defendant on 2/25/15. Closing Argument by Plaintiff on 3/4/15. Closing Argument by Defendant on 3/4/15. Opinion of the Court on 4/7/15. Jury Instructions on 3/5/15. Testimony of: Trial: 2/26/15 through 3/4/15. Pre-Trial Proceeding: Pretrial Conferences 1/10/14, 4/11/14, 11/7/14, 12/8/14, 2/13/15, 2/18/15. Other: Trial 2/26/15, 2/27/15, 3/2/15, 3/3/15, 3/4/15. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Rosen, David)
April 16, 2015 Filing 269 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-55577, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 as to Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (mat)
April 16, 2015 Filing 268 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Rodman, Daniel)
April 16, 2015 Filing 267 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Lupi Edwards Court Reporter. Court will contact Jamie K. Rinehart at j.rinehart@rkmlaw.net with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 2/25/15 by Leandra Amber. Opening Statement by Plaintiff on 2/25/15. Opening Statement by Defendant on 2/25/15. Closing Argument by Plaintiff on 3/4/15. Closing Argument by Defendant on 3/4/15. Opinion of the Court on 4/7/15. Jury Instructions on 3/5/15. Testimony of: All Trial 2/26/15-3/4/15. Pre-Trial Proceeding: Pretrial Conferences 1/10/14, 4/11/14, 11/7/14, 12/8/14, 2/13/15, 2/18/15. Other: Trial 2/26/15, 2/27/15, 3/2/15, 3/3/15, 3/4/15. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Rosen, David)
April 15, 2015 Filing 266 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Designation of Record on Appeal #265 . The following error(s) was found: INCORRECT FILING EVENT USED. TO E FILE: CIVIL>> OTHER FILINGS >> TRANSCRIPTS >> G-120. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2015 Filing 265 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiffs Lupi Edwards re #259 (Rosen, David)
April 15, 2015 Filing 264 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Plaintiffs Lupi Edwards. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 Filed On: April 2, 2015; Entered On: April 7, 2015; (Attachments: #1 Judgment)(Rosen, David)
April 6, 2015 Filing 263 JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: 1. That plaintiffs recover nothing; 2. That the action is dismissed with prejudice; and 3. Defendant shall have its costs of suit.in favor of Ford Motor Company against Lupi Edwards, R. S. A. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj)
April 3, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment re Objection #261 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(Rosen, David)
April 3, 2015 Filing 261 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging #256 Defendant's Proposed Judgment filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Rosen, David)
April 2, 2015 Filing 260 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #259 . (Rosen, David)
April 2, 2015 Filing 259 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs Lupi Edwards. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-15483301 paid.) (Rosen, David)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF, R.S.A., A MINOR by Judge Percy Anderson: the Petition for an Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal the Second Amended Petition for Order Granting Resignation and Application of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff, R.S.A., a Minor #37 is GRANTED. (gk)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has read and considered the Second Amended Petition for Order Granting Resignation and Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff R.S.A., a Minor. Good cause appearing, it is ordered that Mark Leonard Sallus shall be appointed as guardian ad litem for R.S.A. in this action, succeeding resignor Lupi Edwards. This order is effective nunc pro tunc as of 10/21/2013. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
March 16, 2015 Filing 256 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Judgment re Jury Trial - Completed,, #251 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Murphy, Jonathan)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Percy Anderson: The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Lodging filed 3/12/2015 #254 , for the following reasons: Lodged proposed judgment includes the minor plaintiff's full name in violation of LR 5.2. (gk)
March 12, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Judgment re Jury Trial - Completed,, #251 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Murphy, Jonathan) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) FILED 3/13/2015 #255 ** Modified on 3/16/2015 (gk).
March 10, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Jury Trial - Held and Continued, [241. ]A duplicate docket entry was made in error regarding the #241 Minute Order Jury Trial 4th day. (pj)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: Defendant Ford Motor Company, Inc. shall file and serve a proposed Judgment no later than March 20, 2015. Plaintiffs shall file and serve objections to the form of the proposed Judgment, if any, no later than April 3, 2015. (pj)
March 5, 2015 Filing 253 UNREDACTED VERDICT FORM re: Redacted Verdict Form #252 . (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 252 REDACTED VERDICT FORM. (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 251 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 7th Day held and completed before Judge Percy Anderson: Court instructs jury. Bailiff(s) sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Verdict reached. Jury Verdict in favor of defendant(s) is read and filed. Polling waived. Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists. Filed jury notes. Filed jury instructions. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Counsel stipulate to the return of exhibits upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 250 UNREDACTED Jury Note Number 1 filed re: Redacted Jury Note Number 1 #249 . (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 249 REDACTED Jury Note Number 1 filed. (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 248 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on the joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 247 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (gk)
March 5, 2015 Filing 246 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Given) by Judge Percy Anderson. (gk)
March 4, 2015 Filing 245 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 6th Day held before Judge Percy Anderson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Defendant(s) rest. Closing arguments made. Court denies Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law #237 . Jury Trial continued to 3/5/2015 08:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber AM/ Myra Ponce PM. (gk)
March 3, 2015 Filing 244 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 5th Day held before Judge Percy Anderson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 3/4/2015 08:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has considered the proposed verdict forms submitted by Plaintiffs and Defendant. The Court intends to submit the attached verdict form to the jury. (smo)
March 3, 2015 Filing 239 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Rule 50 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Chase, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 241 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held before Judge Percy Anderson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2015 08:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Parties stipulate to dismiss the breach of warranties claim. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (pj)
March 2, 2015 Filing 238 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held before Judge Percy Anderson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2015 at 8:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (smo)
March 2, 2015 Filing 237 FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S RULE 50(a) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (lom)
February 27, 2015 Filing 236 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge Percy Anderson. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to Monday, March 2, 2015 at 8:00 a.m. for further trial. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (lom)
February 26, 2015 Filing 235 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge Percy Anderson: Opening statements made plaintiffs and defendant. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to Thursday, February 27, 2015 at 8:00 a.m. for further trial. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (lom)
February 25, 2015 Filing 234 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge Percy Anderson. The Jury is impaneled and sworn. Opening statements made by plaintiffs and defendant. Case continued to Thursday, February 26, 2015 at 8:00 a.m. for further trial. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (lom)
February 23, 2015 Filing 232 Amended PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits JOINT - Plaintiffs 1-393 and Defendant 1000-1517. (Rodman, Daniel)
February 23, 2015 Filing 231 SUPPLEMENT Ford's Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing Regarding Excluding Rollover Testing Involving: 1996 Isuzu Rodeo (Cris Test), 2003 Subaru Forester Tests 1 & 3 (Dolly Rollover Test) and 2000 Ex0plorer (Dolly Rollover Test) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Murphy, Jonathan)
February 23, 2015 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition Bench Brief (Chase, Brian)
February 23, 2015 Filing 229 Witness List filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
February 20, 2015 Filing 228 TRIAL BRIEF FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S BENCH BRIEF REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ANTICIPATED "FAILURE TO TEST" CLAIM filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Jonathan)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The parties are ordered to submit revised witness lists no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 23,2015. Plaintiffs are ordered to send to Defendant, no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 20, 2015, their specific objections to video evidence of automotive crash tests that Defendant has represented it intends to offer at trial. Defendant shall file a single document that includes Plaintiffs' objections and its responses, if any, no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 23, 2015. (smo)
February 18, 2015 Filing 233 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: For reasons stated on the record, the Court grants in part and denies in part defendant's Motion in Limine (No. 3) to Exclude Evidence of Vehicle Drop Tests (#128). The Court also grants in part and denies in part defendant's Motion in Limine (No. 6) to Exclude Evidence Referring to Volvo, or Other Vehicles Including the Volvo XC90 and the Ford Explorer (#130). Plaintiffs Motion in Limine (No. 1) to Preclude all Trade Industry Standards and Customs Including Federal Motion Vehicle Safety Standards and Alleged Compliance Therewith (#134) is denied. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (No. 2) to Limit the Testimony of Defendants Expert Dr. Robert Piziali #135 is denied. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (No. 8) to Exclude Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Dr. Elizabeth Raphael #139 is taken under submission. The parties are ordered to submit revised witness lists no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 23, 2015. The Plaintiffs are ordered to send to Defendant, no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 20, 2015, their specific objections to video evidence of automotive crash tests that Defendant has represented it intends to offer at trial. The Defendant shall file a single document that includes Plaintiffs' objections and its responses, if any, no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 23, 2015. See document for details. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (smo)
February 18, 2015 Filing 226 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 7, 2014; 1:35 P.M. re Transcript #225 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Amber, Leandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 18, 2015 Filing 225 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 7, 2014; 1:35 P.M.. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 613-0179, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2015. (Amber, Leandra)
February 16, 2015 Filing 223 FORD'S NOTICE OF TRIAL EXHIBITS RE TESTING OF VEHICLES OTHER THAN THE 2002 FORD EXPLORER SPORT TRAC Exhibit List filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
February 16, 2015 Filing 222 Proposed Exhibit List Weaver docs,Volvo docs, filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Chase, Brian)
February 13, 2015 Filing 224 MINUTES OF Further Pretrial Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court confirms that the parties are ready to proceed to trial on February 25, 2015. Court and counsel also confer about prior motions in limine and the Court hears limited oral argument on the few remaining. Plaintiffs' counsel provides the Court with an external hard-drive. The Court orders the parties to file a list of exhibit numbers for their proposed trial exhibits. Court sets a further pretrial conference for February 18, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (smo)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court sets a further pretrial conference for February 18, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file a list of exhibit numbers for proposed trial exhibits that they intend to use intheir case in chief relating to (1) internal Ford documents (the "Weaver/Brillmeyer/Geck memoranda) and (2) the Volvo XC90 no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 16, 2015. Defendant shall file a list of exhibit numbers for proposed trial exhibits that it intends to use in its case in chief relating to testing of vehicles other than the 2002 Ford Explorer Sport Trac no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 16, 2015. IT IS SO ORDERED. (smo)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court sets a further pretrial conference for February 13, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. (smo)
January 14, 2015 Filing 219 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference before Judge John F. Walter: Settlement conference conducted. Case does not settle. Court Reporter: None. (jp)
January 8, 2015 Filing 218 SCHEDULING NOTICE - The parties are ordered to participate in mediation on January 14, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. before the Honorable John F. Walter in Courtroom 16, 312 N. Spring Street. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Counsel shall notify the Court no later than January 9, 2015, of their availability to participate in mediation with Judge John F. Walter beginning at 9:00 a.m. on any of the following dates: January 13, 2015; January 14, 2015; January 15, 2015; January 20, 2015; January 21, 2015; or January 22, 2015. The parties, including a business representative from defendant Ford Motor Company, Inc., shall be present for the mediation. Those present shall have full authority to approve any settlement. No additional mediation briefs will be required or accepted. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The parties have informed the Court that they are available to begin trial on February 25, 2015, with Plaintiffs calling their first witness on February 26, 2015. Trial is therefore continued to February 25, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
December 17, 2014 Filing 215 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court and counsel confer regarding status of the case. The Jury trial is set for February 25, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. If any issues arise regarding availability, counsel shall notify the court by December 22, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (jloz)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The parties are ordered to submit a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement no later than close of business on Monday, December 22, 2014, to the Court's courtesy box. Additionally, the parties shall meet and confer to determine whether, after selecting a jury and giving their opening statements at trial on February 25, 2015, they plan to begin calling witnesses that same day. The parties shall notify the Clerk of their decision, as well as any conflicts presented by a February 25, 2015 trial date no later than 12:00 pm on Monday, December 22, 2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
December 9, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Monday, December 8, 2014; 1:33 p.m re Transcript #211 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Amber, Leandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2014 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, December 8, 2014; 1:33 p.m. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 894-6603, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Amber, Leandra)
December 9, 2014 Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Monday, December 8, 2014; 1:33 p.m. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 894-6603, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Amber, Leandra)
December 8, 2014 Filing 214 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court and counsel confer regarding status of the case. The Jury trial set for December 9, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated. Counsel shall notify the Court by Wednesday, December 10, 2014, whether there are any issues regarding the proposed trial date. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (jloz)
December 8, 2014 Filing 209 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Allow Fresno County Coroner's Pathologist Dr. Chambliss to Testify Remotely Via Videoconference Opposition re: REQUEST for Order for to Allow Video Conference Testimony of Dr. Michael Chambliss #208 Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. in Opp. to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Decl., #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Decl., #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Decl., #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Decl.)(Rinehart, Jamie)
December 7, 2014 Filing 208 REQUEST for Order for to Allow Video Conference Testimony of Dr. Michael Chambliss filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Request set for hearing on 12/8/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay Schuttert, #2 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 5, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Witness List #205 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rne)
December 4, 2014 Filing 206 Joint PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits . (Rodman, Daniel)
December 4, 2014 Filing 205 Witness List filed by Defendant - SECOND AMENDED JOINT TRIAL WITNESS ESTIMATE FORM Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court sets a further pretrial conference for December 8, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
December 1, 2014 Filing 204 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court and counsel confer concerning status of the case. Jury trial remains set for December 9, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (jloz)
November 19, 2014 Filing 202 JOINT DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS - DESPUTED TESTIMONY WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rodman, Daniel)
November 7, 2014 Filing 201 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court and counsel confer concerning trial documents. Counsel shall submit a revised witness testimony form as stated on the record. The Court orders counsel to meet and confer regarding duration of trial and availability. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
November 6, 2014 Filing 200 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (AMENDED DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS - ANNOTATED set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
November 6, 2014 Filing 199 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS - ANNOTATED set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
November 5, 2014 Filing 198 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (AMENDED DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS - Annotated set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
October 24, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Friday, April 11, 2014; 1:31 P.M. re Transcript #196 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Amber, Leandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 24, 2014 Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Friday, April 11, 2014; 1:31 P.M.. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 894-6603, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2015. (Amber, Leandra)
July 23, 2014 Filing 195 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert R Luster counsel for Claimant Liberty Insurance Corporation. Robert B. Javan is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimant Robert B. Javan. (Luster, Robert)
July 22, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Robert R. Luster on behalf of Claimant Liberty Insurance Corporation. Filed by Claimant Liberty Insurance Corporation (Attorney Robert R Luster added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:clm))(Luster, Robert)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint submission proposing trial dates. (Docket No. 191.) The Court sets a final pretrial conference for November 7, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. Trial is hereby scheduled to commence on December 9, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. (bp)
May 15, 2014 Filing 192 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 13, 2014 Filing 191 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company JOINT RESPONSE TO COURT'S REQUEST RE TRIAL AVAILABILITY (Murphy, Jonathan)
May 6, 2014 Filing 190 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court and counsel confer concerning the status of the case. The parties shall file a joint report with a list of proposed trial dates by no later than 5/16/2014. The Court will review the proposed dates and issue an order setting the trial date. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE DR. TAMORAH HUNT IN LIEU OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT ECONOMIST DR. FORMUZIS IN THE EVENT OF UNAVAILABILITY AT TRIAL by Judge Percy Anderson: It is hereby ordered that the Joint Stipulation to Substitute Dr. Tamorah Hunt in Lieu of Plaintiffs' Expert Economist Dr. Formuzis in the Event of Unavailability at Trial #185 is GRANTED. (gk)
April 22, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE OF LODGING filed with [Proposed] Order re Stipulation for Leave #185 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Substitute Dr. Hunt in Lieu of Dr. Formuzis)(Rinehart, Jamie)
April 22, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Leave #185 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. L.R. 52-4.1 Separate Order. A separate proposed order shall be submitted with any stipulation, application, motion, or request of the parties requiring an order of the court...the proposed order shall be submitted as provided in L.R. 5-4.4. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rne)
April 21, 2014 Filing 185 STIPULATION for Leave to Substitute Dr. Hunt in Lieu of Dr. Formuzis in the Event of Unavailability at Trial filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards.(Rinehart, Jamie)
April 18, 2014 Filing 184 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards to Court's Request for Trial Availability (Rinehart, Jamie)
April 17, 2014 Filing 183 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company to Court's Request for Trial Availability (Murphy, Jonathan)
April 11, 2014 Filing 188 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Final Pretrial Conference continued to 4/25/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. The Court will rule on the remaining motions in limine at the Final Pretrial Conference. On or before April 17, 2014, counsel are to file a list of proposed trial dates. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (rne)
April 10, 2014 Filing 182 PROPOSED SECOND SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Rinehart, Jamie)
April 10, 2014 Filing 181 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Rinehart, Jamie)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The final pretrial conference set for April 4, 2014 is hereby continued to April 11, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. The parties are ordered to appear at this new date and time. (pso)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: In accordance with Plaintiffs' counsel's representation that one of their retained experts is not available on the date presently scheduled for trial of this matter, the trial is continued to May 13, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. The final pretrial conference is continued to April 4, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. (pso)
January 15, 2014 Filing 178 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company TO COURT'S REQUEST RE TRIAL AVAILABILITY (Rodman, Daniel)
January 14, 2014 Filing 177 REPORT of Regarding Status of Dr. Joseph Burton and Continued Trial Dates filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
January 10, 2014 Filing 176 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: The Court issues its tentative rulings regarding the parties' joint motions in limine. Plaintiffs' counsel shall advise the Court by no later than 12:00 noon on 1/15/2014, regarding expert witness Joseph Burton's availability for trial. Defense counsel shall also advise the Court by no later than 12:00 noon on January 15, regarding their availability for trial. The Court shall set a new trial date and other deadlines after reviewing the documents. The Court orders that the portion of the transcript that occurred outside the presence of either plaintiff or defense counsel shall be placed under seal. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
January 10, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #51 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
January 10, 2014 Filing 174 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 to Exclude DEFENDANTS REBUTTAL EXPERT DR. ELIZABETH RAPHAEL #139 to add pages inadvertently excluded from initial filing filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Smith, Kevin)
January 9, 2014 Filing 173 PROPOSED Amended Special JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
January 9, 2014 Filing 159 DEPO OF SANDY WRESTLER - LINKED TO DOC 154 - AMENDED DEPO DESIGNATIONS - DISPUTED TESTIMONY WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
January 9, 2014 Filing 158 DEPO OF LT FAE RALPH DURAN - LINKED TO DOC 154 - AMENDED DEPO DESIGNATIONS - DISPUTED TESTIMONY WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
January 9, 2014 Filing 157 DEPO OF JEFFREY CROTEAU - LINKED TO DOC 154 - AMENDED DEPO DESIGNATIONS - DISPUTED TESTIMONY WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
January 9, 2014 Filing 156 DEPO OF MICHAEL CHAMBLISS, M.D. - LINKED TO DOC 154 - AMENDED DEPO DESIGNATIONS - DISPUTED TESTIMONY WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
January 9, 2014 Filing 155 DEPO OF SGT. MICHAEL ARPAIA - LINKED TO DOC 154 - AMENDED DEPO DESIGNATIONS - DISPUTED TESTIMONY WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
January 8, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibits 37-51 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #114 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibits 34-36 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #111 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibits 29-33 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #110 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit 28 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #109 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibits 25-27 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #108 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit 24 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #107 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit 23 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #106 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit 22 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #105 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibits 14-21 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #103 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit 13 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #102 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibits 6-12 to Offer of Proof for Witness Jeffrey Croteau filed 12/18/2013 #99 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit C re Offer of Proof for Expert Steve Meyer filed 12/18/2013 #98 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 8, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit B re Offer of Proof for Expert Steve Meyer filed 12/18/2013 #97 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 7, 2014 Filing 154 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. Amendment to Witness Testimony Summaries #121 AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS - DISPUTED TESTIMONY (Smith, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 153 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS STEVE MEYER WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 152 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS DR. PETER FORMUZIS WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 151 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS JOSEPH BURTON WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 150 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN HERBST WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Smith, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 149 Witness List filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards.. (Smith, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 148 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (AMENDED DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS set) filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
January 7, 2014 Filing 147 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR EXPERT WITNESS EDDIE COOPER WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rodman, Daniel)
January 6, 2014 Filing 146 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR EXPERT WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rodman, Daniel)
January 6, 2014 Filing 145 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR REBUTTAL EXPERT WITNESS ELIZABETH RAPHAEL WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rodman, Daniel)
January 6, 2014 Filing 144 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS MICHAEL LEIGH WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rodman, Daniel)
January 6, 2014 Filing 143 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR EXPERT WITNESS DR. ROBERT PIZIALI WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rodman, Daniel)
January 6, 2014 Filing 142 AMENDED OFFER OF PROOF FOR EXPERT WITNESS STEPHEN FENTON WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 27, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE TO COURT RE: UNRESOLVED DISCOVERY ISSUES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 140 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Court and counsel discuss trial readiness. The parties are ordered to meet and confer, and schedule a further good faith settlement conference with the assigned mediator. On or before 1/7/2014, the parties shall meet and confer and file an amended proposed and disputed jury instructions, designation of deposition testimony, expert witness proffers, and summary of witness testimony and time estimates. The parties shall notify the Court by no later than 12/27/2013, regarding any unresolved discovery issues. The Court continues the Final Pretrial Conference to 1/10/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. The Court orders that the portion of the transcript that occurred outside the presence of either plaintiff or defense counsel shall be placed under seal. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (gk)
December 20, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 to Exclude DEFENDANTS REBUTTAL EXPERT DR. ELIZABETH RAPHAEL filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Smith, Kevin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE No. 5 to Exclude EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE TO COMPARISONS BETWEEN 2002 FORD EXPLORER AND THE CHEVROLET BLAZER, TOYOTA 4RUNNER, AND/OR ANY OTHER NON 2001-2005 FORD EXPLORER SPORT TRAC VEHICLE filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Smith, Kevin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 to Exclude ALL TESTING THAT WAS PERFORMED ON VEHICLES OTHER THAN 2001-2005 FORD EXPLORER SPORT TRAC, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MALIBU I&II, CRIS, SPIT, DOLLY ROLLOVER, INVERSION, INVERTED DROP (INVERTED PRODUCTION DROP; INVERTED ROLL CAGE DROP), ROLL SPIN, XC90 SPIN, MATCHED PAIR DROP, SURROGATE INVERSION, RODEO CRIS, GROUND-BASED FIXTURE CRIS, & CROWN VICTORIA TESTING filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Smith, Kevin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 to Exclude THE USE OF STATISTICAL EVIDENCE BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Smith, Kevin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 to Limit TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT DR. ROBERT PIZIALI filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Smith, Kevin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 to Preclude ALL TRADE INDUSTRY STANDARDS AND CUSTOMS INCLUDING FEDERAL MOTOR VEHICLE SAFETY STANDARDS ("FMVSS"), AND ALLEGED COMPLIANCE THEREWITH filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Smith, Kevin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Evidence of the Weaver Memo; Declarations of Daniel S. Rodman and Brian Chase filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Preclude The Use of the Consumer Expectations Test and Limit Plaintiffs to the Risk Benifit Test of Design Defect; Declrarations of Daniel S. Rodman and Brian Chase filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to the Insurance Institute of Highway Safety's Testing and Ratings; Declaration of Daniel S. Rodman filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Evidence Referring to Volvo, or Other Vehicles Including the Volvo XC90 and the Ford Explorer; Declarations of Daniel S. Rodman and Brian Chase filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the New FMVSS 216 and 226 Standards and the Notice of Proposed Rulemaking to FMVSS 216 and 226; Declaration of Daniel S. Rodman filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF VEHICLE DROP TESTS AND DECLARATIONS OF DANIEL RODMAN AND BRIAN CHASE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 20, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reference to Seat Belt System Defects and/or Alternative Restraint Systems; Declaration of Daniel S. Rodman in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Any Evidence and Prevent Any Mention of Handling and Stability Defects and Characteristics; Declarations of Daniel S. Rodman and Richard G. Barone filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF OTHER ACCIDENTS, INCIDENTS, COMPLAINTS, OR LAWSUITS; DECLARATIONS OF DANIEL RODMAN AND BRIAN CHASE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 20, 2013 Filing 124 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards.. (Chase, Brian)
December 20, 2013 Filing 123 STATEMENT JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE (Rodman, Daniel)
December 20, 2013 Filing 122 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
December 19, 2013 Filing 121 Joint WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 19, 2013 Filing 120 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52 Pages 1-32, #2 Exhibit 52 Pages 33-65, #3 Exhibit 52 Pages 66-98, #4 Exhibit 52 Pages 99-131, #5 Exhibit 52 Pages132-164, #6 Exhibit 52 Pages 165-197, #7 Exhibit 52 Pages 198-230, #8 Exhibit 52 Pages 231 - 263, #9 Exhibit 52 Pages 264 - 296, #10 Exhibit 52 Pages 297 -329, #11 Exhibit 52 Pages 330 -362, #12 Exhibit 52 Pages 363 - 395, #13 Exhibit 52 Pages 396 - 428, #14 Exhibit 52 Pages 429 - 461, #15 Exhibit 52 Pages 462 - 494, #16 Exhibit 52 Pages 495 - 527, #17 Exhibit 52 Pages 528 -560, #18 Exhibit 52 Pages 561 - 593, #19 Exhibit 52 Pages 594 - 626, #20 Exhibit 52 Pages 627 - 659, #21 Exhibit 52 Pages 660 - 692, #22 Exhibit 52 Pages 693 - 725, #23 Exhibit 52 Pages 726 - 758, #24 Exhibit 52 Pages 759 - 791, #25 Exhibit 52 Pages 792 - 824, #26 Exhibit 52 Pages 825 - 854, #27 Exhibit 53, #28 Exhibit 54)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 19, 2013 Filing 119 Deposition Designations - Disputed Testimony filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 118 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 53, #2 Exhibit 54)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 117 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 82, #2 Exhibit 83, #3 Exhibit 84, #4 Exhibit 85, #5 Exhibit 86, #6 Exhibit 87, #7 Exhibit 88, #8 Exhibit 89, #9 Exhibit 90)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 116 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81 Pages 1-40, #2 Exhibit 81 Pages 41-80, #3 Exhibit 81 Pages 81-120, #4 Exhibit 81 Pages 121-161, #5 Exhibit 81 Pages 162-202, #6 Exhibit 81 Pages 203-243, #7 Exhibit 81 Pages 244-284, #8 Exhibit 81 Pages 285-325, #9 Exhibit 81 Pages 326-366, #10 Exhibit 81 Pages 367-407, #11 Exhibit 81 Pages 408-448, #12 Exhibit 81 Pages 449-489, #13 Exhibit 81 Pages 490 - 530, #14 Exhibit 81 Pages 531-571, #15 Exhibit 81 Pages 572-612, #16 Exhibit 81 Pages 613-653, #17 Exhibit 81 Pages 653 - 693, #18 Exhibit 81 Pages 694-733, #19 Exhibit 81 Pages 744-784, #20 Exhibit 81 Pages 744-825, #21 Exhibit 81 Pages 826 - 846)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 115 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 59 Pages 1-43, #2 Exhibit 59 Pages 44-87, #3 Exhibit 59 Pages 88-131, #4 Exhibit 59 Pages 132-171, #5 Exhibit 60, #6 Exhibit 61, #7 Exhibit 62, #8 Exhibit 63, #9 Exhibit 64, #10 Exhibit 65, #11 Exhibit 66, #12 Exhibit 67, #13 Exhibit 68, #14 Exhibit 69, #15 Exhibit 70, #16 Exhibit 71, #17 Exhibit 72, #18 Exhibit 73 Pages 1 - 37, #19 Exhibit 73 Pages 38 - 73, #20 Exhibit 74, #21 Exhibit 75, #22 Exhibit 76, #23 Exhibit 77 Pages 1-200, #24 Exhibit 77 Pages 201-408, #25 Exhibit 78, #26 Exhibit 79, #27 Exhibit 80)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 114 Exh 37-51 to OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 38, #4 Exhibit 38, #5 Exhibit 38, #6 Exhibit 39, #7 Exhibit 40, #8 Exhibit 41, #9 Exhibit 42, #10 Exhibit 43, #11 Exhibit 44, #12 Exhibit 45, #13 Exhibit 46, #14 Exhibit 47, #15 Exhibit 48, #16 Exhibit 49, #17 Exhibit 50, #18 Exhibit 51)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 113 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32 Pages 1-70, #2 Exhibit 32 Pages 71-140, #3 Exhibit 33 Pages 1-64, #4 Exhibit 33 Pages 65-129, #5 Exhibit 33 Pages 130-194, #6 Exhibit 33 Pages 195-254, #7 Exhibit 34, #8 Exhibit 35, #9 Exhibit 36, #10 Exhibit 37, #11 Exhibit 38, #12 Exhibit 39, #13 Exhibit 40, #14 Exhibit 41, #15 Exhibit 42, #16 Exhibit 43, #17 Exhibit 44, #18 Exhibit 45, #19 Exhibit 46, #20 Exhibit 47, #21 Exhibit 48, #22 Exhibit 49, #23 Exhibit 50, #24 Exhibit 51, #25 Exhibit 52, #26 Exhibit 53, #27 Exhibit 54, #28 Exhibit 55, #29 Exhibit 56, #30 Exhibit 57, #31 Exhibit 58)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 112 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Pages 1-5, #3 Exhibit 2 Pages 6-10, #4 Exhibit 2 Pages 11-17, #5 Exhibit 3 Pages 1-33, #6 Exhibit 3 Pages 33-66, #7 Exhibit 3 Pages 67-100, #8 Exhibit 4 Pages 1-33, #9 Exhibit 4 Pages 34-66, #10 Exhibit 4 Pages 67-100, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10 Pages 1-22, #17 Exhibit 10 Pages 23-45, #18 Exhibit 10 Pages 46-68, #19 Exhibit 10 Pages 69-91, #20 Exhibit 10 Pages 92-114, #21 Exhibit 10 Pages 115-137, #22 Exhibit 10 Pages 138-160, #23 Exhibit 10 Pages 161-183, #24 Exhibit 10 Pages 184-206, #25 Exhibit 10 Pages 207-219, #26 Exhibit 11, #27 Exhibit 12, #28 Exhibit 13, #29 Exhibit 14, #30 Exhibit 15, #31 Exhibit 16, #32 Exhibit 17, #33 Exhibit 18, #34 Exhibit 19, #35 Exhibit 20, #36 Exhibit 21, #37 Exhibit 22, #38 Exhibit 23, #39 Exhibit 24, #40 Exhibit 25 Pages 1- 30, #41 Exhibit 25 Pages 31-60, #42 Exhibit 25 Pages 61-90, #43 Exhibit 25 Pages 91-121, #44 Exhibit 25 Pages 122-152, #45 Exhibit 25 Pages 153-183, #46 Exhibit 25 Pages 184-214, #47 Exhibit 25 Pages 215-245, #48 Exhibit 25 Pages 246-276, #49 Exhibit 25 Pages 277-304, #50 Exhibit 26 Pages 1-25, #51 Exhibit 26 Pages 27-30, #52 Exhibit 26 Pages 30-60, #53 Exhibit 26 Pages 61-90, #54 Exhibit 26 Pages 91-121, #55 Exhibit 26 Pages 122-152, #56 Exhibit 26 Pages 153-182, #57 Exhibit 26 Pages 183-213, #58 Exhibit 26 Pages 214-244, #59 Exhibit 26 Pages 245 - 251, #60 Exhibit 27 Pages 1-27, #61 Exhibit 27 Pages 28-55, #62 Exhibit 27 Pages 56-83, #63 Exhibit 27 Pages 84-111, #64 Exhibit 27 Pages 112-139, #65 Exhibit 27 Pages 140-167, #66 Exhibit 27 Pages 168-187, #67 Exhibit 28 Pages 1-33, #68 Exhibit 28 Pages 34-67, #69 Exhibit 28 Pages 68-101, #70 Exhibit 28 Pages 102-135, #71 Exhibit 28 Pages136-169, #72 Exhibit 28 Pages 170 - 203, #73 Exhibit 28 Pages 204-228, #74 Exhibit 29 Pages 1-33, #75 Exhibit 29 Pages 34-67, #76 Exhibit 29 Pages 68-101, #77 Exhibit 29 Pages 102-134, #78 Exhibit 29 Pages 135-168, #79 Exhibit 29 Pages 169-201, #80 Exhibit 30 Pages 1-50, #81 Exhibit 30 Pages 51-100, #82 Exhibit 30 Pages 101-150, #83 Exhibit 30 Pages 151-200, #84 Exhibit 30 Pages 201-254, #85 Exhibit 31 Pages 1-50, #86 Exhibit 31 Pages 51-100, #87 Exhibit 31 Pages 101-150, #88 Exhibit 31 Pages 151-200, #89 Exhibit 31 Pages Pages 201-249)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 111 Exh 34, 35, 36 to OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35, #2 Exhibit 35, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 35, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit 36, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 36, #12 Exhibit 36)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 110 Exh 29, 30, 31, 32, 33 to OFFER OF PROOF TO WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 30 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 32 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 32 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 32 Part 3, #7 Exhibit 32 Part 4, #8 Exhibit 32 Part 5, #9 Exhibit 33 Part 1, #10 Exhibit 33 Part 2, #11 Exhibit 33 Part 3, #12 Exhibit 33 Part 4, #13 Exhibit 33 Part 5, #14 Exhibit 33 Part 6)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 109 Exh 28 to OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28 Part 2, #2 Exhibit 28 Part 3, #3 Exhibit 28 Part 4, #4 Exhibit 28 Part 5, #5 Exhibit 28 Part 5, #6 Exhibit 28 Part 6, #7 Exhibit 28 Part 7, #8 Exhibit 28 Part 8, #9 Exhibit 28 Part 9, #10 Exhibit 28 Part 10, #11 Exhibit 28 Part 11)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 108 Exh 25, 26, 27 to OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 27 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 27 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 27 Part 4, #6 Exhibit 27 Part 5, #7 Exhibit 27 Part 6, #8 Exhibit 27 Part 7)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 107 Exh 24 to OFFER OF PROOF OF WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24 Part 2, #2 Exhibit 24 Part 3, #3 Exhibit 24 Part 4a, #4 Exhibit 24 Part 4b, #5 Exhibit 24 Part 5, #6 Exhibit 24 Part 6, #7 Exhibit 24 Part 7, #8 Exhibit 24 Part 8, #9 Exhibit 24 Part 9, #10 Exhibit 24 Part 10, #11 Exhibit 24 Part 11)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 106 Exh 23 to OFFER OF PROOF TO WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23 Part 2, #2 Exhibit 23 Part 3, #3 Exhibit 23 Part 4, #4 Exhibit 23 Part 5, #5 Exhibit 23 Part 6, #6 Exhibit 23 Part 7, #7 Exhibit 23 Part 8, #8 Exhibit 23 Part 9)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 105 Exh 22 to OFFER OF PROOF TO WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22 Part 2, #2 Exhibit 22 Part 3a, #3 Exhibit 22 Part 3b, #4 Exhibit 22 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 22 Part 5, #6 Exhibit 22 Part 6, #7 Exhibit 22 Part 7, #8 Exhibit 22 Part 8)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment filed by Edwards Lupi Edwards. Offer of Proof (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 103 Exh 14-21 to OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 15 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 21)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 102 Exh 13 to OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 Part 2, #2 Exhibit 13 Part 3, #3 Exhibit 13 Part 4, #4 Exhibit 13 Part 5, #5 Exhibit 13 Part 6, #6 Exhibit 13 Part 7, #7 Exhibit 13 Part 8, #8 Exhibit 13 Part 9)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 100 OFFER OF PROOF FOR PLAINTIFFS' WITNESSES (Exh A-B) WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A-9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A-10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A-11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit A-12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Smith, Kevin)
December 18, 2013 Filing 99 Exh 6-12 to OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 10 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 12)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 98 WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 97 WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 96 WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 95 OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS PETER FORMUZIS (Exh A-F) WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Smith, Kevin)
December 18, 2013 Filing 94 WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 93 WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 92 WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 91 WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Chase, Brian)
December 18, 2013 Filing 90 OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS MICHAEL LEIGH (Exh A-B) WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Smith, Kevin)
December 18, 2013 Filing 89 OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS MICHAEL CHAMBLISS (Exh A-D) WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Smith, Kevin)
December 18, 2013 Filing 88 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 87 Witness List filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Fenton, #2 Exhibit B Piziali, #3 Exhibit C Tandy, #4 Exhibit D Croteau, #5 Exhibit E Cooper, #6 Exhibit F Raphael, #7 Exhibit G Leigh)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 86 OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS JEFFREY CROTEAU (Exh 1-5) WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 5 Part 3, #10 Exhibit 5 Part 4, #11 Exhibit 5 Part 5, #12 Exhibit 5 Part 6, #13 Exhibit 5 Part 7, #14 Exhibit 5 Part 8, #15 Exhibit 5 Part 9, #16 Exhibit 5 Part 10, #17 Exhibit 5 Part 11, #18 Exhibit 5 Part 12, #19 Exhibit 5 Part 13)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 85 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Pages 1-5, #2 Exhibit 1 Pages 6-10, #3 Exhibit 1 Pages 11-15, #4 Exhibit 1 Pages 16-17, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7 Pages 1-22, #11 Exhibit 7 Pages 22-32, #12 Exhibit 7 Pages 33-44, #13 Exhibit 7 Pages 45-67, #14 Exhibit 7 Pages 68-90, #15 Exhibit 7 Pages 91-113, #16 Exhibit 7 Pages 114-136, #17 Exhibit 7 Pages 137-159, #18 Exhibit 7 Pages 160-182, #19 Exhibit 7 Pages 183-205, #20 Exhibit 7 Pages 206-228, #21 Exhibit 7 Pages 229-251, #22 Exhibit 7 Pages 252-274, #23 Exhibit 7 Pages 275-297, #24 Exhibit 7 Pages 298-320, #25 Exhibit 7 Pages 321-343, #26 Exhibit 7 Pages 344-366, #27 Exhibit 7 Pages 367-389, #28 Exhibit 7 Pages 390-412, #29 Exhibit 7 Pages 413-435, #30 Exhibit 7 Pages 436-446, #31 Exhibit 7 Pages 447-453, #32 Exhibit 7 Pages 454-458, #33 Exhibit 7 Pages 459-481, #34 Exhibit 7 Pages 482-504, #35 Exhibit 7 Pages 505-527, #36 Exhibit 7 Pages 528-550, #37 Exhibit 7 Pages 551-573, #38 Exhibit 7 Pages 574-581, #39 Exhibit 8, #40 Exhibit 9, #41 Exhibit 10, #42 Exhibit 11 Pages 1-50, #43 Exhibit 11 Pages 51-100, #44 Exhibit 11 Pages 101-150, #45 Exhibit 11 Pages 151-200, #46 Exhibit 11 Pages 201-250, #47 Exhibit 11 Pages 251-300, #48 Exhibit 11 Pages 301-350, #49 Exhibit 11 Pages 351 - 400, #50 Exhibit 11 Pages 401-443, #51 Exhibit 12 Pages 1-21, #52 Exhibit 12 Pages 22-43, #53 Exhibit 12 Pages 44-62, #54 Exhibit 13 Page 1, #55 Exhibit 13 Page 2, #56 Exhibit 14, #57 Exhibit 15, #58 Exhibit 16, #59 Exhibit 17, #60 Exhibit 18 Pages 1-15, #61 Exhibit 18 Pages 16-31, #62 Exhibit 18 Pages 32-47, #63 Exhibit 18 Pages 48-63, #64 Exhibit 18 Pages 64-74, #65 Exhibit 19)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 84 OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS MICHAEL LEIGH WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 2 Part 3, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 4 Part 3, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 83 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Pages 1-6, #3 Exhibit 2 Pages 6-10, #4 Exhibit 2 Pages 11-17, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 Pages 1-7, #8 Exhibit 5 Pages 8-14, #9 Exhibit 5 Pages 15-21, #10 Exhibit 5 Pages 22-28, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18 Pages 1-4, #24 Exhibit 18 Pages 5-7, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23 Pages 1-19, #30 Exhibit 23 Pages 20-39, #31 Exhibit 23 Pages 40-56)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 82 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 81 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 80 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 79 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 78 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 Pages 1-50, #2 Exhibit 11 Pages 51-100, #3 Exhibit 11 Pages 101-124)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 77 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 76 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 75 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 74 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Pages 1-50, #2 Exhibit 7 - Pages 51-100, #3 Exhibit 7 - Pages 101 - 150, #4 Exhibit 7 - Pages 151-200, #5 Exhibit 7 - Pages 201 - 229)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 73 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 72 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 71 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 70 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 69 Amended WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 18, 2013 Filing 68 OFFER OF PROOF FOR DR. MICHAEL CHAMBLISS WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 67 OFFER OF PROOF FOR SGT. MICHAEL ARPAIA WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 4- Part 2 of 2)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 66 OFFER OF PROOF FOR OFFICER SHANNON STIERS WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 4 - Par 2 of 2)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 65 OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS GAIL STILES WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 64 OFFER OF PROOF FOR FIREFIGHTER EMILIO VALENCIA WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 2)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 63 OFFER OF PROOF FOR WITNESS SHARON FINE WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 18, 2013 Filing 62 OFFER OF PROOF FOR LT. RALPH DURAN WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by DEFENDANT Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit 2)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 16, 2013 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard G Barone counsel for Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. Adding Jamie K. Rinehart as attorney as counsel of record for Lupi Edwards for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Barone, Richard)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: If a party desires to offer deposition testimony into evidence at trial in its case-in-chief, on or before 12/16/2013, it shall designate only those relevant portions of the testimony it wishes to offer at trial and advise opposing counsel and the Court whether the testimony shall be read, played on videotape or on a computer, or submitted. All objections and responses to any such testimony shall be made in writing and filed on 12/18/2013, so the Court may consider whether ruling on such objections prior to trial or will either facilitate the conduct of the trial or result in the disposition of certain evidentiary matters. On or before 12/18/2013, the parties shall electronically exchange counter-designations of deposition testimony. Objections to counter-designations are to be filed on or before 12:00 PM on 12/19/2013. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: In the proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order filed on 12/6/2013, plaintiffs Lupi Edwards and Ruby Sera Aunei identified the claims that will be presented at trial, and defendant Ford Motor Company, Inc. identified the counterclaim/affirmative defense it intends to pursue at trial. To assist the Court in preparing for trial, the Court orders the parties to file, by 5:00 PM on 12/18/2013, Offers of Proof for each witness who will offer testimony in support of the parties' respective cases-in-chief. The parties are advised that the trial testimony of their witnesses will be limited to testimony proffered in the Offers of Proof. To the extent that a party decides to abandon any claim or defense, that party shall, by 5:00 PM on 12/18/2013, file a Notice with the Court identifying the claim or defense that will not be pursued at trial. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: To assist the Court in performing its gatekeeper function under Daubert, any party seeking to offer expert testimony in its case-in-chief, shall file a written proffer of the expert's opinions, with citations to the expert witness disclosure for each such opinion. The written proffer shall be filed no later than 5:00 PM on 12/18/2013. In addition to the proffer, the parties shall file, by 5:00 PM on 12/18/2013, the curriculum vitae of each expert witness, the expert designation identifying the expert, and a copy of any written report prepared by the expert and disclosed to the other party. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 6, 2013 Filing 57 OBJECTIONS and Designations of Deposition Testimony (Joint) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Murphy, Jonathan)
December 6, 2013 Filing 56 PROPOSED Special JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
December 6, 2013 Filing 55 Joint PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits 1-1502. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Joint Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation)(Rodman, Daniel)
December 6, 2013 Filing 54 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
December 6, 2013 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Murphy, Jonathan)
December 6, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Smith, Kevin)
December 6, 2013 Filing 51 Joint Trial Witness Estimate filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards (Smith, Kevin)
December 6, 2013 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
December 6, 2013 Filing 49 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Disputed set) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
December 6, 2013 Filing 48 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Rodman, Daniel)
December 6, 2013 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Because Plaintiffs did not show that they acted diligently, the Court finds that Plaintiffs failed to satisfy Rule 16(b)s good cause standard. Accordingly, the Court denies Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Relief from the Court Ordered Discovery Motion Cut-Off Deadline #41 . Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #44 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jay Schuttert on behalf of Defendant, designating Daniel S. Rodman as local counsel. (lt)
November 21, 2013 Filing 44 APPLICATION for attorney Jay J. Schuttert to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13018517 paid.) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice)(Rodman, Daniel)
November 20, 2013 Filing 43 REPLY Reply First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Court Ordered Discovery Motion Cut-Off Date #41 filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin P. Smith)(Smith, Kevin)
November 20, 2013 Filing 42 OPPOSITION FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM THE COURT ORDERED DISCOVERY MOTION DEADLINE OF NOVEMBER 12, 2013; DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. RODMAN filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rodman, Daniel)
November 19, 2013 Filing 41 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Court Ordered Discovery Motion Cut-Off Date filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin P. Smith, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
November 14, 2013 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard G Barone counsel for Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. Adding Brian D. Chase as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. (Barone, Richard)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING ACCESS TO WWW.FORDDOCS.COM by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation for Discovery #31 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Confidentiality Order entered in In re Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc. ATX, ATXII, and Wilderness Tires Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 373, shall govern Plaintiff's access to "Confidential Materials" furnished by Ford in connection with MDL No. 373. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mp)
October 28, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Notice filed 10/11/2013 #29 . The following error(s) was found: The docket entry reflects that this filing was made on behalf of R.S.A. Counsel for Lien Claimant Liberty Insurance Corporation should have filed this document in the traditional manner pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.2. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 21, 2013 Filing 37 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for To File Under Seal filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
October 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Percy Anderson, ORDERING Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal 2nd Amended Petition for Order Granting Resignation and Application of Guardian Ad Litem; Declaration of Kevin P. Smith, [Proposed] Order submitted by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards received on 10/18/13 is not to be filed but instead REJECTED. Denial based on: The Court is participating in the Central District of California's Pilot Project for the Electronic Submission and Filing of Under Seal Documents. Counsel is directed to the Court's Text Only Docket Entry on 7/15/13 (Docket No.18) regarding the submission of under seal documents. (pso)
October 18, 2013 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel S Rodman counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
October 18, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Errata to EFC Document Number 33 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed in Error/Blank Document (Rodman, Daniel)
October 18, 2013 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel S Rodman counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Rodman, Daniel)
October 17, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
October 16, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Access to www.Forddocs.com filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Jonathan)
October 15, 2013 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Joseph Gibson counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Robert J. Gibson is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Gibson, Robert)
October 11, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE Notice of Lien filed by Lien Claimant R. S. A.. (Javan, Robert)
October 1, 2013 Filing 28 DENIED BY ORDER of Judge Percy Anderson, re Joint Motion for Continuance of Trial and Related Deadlines, or in the Alternative for Continuance of Expert Disclosure Deadlines #21 . (gk)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has before it Plaintiffs' ex parte application to file under seal an amended petition for resignation and application of guardian ad litem. To the extent plaintiffs seek to file the application under seal #25 that request is granted. The petition for the resignation and appointment for a new guardian is denied. According to the application, the prospective guardian has a business relationship with counsel for plaintiffs. To avoid the any appearance of a conflict of interest, the application is denied. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiffs to submit an application to have Lupi Edwards resign as guardian ad litem and to have an independent guardian ad litem, to be selected by counsel, appointed in her place. The application is to be filed no later than 10/21/2013. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
October 1, 2013 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Kevin P. Smith in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal Amended Petition for Order Granting Resignation and Application of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff, R.S.A., a minor. (gk)
October 1, 2013 Filing 25 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Under Seal Amended Petition for Order Granting Resignation and Application of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff, R.S.A., a minor; Declaration of Kevin P. Smith; Amended Petition filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (gk)
August 28, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING filed by Plaintiff R. S. A., Lupi Edwards. (Smith, Kevin)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is a Petition for Order Granting Resignation and Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff R.S.A., a Minor (the Petition). [Docket No. 22.] In violation of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3), the Petition fails to identify R.S.A., a person known to be a minor, only by her initials. Accordingly, the Court orders the Petition stricken, and Plaintiffs are ordered to submit a second petition that complies with Rule 5.2(a)(3). Further, the Court orders Plaintiffs to submit a separate application to place the Petition (Docket No. 22) under seal. #22 . (pso)
August 16, 2013 Filing 22 First APPLICATION for Appointment of Anthony Stuart as Guardian ad Litem for RSA filed by Plaintiff Lupi Edwards. Application set for hearing on 8/16/2013 at 05:00 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Barone, Richard) Modified on 8/20/2013 (pso). ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER OF THE COURT***
August 9, 2013 Filing 21 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial from 1/21/2014 to 3/21/2014 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Jonathan)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On 3/11/2013, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to show cause as to why no conflict of interest exists between plaintiff Lupi Edwards and her niece, minor plaintiff R.S.A., on whose behalf she also brings the case #14 . In the present circumstances, the Court's concern over the potential conflict of interest has not been allayed by Plaintiffs' response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiffs to submit, no later than 8/16/2013, an application to have Lupi Edwards resign as guardian ad litem and to have an independent guardian ad litem, to be selected by counsel, appointed in her place. Plaintiffs may, for example, select a guardian ad litem from the Probate Volunteer Panel of the Los Angeles Superior Court. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 19, 2013 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Janine A Schwerter counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Janine A. Schwerter is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, Inc.. (Schwerter, Janine)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: Under Seal Pilot Program by Judge Percy Anderson: Judge Anderson is participating in the Central District of California's Pilot Project for the Electronic Submission and Filing of Under Seal Documents. The Pilot Project applies to both civil and criminal cases. Parties shall make every effort to limit the number and volume of under seal filings. In most circumstances, parties should seek to file under seal only the specific exhibits or documents for which there is a valid basis for filing under seal. When seeking the Court's approval for an under seal filing, the submitting party shall electronically file an Ex Parte Application to Seal and proposed Order through the Courts CM/ECF System pursuant to Local Rule 5-4. The Ex Parte Application and proposed Order shall not contain the information the party seeks to file under seal. The party seeking permission to file under seal shall submit to the Court's generic chambers e-mail address (pa_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov) PDF versions of the Ex Parte Application, proposed Order, Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application stating the reason for the under seal filing, and the document(s) and/or exhibit(s) the party seeks to file under seal. The party shall also submit a Word or WordPerfect version of the proposed Order to the generic chambers e-mail address. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the submitting party shall deliver a Mandatory Chambers Copy of the Ex Parte Application, proposed Order, Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application, and the document(s) and/or exhibit(s) the party seeks to file under seal to the Court's courtesy copy box located outside chambers no later than 12:00 p.m. on the following business day. The Pilot Project for the Electronic Submission and filing of Under Seal Documents does not apply to in camera submissions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(pso) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO STIPULATED SHARING AND NON-SHARING PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon the Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order #13 , the Court hereby orders that the provisions of the Protective Order will govern the discovery of Protected Documents in this action. The Stipulation for Protective Order, which was lodged on 3/5/2013, is deemed entered by this Court. (gk)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order to Show Cause Re: Lupi Edwards as Guardian Ad Litem for Ruby Sera Aunei filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin P. Smith)(Smith, Kevin)
March 25, 2013 Filing 15 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company(Schwerter, Janine)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson.Prior to the removal of this wrongful death action to this Court, plaintiff Lupi Edwards was appointed guardian ad litem of her minor son, plaintiff R.S.A. The Court, however, is concerned that a conflict of interest may exist between plaintiff Lupi Edwards and plaintiff R.S.A. Case law teaches that, where the guardian and the child are potential claimants to the same settlement fund, the parents interest are potentially in conflict with the childs. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause, in writing no later than March 25, 2013, either why no conflict exists in this case or why the Court should permit the current guardian ad litem to continue in that capacity despite the existence of the conflict. Plaintiffs may also select an appropriate party to act as guardian ad litem for R.S.A., for example from the Probate Volunteer Panel of the Los Angeles Superior Court. (pso)
March 5, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order)(Schwerter, Janine)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of November 11, 2013; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of November 18, 2013; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for December 20, 2013, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of January 21, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. Refer to document for details of the Court's order. (pso)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to document for details of the Court's order. (pso)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to the Courts attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for Monday, February 25, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar.Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2013 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. (pso)
February 11, 2013 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Schwerter, Janine)
January 4, 2013 Filing 8 PLANITIFFS' DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs R. S. A., Lupi Edwards (Smith, Kevin)
December 28, 2012 Filing 7 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson: Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2013 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Counsel shall meet at least 21 days in advance of the Scheduling Conference to prepare a jointly signed report for the court to be submitted no less than 14 days before the Scheduling Conference. (gk)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. All counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. See document for further details. (gk)
December 27, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(esa)
December 27, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. Related Case(s): NONE (esa) (mg).
December 27, 2012 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company NA for Ford Motor Company. (esa) (mg).
December 27, 2012 Filing 2 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (esa) (mg).
December 27, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of CA, Los Angeles County, case number BC492573 with conformed copies of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson, discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendant Ford Motor Company.(esa) (mg).
December 27, 2012 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, #1 filed by defendant Ford Motor Company.(esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupi Edwards et al v. Ford Motor Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. S. A.
Represented By: Richard G Barone
Represented By: Jamie Kristine Rinehart
Represented By: Kevin P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupi Edwards
Represented By: Richard G Barone
Represented By: Jamie Kristine Rinehart
Represented By: Kevin P Smith
Represented By: Brian D Chase
Represented By: David A Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 200 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jonathan Raymond Murphy
Represented By: Daniel S Rodman
Represented By: Janine A Schwerter
Represented By: Jay J Schuttert
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Robert B Javan
Represented By: Robert R Luster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?