Noemi Garibaldi v. Compass Group USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Noemi Garibaldi
Defendant: Eurest Services Inc, Jeanette Choate, Compass Group USA Inc, Compass Group USA Investments Inc, Compass One LLC and Does
Case Number: 2:2013cv00011
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S. Fischer
Presiding Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 38 Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Stipulation for Protective Order 30 ; NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. See order for details. (jy)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dale S. Fischer re failure to appear for Order to Show Cause Hearing. See Minute Order for specifics. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/3/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/22/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/15/2013. The hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rne)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noemi Garibaldi v. Compass Group USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurest Services Inc
Represented By: Lindsey M Stevens
Represented By: Adam Ryan Rosenthal
Represented By: Nancy E Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA Inc
Represented By: Lindsey M Stevens
Represented By: Adam Ryan Rosenthal
Represented By: Nancy E Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA Investments Inc
Represented By: Lindsey M Stevens
Represented By: Adam Ryan Rosenthal
Represented By: Nancy E Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass One LLC
Represented By: Lindsey M Stevens
Represented By: Adam Ryan Rosenthal
Represented By: Nancy E Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi Garibaldi
Represented By: Matthew John Matern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?