Progressive Produce Corporation v. Wild West Produce LLC et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Produce Corporation
Defendant: Wild West Produce LLC, Mario G Luera and Amy Luera
Case Number: 2:2013cv00665
Filed: January 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Re: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 15 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Cour t, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff (s) to show cause in writing no later than April 24, 2013, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Defendants' Answer to Complaint or Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default on defendants. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause why this case is within the Court's jurisdiction. Plaintiff has no later than March 4, 2013, to respond, demonstrating why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (jre)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Produce Corporation v. Wild West Produce LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild West Produce LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario G Luera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Luera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Produce Corporation
Represented By: R Jason Read
Represented By: Elise Charlotte O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?