Oko International Co v. Google Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Oko International Co
Defendant: Google Inc and Modify Industries Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv02017
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M. Gee
Presiding Judge: Margaret A. Nagle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2013 Filing 22 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation for Dismissal) (gk)
September 18, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a) filed by Plaintiff Oko International Co.(Kroll, Howard)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation 19 , the Scheduling Conference is continued to 10/18/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
August 23, 2013 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 8/30/13 to 10/18/13 Re: Order, Set/Reset Hearing,, 18 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret)
July 8, 2013 Filing 18 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Counsel shall meet at least 21 days in advance of the Scheduling Conference to prepare a jointly signed report for the court to be submitted no less than 14 days before the Scheduling Conference. (gk)
June 28, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Google Inc.(Caruso, Margret)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING FOURTH EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee 15 . The deadline for Defendant Google Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended to June 28, 2013. THERE SHALL BE NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR CONTINUANCE. (im)
June 3, 2013 Filing 15 Fourth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 28, 2013 re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee 13 . The deadline for Defendant Google Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended from May 10, 2013 to June 7, 2013. In the future, the parties should avoid submitting requests for continuance lessthan five court days prior to the expiration of the scheduled date. SEE ORDER. (im)
May 10, 2013 Filing 13 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 7, 2013 re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by Defendant Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret)
April 30, 2013 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Google Inc answer now due 5/10/2013, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 10 , Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by Defendant Google Inc.(Caruso, Margret)
April 8, 2013 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Google Inc, identifying Google Inc.. (Caruso, Margret)
April 8, 2013 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Google Inc answer now due 5/3/2013, filed by Defendant Google Inc.(Caruso, Margret)
March 28, 2013 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oko International Co, upon Defendant Modify Industries Inc served on 3/22/2013, answer due 4/12/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michele Mitchell, Person In Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kroll, Howard)
March 28, 2013 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oko International Co, upon Defendant Google Inc served on 3/22/2013, answer due 4/12/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anna Rasmussen, Legal Dept./Agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kroll, Howard)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (im)
March 20, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 20, 2013 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Oko International Co. (et)
March 20, 2013 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Oko International Co. (et) (mg).
March 20, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Oko International Co. Related Case(s): Not Indicated. (et) (mg).
March 20, 2013 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Oko International Co. (et) (mg).
March 20, 2013 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Google Inc, Modify Industries Inc. (et)
March 20, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Google Inc, Modify Industries Inc. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Oko International Co. (et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oko International Co v. Google Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Margret M Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modify Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oko International Co
Represented By: David William Klinger
Represented By: Howard A Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?