Beverly Gooch v. American Eagle Airlines Inc et al

Defendant: American Eagle Airlines Inc and Does
Plaintiff: Beverly Gooch
Case Number: 2:2013cv02272
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Victor B. Kenton
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED AS FOLLOWS: Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant American Eagle Airlines, Inc. and against Plaintiff Beverly Gooch. Plaintiff shall take nothing as a result of her claims for relief, all of Plaintiff's claims for relief shall be dismissed with prejudice, and Defendant shall recover its costs. (gk)
February 10, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 92 as to all of plaintiff's claims. Because the Court grants American Eagle's motion for summary judgment as to all of plain tiff's claims it does not reach American Eagle's additional request for summary judgment as to whether plaintiff may recover punitive damages. In addition, on 1/26/2016, plaintiff's counsel filed a motion to withdraw as her attorney 109 . However, in light of this order, the Court DECLINES TO REACH this motion. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
September 9, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Re Stipulation for Protective Order 88 . (ib)
October 6, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiff will suffer no prejudice if she is required to proceed on the Third Amended Complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Strike the Fourth Amended Complaint 66 . Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
March 6, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby RESERVES judgment on defendant's instant motion to dismiss 23 (treated herein as a motion for summary judgment) and defendant's motion to strike 21 . Plaintiff shall ha ve leave to file a supplemental brief on or before 3/24/2014 setting forth additional arguments and/or evidence as to whether she received proper notice of the bar date. Defendant shall have leave to respond on or before 3/31/2014. The parties' briefs, if any, including exhibits and attachments. The Court CONTINUES the hearing on defendant's motions until 4/7/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. At that time, the Court will also hear argument as to whether plaintiff should be granted leave to amend the FAC to allege conduct that occurred after the 10/21/2013 confirmation of the reorganization plan. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverly Gooch v. American Eagle Airlines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Eagle Airlines Inc
Represented By: Robert J Hendricks
Represented By: Larry M Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?