Max Kleven et al v. Daphne Hereford et al

Defendant: Belleair Trading International LLC, Does, Daphne Hereford and Rin Tin Tin Inc
Plaintiff: Max Kleven and RIN Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv02783
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Audrey B. Collins
Referring Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2016 271 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS DAPHNE HEREFORD AND RIN TIN TIN, INC. by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Plaintiff Rin, Inc. ("Rin") and Plaintiff-in-Intervention Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.'s ("Shamrock") Motion for Entry of Defa ult Judgment against Defendants Rin Tin Tin, Inc. ("RTTI") and Daphne Hereford 243 , the Court hereby ORDERS, ADJUDGES, AND DECLARES AS FOLLOWS: Hereford and RTTI's Counter-Claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED AND ADJUDGED that Hereford and RTTI, and each of them and their respective officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Judgment by personal serv ice or otherwise are permanently enjoined re name, mark, character or phrase "Rin Tin Tin," etc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Shamrock and Rin, on the one hand, and Hereford and RTTI, on the other hand, shall each bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. See document for further details. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (gk)
December 7, 2015 232 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT BELLEAIR TRADING INTERNATIONAL, LLC ON CLAIMS BROUGHT BY PLAINTIFF RIN, INC. AND PLAINTIFF-IN-INTERVENTION SHAMROCK ENTERTAINMENT, LTD. by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the United States Pat ent and Trademark Office is directed to cancel the Rin Tin Tin Trademark Registrations. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, upon entry by the Court of this Judgment, all of Rin and Shamrock's claims against Belleair not adjudicated by this Judgment shall be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for purposes of enforcement of Rin, Shamrock, and Belleair's Settlement Agreement dated as of 11/6/2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Rin and Shamrock, on the one hand, and Belleair, on the other hand, shall each bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. See document for details. (gk)
August 21, 2015 210 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Max Kleven et al v. Daphne Hereford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belleair Trading International LLC
Represented By: Evan L Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: Evan L Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Hereford
Represented By: Evan L Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rin Tin Tin Inc
Represented By: Evan L Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Kleven
Represented By: David Laurence Gernsbacher
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIN Inc
Represented By: David Laurence Gernsbacher
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?