Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr. et al v. 3M Bondo Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carra Jane Penegar and Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr.
Defendant: Interantional Truck and Engine Corporation, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., NMBFIL, Inc., Volvo Group North America, Inc., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Crane Co., Detroit Diesel Corporation, Does 1-6000, inclusive, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Tube City IMS Corp., Owens-Illinois, Inc., General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, Jerguson Gage and Valve Company, Toyota Motor Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Edelbrock Corporation, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., Volvo Trucks North America, Mack Trucks, Inc., Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Maremont Corporation, DAP, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Georgia-Pacific LLC, Dowman Products, Inc., CLA-VAL Co., Cummins, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., 3M Bondo Corporation, Domco Products Texas, L.P., Viad Corporation, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, Arvinmeritor, Inc., SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Haldex Brake Products Corporation, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Pneumo-Abex LLC, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Borg-Warner Morse Tec, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Kentile Floors, Inc., CBS Corporation, The William Powell Company, IMO Industries, Inc. and Navistar, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv04015
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Audrey B Collins
Referring Judge: Margaret A Nagle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2014 Filing 33 Counsel to disregard the civil case management order in this case. Case was consolidated in June and this case was closed, this order will be STRICKEN. A. Bridges, Court Clerk to Judge Collins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Audrey B. Collins (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (ab) Modified on 2/6/2014 (ab). ***STRICKEN CASE CONSOLIDATED AND CLOSED***
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Manuel L. Real, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 12-08539 R(MRWx) (rn)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES by Judge Audrey B. Collins. NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT: The Court, having read and considered the parties Stipulation to Consolidate Related Cases, and under the Courts inherent authority to control its docket, hereby orders Case No. 13CV03709ABCMAN to be consolidated with Case No. 13CV04015 GWMRW, as both cases arise from the removal of the identical case, Los Angeles County Superior Court Case No. JCCP4674/BC507323. The Court directs the parties to make all future filings solely in Case No. 13CV03709ABC(MANx) and there is no need to refer to Case No. 13CV04015ABC (MANx) on any of those filings, case will be closed. Additionally, all future hearings and proceedings in Case No. 13CV04015ABC (MANx) are advanced to this date and vacated. All future hearings and proceedings in Case No. 13CV03709ABC (MANx) remain unchanged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re CASE TRANSFERRED TO JUDGE COLLINS by Judge Audrey B. Collins: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this action has been reassigned to the Honorable Audrey B. Collins, United States District Judge. Please substitute the initials ABC in place of the initials GW. The case number will now read: CV 13-4015 ABC (MANx). Henceforth, it is imperative that the initials ABC be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of documents. (see document for further details) (bm)
June 25, 2013 Filing 28 ANSWER filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Moses, Thomas)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 13-03709 ABC(MANx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Audrey B. Collins and Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-04015 ABC(MANx). Signed by Judge Audrey B. Collins (rn)
June 17, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tenny Mirzayan on behalf of Plaintiffs Carra Jane Penegar, Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr (Mirzayan, Tenny)
June 13, 2013 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Timothy C Pieper counsel for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. Adding Timothy C. Pieper as attorney as counsel of record for Genuine Parts Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Pieper, Timothy)
June 13, 2013 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr counsel for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. Adding Russell W. Schatz as attorney as counsel of record for Genuine Parts Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Schatz, Russell)
June 13, 2013 Filing 23 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company, (Schatz, Russell)
June 13, 2013 Filing 22 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company.(Schatz, Russell)
June 12, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Derek S Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek)
June 12, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant General Electric Company. Related Case(s): 2:13-cv-03709 (Gardiner, Katherine)
June 12, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE filed by defendant General Electric Company. DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY'S NOTICE OF REFILING ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (Gardiner, Katherine)
June 12, 2013 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine)
June 12, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine)
June 11, 2013 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE of FRCP 7.1 Statement filed by Defendant FMC Corporation (Patel, Ketul)
June 11, 2013 Filing 15 ANSWER to Notice of Removal, #1 Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant FMC Corporation.(Patel, Ketul)
June 11, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ketul D Patel on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Patel, Ketul)
June 11, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kimberly Lynn Rivera on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Rivera, Kimberly)
June 11, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Jamison on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Jamison, Kevin)
June 11, 2013 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE of FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant CBS Corporation (Patel, Ketul)
June 11, 2013 Filing 10 JOINDER filed by Defendant CBS Corporation joining in Notice of Removal, #1 . (Patel, Ketul)
June 11, 2013 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal, #1 JURY DEMAND. Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant CBS Corporation.(Patel, Ketul)
June 11, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ketul D Patel on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation (Patel, Ketul)
June 11, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kimberly Lynn Rivera on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation (Rivera, Kimberly)
June 11, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Jamison on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation (Jamison, Kevin)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for July 15, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than July 1, 2013. See Civil L.R. 26-1. (See order for details.) (kti)
June 11, 2013 Filing 4 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti)
June 5, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(esa)
June 5, 2013 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation has no parent corporation and no publicly held corporation holds more than 10 percent of its stock. (esa) (mg).
June 5, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of CA, Los Angeles County, case number BC507323 with conformed copies of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu, discovery to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner; (Filing fee $ 400 PAID ); filed by defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2013: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2013: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr. et al v. 3M Bondo Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interantional Truck and Engine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMBFIL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Diesel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-6000, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tube City IMS Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S Johnson
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerguson Gage and Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Represented By: Russell W Schatz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edelbrock Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowman Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Bondo Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Charles S Park
Represented By: Shaghig D Agopian
Represented By: Thomas Jeffrey Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Rivera
Represented By: Ketul D Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haldex Brake Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentile Floors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Rivera
Represented By: Ketul D Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carra Jane Penegar
Represented By: Alexandra Shef
Represented By: H W Trey Jones
Represented By: Tenny Mirzayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Ray Penegar, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra Shef
Represented By: H W Trey Jones
Represented By: Tenny Mirzayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?