Pharrell Williams et al v. Bridgeport Music Inc et al
Plaintiff: Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke and Pharrelll Williams
Defendant: Marvin Gaye, III, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Bridgeport Music Inc and Frankie Christian Gaye
Counter Defendant: Paula Maxine Patton, Geffen Records, Interscope Records, UMG Recordings, Pharrell Williams, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Star Trek Entertainment, Universal Music Distribution, Robin Thicke an individual doing business as I Like'em Thicke Music, Paula Maxine Patton individually doing business as Haddington Music and T. I.
3Rd Party Defendant: EMI April, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc.
Interested Party: Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate
Case Number: 2:2013cv06004
Filed: August 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO RELEASE SUPERSEDEAS BOND (DKT 575) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Stipulation is GRANTED. Good cause exists for release ofthe Supersedeas Bond. The Amended Judgment (Doc. 573) awarding $4,983,766.85 to the Gayes in damages, profits, and pre-judgment interest, plus all post-judgment interest thereon to date, has been satisfied in full by Counter-Defendants PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE, and MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. The Supersedeas Bond (Doc. 469) submitted by Counter- Defendants on December 16, 2015, issued by Arch Insurance Company as Bond #: SU1133222 and in the amount of $5,400,000.00 shall be released to Defendants through their counsel (See Order for further details) (yl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 575 Joint STIPULATION for Order Releasing Supersedeas Bond filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Releasing Supersedeas Bond)(King, Howard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 573 AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt Re Judgment, #450 . For the First Claim for Relief, Robin Thicke, Pharrell Williams, and More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc., jointly and severally, shall pay $2,848,846.50 in actual damages to the Gaye Parties. In addition, Robin Thicke shall pay $1,768,191.88, and Pharrell Williams and More Water From Nazareth Publishing, Inc. (collectively, the Williams Parties) shall pay $357,630.96 to the Gaye Parties in separate awards of profits attributable to infringement. Robin Thicke, Pharrell Williams, and More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc. shall pay prejudgment interest to the Gaye Parties on the actual damages award and on the respective profits awards against each of them, as calculated from the date of the jury's verdict, March 10, 2015, through the Original Judgment Date, at the rate of 0.25% per annum simple interest, for a total prejudgment interest amount of $9,097.51. (bp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 574 Mail Returned addressed to Matthew Tyler Hale re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail 569 . (lom)
December 3, 2018 Filing 572 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Judgment,,, #450 filed by Counter-Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Judgment)(Miller, Seth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 570 NOTICE filed by Judgment Creditor Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate. (Ferd, Danit)
November 15, 2018 Filing 571 Mail Returned addressed to Matthew Tyler Hale re Bill of Costs (CV-59) #568 . (mrgo)
November 13, 2018 Filing 569 Notice of Electronic Filing re Bill of Costs (CV-59) #568 e-mailed to Michelle Beth Goodman bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2018 Filing 568 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed. RE: Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs #556 (jcw)
July 19, 2018 Filing 567 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #558 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #457 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #508 , CCA # 15-56880, 16-55089 and 16-55626. The judgment of this Court, entered March 21, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [SEE USCA OPINION #563 , ORDER AND AMENDED OPINION #566 AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART]. (jp)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER AND AMENDED OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #558 filed by Nona Marvisa Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Frankie Christian Gaye, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #457 filed by Pharrelll Williams, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #508 filed by Nona Marvisa Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Frankie Christian Gaye. CCA # 15-56880, 16-55089 and 16-55626. The opinion and dissent filed March 21, 2018, and reported at 885 F.3d 1150, are hereby amended. The amended opinion and dissent will be filed concurrently with this order. The petition for rehearing en banc, filed April 11, 2018, is DENIED. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART. (mat)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #558 filed by Nona Marvisa Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Frankie Christian Gaye, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #457 filed by Pharrelll Williams, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #508 filed by Nona Marvisa Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Frankie Christian Gaye. CCA # 15-56880, 16-55089 and 16-55626. The motion of the Recording Industry Association of America and the National Music Publishers' Association for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of Appellants' petition for rehearing en banc is GRANTED. (mat)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 15-56880. Appellant's motion for a seven-day extension of time to file a petition for rehearing en banc is granted. (bp)
March 21, 2018 Filing 563 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 15-56880. (bp)
May 27, 2016 Filing 562 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/14/16, 10:30 AM re Transcript #561 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 27, 2016 Filing 561 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/14/16, 10:30 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2016. (Joko, Alexander)
April 28, 2016 Filing 560 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55626, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #558 as to defendants Bridgeport Music Inc, Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (mat)
April 28, 2016 Filing 559 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye for Court Reporter. Court will contact Marie Zambrano at marie.zambrano@aporter.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Asimow, Daniel)
April 27, 2016 Filing 558 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Appeal of Order on Application to Clerk to Tax Costs,,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #554 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17718210.) (Asimow, Daniel)
April 26, 2016 Filing 557 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Clifford Harris, Jr(an individual), Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings #556 COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO THE FORM OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' RECALCULATION OF TAXABLE COSTS filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
April 21, 2016 Filing 556 Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Clifford Harris, Jr(an individual), Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Verification of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Amended Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs) (Duvall, Paul)
April 12, 2016 Filing 555 MEMORANDUM in Support of APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin; Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (with Exhibits A, B and C)529 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #2 Exhibit A to Busch Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Busch Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Busch Declaration)(Asimow, Daniel)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS (DKT. #479 ); COUNTER-CLAIMANT MARVIN GAYE III'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND JOINDER IN MOTION (DKT. #502 ); COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO APPLICATION TO THE CLERK TO TAX COSTS (DKT. #478 , #521 ); COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF GERALD ESKELIN AND CONCURRENT APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. #529 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Application is DENIED and the Motion to Strike and supporting documentation (Dkt. 529) and the opposition to the Motion to Strike and supporting documentation (Dkt. 547) shall be unsealed. The Motions are DENIED. The Motion to Strike is GRANTED and the Application to File Under Seal is DENIED. The Application to Tax Costs is DENIED as to the amounts that exceed those approved in this Order. See order for details. (ah)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER RULING ON PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. BUSCH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS #513 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER RULING ON DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ANTHONY RICIGLIANO #530 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER RULING ON PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JANIS GAYE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES #515 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah)
March 14, 2016 Filing 550 MINUTES OF NONA MARVISA GAYE, ET AL.'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS #479 ; MARVIN GAYE III'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND JOINDER IN MOTION #502 ; NONA GAYE AND FRANKIE GAYE'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL #529 ; NONA GAYE AND FRANKIE GAYE'S MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF GERALD ESKELIN #548 held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The motion hearing is held. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to deny Nona Marvisa Gaye, et al.'s Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs ("Gaye Motion") and deny Marvin Gaye III's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Joinder in Motion ("Joinder"). The Court also states its tentative views that it is inclined to grant Nona Gaye and Frankie Gaye's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Gerald Eskelin ("Strike Motion"), but deny the related Application for Leave to File Under Seal ("Application"). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Gaye Motion, Joinder, Strike Motion and Application UNDER SUBMISSION and will issue a ruling. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (pso)
March 14, 2016 Filing 549 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by Defendant Marvin Gaye, III (Philips, Paul)
March 10, 2016 Filing 548 NOTICE of Request to Supplement the Record Regarding Counterclaimants' Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin filed by Counterclaimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Asimow, Daniel)
March 8, 2016 Filing 547 SEALED OPPOSITION RE APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin; Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (with Exhibits A, B and C)529 , Order, #540 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE COUNTERCLAIMANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL AND MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT. #529 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: To facilitate a determination on Counterclaimants' Motion to Strike ("Motion"), the Motion and the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in support of the Motion, including Exhibits A, B and C (as identified in Dkt. #529 ) will be provisionally filed under seal. Counterclaim-Defendants shall file any Opposition to the Motion, not to exceed 12 pages, on or before March 8, 2016. The Opposition shall also be provisionally filed under seal. No reply from Counterclaimants is required. After briefing on the Motion is complete, a determination will be made as to whether any of these materials, including the Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (Dkt. 512 ), will remain under seal. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 2, 2016 Filing 545 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 539 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, Seth)
March 2, 2016 Filing 544 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 539 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, Seth)
March 2, 2016 Filing 543 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 539 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Seth)
March 2, 2016 Filing 542 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #531 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Defendants/Counter-Claimants' Objections to the Declaration of Gerald Eskelin)(Duvall, Paul)
March 2, 2016 Filing 541 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #530 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Defendants/Counter-Claimants' Objections to the Declaration of Anthony Ricigliano)(Duvall, Paul)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER DEFERRING COUNTERCLAIMANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 529, 532) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Court, having considered Counterclaimants' Application for Leave to File Under Seal, finds good cause to defer its ruling. The Application will be addressed at the March 14, 2016 hearing. (bp)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 539 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PARTIES' FAILURE TO ADHERE TO COURT'S STANDING ORDER RE THE PREPARATION OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS (DKT. #513 , #514 , #515 , #530 , #531 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has received the parties' respective objections to declarations filed in conjunction with the attorney's fees motions ("Objections"). Dkt. #513 , #514 , #515 , #530 , #531 . These Objections do not comply with the Court's Initial Standing Order with respect to how such objections shall be prepared. S.O., p. 16 (iii)(d). Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval and/or a ruling. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re..." with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by March 2, 2016. Additionally, the proposed order shall be uploaded in Word through the Court's CM/ECF system pursuant to the CM/ECF Procedures and Local Rules, or emailed directly to the Court's Chambers' email pursuant to S.O., p. 16(iii)(d). No chambers courtesy copies of these documents are required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 28, 2016 Filing 538 REPLY In Support Of APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin; Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (with Exhibits A, B and C)529 Under Seal filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Asimow, Daniel)
February 26, 2016 Filing 537 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin; Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (with Exhibits A, B and C)529 PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO COUNTERCLAIMANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 26, 2016 Filing 536 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Paul H Duvall counsel for Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. Changing Address and Telephone Numbers to KING & BALLOW; 1999 Avenue of the Stars; Suite 1100; Century City, CA 90067. Changing Telephone Number and Fax Number to Phone: 424.253.1255 Fax: 888.688.0482. Filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Paul H. Duvall. (Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 535 JOINDER in APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin; Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (with Exhibits A, B and C)529 filed by Defendant Marvin Gaye, III. (Philips, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 534 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 filed by Defendant Marvin Gaye, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Philips, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 533 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, of Documents Proposed to be Filed Under Seal served on 02/24/2016. (Asimow, Daniel)
February 24, 2016 Filing 532 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin; Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (with Exhibits A, B and C)529 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document)(Asimow, Daniel)
February 24, 2016 Filing 531 OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GERALD ESKELIN IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 530 OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ANTHONY RICIGLIANO IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 529 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin; Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Gerald Eskelin (with Exhibits A, B and C) under seal filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document MPA ISO Motion to Strike, #3 Redacted Document Decl of Richard Busch ISO Motion to Strike)(Asimow, Daniel)
February 24, 2016 Filing 528 REPLY /RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD M. PEARL REGARDING MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 527 REPLY /RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JANIS GAYE REGARDING MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 526 REPLY /RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. BUSCH REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 525 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 [DEFENDANTS/COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS/COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark A. Levinsohn in Support of Defendants and Counter-Claimants' Reply to Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit [Exhibits] A through I to the Declaration of Mark A. Levinsohn in Support, #3 Declaration of Andrew H. Davis in Support of Defendants and Counter-Claimants' Reply to Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees, #4 Declaration of Sherie A. Johnson in Support of Defendants and Counter-Claimants' Reply to Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2016 Filing 524 DECLARATION of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Asimow, Daniel)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION REGARDING DOCKET ENTRY 512 by Judge John A. Kronstadt, #522 . Document 512 (Declaration of Gerald Eskelin) filed on February 10, 2016, shall be placed UNDER SEAL. The document will not be available to any member of the public absent an order by the Court made in response to an appropriate application to which the parties to this action will have been given an opportunity to object. The request to remove the document from the docket is DENIED. There is no authority that permits such a modification. (pso)
February 12, 2016 Filing 522 Joint STIPULATION for Order TO REMOVE THE DECLARATION OF GERALD ESKELIN (Doc. 512) FROM PACER filed by Plaintiffs, et al. Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order TO REMOVE DOCUMENT 512 FROM PACER)(Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 521 OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings, Universal Music Dist #478 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 520 DECLARATION of SETH MILLER IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL)(Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 519 DECLARATION of ANTHONY RICIGLIANO IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 518 DECLARATION of KAREN L. SLOANE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 517 DECLARATION of PETER T. PATERNO IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 516 DECLARATION of HOWARD E. KING IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 515 OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JANIS GAYE re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 514 OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD M. PEARL re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 513 OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. BUSCH re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 511 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #502 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTIONS FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES (DOC. 479, 502); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 19, 2016 Filing 510 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55089 Cross Appeal, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #508 (mat)
January 15, 2016 Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Daniel B. Asimow at daniel.asimow@aporter.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Order to Unseal Transcript)(Asimow, Daniel)
January 14, 2016 Filing 508 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Appeal of Judgment,,, #450 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17103945.) (Asimow, Daniel)
January 14, 2016 Filing 507 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. correcting Notice (Other) #473 of Cross-Appeal (Asimow, Daniel)
January 13, 2016 Filing 506 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/31/2014; 10:52 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES. (at).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Miscellaneous Document #497 , for the following reasons: Proposed Document was not submitted as a sepate attachment. Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Since proposed orders are not required for motions, there is nothing further that needs to be submitted.; (bp)
January 12, 2016 Filing 504 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Duvall, Paul)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE RETURN OF TRANSCRIPTS AND DESTRUCTION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS by Judge John A Kronstadt: Counsel for Bridgeport Music, Inc., et al. contacted the Clerk on December 15, 2015 to make arrangements to pick up the exhibits. Therefore, all remaining exhibits and lodged transcripts have been returned to counsel. #45 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 12, 2016 Filing 502 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Counterclaimant Marvin Gaye, III(an individual). Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Philips, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 501 DECLARATION of PAUL N. PHILIPS IN SUPPORT OF MARVIN GAYE III'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES filed by Counter Claimant Marvin Gaye, III. (Philips, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 500 MEMORANDUM in Support of Marvin Gaye's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees filed by Counter Claimant Marvin Gaye, III. (Philips, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 499 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/16/13, 1:30 PM re Transcript #498 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 11, 2016 Filing 498 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/16/13, 1:30 PM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2016. (Joko, Alexander)
January 11, 2016 Filing 497 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 1/12] [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR AWARD OF FEES AND EXPENSES re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 (Duvall, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2016 (bp).
January 11, 2016 Filing 496 DECLARATION of Dr. Michael Alleyne in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 495 DECLARATION of Nancie Stern in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 494 DECLARATION of Thomas Court in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 493 DECLARATION of Ronald Aston in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 492 DECLARATION of Gary Cohen in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Counter Claimant Nona Marvisa Gaye, Defendant Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 491 DECLARATION of Ingrid Monson in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 490 DECLARATION of Judith Finell in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 489 DECLARATION of Nona Gaye in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 488 DECLARATION of Janis Gaye in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 487 DECLARATION of Richard M. Pearl in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 [with Exhibits A through E attached] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 486 DECLARATION of Sherie A. Johnson in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 485 DECLARATION of Andrew H. Davis in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 484 DECLARATION of James M. Thayer in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 [with Exhibits A through C attached] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 483 DECLARATION of Mark L. Block in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 [with Exhibits 1 through 3 attached] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 482 DECLARATION of Daniel B. Asimow in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 [with Exhibits A through C attached] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 481 DECLARATION of Mark A. Levinsohn in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 [with Exhibits A through C attached] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 480 DECLARATION of Richard S. Busch in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #479 [with Exhibits A through F3 attached] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit /Exhibits F4 and F5 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit F5 (cont.) to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #3 Exhibit F5 (cont.) through Exhibit G to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 479 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs) (Duvall, Paul)
January 11, 2016 Filing 478 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams(an individual) filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Verification of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs) (Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2016 Filing 477 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiffs, et al. Pharrelll Williams re #457 (Miller, Seth)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO UNSEAL PORTION OF JULY 31, 2014 HEARING TRANSCRIPT by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. After full consideration of the papers filed in connection with the Stipulation to Unseal Portion of July 31, 2014 Hearing Transcript #472 , the Court finds that good cause exists to GRANT the request to unseal the transcript, and therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The portion of the July 31, 2014, hearing identified by Docket No. 101 is hereby unsealed to allow a transcript of that proceeding to be prepared and delivered and made part of the master docket. (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
December 31, 2015 Filing 473 NOTICE of Cross-Appeal filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants/Appellees Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Asimow, Daniel)
December 30, 2015 Filing 472 STIPULATION for Order TO UNSEAL PORTION OF JULY 31, 2014 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Plaintiffs, et al. Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, Seth)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND APPLICATION FOR TAXABLE COSTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Stipulation for Leave, #470 . After full consideration of the papers filed in connection with the Joint Stipulation toSet Deadlines for the Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs and Application for Taxable Costs, the Court finds that there is good cause to GRANT the schedule requested. It is hereby ordered that:1. The Parties shall have until January 11, 2016, to file initial motions for attorneys fees and costs pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 505, and applications for taxable costs with the Clerk pursuant to Local Rule 54.2. The Parties shall have until February 10, 2016, to file their respective opposition(s) and objection(s) to any such motion(s) for attorneys fees and costs and application(s) for taxable costs.3. The Parties shall have until February 24, 2016, to file their respective repl(ies) to any response(s) to such motion(s) and application(s).4. Upon receiving the briefing on any motion(s), the Court will determine whether the matter will be taken under submission or set for a hearing. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, it will be held on March 14, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. (bp)
December 28, 2015 Filing 475 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/18/2014; 9:34 a.m. re Transcript #474 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 28, 2015 Filing 474 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/18/2014; 9:34 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/28/2016. (at)
December 28, 2015 Filing 470 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to EXTEND DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND APPLICATION FOR TAXABLE COSTS filed by Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER APPROVING SUPERSEDEAS BOND #463 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the supersedeas bond submitted by Counter-Defendants is hereby approved under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(d). This order of approval is without prejudice to Counter-Claimants' right to move to increase this bond amount if this Court awards Counter-Claimants their attorney's fees and costs. (lom)
December 17, 2015 Filing 467 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs, et al. Pharrelll Williams for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Karen L. Sloane at ksloane@khpslaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Miller, Seth)
December 16, 2015 Filing 469 SUPERSEDEAS BOND in the amount of $ 5,400,000.00 posted by Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams, Counter Defendants Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Star Trek Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution. (lom)
December 15, 2015 Filing 466 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams of SUPERSEDEAS BOND. (Miller, Seth)
December 15, 2015 Filing 465 NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND re Miscellaneous Document #464 , Stipulation for Order #463 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Seth)
December 15, 2015 Filing 464 CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY FOR COUNTER-DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF COURT APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND re: Stipulation for Order #463 (Miller, Seth)
December 15, 2015 Filing 463 STIPULATION for Order FOR COURT APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND filed by Plaintiffs, et al. Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE RETURN OF TRANSCRIPTS AND DESTRUCTION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS by Judge John A Kronstadt: Counsel for Pharrell Williams, et al contacted the Clerk and all lodged transcripts were picked up on December 8, 2015. The exhibits remain. The exhibits will be destroyed on December 18, 2015 unless other arrangements are made with the Clerk on or before December 17, 2015. 455 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 10, 2015 Filing 461 PROOF OF SERVICE Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate, re Notice of Lien #449 filed on 11/25/16, served on December 1, 2016. (Ferd, Danit)
December 10, 2015 Filing 460 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danit Weinberg Ferd counsel for Interested Party Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate. Adding DANIT WEINBERG FERD as counsel of record for NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTONREY DANIT WEINBERG FERD ON BEHALF OF INTERESTED PARTY LOS ANGELES COUNTY CSSD-INTERSTATE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. ALEXANDRA BAUER will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. ALEXANDRA BAUER is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTONREY DANIT WEINBERG FERD ON BEHALF OF INTERESTED PARTY LOS ANGELES COUNTY CSSD-INTERSTATE DANIT WEINBERG FERD. (Ferd, Danit)
December 10, 2015 Filing 459 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danit Weinberg Ferd counsel for Interested Party Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate. ALEXANDRA BAUER is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTONREY DANIT WEINBERG FERD ON BEHALF OF INTERESTED PARTY LOS ANGELES COUNTY CSSD-INTERSTATE DANIT W. FERD. (Ferd, Danit)
December 8, 2015 Filing 458 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56880, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #457 (car) Modified on 12/8/2015 (car).
December 7, 2015 Filing 457 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs, et al. Pharrelll Williams. Appeal of Judgment,,, #450 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-16900619.) (Miller, Seth)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #451 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #452 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #453 , for the following reasons: Title page is missing. The proof of servcie does not have a caption page pursuant to L.R. 11-3.8. Docekt Nos. 452-453 are Notices of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel but have no description in the docket text and, therefore, are untitled. Counsel shall re-file all 3 documetns, consistent with teh Local Rules and CM/ECF Procedures.; (bp)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE RETURN OF TRIAL EXHIBITS AND TRANSCRIPTS by Judge John A Kronstadt: In light of the Judgment (Dkt. #450 ) issued in this action, counsel are directed to contact the Clerk no later than December 11, 2015 to arrange a date and time to pick up any trial exhibits and/or lodged deposition transcripts. If arrangements are not made by December 11, 2015 the documents will be destroyed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 4, 2015 Filing 454 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #451 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
December 3, 2015 Filing 453 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 12/7] (Ferd, Danit) Modified on 12/7/2015 (bp).
December 3, 2015 Filing 452 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 12/7] (Attorney Danit Weinberg Ferd added to party Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate(pty:ip))(Ferd, Danit) Modified on 12/7/2015 (bp).
December 3, 2015 Filing 451 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 12/7] PROOF OF SERVICE Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate, re Notice of Lien #449 (Ferd, Danit) Modified on 12/7/2015 (bp).
December 2, 2015 Filing 450 JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. This action was tried by a jury, which rendered a verdict. Based on that verdict,IT IS NOW HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and Counter-Claimants Nona Marvisa Gaye, Frankie Christian Gaye, and Marvin Gaye III (collectively, the "Gaye Parties") and against Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Robin Thicke; Pharrell Williams; Clifford Harris, Jr.; More Water From Nazareth Publishing, Inc.; Interscope Records; Star Trak Entertainment; UMG Recordings, Inc.; and Universal Music Distribution (collectively, "Counter-Defendants") on the First Claim for Relief, the Gaye Parties' counterclaim for copyright infringement of the work "Got to Give It Up" by the work Blurred Lines." Refer to the Judgment for Details. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pso)
November 25, 2015 Filing 449 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate. (pso)
October 30, 2015 Filing 448 RESPONSE filed by Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gayeto Notice (Other) #439 Counterclaimants' Response to Counter-Defendants' Objections (Asimow, Daniel)
October 28, 2015 Filing 447 NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT re Objection #446 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Seth)
October 28, 2015 Filing 446 OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other) #439 OBJECTIONS TO COUNTERCLAIMANTS' PROPOSED JUDGMENT filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
October 27, 2015 Filing 445 SEALED DOCUMENT- COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT NOTICE IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S ORDER Dated October 6, 2015 to Resubmit to the Clerk any Document that has been Approved by the Court to be Filed Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
October 23, 2015 Filing 444 ATTACHMENT TO NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING PER COURT ORDERS DATED OCTOBER 6, 2015 AND OCTOBER 23, 2015 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (bp)
October 23, 2015 Filing 443 NOTICE in Compliance with the Court's Orders Dated October 6, 2015 and October 23, 2015 Approving Publicly Filing Documents Previously Filed Under Seal filed by Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. [JOINT NOTICE] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Notice in Compliance with the Court's Orders Dated October 6, 2015 and October 23, 2015 Approving Publicly Filing Documents Previously Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit [EXHIBITS] A through P to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Notice in Compliance with the Court's Orders Dated October 6, 2015 and October 23, 2015, Approving Publicly Filing Documents Previously Filed Under Seal)(Duvall, Paul)
October 23, 2015 Filing 442 Joint NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye of One DVD containing Exhibit A and Exhibit P to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch filed Concurrently with Counter-Claimants' Joint Notice in Compliance with the Court's Orders dated October 6, 2015 and October 23, 2015, Approving Publicly Filing Documents Previously Filed Under Seal. (Duvall, Paul)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 (IN CHAMBERS) RE COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' REQUEST FOR REVIEW AND CLARIFICATION OF COURTS OCTOBER 6, 2015 ORDER (DKT. #436 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On October 6, 2015, the Court issued an order ("Order" (Dkt. #435 )) with respect to several pending applications to file documents under seal. Counterclaimants Nona Marvisa Gaye, Frankie Christina Gaye and Marvin Gaye III filed a "Request for Review and Clarification" of the Order. Dkt. #436 . In it, they seek aclarification of the language in the Order that, with respect to Docket No. 395, states: "MOOT. These exhibits are addressed elsewhere in this Order." [SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS] (ake)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SET DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYSFEES AND COSTS AND APPLICATION FOR TAXABLE COSTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: After consideration of the materials filed in connection with the Joint Stipulation to Set Deadlines for the Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs and Application for Taxable Costs, there is good cause to GRANT the parties scheduling request. #438 (See Document for Details) (ake)
October 21, 2015 Filing 439 NOTICE of Lodging of Counterclaimant's Proposed Judgment filed by Counterclaimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment)(Asimow, Daniel)
October 21, 2015 Filing 438 Joint STIPULATION for Order JOINT STIPULATION TO SET DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND APPLICATION FOR TAXABLE COSTS filed by Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SET DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND APPLICATION FOR TAXABLE COSTS)(Asimow, Daniel)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DATE TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO COURT'S OCTOBER 6, 2015 ORDER (DKT. #435 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to the Court's Order, the parties were to resubmit documents to the Clerk and/or file documents on the public docket by October 16, 2015. ([Dkt. 435]). In light of the Counter-Claimants' recent Request for Clarification of the October 6 Order (Dkt. #436 ), the Court continues the deadline to resubmit and/or file documents from October 16, 2015 to October 23, 2015. #435 #436 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 13, 2015 Filing 436 REQUEST for Review of [JOINT REVIEW] AND CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S OCTOBER 6, 2015 ORDER REGARDING APPLICATIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re Order on Application for Order to Show Cause,,,, Order on Motion for Leave,, #435 filed by Counter-Claimants' Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE APPLICATIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DKTS. #106 , #189 , #194 , #197 , #247 , #278 , #281 , #287 , #291 , #395 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE COUNTERCLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 14, 2015 ORDER REGARDING THE START DATE OF THE ONGOING ROYALTY #425 #428 ; COUNTERCLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 14, 2015 ORDER REGARDING REMITTITUR OF THE JURY'S ACTUAL DAMAGES AWARD #426 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. For the foregoing reasons, both Motions are DENIED. Counsel shall meet and confer to seek to reach agreement as to the form of a proposed judgment. If an agreement is reached, Counterclaimants shall lodge the proposed judgment by October 21, 2015. If counsel are unable to reach an agreement as to the form of the judgment, Counterclaimants shall lodge a proposed judgment by October 21, 2015, and Counterclaim-Defendants shall file any objections by October 28, 2015. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED CONSOLIDATED STANDING ORDERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on September 11, 2015, the Court amended its Standing Orders. Counsel shall obtain a copy of the Orders by referring to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (www.cacd.uscourts.gov). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pso) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROPOSED JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel shall lodge the proposed judgment within 5 days upon the entry of the Court's ruling on Counter-Claimants Joint Motion for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty (Dkt. #425 ) and a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding Remittitur of the Jury's Actual Damages Award (Dkt. #426 ) (the "Motions"), and Counter-Defendants' Request for Oral Argument regarding the Motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT UNDER SUBMISSION AND DEFERRING THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Upon the Court's final ruling on the post-trial motions, the Gaye Parties were ordered to lodge a proposed judgment no later than July 29, 2015, with any objections to be filed no later than August 5, 2015. Dkt. #423 . On July 22, 2015, Counter-Claimants filed an ex parte application associated with a Motion for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty (Dkt. #425 ), which was later supplemented (Dkt. #428 ), and a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding Remittitur of the Jury's Actual Damages Award (Dkt. #426 ) (the "Motions"). The Court set the time for the response to the Motions for 12:00 pm on July 27, 2015, and took the matters under submission. After reviewing all of the present pleadings, including the opposition of the Counterclaim-Defendants (Dkt. #429 , #430 ), the Court directs as follows: (i) the date for the filing of the proposed judgment is deferred and shall be the later of August 14, 2015, or the date set by the Court in a subsequent order addressing the Motions; and (ii) among the matters to be considered as part of the under submission process are the parties competing requests as to whether the Court will conduct a hearing on the disputed matters. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 27, 2015 Filing 430 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, #423 [JOINT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 14, 2015 ORDER REGARDING REMIT #426 COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 14, 2015 ORDER REGARDING REMITTITUR OF THE JURY'S ACTUAL DAMAGES AWARD filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Miller, Seth)
July 27, 2015 Filing 429 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty #425 COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 14, 2015 ORDER REGARDING THE START DATE OF THE ONGOING ROYALTY filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Miller, Seth)
July 24, 2015 Filing 428 SUPPLEMENT to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty #425 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of the Supplement to Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty, #2 Exhibit [s] of the Declaration of Richard S. Busch)(Duvall, Paul)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER RE: COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONDENSE THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO FORGO ORAL ARGUMENT FOR COUNTERCLAIMANTS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge John A. Kronstadt: After full consideration of supporting and opposing papers, the Gaye Parties Application is hereby GRANTED. The Thicke Parties Responses to the Motion for Clarification and Motion for Reconsideration shall be filed on or before 12:00 pm on July 27, 2015. The matter will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION on July 27, 2015. Upon review of the parties' submissions, the Court will notify the parties if a reply is necessary otherwise, a ruling will be issued. #424 (pso)
July 22, 2015 Filing 426 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Order on Motion for Order,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, #423 [JOINT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 14, 2015 ORDER REGARDING REMITTITUR OF THE JURY'S ACTUAL DAMAGES AWARD] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding Remittitur of the Jury's Actual Damages Award, #2 Proposed Order re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding Remittitur of the Jury's Actual Damages Award) (Duvall, Paul)
July 22, 2015 Filing 425 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty, #2 Declaration of Gary Cohen in Support, #3 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support, #4 Proposed Order re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Clarification of the Court's July 14, 2015 Order Regarding the Start Date of the Ongoing Royalty) (Duvall, Paul)
July 22, 2015 Filing 424 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Condense the Briefing Schedule and to Forgo Oral Argument for Counter-Claimants' Motion for Clarification and Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Ex Parte Application to Condense the Briefing Schedule and to Forgo Oral Argument for Counter-Claimants' Motion for Clarification and Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Declaration of Sara R. Ellis in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Ex Parte Application to Condense the Briefing Schedule and to Forgo Oral Argument for Counter-Claimants' Motion for Clarification and Motion for Reconsideration) (Duvall, Paul)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt RE PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS'MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ONGOING ROYALTIES; COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST #345 #346 #375 #376 #377 #378 #385 #413 #421 . Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
July 7, 2015 Filing 422 COUNTER-DEFENDANT CLIFFORD HARRIS, JR.'S OPPOSITION TO JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Counter-Defendant Clifford Harris, Jr.'s Supplemental Brief Regarding Joint and Several Liability Supplement(Motion related) #420 #421 filed by Counter Defendant Clifford Harris, Jr. (Miller, Seth)
July 7, 2015 Filing 421 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Counter-Defendant Clifford Harris, Jr.'s Supplemental Brief Regarding Joint and Several Liability Supplement(Motion related) #420 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch) (Asimow, Daniel)
July 6, 2015 Filing 420 SUPPLEMENT COUNTER-DEFENDANT CLIFFORD HARRIS, JR.'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY; DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER filed by Counter Defendant Clifford Harris, Jr. (Miller, Seth)
July 6, 2015 Filing 419 SUPPLEMENT COUNTER-DEFENDANTS ROBIN THICKE, PHARRELL WILLIAMS, AND CLIFFORD HARRIS, JR.'S SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT EXCERPTS PER 6/29/15 HEARING [DOC. 410] filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Miller, Seth)
July 6, 2015 Filing 418 SUPPLEMENT [Joint] Brief re: Harris and the Interscope Parties' Joint and Several Liability for the Jury Award of Actual Damages filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch)(Asimow, Daniel)
July 6, 2015 Filing 417 SUPPLEMENT Interscope Parties' Supplemental Brief Pursuant to the Court's June 30, 2015 Order (Doc. 410) filed by Counter Defendants Geffen Records, Interscope Records, Star Trek Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental, #2 Exhibit A)(Haddad, Mark)
July 1, 2015 Filing 416 SUPPLEMENT [Joint] Filing re: Testimony of Nancie Stern From Which a Prospective Ongoing Royalty Could Be Determined filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch)(Asimow, Daniel)
July 1, 2015 Filing 415 SUPPLEMENT [Joint] Filing re: Testimony Concerning the Placement of the Rap Section in "Blurred Lines" filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch)(Asimow, Daniel)
July 1, 2015 Filing 414 OBJECTION IN OPPOSITION re: Joint REQUEST for Order for The Court to Consider Previously Filed Sound Recording Excerpts and Mashups in Determining Post-Trial Motions #413 COUNTER-DEFENDANTS ROBIN THICKE AND PHARRELL WILLIAMS' OBJECTION TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO CONSIDER PREVIOUSLY FILED SOUND RECORDING EXCERPTS AND MASHUPS IN DETERMINING POST-TRIAL MOTIONS filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Miller, Seth)
June 30, 2015 Filing 413 Joint REQUEST for Order for The Court to Consider Previously Filed Sound Recording Excerpts and Mashups in Determining Post-Trial Motions filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
June 30, 2015 Filing 412 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/29/15, 10:00 AM re Transcript #411 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 30, 2015 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/29/15, 10:00 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
June 29, 2015 Filing 410 MINUTES OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (DKT. 346); COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CORRECT THE JURY'S VERDICT (DKT. 345); COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT NOTICE OF ELECTION OF ATUAL DAMAGES AND PROFITS (DKT. 344); DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ONGOING ROYALTIES (DKT. 377); DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF (DKT. 376); COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST (DKT. 375); PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR (DKT. 378, 385); Motion Hearing held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court states its tentative views regarding the following. Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motions UNDER SUBMISSION and will issue a ruling. The parties are ordered to meet and confer. On or before July 6, 2015, they shall jointly or separately file a supplemental brief(s), not to exceed five pages per side, that sets forth their collective or respective views whether, if the verdict is revised to impose liability on Harris and the Interscope Parties, they will bejointly and severally liable for the jury award of actual damages. The parties are also ordered to file excerpts of the trial record that contain (i) testimony concerning the placement of the rap section in Blurred Lines; and (ii) testimony of Nancie Stern from which a prospective ongoing royalty could bedetermined. (See order for further details). Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (shb)
June 29, 2015 Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda R Farfel on behalf of Counter Defendants Geffen Records, Interscope Records, Star Trek Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution (Attorney Amanda R Farfel added to party Geffen Records(pty:cd), Attorney Amanda R Farfel added to party Interscope Records(pty:cd), Attorney Amanda R Farfel added to party Star Trek Entertainment(pty:cd), Attorney Amanda R Farfel added to party UMG Recordings(pty:cd), Attorney Amanda R Farfel added to party Universal Music Distribution(pty:cd))(Farfel, Amanda)
June 25, 2015 Filing 408 SUPPLEMENT As per Court Order of June 19, 2015 (Doc. 406) filed by Counter Defendants Geffen Records, Clifford Harris, Jr, Clifford Harris, Jr, Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke, Robin Thicke, Robin Thicke, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams, Pharrelll Williams, Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda R. Farfel, #2 Exhibit A and B)(Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Clifford Harris, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Clifford Harris, Jr(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Clifford Harris, Jr(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Clifford Harris, Jr(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Robin Thicke(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Robin Thicke(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Robin Thicke(pty:pla), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Robin Thicke(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Pharrell Williams(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Pharrelll Williams(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Pharrelll Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Pharrelll Williams(pty:cd))(Haddad, Mark)
June 25, 2015 Filing 407 SUPPLEMENT to Joint MOTION for Order for Declaratory Relief [Counter-Claimants' Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief] #376 [COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF RE WHETHER COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' MOTION MAY BE CONSTRUED AS A RULE 50 MOTION] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief re Whether Counter-Claimants' Motion May be Construed as a Rule 50 Motion)(Duvall, Paul)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed Counterclaimants' "Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief" ("Motion"). Dkt. #376 . They seek an order declaring that, notwithstanding the contrary verdict of the jury, certain Counterclaim-Defendants are liable for copyright infringement based on the jury's other factual determinations. Counterclaim-Defendants contend that this relief cannot be granted on a declaratory basis, and that "[t]he Gaye Parties did not move for judgment as a matter of law against Harris or the Interscope Parties." Opp'n, Dkt. 393 at 6-7. No later than June 25, 2015, the parties shall file supplemental briefs, not to exceed five pages, that address whether the Motion may be construed as one brought pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 16, 2015 Filing 405 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. correcting Reply (Motion related),, #404 NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE, AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR (Miller, Seth)
June 15, 2015 Filing 404 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #378 PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Miller, Seth)
June 15, 2015 Filing 403 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Joint MOTION for Order for Declaratory Relief [Counter-Claimants' Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief] #376 [COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply in Support of Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief)(Duvall, Paul)
June 15, 2015 Filing 402 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Joint MOTION for Order for Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, For Ongoing Royalties [Joint Post-Trial Motion] #377 [COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ONGOING ROYALTIES] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Reply in Support of Joint Post-Trial Motion for Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, For Ongoing Royalties)(Duvall, Paul)
June 15, 2015 Filing 401 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Joint MOTION for Order for Re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Prejudgment Interest #375 [COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GARY COHEN REGARDING PREJUDGMENT INTEREST] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
June 15, 2015 Filing 400 REPLY [JOINT] IN SUPPORT OF Joint MOTION for Order for Re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Prejudgment Interest #375 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
June 3, 2015 Filing 399 ADDENDUM TO APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. 395); DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams re: Joint APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal Opposing Motion of Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke, and More Water From Nazareth Publishing, Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Declaratory Relief, a New Trial or Remittitur #395 (Miller, Seth)
June 3, 2015 Filing 398 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #390 NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ONGOING ROYALTIES (DKT. 390) (Miller, Seth)
June 2, 2015 Filing 397 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye of Items not conducive to e-filing -- Exhibits O, P, and Q to the Richard S. Busch Declaration which was e-filed on June 1, 2015. (Duvall, Paul)
June 2, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING OF A DVD CONTAINING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL OR REMITTITUR] re Notice of Lodging, #389 , Notice (Other), #394 (Duvall, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 395 Joint APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal Opposing Motion of Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke, and More Water From Nazareth Publishing, Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Declaratory Relief, a New Trial or Remittitur filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Joint Application of Counter-Claimants for Order To File Documents Opposing Motion of Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke and More Water From Nazareth Publishing, Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Declaratory Relief, a New Trial, or Remittitur Under Seal)(Duvall, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 394 NOTICE of Errata and Correction to the Joint Notice of Lodging of a DVD Containing Exhibits in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Response to Motion of Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke and More Water From Nazareth Publishing, Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Declaratory Relief, a New Trial or Remittitur filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 393 Counter-Defendants' Opposition re: Joint MOTION for Order for Declaratory Relief [Counter-Claimants' Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief] #376 filed by Counter Defendants Geffen Records, Interscope Records, Star Trek Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda R. Farfel, #2 Exhibit A through F, #3 Exhibit G through M)(Haddad, Mark)
June 1, 2015 Filing 392 OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION re: Joint MOTION for Order for Re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Prejudgment Interest #375 COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GARY COHEN REGARDING PREJUDGMENT INTEREST filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Miller, Seth)
June 1, 2015 Filing 391 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint MOTION for Order for Re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Prejudgment Interest #375 COUNTER-DEFENDANTS PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE, AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST filed by Counter Defendant Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
June 1, 2015 Filing 390 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint MOTION for Order for Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, For Ongoing Royalties [Joint Post-Trial Motion] #377 COUNTER--DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT POST-TRIAL MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ONGOING ROYALTIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOWARD E. KING filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Miller, Seth)
June 1, 2015 Filing 389 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING OF A DVD CONTAINING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE, AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR] re Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, #388 (Duvall, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 388 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #378 [COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Response to Motion of Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke and More Water from Nazareth Publishing, Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Declaratory Relief, a New Trial, or Remittitur, #2 Exhibit [Exhibits] A through S to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Response to Motion of Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke and More Water from Nazareth Publishing, Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Declaratory Relief, a New Trial, or Remittitur)(Duvall, Paul)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MAY 21, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John A Kronstadt: In light of the parties' Joint Report Regarding Settlement Conference (Dkt. #386 ), the Court takes the Status Conference, set for May 21, 2015, off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 19, 2015 Filing 386 JOINT REPORT of REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PER DKT. 384 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams, Counter Defendant Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
May 11, 2015 Filing 385 Amendment to MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #378 CORRECTED MOTION filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (King, Howard)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: GRANTING IN PART REQUEST OF COUNTER DEFENDANTS PHARRELL WILLIAMS AND ROBIN THICKE FOR PERMISSION TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGES IN SUPPORT OF MAY 1, 2015, POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Request is hereby GRANTED IN PART; 2. Counter-Defendants Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke, and More Water From Nazareth Publishing, Inc. (Williams Counter-Defendants) may file a memorandum with up to five (5) additional pages beyond the 25 page limit in Local Rule 11-6 (i.e., up to 30 pages total) in support of their post-trial motions filed on May 1, 2015; and 3. Counter-Claimants may have the same number of additional pages for their opposing memorandum. (shb) Modified on 5/11/2015 (cr).
May 7, 2015 Filing 384 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Telephone Conference set for 5/21/2015 11:00 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt.Court Reporter: Alex Joko. The status conference is held by telephone. The Court confers with counsel and discloses that it was aformer partner of Arnold & Porter LLC and is a current member with Peter I. Ostroff of the ConstitutionalRights Foundation. Counsel report that they do not object to the Court remaining as the bench officer inthis action. The Court does not believe there is a basis to recuse itself however, should counsel wish toconfer with their respective clients and determine that the Court should recuse itself, the appropriateapplication shall be filed immediately.The Court confers with counsel regarding whether a settlement conference would be productive. Counselrequest the opportunity to discuss the matter with their respective clients and report back to the Court.The Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Status Conference to May 21, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shallfile a joint report on or before May 18, 2015, which states whether the parties believe a settlementconference would be productive or not. If it is determined that a settlement conference would bebeneficial, the parties shall indicate the agreed upon settlement method, i.e., a district judge, magistratejudge, or private neutral. The report shall not disclose any substantive discussions between the parties.The Court will determine whether the May 21 telephonic hearing is necessary upon review of the partiesreport. (bp)
May 6, 2015 Filing 382 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING REQUEST OF COUNTER-DEFENDANTS PHARRELL WILLIAMS AND ROBIN THICKE FOR PERMISSION TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGES IN SUPPORT OF MAY 1, 2015, POST-TRIAL MOTIONS re REQUEST to Exceed Page Limitation of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of May 1, 2015, Post-Trial Motions #374 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 381 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING REQUEST OF COUNTER-DEFENDANTS PHARRELL WILLIAMS AND ROBIN THICKE FOR PERMISSION TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGES IN SUPPORT OF MAY 1, 2015, POST-TRIAL MOTIONS)(Miller, Seth)
May 5, 2015 Filing 381 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGES IN SUPPORT OF MAY 1, 2015 POST TRIAL MOTIONS (DKT. #374 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the following deficiency(ies) has been found with your electronically filed document: Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re..." with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by May 6, 2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 1, 2015 Filing 380 NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING CD IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-DEFENDANTS THICKE AND WILLIAMS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR re Declaration (Motion related),, #379 , MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #378 (Miller, Seth)
May 1, 2015 Filing 379 DECLARATION of SETH MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #378 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Miller, Seth)
May 1, 2015 Filing 378 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PHARRELL WILLIAMS, ROBIN THICKE AND MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, DECLARATORY RELIEF, A NEW TRIAL, OR REMITTITUR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 7/29/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Miller, Seth)
May 1, 2015 Filing 377 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Order for Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, For Ongoing Royalties [Joint Post-Trial Motion] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Post-Trial Motion for Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, for Ongoing Royalties with Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, and F attached, #2 Proposed Order Granting Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, for Ongoing Royalties)(Duvall, Paul)
May 1, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Order for Declaratory Relief [Counter-Claimants' Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief with Exhibits A, B, C, and D attached, #2 Proposed Order Granting Counter-Claimants' Joint Post-Trial Motion for Declaratory Relief)(Duvall, Paul)
May 1, 2015 Filing 375 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Order for Re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Prejudgment Interest filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Prejudgment Interest with Exhibit A Attached, #2 Declaration of Gary Cohen Regarding Prejudgment Interest, #3 Proposed Order Granting Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion for Prejudgment Interest)(Duvall, Paul)
April 29, 2015 Filing 374 REQUEST to Exceed Page Limitation of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of May 1, 2015, Post-Trial Motions filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEFERRING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court determines that it is appropriate to defer entry of judgment, for several reasons. First, any judgment entered now could be amended following a ruling on the Motions. The parties disagree substantially as to the form of judgment, and several of their present disputes may become moot after the Motions are decided. Second, the parties are in agreement that, if their respective proposed judgments are not entered, judgment should be deferred. Third, a partial entry of judgment at this time, even one styled as provisional, could create uncertainty as to when certain deadlines begin to run and whetherjurisdiction exists to order forms of relief. Fourth, no party will be prejudiced if entry of judgment is deferred until after the Motions are decided.[SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS] (ake)
April 17, 2015 Filing 371 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging #367 Counter-Claimants Joint Objections To Plaintiffs And Counter-Defendants [Proposed] Judgment filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Asimow, Daniel)
April 16, 2015 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel C Posner on behalf of Counter Defendant More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Plaintiffs Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams (Attorney Daniel C Posner added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Daniel C Posner added to party Robin Thicke(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C Posner added to party Pharrelll Williams(pty:pla))(Posner, Daniel)
April 16, 2015 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kathleen M Sullivan on behalf of Counter Defendant More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Plaintiffs Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams (Attorney Kathleen M Sullivan added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Kathleen M Sullivan added to party Robin Thicke(pty:pla), Attorney Kathleen M Sullivan added to party Pharrelll Williams(pty:pla))(Sullivan, Kathleen)
April 15, 2015 Filing 368 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging, #364 COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS' [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT filed by Counter Defendant Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline [Proposed] Judgment)(Miller, Seth)
April 15, 2015 Filing 367 NOTICE OF LODGING filed COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF LODGING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,, 362 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Judgment)(Miller, Seth)
April 14, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Martin R Glick on behalf of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Attorney Martin R Glick added to party Frankie Christian Gaye(pty:dft), Attorney Martin R Glick added to party Frankie Christian Gaye(pty:cc), Attorney Martin R Glick added to party Nona Marvisa Gaye(pty:cc), Attorney Martin R Glick added to party Nona Marvisa Gaye(pty:dft))(Glick, Martin)
April 14, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel B Asimow on behalf of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Attorney Daniel B Asimow added to party Frankie Christian Gaye(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel B Asimow added to party Frankie Christian Gaye(pty:cc), Attorney Daniel B Asimow added to party Nona Marvisa Gaye(pty:cc), Attorney Daniel B Asimow added to party Nona Marvisa Gaye(pty:dft))(Asimow, Daniel)
April 13, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Lodging [Proposed] Judgment re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,, 362 (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT, #2 Memorandum Pursuant to Local Rule 58-7 Accompanying [Proposed] Judgment)(Duvall, Paul)
April 10, 2015 Filing 363 NOTICE Appearance and Association of Co-Counsel filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. Martin R. Glick and Daniel B. Asimow Hereby Enter Their Appearance as Associated Counsel. (Asimow, Daniel)
April 2, 2015 Filing 362 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE JOINT REPORT (DKT. 361): The Court has reviewed the parties' "Joint Report Pursuant to the Court's March 20, 2015 Order" ("Joint Report"), and the proposed briefing schedule therein. The proposal of the parties is GRANTED IN PART. The following briefing schedule is set: May 1, 2015: deadline for filing of Motions as set forth in the Joint Report. June 1, 2015: deadline for filing of Oppositions. June 15, 2015: Deadline for filing of Replies. June 29, 2015 at 8:30 a.m.: Hearing on all Motions. The parties have agreed that, notwithstanding these remaining disputes, judgment should be promptly entered in accordance with the jury verdict. The parties shall confer and lodge a proposed judgment no later than April 13, 2015. To the extent the parties are unable to reach an agreement, the Gaye parties shall lodge a proposed judgment by April 13, 2015, with other parties to file any objections by April 15, 2015. The notice of lodging shall indicate whether the parties have agreed to the form of judgment, or whether objections will be filed. If objections are to be filed, each party shall include in its respective notice its position as to why the judgment should not be entered. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 27, 2015 Filing 361 JOINT REPORT of PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S MARCH 20, 2015 ORDER filed by Counter Defendants Geffen Records, Interscope Records, Star Trek Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution. (Haddad, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: ORDER DENYING COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT. 356), VACATING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT REPORT. The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants Motion to Strike Counter-ClaimantsMotion to Correct the Verdict and for Injunctive Relief and Request for a Status Conference to Set aBriefing Schedule for All Post-Trial Motions (Motion), as well as the motions these parties seek tostrike. Dkt. 356. Counterclaimants have not yet responded to the Motion. However, to ensure judicial andparty efficiency with respect to the briefing of post-trial matters, this Order addresses certain pendingissues and sets forth the steps that the parties are to take as to briefing.First, the Motion to Strike is DENIED. Counterclaim-Defendants argue that Counterclaimants motionshave certain procedural and legal deficiencies. These issues are to be decided on the merits, and not onthe summary basis advanced by Counterclaim-Defendants. They cite no legal authority to support therequest to strike. Filings may be stricken pursuant a courts inherent powers. See Ready Transp., Inc. v.AAR Mfg., Inc., 627 F.3d 402, 404 (9th Cir. 2010).1 However, Counterclaim-Defendants fail to show thatthe exercise of these powers, which must be done with restraint and discretion, is warranted here. Seeid. at 404-05 (these powers are generally reserved to address, e.g., abusive litigation conduct) (citationomitted).Second, the Request for a Status Conference to Set a Briefing Schedule is GRANTED IN PART. Twopost-trial motions have been filed, another is set for briefing and more appear to be planned. At present,it appears likely that these motions will address issues that are interrelated. It will be more efficient for theCourt and the parties if piecemeal litigation is avoided. Instead, the issues should be presented andaddressed in a comprehensive manner.2 For these reasons, the following procedures are adopted with respect to post-trial motions:1. The current briefing schedule for Counterclaimants Motion to Correct the Jurys Verdict andMotion for Permanent Injunction, and for Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants motionregarding declaratory relief issues, is VACATED;2. No later than March 25, 2015, the parties shall meet and confer as to each of the followingmatters:a. What post-trial motion(s) each side plans to file;b. The proposed briefing schedule for all such motions, i.e., the date on which each will befiled, the date on which the opposition to each will be filed, and the date on which anyreply in support of each will be filed. The parties shall also discuss a proposed date forthe hearing of all such motions in the event that one is conducted; andc. Any other post-trial issues that remain.3. If Counterclaimants wish to withdraw and refile their Motion to Correct the Jurys Verdict and/ortheir Motion for Permanent Injunction in connection with this revised briefing schedule in whichcertain other related motions may be filed, they are granted leave to do so.4. On or before March 27, 2015, the parties shall file a Joint Report that sets forth their collective orrespective positions as to these matters. 5. Upon receiving the Joint Report, the Court will determine whether a status conference isnecessary or if it will set dates based on what is set forth in the Joint Report. (bp)
March 20, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark E Haddad on behalf of Counter Defendants Geffen Records, Interscope Records, Star Trek Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution (Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Geffen Records(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Interscope Records(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Star Trek Entertainment(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party UMG Recordings(pty:cd), Attorney Mark E Haddad added to party Universal Music Distribution(pty:cd))(Haddad, Mark)
March 19, 2015 Filing 358 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Joint MOTION to CORRECT the JURY'S VERDICT #345 , Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction [Post Trial] #346 filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Pharrelll Williams. (King, Howard)
March 19, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion, #356 (King, Howard)
March 19, 2015 Filing 356 OPPOSITION to Joint MOTION to CORRECT the JURY'S VERDICT #345 , Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction [Post Trial] #346 Plaintiffs' and Counter-Defendants' Motion to Strike Counter-Claimants' Motion to Correct the Verdict and for Injunctive Relief and Request for Status Conference, etc. 2015.03.19 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (King, Howard)
March 18, 2015 Filing 355 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/24-25/15, 2/27/15, 3/3-4/15, 3/6/15, 3/10/15 re Transcript #353 , #354 , #350 , #351 , #352 , #348 , #349 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 18, 2015 Filing 354 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/10/15, 9:30 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
March 18, 2015 Filing 353 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/6/15, Morning Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
March 18, 2015 Filing 352 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/4/15, Morning Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
March 18, 2015 Filing 351 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/3/15, Morning Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
March 18, 2015 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/27/15, Morning Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
March 18, 2015 Filing 349 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/25/15, Morning Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
March 18, 2015 Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/24/15, Morning Session. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
March 17, 2015 Filing 347 DECLARATION of Richard S. Busch In Support of Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction [Post Trial] #346 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) A through F to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support, #2 Exhibit G (Part 1) to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #3 Exhibit G (Part 2) to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #4 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support, #5 Exhibit I through J to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #6 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #7 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Injunction Relief)(Duvall, Paul)
March 17, 2015 Filing 346 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction [Post Trial] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
March 17, 2015 Filing 345 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to CORRECT the JURY'S VERDICT filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion to Correct the Jury's Verdict, #2 Exhibit (s) A, B, C, and D to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion to Correct the Jury's Verdict, #3 Proposed Order Granting Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion to Correct the Jury's Verdict)(Duvall, Paul)
March 17, 2015 Filing 344 Joint REQUEST for Damages [Joint Notice of Election of Actual Damages and Profits Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 540 (c)(1)] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME(DKT. 342) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' "Request for Extension of Time to File Their Brief Regarding Declaratory Relief Issues" ("Request" (Dkt. 342)). Good cause having been shown, the Request is GRANTED. No later than April 3, 2015, the parties shall file simultaneous briefs regarding what issues, if any, they believe remain to be addressed by the Court in regard to the declaratory relief action. The parties may submit response briefs no later than April 10, 2015. At this time, the Court will determine whether a hearing will be conducted.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 16, 2015 Filing 342 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File BRIEF REGARDING DECLARATORY RELIEF ISSUES filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
March 12, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/24/15, Day 1, pm session 2:02 pm; 2/25/15, Day 2, pm session, 11:38 a.m.; 2/26/15, Day 3, 11:29 a.m.; 2/27/15, Day 4, pm session, 11:11 a.m.; 3/3/15, Day 5, pm session, 12:59 p.m.; 3/4/15, Day 6, pm session, 11:39 a.m.; 3/5/15, Day 7, 11:29 p.m.; 3/6/15, Day 8, pm session, 1:22 p.m. re Transcript #337 , #334 , #338 , #339 , #331 , #340 , #336 , #332 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seijas, Pamela) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2015 Filing 340 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/6/15, Day 8, pm session, 1:22 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 339 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/5/15, Day 7, 11:29 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 338 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/4/15, Day 6, pm session, 11:39 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/3/15, Day 5, p.m. session; 12:59 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/26/15, Day 3, 11:29 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 335 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transcript (CV),, #333 (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 334 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/27/15, Day 4, pm session, 11:11 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/26/15, Day 3, pm session, 11:29 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/25/15, Day 2, pm session, 11:38 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 12, 2015 Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02/24/15, Day 1, pm session, 2:02 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
March 10, 2015 Filing 373 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 330 SPECIAL VERDICT. NFPV (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 329 JURY NOTE NUMBER 6. NFPV (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 328 JURY NOTE NUMBER 5. NFPV (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 327 JURY NOTE NUMBER 4. NFPV (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 326 JURY NOTE NUMBER 3. NFPV (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 325 JURY NOTE NUMBER 2. NFPV (bp) Modified on 3/11/2015 (bp).
March 10, 2015 Filing 324 JURY NOTE NUMBER: 1. NFPV (bp).
March 10, 2015 Filing 323 QUESTIONNAIRE NUMBER 1. NFPV (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 322 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Given) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. NFPV (bp).
March 10, 2015 Filing 321 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 9th Day held and completed before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Verdict reached. Jury FINDS: in favor of the Gaye Parties. Jury polled. Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists, Filed jury notes, Filed Jury instruction. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 320 SPECIAL VERDICT in favor of The Gaye Parties and against The Thicke Parties. Redacted (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 319 Question # 1 filed. Redacted (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 318 Jury Notes # 6 filed. (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 317 Jury Notes # 5 filed. Redacted (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 316 Jury Notes # 4 filed. Redacted (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 315 Jury Notes # 3 filed. Redacted (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 314 Jury Notes # 2 filed. Redacted (bp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 313 Jury Notes # 1 filed. Redacted (bp)
March 6, 2015 Filing 312 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 8th Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 3/10/2015 08:30 AM.Court Reporter: Alex Joko(AM); Pamela Batalo(PM). (bp)
March 5, 2015 Filing 311 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 7th Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiffs rest, Defendants rest. Closing argument made by plaintiffs, defendants, court instructs jury. Bailiff sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Motion for Judgment/Directed Verdict by Defendants and Counter-Claimants, denied. Clerk reviewed admitted exhibits with counsel to be submitted to the Jury/Court for deliberation/findings. Counsel stipulate to the return upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. Case continued to March 6, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (bp)
March 5, 2015 Filing 310 Counter-Claimants' Proposed Change to Jury Instruction 4 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Duvall, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 309 PROPOSED AMENDED JURY VERDICT filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 308 OBJECTIONS PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT REGARDING AND OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
March 5, 2015 Filing 306 PROPOSED PLAINTIFFS' REVISED [PROPOSED] VERDICT FORM JURY VERDICT Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
March 5, 2015 Filing 305 [JOINT] STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBIT 254 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Duvall, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 304 Counter-Claimants' Proposed Change to Jury Instruction Number 35 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Duvall, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 303 [PROPOSED] JOINT STIPULATION filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Duvall, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 302 PROPOSED STIPULATED FACTS filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Duvall, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 301 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. [Counter-Claimants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to Jury Instruction No. 43] Re: Objection #299 (Duvall, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 300 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Deposition Transcripts re Notice (Other) #280 (Duvall, Paul)
March 4, 2015 Filing 307 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 6th Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Case continued to 3/5/2015 12:30 PM Court Reporter: Alex Joko(AM); Pamela Batalo(PM). The Court states its tentative views that Ms. Veezy can testify on all matters with the exception of what occurred in the studio because it is cumulative and her late disclosure as a witness is unduly prejudicial on this issue. The Court states that the standard applied in light of Ms. Veezy not being identified timely ahs been informed by counsel's statement that this was due to his oversight. (bp)
March 4, 2015 Filing 299 OBJECTIONS PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 43 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
March 3, 2015 Filing 298 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 5th Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Gaye Parties rest. Case continued to 3/4/2015 08:30 AM. The Court has reviewed the Gaye Parties' Request for an Evidentiary Relief, A Bench Instruction, and a Supplemental Jury Instruction (Dkt. 297)(the "Request"). The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to deny the Request. Counsel address the Court. The Court DENIES the Request as it does not find a sufficient basis for the relief requested. All of the matters raised have been addressed previously.Court Reporter: Alex Joko(AM); Pamela Batalo(PM). (bp)
March 2, 2015 Filing 297 REQUEST for Relief from Evidentiary Relief, A Bench Instruction, and a Supplemental Jury Instruction filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Request for Evidentiary Relief, A Bench Instruction, and A Supplemental Jury Instruction with Exhibits A, B and C)(Duvall, Paul)
March 2, 2015 Filing 296 Supplemental Brief Re Touring and Income Expenses filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams re: Trial Brief, #290 (King, Howard)
February 27, 2015 Filing 295 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2015 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The parties have reached an agreement to admit Exhibits 248, 249, 515, 516, 603, 604, 607, 608, 613, and 614.Court Reporter: Alex Joko(AM); Pamela Batalo(PM). (bp)
February 27, 2015 Filing 293 ADDENDUM TO JOINT APPLICATION OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS FOR ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT TRIAL BRIEF RE: TOURING INCOME AND EXPENSES UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams re: APPLICATION for Order for to Seal #291 (Miller, Seth)
February 26, 2015 Filing 294 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 2/27/2015 08:30 AM.Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (bp)
February 26, 2015 Filing 292 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL THE TESTIMONY OF CARON VEAZEY Re: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #286 (King, Howard)
February 26, 2015 Filing 291 APPLICATION for Order for to Seal filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Duvall, Paul)
February 26, 2015 Filing 290 TRIAL BRIEF Re: Touring Income and Expenses filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #2 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts, #4 Exhibit Correspondence from Seth Miller)(Duvall, Paul)
February 25, 2015 Filing 289 STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT REGARDING AGREEMENT NOT TO PRODUCE TOUR EXPENSES PER 02/24/15 MINUTE ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams re: Jury Trial - Begun,, #284 . (Miller, Seth)
February 25, 2015 Filing 288 ADDENDUM TO JOINT APPLICATION OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' FOR ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL THE TESTIMONY OF CARON VEAZEY filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams re: APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal #281 (Miller, Seth)
February 25, 2015 Filing 287 ADDENDUM TO JOINT APPLICATION OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS FOR ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CALL A WITNESS TO AUTHENTICATE CERTAIN FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams re: MOTION for Leave to Admit Witness from CAA #278 (Miller, Seth)
February 25, 2015 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support [REDACTED] -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion to Exclude from Trial the Testimony of Caron Veazey Re: APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal #281 (Duvall, Paul)
February 25, 2015 Filing 285 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Case continued to 2/26/2015 11:30 AM.Court Reporter: Alex Joko(AM; Pamela Batalo(PM). (bp)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (DKT. #244 ) AND ADDITIONAL DISPUTED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (DKT. #267 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The parties have submitted 27 disputed jury instructions. Dkts. 244, 267. Several of these disputes concern proposed modifications to instructions from the Ninth Circuit Manual of Model Civil Jury Instructions ("MCJI"), and several concern special instructions. The Court rules on these as follows, and refers to the disputed instructions by the tab numbers given to them by the parties in their joint statements: [SEE DOCUMENTS FOR DETAILS] (ake)
February 24, 2015 Filing 284 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Case continued to 2/25/2015 08:30 AM. The Court STRIKES Plaintiffs' Request for Daubert Hearing Regarding Opinions of Defendants' Musicologist that Theme X and the Keyboard Part are Found in the Deposit Copy (Dkt. 277), as it determines that it is a request for reconsideration that has been ruled on previously.Court Reporter: Alex Joko(AM; Pamela Batalo(PM). (See civil minutes-trial for further details) (bp)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 AMENDED ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM by Judge John A. Kronstadt: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the persons listed in the attached document are authorized to bring equipment set forth in the attached document into the Courthouse during the pendency of the trial in the above-captioned action commencing on February 24, 2015. See document for details. (cr)
February 24, 2015 Filing 281 APPLICATION for Order for to File Documents Under Seal filed by Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS FOR TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 24, 2015 Filing 279 OPPOSITION Request for Daubert Hearing filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Judith Finell, #2 Declaration Declaration of Richard Busch, #3 Exhibit A- Ingrid Monson Expert Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit B - Pre-Trial Hearing Transcript Excerpts)(Duvall, Paul)
February 24, 2015 Filing 278 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Admit Witness from CAA filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex. A - Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Robin Thicke ROG Responses, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Subpoena to CAA, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Email from Greg David Derin)(Duvall, Paul)
February 23, 2015 Filing 277 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR DAUBERT HEARING REGARDING OPINIONS OF DEFENDANTS' MUSICOLOGISTS THAT THEME X AND THE KEYBOARD PART ARE FOUND IN THE DEPOSIT COPY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES: DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams re: Amended Minutes #273 (Miller, Seth)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
February 23, 2015 Filing 275 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/20/15, 9:00 AM re Transcript #274 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 23, 2015 Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/20/15, 9:00 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
February 20, 2015 Filing 273 AMENDED MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge John A. Kronstadt:Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (See document for details) #272 . (pso)
February 20, 2015 Filing 272 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge John A. Kronstadt:Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (See document for details) (bp)
February 18, 2015 Filing 271 DECLARATION of Judith Finell re Statement #259 [in Support of Joint Statement Pursuant to Order re Admissibility of Sound Recording Evidence at Trial] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 18, 2015 Filing 270 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Miller, Seth)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, sets a Final Pretrial Conference for February 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 17, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS AND JOINT LIST OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY DESIGNATIONS, COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 17, 2015 Filing 267 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (ANNOTATED - JOINT [PROPOSED] ADDITIONAL DISPUTED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS set) filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams.. (Miller, Seth)
February 17, 2015 Filing 266 NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING BINDERS OF DISPUTED EXHIBITS re Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to allow,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Limit,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Pretrial Conference - Final,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #226 (Miller, Seth)
February 17, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. correcting Statement #259 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE JOINT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO ORDER RE ADMISSIBILITY OF SOUND RECORDING EVIDENCE AT TRIAL (DOCUMENT 259) (Miller, Seth)
February 13, 2015 Filing 264 DECLARATION of Judith Finell re Statement #259 [in Support of Counter-Claimants' Trial Brief] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 13, 2015 Filing 263 DECLARATION of Judith Finell re Statement #259 [In Support of Counter-Claimants Objections to Plaintiffs' Demonstrative Audio Exhibits] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) (Continued) to the Declaration of Judith Finell in Support of Counter-Claimants Objections to Plaintiffs' Demonstrative Audio Exhbits)(Duvall, Paul)
February 13, 2015 Filing 262 DECLARATION of Richard S. Busch re Statement #259 [in Support of Joint Statement Pursuant to Order Re Admissibility of Sound Recording Evidence at Trial] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 13, 2015 Filing 261 DECLARATION of SANDY WILBUR re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #231 DECLARATION OF SANDY WILBUR REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EDITED SOUND RECORDINGS/POWERPOINTS filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
February 13, 2015 Filing 260 DECLARATION of SETH MILLER re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #231 DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EDITED SOUND RECORDINGS/POWERPOINTS filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
February 13, 2015 Filing 259 STATEMENT JOINT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO ORDER RE ADMISSIBILTY OF SOUND RECORDING EVIDENCE AT TRIAL re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #231 . (Miller, Seth)
February 13, 2015 Filing 258 STIPULATION for Order REGARDING EQUIPMENT TO BE ALLOWED IN COURTROOM filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM)(Miller, Seth)
February 13, 2015 Filing 257 AMENDED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST GROUPED BY DISPUTED EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO 1/26/2015 ORDER Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams.. (Miller, Seth)
February 13, 2015 Filing 256 AMENDED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams.. (Miller, Seth)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of a trial set in a criminal case, which is scheduled to proceed on February 17, 2015, the Court continues the trial in this matter from February 17, 2015 to February 24, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. A pretrial conference will be set for a date during the week of February 16, 2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 11, 2015 Filing 254 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williamsto Objection, #250 RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL WITNESSES [DKT 250] (King, Howard)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE INFORMATION RE TRIAL FOR MEDIA AND PUBLIC by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court refers the media and any interested person to the Court's website (www.cacd.uscourts.gov, Newsworthy, Cases of Interest) to obtain information about the trial, currently set for February 17, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pso) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 10, 2015 Filing 252 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants [Joint Notice of Lodging Supplemental Demonstrative Sound Recordings] re Notice of Lodging, #237 (Duvall, Paul)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, RECONSIDERATION OF GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1-3 AND CERTIFICATION OF QUESTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (DKT. #232 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: For the reasons stated in this Order, the motions for reconsideration and for the certification of an interlocutory appeal are DENIED. The trial date iscontinued to February 17, 2015; provided, however, a further continuance may be necessary if a criminal trial that is presently scheduled for that date goes forward. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS] (ake)
February 5, 2015 Filing 250 OBJECTIONS -Counter-Claimants' Joint Objections to Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Trial Witnesses filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Duvall in Support of Counter-Claimants' Objections to Plaintiffs' and Counter-Defendants' Witness List)(Duvall, Paul)
February 5, 2015 Filing 249 OBJECTIONS BY COUNTER-CLAIMANTS TO PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED VERDICT FORM filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
February 4, 2015 Filing 248 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Pharrelll Williams.. (King, Howard)
February 4, 2015 Filing 247 APPLICATION for Order for For Counter-Claimants' Joint Application to File Documents Under Seal [Joint] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Counter-Claimants' Joint Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Duvall, Paul)
February 4, 2015 Filing 246 TRIAL BRIEF [JOINT] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Trial Brief with Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Judith Finell in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Trial Brief with Exhibit)(Duvall, Paul)
February 3, 2015 Filing 245 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williamsto Declaration,, #239 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. BUSCH IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED SUBMISSION RE: NANCIE STERN'S TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO DOCUMENT 226 (Miller, Seth)
February 3, 2015 Filing 244 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (ANNOTATED - AMENDED NOTICE OF DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS set) filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Seth)
February 3, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING OF CORRECTED AUDIO EXAMPLES OF CORRUPTED AUDIO EXAMPLES WITHIN THE EDITED SOUND RECORDINGS LODGED WITH THE COURT ON FEBRUARY 2, 2015, PURSUANT TO THE JANUARY 28, 2015, ORDER RE ADMISSIBILITY OF SOUND RECORDING EVIDENCE AT TRIAL] re Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to allow,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Limit,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Pretrial Conference - Final,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #226 (Duvall, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 242 Counter-Claimant's Joint Supplemental Filing of Pages From the Deposition of Harry Weinger in Accordance with Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 8 [Document 226] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye (Duvall, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 241 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye.. (Duvall, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 240 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by AMENDED JOINT [PROPOSED] VERDICT FORM Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Seth)
February 2, 2015 Filing 239 DECLARATION of Richard S. Busch re Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude Order on Motion in Limine to allow Order on Motion in Limine to Limit Pretrial Conference - FinalMotion Hearing #226 [DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. BUSCH IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED SUBMISSION RE: NANCIE STERN'S TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO DOCUMENT 226 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Supplement -- Joint Requested Submission Re: Nancie Stern's Testimony Pursuant to Document 226)(Duvall, Paul).
February 2, 2015 Filing 238 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging, #237 PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING EDITED SOUND RECORDINGS AND POWERPOINT PRESENTATIONS SUBMITTED IN RESPONSE TO THE JANUARY 28, 2015 ORDER RE ADMISSIBILITY OF SOUND RECORDING EVIDENCE AT TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
February 2, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS EDITED SOUND RECORDINGS PURSUANT TO THE JANUARY 28, 2015 ORDER RE ADMISSIBILITY OF SOUND RECORDING EVIDENCE AT TRIAL] re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #231 (Duvall, Paul)
February 2, 2015 Filing 236 NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF PLAINTIFFS' EDITED SOUND RECORDINGS OF "GOT TO GIVE IT UP" AND "AFTER THE DANCE" PURSUANT TO JANUARY 28, 2015 ORDER RE ADMISSIBILITY OF SOUND RECORDING EVIDENCE AT TRIAL re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #231 (Miller, Seth)
February 2, 2015 Filing 235 PLAINTIFFS' AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' SUBMISSION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF HARRY WEINGER IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 re MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF HARRY WEINGER #171 filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (King, Howard)
February 2, 2015 Filing 234 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Pharrell Williams.. (King, Howard)
January 30, 2015 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from February 10, 2015 to Date to be Determined by Judge Kronstadt EX PARTE APPLICATION for Reconsideration of Document 231 and Document 226 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Question for Interlocutory Appeal #232 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Miller, Seth)
January 29, 2015 Filing 232 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from February 10, 2015 to Date to be Determined by Judge Kronstadt , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Reconsideration of Document 231 and Document 226, EX PARTE APPLICATION to Certify Question for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal, #3 Declaration of Judith Finell in Support of Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal, #4 Declaration of Ingrid Monson in Support of Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal, #5 Declaration of Ron Aston in Support of Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal, #6 Declaration of Thomas Court in Support of Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal, #7 Declaration of Janis Gaye in Support of Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal, #8 Proposed Order re: Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application or Continuance of Trial, Reconsideration of Granting Motions in Limine 1-3 and Certification of Question for Interlocutory Appeal)(Duvall, Paul)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE ADMISSIBILITY OF SOUND RECORDING EVIDENCE AT TRIAL by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Consistent with the foregoing, if any party seeks the admission of an edited sound recording, it shall belodged with the Court and served on the opposing party on or before noon on Monday, February 2,2015. The parties shall then meet and confer no later than Wednesday, February 4, 2015 regarding anydisputes over the admissibility of such recordings. No later than Friday, February 6, 2015, the partiesshall file a joint statement reflecting their collective or respective positions as to any areas ofdisagreement as to the admissibility of any such sound recordings. Upon receiving the parties February6 filing, the Court will determine whether to schedule a further hearing on this matter for February 9,2015. (bp)
January 27, 2015 Filing 230 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 01/26/15; 2:47p.m. re Transcript #229 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seijas, Pamela) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 27, 2015 Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 01/26/15; 2:47 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Seijas, Pamela)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENT OPPOSITION (DKT. 225) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Finding good cause, the Court GRANTS Counter-Claimants' request to supplement their opposition to Plaintiffs' first motion in limine with the materials provided. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #224 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sara R. Ellis on behalf of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye, designating Mark L. Block as local counsel. (lt)
January 26, 2015 Filing 226 MINUTES OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE EXHIBITS; PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The pretrial conference, status conference, and motion hearing is held. The Court will review the Three Boys decision, and confers with counsel regarding the pretrial documents as follows: Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine:The Court states its tentative views with respect to Plaintiffs' motions in limine, hears argument, and rules as follows: No. 1: to Exclude Evidence of Marvin Gaye Sound Recordings (Dkt. 165): GRANTED; No. 2: to Exclude Testimony of Judith Finell and Ingrid Monson (Dkt. 174): DENIED ; No. 3: to Exclude Defendants' Audio Examples (Dkt. 166): GRANTED; No. 4: to Exclude Evidence of Lay Opinions Regarding Similarity of the Sound Recordings (Dkt. 167): GRANTED; No. 5: to Exclude Evidence of Robin Thicke's Touring Income (Dkt. 168): GRANTED; No. 6: to Exclude Evidence of Marvin Gaye's Rights of Publicity (Dkt. 169): DENIED IN PART; No. 7: to Exclude Testimony of Michael Alleyne, Thomas Court, Ron Aston and Nancie Stern (Dkt. 170): GRANTED; No. 8: to Exclude Testimony of Harry Weinger (Dkt. 171): GRANTED ; No. 9: to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiffs' Press Statements (Dkt. 172): DENIED. Defendants Motions in Limine:The Court states its tentative views with respect to Defendants' motions in limine, hears argument and then rules as follows: No. 1: to Exclude The Testimony of Lawrence Ferrara, Ph.D. and Evidence of His Consultation in Anticipation of Litigation (Dkt. 157): GRANTED; No. 2: to Exclude The Evidence of a Dispute Between Anthony Kyser and Counter-Claimants Regarding All Things Marvin Gaye, LTD. and Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Dkt. 158): The motion is not opposed and, therefore, GRANTED; No. 3: to Exclude Testimony and Evidence of Sandy Wilbur Regarding Compositions and Sound Recordings other than "Blurred Lines," "Love After War," "After the Dance," and "Got to Give it Up" (Dkt. 159): DENIED; No. 4: to Allow Experts to Testify and Present Evidence that the Descending Base Line is in the Deposit Copy of "Got To Give It Up" (Dkt. 160): GRANTED; No. 5: to Exclude From Trial Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight (Dkt. 161): DENIED; No. 6: to Exclude Trial Testimony of Peter Oxendale and Evidence of any Opinion or Statement of Peter Oxendale (Dkt. 162): GRANTED; No. 7: to Exclude From Trial the Testimony of Bruce Scavuzzo (Dkt. 163): GRANTED; No. 8: to Exclude From Trial Evidence or Testimony Referencing EMI and its Representative'sPositions, Opinions, and Communications with the Gayes or the Gayes' Representatives, Including EMI's Failure to Pursue Claims on the Gayes' Behalf (Dkt. 164): GRANTED. The February 6, 2015 Status Conference re Exhibits is taken off calendar. The Court will determine if a further hearing is necessary prior to the commencement of the February 10, 2015 trial. The Court will inform counsel on or before February 5, 2015, whether either of the two criminal cases, that is currently set for February 17, 2015, will go forward and whether a continuance of this trial will be necessary. Refer to the document for complete details. #157 #158 #159 #160 #161 #162 #163 #164 #165 #166 #167 #168 #169 #170 #171 #172 #174 Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (pso)
January 26, 2015 Filing 225 REQUEST to Supplement Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Marvin Gaye Sound Recordings re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #186 [WITH EXHIBIT A attached] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 22, 2015 Filing 224 APPLICATION for attorney Sara Rebecca Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15091426 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Block, Mark)
January 21, 2015 Filing 223 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
January 21, 2015 Filing 222 Joint Exhibit List JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams.. (Miller, Seth)
January 20, 2015 Filing 221 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye.. (Duvall, Paul)
January 20, 2015 Filing 220 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams.. (Miller, Seth)
January 20, 2015 Filing 219 PROPOSED JOINT JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 218 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Sixth MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Trial Testimony of Peter Oxendale and Evidence of any Opinion or Statement of Peter Oxendale #162 [JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply in Support of Counter-Claimants' Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude From Trial Testimony of Peter Oxendale and Evidence of any Opinion or Statement of Peter Oxendale and Exhibits A and B)(Duvall, Paul)
January 16, 2015 Filing 217 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Seventh MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude From Trial the Testimony of Bruce Scavuzzo #163 [JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply in Support of Counter-Claimants' Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude From Trial the Testimony of Bruce Scavuzzo and Exhibits A, B, and C)(Duvall, Paul)
January 16, 2015 Filing 216 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Eighth MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude From Trial Evidence or Testimony Referencing EMI and its Representative's Positions, Opinions, and Communications with the Gayes or the Gayes' Representatives, Including EMI's Failure to Pur #164 [JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 8 to Exclude from Trial Testimony Referencing EMI and Its Representative's Positions, Opinions, and Communications with the Gayes or the Gayes' Representatives)(Duvall, Paul)
January 16, 2015 Filing 215 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESS STATEMENTS #172 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 214 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF HARRY WEINGER #171 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 213 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL ALLEYNE, THOMAS COURT, RON ASTON, AND NANCIE STERN #170 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 212 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE RIGHTS OF PUBLICITY #169 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 211 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF ROBIN THICKE'S TOURING INCOME #168 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 210 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF LAY OPINIONS REGARDING SIMILARITY OF THE SOUND RECORDINGS #167 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 209 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude DEFENDANTS' AUDIO EXAMPLES #166 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 208 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON #174 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 207 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE SOUND RECORDINGS #165 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 206 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Seth)
January 16, 2015 Filing 205 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude From Trial Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight #161 [JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude from Trial the Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight and Exhibit A)(Duvall, Paul)
January 16, 2015 Filing 204 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Allow Experts to Testify and Present Evidence that the Descending Base Line is in the Deposit Copy of "Got To Give It Up" #160 [JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply in Support of Counter-Claimants'' Joint Motion in Limine No. 4 to Allow Experts to Testify and Present Evidence That The Descending Bass Line is in the Deposit Copy of "Got To Give It Up", #2 Exhibit (s) to Declaration of Richard S. Busch - Part 1, #3 Exhibit (s) to Declaration of Richard S. Busch - Part 2)(Duvall, Paul)
January 16, 2015 Filing 203 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Third MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony and Evidence of Sandy Wilbur Regarding Compositions and Sound Recordings other than "Blurred Lines," "Love After War," "After the Dance," and "Got to Give it Up& #159 [JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply In Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude from Trial Testimony and Evidence of Sandy Wilbur Regarding Compositions and Sound Recordings other Than "Blurred Lines," "Love After War," "After the Dance," and "Got To Give It Up" with Exhibits A, B, and C)(Duvall, Paul)
January 16, 2015 Filing 202 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of First MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Lawrence Ferrara, Ph.D. and Evidence of His Consultation in Anticipation of Litigation #157 [COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Reply in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude from Trial the Testimony of Lawrence Ferrara, Ph.D. and Evidence of his Consultation in Anticipation of Litigation with EXHIBITS A and B)(Duvall, Paul)
January 15, 2015 Filing 201 ADDENDUM TO APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: File Documents Under Seal Purusuant to Order Re Pilot Program For Under Seal Documents #189 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 14, 2015 Filing 200 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Pharrelll Williams.. (Miller, Seth)
January 14, 2015 Filing 199 STATEMENT JOINT STATEMENT RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams re: Order,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, #154 . (Miller, Seth)
January 14, 2015 Filing 198 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #188 , Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude From Trial Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight #161 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 197 Corrected APPLICATION for Order for File Documents Under Seal filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 196 DECLARATION of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda OPPOSING Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 - 9 MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON #174 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF ROBIN THICKE'S TOURING INCOME #168 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF HARRY WEINGER #171 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE RIGHTS OF PUBLICITY #169 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESS STATEMENTS #172 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude DEFENDANTS' AUDIO EXAMPLES #166 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL ALLEYNE, THOMAS COURT, RON ASTON, AND NANCIE STERN #170 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE SOUND RECORDINGS #165 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF LAY OPINIONS REGARDING SIMILARITY OF THE SOUND RECORDINGS #167 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 3 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #2 Exhibit 3A through 3B to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #3 Exhibit 3C through 3D to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #4 Exhibit 3E through 5 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #5 Exhibit 6 through 8 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #6 Exhibit 9 - Part 1 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #7 Exhibit 9- Part 2 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #8 Exhibit 9 - Part 3 and Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #9 Exhibit 11 through 13 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #10 Exhibit 14 through 20 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #11 Exhibit 21 through 25 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #12 Exhibit 26 through 29 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #13 Exhibit 30 through 43 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #14 Exhibit 44A through 44B to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #15 Exhibit 44C through 45 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9, #16 Exhibit 46 through 50 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants' Memoranda Opposing Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motions in Limine 1 through 9)(Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Eighth MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude From Trial Evidence or Testimony Referencing EMI and its Representative's Positions, Opinions, and Communications with the Gayes or the Gayes' Representatives, Including EMI's Failure to Pur #164 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 194 Corrected APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Order re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Order Re Pilot Program For Under Seal Documents)(Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Seventh MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude From Trial the Testimony of Bruce Scavuzzo #163 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Third MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony and Evidence of Sandy Wilbur Regarding Compositions and Sound Recordings other than "Blurred Lines," "Love After War," "After the Dance," and "Got to Give it Up& #159 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 4))(Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 191 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Sixth MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Trial Testimony of Peter Oxendale and Evidence of any Opinion or Statement of Peter Oxendale #162 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Lawrence Ferrara, Ph.D. and Evidence of His Consultation in Anticipation of Litigation #157 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 189 APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: File Documents Under Seal Purusuant to Order Re Pilot Program For Under Seal Documents filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Application to File Under Seal)(Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude From Trial Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight #161 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 187 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Allow Experts to Testify and Present Evidence that the Descending Base Line is in the Deposit Copy of "Got To Give It Up" #160 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE SOUND RECORDINGS #165 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 185 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Second MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude The Evidence of a Dispute Between Anthony Kyser and Counter-Claimants Regarding All Things Marvin Gaye, LTD. and Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. #158 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESS STATEMENTS #172 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF HARRY WEINGER #171 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL ALLEYNE, THOMAS COURT, RON ASTON, AND NANCIE STERN #170 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE RIGHTS OF PUBLICITY #169 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 180 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF ROBIN THICKE'S TOURING INCOME #168 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF LAY OPINIONS REGARDING SIMILARITY OF THE SOUND RECORDINGS #167 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude DEFENDANTS' AUDIO EXAMPLES #166 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON #174 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
January 8, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING OF MUSIC CDS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE re MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON #174 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF ROBIN THICKE'S TOURING INCOME #168 , Declaration (Motion related),, #175 , Declaration (Motion related), #173 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL ALLEYNE, THOMAS COURT, RON ASTON, AND NANCIE STERN #170 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE SOUND RECORDINGS #165 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF LAY OPINIONS REGARDING SIMILARITY OF THE SOUND RECORDINGS #167 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF HARRY WEINGER #171 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE RIGHTS OF PUBLICITY #169 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESS STATEMENTS #172 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude DEFENDANTS' AUDIO EXAMPLES #166 (Miller, Seth)
January 7, 2015 Filing 175 DECLARATION of SETH MILLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1 THROUGH 9 MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE SOUND RECORDINGS #165 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 174 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit TESTIMONY OF JUDITH FINELL AND INGRID MONSON ( Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt.) filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams.(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 173 DECLARATION of SANDY WILBUR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1 THROUGH 9 MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE SOUND RECORDINGS #165 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 172 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESS STATEMENTS filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 9)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 171 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF HARRY WEINGER filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 8)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude TESTIMONY OF MICHAEL ALLEYNE, THOMAS COURT, RON ASTON, AND NANCIE STERN filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 7)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 169 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE RIGHTS OF PUBLICITY filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 6)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF ROBIN THICKE'S TOURING INCOME filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 5, #2 Declaration of Debra MacCulloch)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF LAY OPINIONS REGARDING SIMILARITY OF THE SOUND RECORDINGS filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 4)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 166 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude DEFENDANTS' AUDIO EXAMPLES filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 3)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE OF MARVIN GAYE SOUND RECORDINGS filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 1)(Miller, Seth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Eighth MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude From Trial Evidence or Testimony Referencing EMI and its Representative's Positions, Opinions, and Communications with the Gayes or the Gayes' Representatives, Including EMI's Failure to Pursue Claims on the Gayes' Behalf filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 8 to Exclude from Trial Evidence or Testimony Referencing EMI and its Representative's Positions, Opinions, and Communications with the Gayes or the Gayes' Representatives, Including EMI's Failure to Pursue Claims on the Gayes' Behalf, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 8 to Exclude from Trial Evidence or Testimony Referencing EMI and its Representative's Positions, Opinions, and Communications with the Gayes or the Gayes' Representatives, Including EMI's Failure to Pursue Claims on the Gayes' Behalf)(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2015 Filing 163 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Seventh MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude From Trial the Testimony of Bruce Scavuzzo filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude from Trial the Testimony of Bruce Scavuzzo, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude from Trial the Testimony of Bruce Scavuzzo)(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Sixth MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Trial Testimony of Peter Oxendale and Evidence of any Opinion or Statement of Peter Oxendale filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude from Trial Testimony of Peter Oxendale and Evidence of any Opinion or Statement of Peter Oxendale, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude from Trial Testimony of Peter Oxendale and Evidence of any Opinion or Statement of Peter Oxendale)(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude From Trial Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude from Trial Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude from Trial Expert Testimony of Jason Gallien, Nicole Bilzerian and Chris Knight)(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Allow Experts to Testify and Present Evidence that the Descending Base Line is in the Deposit Copy of "Got To Give It Up" filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 4 To Allow Experts to Testify and Present Evidence that the Descending Base Line is in the Deposit Copy of "Got To Give It Up", #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 4 To Allow Experts to Testify and Present Evidence that the Descending Base Line is in the Deposit Copy of "Got To Give It Up")(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Third MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Testimony and Evidence of Sandy Wilbur Regarding Compositions and Sound Recordings other than "Blurred Lines," "Love After War," "After the Dance," and "Got to Give it Up" filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude from Trial Testimony and Evidence of Sandy Wilbur Regarding Compositions and Sound Recordings other than "Blurred Lines," "Love After War," "After the Dance," and "Got to Give it Up")(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude The Evidence of a Dispute Between Anthony Kyser and Counter-Claimants Regarding All Things Marvin Gaye, LTD. and Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude from Trial the Evidence of a Dispute Between Anthony Kyser and Counter-Claimants Regarding All Things Marvin Gaye, LTD. and Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc., #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude from Trial the Evidence of a Dispute Between Anthony Kyser and Counter-Claimants Regarding All Things Marvin Gaye, LTD. and Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.)(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Lawrence Ferrara, Ph.D. and Evidence of His Consultation in Anticipation of Litigation filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum -- Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude from Trial the Testimony of Lawrence Ferrara, Ph.D. and Evidence of his Consultation in Anticipation of Litigation, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude from Trial the Testimony of Lawrence Ferrara, Ph.D. and Evidence of his Consultation in Anticipation of Litigation)(Duvall, Paul)
January 5, 2015 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law)(Duvall, Paul)
January 5, 2015 Filing 155 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND EXTENDING TIME FOR SUPPLEMENTAL FINANCIAL EXPERT REPORT AND FOR DEPOSITIONS OF GARY COHEN AND BRUCE KOLBRENNER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that good cause being shown:1. The deadline to file motions in limine is continued from December 29,2014, until January 6, 2015;2. The deadline to file oppositions, if any, to motions in limine iscontinued from January 5, 2014, until noon on January 13, 2015;3. The deadline to file replies, if any, to motions in limine is continuedfrom January 12, 2015, until January 16, 2015;4. The deadline for Defendants to provide the supplemental expert reportof their financial expert, Gary Cohen, based on the data produced in response toParagraph 1 of the Courts November 7, 2014, Order (Dkt. 144) is continued toDecember 29, 2014;5. The parties shall have until January 12, 2015, to complete thedepositions of financial experts Gary Cohen and Bruce Kolbrenner; and6. On or before January 16, 2015, the parties shall file a Joint StatusReport as to their settlement efforts. The Joint Report shall not disclose thesubstance of any communications. Among other things, the Joint Report shall statewhether any further discussions with the neutral with whom they have worked areplanned, as well as the respective or collective views of the parties as to what further steps, including that one, would facilitate their discussions. re Stipulation to Continue, #153 , The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled (bp)
December 19, 2014 Filing 153 STIPULATION to Continue BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re: Stipulation and Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #78 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND EXTENDING TIME FOR SUPPLEMENTAL FINANCIAL EXPERT REPORT AND FOR DEPOSITIONS OF GARY COHEN AND BRUCE KOLBRENNER)(Miller, Seth)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO DECEMBER 5, 2014 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court finds that there is good cause to GRANT the extension requested. It is hereby ordered that the Expert Discovery Cutoff be extended until December 5, 2014, so Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants may conduct the Deposition of Judith Finell, re Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date, #148 , The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled (bp)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER RE COUNTERCLAIMANTS' REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE (Dkt. 147): The Court has reviewed the matters raised by Counterclaimants' "Request for Order to Substitute Audio Example 1" (Dkt. 147), Counterclaim-Defendants' Opposition (Dkt. 149), and Counterclaimants' Reply (Dkt. 150). Because there is no procedural basis for this request, it is DENIED without prejudice. If any dispute remains as to the admissibility of Counterclaimants' revised proposed exhibit, it will be addressed at the Final Pretrial Conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 26, 2014 Filing 150 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST for Order for Granting Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request to Substitute Audio Example 1 #147 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
November 25, 2014 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REQUEST for Order for Granting Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request to Substitute Audio Example 1 #147 PLAINTIFFS' (1) OPPOSITION TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE AUDIO EXAMPLE 1 AND (2) OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO AUDIO EXAMPLE 1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
November 25, 2014 Filing 148 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to December 5, 2014 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Joint Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery Cutoff to December 5, 2014, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery Cutoff to December 5, 2014)(Duvall, Paul)
November 24, 2014 Filing 147 REQUEST for Order for Granting Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request to Substitute Audio Example 1 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ron Aston in Support of Counter-Claimants' Request for Order to Substitute Audio Example 1 on to Audio Example 1, #2 Declaration of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request for Order to Substitute Audio Example 1, #3 Proposed Order Granting Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request to Substitute Audio Example 1)(Duvall, Paul)
November 24, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. correcting Notice of Lodging #109 To Audio Example 1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ron Aston in Support of Counter-Claimants' Errata and Correction to Audio Example 1)(Duvall, Paul)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge John A. KronstadtGRANTING COUNTERCLAIMANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE'S REQUEST TO SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL REBUTTAL EXPERTDISCLOSURES #143 . Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
November 10, 2014 Filing 143 REQUEST to Supplement Rebuttal Expert Disclosures [by serving Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Disclosures on or by November 14, 2014] [supplementing Rebuttal Expert Reports to be served on Plaintiffs on November 10, 2014] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support of Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request to Serve Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Disclosures with Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Granting Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request to Serve Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Disclosures)(Duvall, Paul)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: GRANTING #141 Request to Extend Time to Supplement Expert Reports. The following schedule is adopted, and supersedes and replaces in part the Scheduling Order of July 9,2014 (Dkt. 78): 1. On or before December 1, 2014, Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants will provide Defendants with the supplemental financial documents and profit and loss statements with respect to the revenue of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants arising from Blurred Lines and Love After War through and including September 30, 2014. This obligation of productionapplies only to documents that are in the possession, custody or control of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants, and does not apply to information in the sole possession, custody or control of non-parties as of December 1, 2014.2. On or before December 15, 2014, the Parties may file supplemental expert reports from their respective financial experts based on the data produced in response to Paragraph 1 of this Order. 3. On or before December 29, 2014, the Parties shall complete any depositions concerning the supplemental financial expert reports discussed in Paragraph 2 of this Order. 4. The expert discovery cutoff date of December 4, 2014 shall remain in effect with respect to allother expert discovery. 5. Even if Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants obtain possession, custody, or control of financial information discussed in Paragraph 1 after December 1, 2014, e.g., the updated UMG entity P&Ls and artist royalty statements referred to in the October 17, 2014 letter betweenCounsel (Dkt. 141, Ex. 1), the deadlines set in Paragraphs 2 and 3 shall remain in place. Plaintiffs and Counterclaim-Defendants have stipulated not to object to expert testimony at trial based on such information, without waiver of their right to object on other grounds. Id. 6. All other pending dates set in the July 9, 2014 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Dkt. 78. Thus, the last day to hear motions is December 22, 2014; the Final Pretrial Conference is set forJanuary 26, 2015 at 3:00 p.m.; the Status Conference re Exhibits is set for February 6, 2015 at 3:00 p.m.; and the jury trial is set for February 10, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. 7. These requirements do not affect the rights of the parties to seek other discovery from non-parties in conformance with the applicable Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California and the deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order. 8. Counsel are urged to meet and confer to seek to resolve any remaining or future issues onthese discovery-related matters. (shb)
October 31, 2014 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REQUEST to Continue Expert Discovery Cutoff Date To Allow Counter-Claimants' Experts to Supplement Their Expert Financial Reports from December 4, 2014 to January 5, 2015 #141 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
October 30, 2014 Filing 141 REQUEST to Continue Expert Discovery Cutoff Date To Allow Counter-Claimants' Experts to Supplement Their Expert Financial Reports from December 4, 2014 to January 5, 2015 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Request to Extend Time To Supplement Expert Reports, #2 Proposed Order Granting Request to Extend Time to Supplement Expert Reports)(Duvall, Paul)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt Re DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE'S MOTION TO REVIEW THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES (DKTS. 83, 88) : Counterclaimants' Motion is GRANTED IN PART. Counterclaimants may redact the following passages of Log Entry 47: (i) the first clause of the first sentence, up to the comma; and (ii) the second and third sentences of paragraph 7 and all of paragraph 8 (the text from "We prefer" through "resolution"). The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. No later than November 5, 2014, Counterclaimants shall produce to Plaintiffs all documents required under this Order and Judge Rosenberg's September 17, 2014 Order. Refer to the Court's order for details. #83 #88 (pso)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt RE: PLAINTIFFS' AND COUNTERDEFENDANTS'MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 . The Motion is DENIED. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RULING ON PLAINTIFFS'AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS'EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Refer to document for details regarding the Court's order. #136 (pso)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RULING ON EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS BY COUNTERCLAIMANTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Refer to document for details regarding the Court's order. #111 (pso)
October 28, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106), #135 (King, Howard)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge John A. Kronstadt.The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Motion Related Document, #126 , for the following reasons: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order, evidentiary objections shall be prepared consistent with Exhibit G. Dkt. 67 . Counsel shall lodge a proposed order by October 28, 2014. (lom)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS' REQUEST TO SUBMIT APPELLATE RECORD (DKT. #133 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On October 22, 2014, Nona Marvisa Gaye and Frankie Christian Gaye ("Defendants") filed a request ("Request") for the Court to accept and admit into the record appellate briefs and certain appellate and trial documents from the court files of Three Boys Music Corp. v. Bolton, 212 F.3d 477 (9th Cir. 2000). Dkt. 133. This decision has already been thoroughly briefed by the Parties in connection with Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment ("Motion"), Defendants' Opposition thereto, and Plaintiffs' Reply. Accordingly, the proposed supplemental materials are not required, and Defendants' Request is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 22, 2014 Filing 133 REQUEST for Consideration of to Submit Appellate Record of Three Boys Music Corp. v. Bolton filed by Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Request to Submit Appellate Record of Three Boys Music Corp. v. Bolton)(Duvall, Paul)
October 22, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/20/14, 10:00 AM re Transcript #131 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 22, 2014 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/20/14, 10:00 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2015. (Joko, Alexander)
October 21, 2014 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to DEFENDANTS Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye Court Reporter. Court will contact Sherie Johnson at sjohnson@kingballow.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: October 20, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Duvall, Paul)
October 20, 2014 Filing 129 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF PHARRELL WILLIAMS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 Hearing held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The motion hearing is held. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to deny Plaintiff Pharrell Williams's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (the "Motion"). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and will issue a ruling. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (lom)
September 25, 2014 Filing 128 OPPOSITION to Amended MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's July 10, 2014 Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses re Order on Motion to Compel,,,,, #80 #88 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO COUNTER-CLAIMANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE'S STATEMENT OF REMAINING OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE'S ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
September 23, 2014 Filing 127 STATEMENT of Remaining Objections to the Magistrate's Order [Dkt. No. 123] [Pursuant to Judge Kronstradt's Order - Dkt. No. 124] Regarding Amended MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's July 10, 2014 Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses re Order on Motion to Compel,,,,, #80 #88 filed by Counter Claimant Nona Marvisa Gaye, Defendant Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch In Support Of Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Statement of Remaining Objections To The Magistrate's Order including Exhibit 1)(Duvall, Paul)
September 22, 2014 Filing 126 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN - PLAINTIFF'S AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; [PROPOSED] ORDER re MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Seth) Modified on 10/27/2014 (lom). (see Order #135 , re stricken document.)
September 22, 2014 Filing 125 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND DIRECTING COUNTER-CLAIMANTS TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (Dkt. #88 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counter-Claimants brought an Amended "Motion to Review [the] Magistrate's Order re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses" (the "Motion") on July 21, 2014. Dkt. 88. Magistrate Judge Rosenberg did not finalize her order (the "Order") with respect to the matters raised in the Motion until September 17, 2014. Dkt. #123 . Pursuant to Local Rule 72-2.1 and this Court's Standing Orders (p. 8, 8(a)), a party seeking review and reconsideration of an order issued by a Magistrate Judge must identify the specific portions of the order to which an objection is made and state the grounds for each such objection. The Motion raised several issues with respect to discovery disputes that, according to Counter-Claimants, are no longer at issue. Dkt. 113. Further, Counter-Claimants have not identified those matters that remain at issue. Nor have they addressed with specificity those rulings in the Order as to which they continue to seek review. For these reasons, the September 22, 2014 hearing is taken off calendar. If Counter-Claimants continue to seek review of the Order, on or before September 23, 2014, they shall file a statement, not to exceed three pages, that lists the specific rulings in the Order that they presently dispute. They shall also state briefly the basis for each such objection and then refer to the Docket Entry and pages of their prior briefing where that position is addressed. For example, the Order designates certain documents that are to be produced some in redacted forms by Counter-Claimants. If Counter-Claimants object to the production of only some of these documents, they shall identify such documents in their September 23 filing and then refer to the pages in the prior briefing where the basis for each objection is addressed. Plaintiffs may file a three-page response, on or before September 25, 2014. It shall follow the same format. Thus, as to each issue identified by Counter-Claimants, Plaintiffs shall state their position and refer to the pages in their earlier briefing that addresses that issue. Upon receiving any supplemental filing, the Court will determine whether a hearing will be held on the Motion, further briefing is required, or if the matter will be taken under submission. #88 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE IN CAMERA REVIEW by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: Discovery Hearing, #101 , In Camera Hearing #100 . Pursuant to this court's order dated July 10, 2014 (Dkt. No. 80), Defendants delivered Items 1-5, 10-12, 25-26, 29-30, 36-51, 53-57, 59-60, 62-65, 67-69, 71, 73-78 and 81 on the privilege log for in camera review in response to Document Request Nos. 15-16. This court heard oral argument. (Dkt. Nos. 100-101.) SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (mp)
September 15, 2014 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Richard S. Busch in Support of Counter-Claimants' Opposition to Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 with Exhibits 1 through 7 attached [Portions previously Filed Under Seal on September 8, 2014; Now Being E-Filed Pursuant to Judge Kronstadt's Order (Document 119) filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch (8 through 10), #2 Exhibit to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch ( 11 through16))(Duvall, Paul)
September 15, 2014 Filing 121 JOINT STATEMENT of Additional Material Facts in Support of Counter-Claimants' Joint Opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 [Previously Filed Under Seal on September 8, 2014; Now Being E-Filed Pursuant to Judge Kronstadt's Order (Document 119) filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
September 15, 2014 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 [Counter-Claimants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] [Unredacted Full Version being e-filed pursuant to Judge Kronstadt's Order (Document 119) filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE: COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DKT. 106, 118) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: It is hereby ordered: The Application to File Documents Under Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The following document attached to the Application shall be filed under seal: Exhibit 16 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch, containing video segments of the depositions of Robin Thicke and Pharrell Williams. The Application to File Documents Under Seal is DENIED with respect to all other documents. No showing of good cause has been made to restrict public access to such materials. Counsel shall file the documents by September 15, 2014 and make them available on the public docket. IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm)
September 11, 2014 Filing 118 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Under Seal Filing #106 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Miller, Seth)
September 11, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. correcting Statement (Motion related),,, #112 (Duvall, Paul)
September 9, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. correcting Statement (Motion related),,, #112 of Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Richard S. Busch (Duvall, Paul)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEFERRING TO RULE ON DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (Dkt. #106 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has received Defendants' Application to File Documents under Seal. The Application states that the Defendants seek to file all or some of the materials under seal because they have been designated as confidential by another party pursuant to a protective order. Pursuant to this Court's Order re Under Seal Pilot Program III.4, the party who has designated the materials confidential shall file, on or before September 11, 2014, a document providing: (i) the reasons the materials should be filed under seal; and (ii) the portions within the materials that are confidential. This document shall be entitled: "ADDENDUM TO APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER." The Court defers ruling on the Application until the Addendum has been filed. #106 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 8, 2014 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Counter-Claimants' Opposition to Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 113 REPLY in support of motion Amended MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's July 10, 2014 Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses re Order on Motion to Compel,,,,, #80 #88 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Review Magistrate's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses)(Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 112 JOINT STATEMENT of Counter-Claimants' Joint Evidence in Support of Their Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch and Exhibits, CONT., #2 Exhibit (s) of Richard S.Busch, CONT.; Declaration of Judith Finell; Declaration of Ingrid Monson; Declaration of Ronald Aston, #3 Declaration of Tom Court; Declaration of Janis Gaye)(Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 111 JOINT STATEMENT of SEPARATE STATEMENT OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Ruling on Evidentiary Objections by Counter-Claimants)(Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 110 JOINT STATEMENT of OF GENUINE DISPUTES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 [SUBMITTED CONCURRENTLY WITH COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' JOINT MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Thumbdrives and DVD Containing Exhibits in Support of Counter-Claimants' Opposition] re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #108 (Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 [JOINT] filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attorney Paul H Duvall added to party Marvin Gaye, III(pty:cc), Attorney Paul H Duvall added to party Marvin Gaye, III(pty:cc), Attorney Paul H Duvall added to party Marvin Gaye, III(pty:dft))(Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [JOINT] NOTICE OF LODGING OF DVD CONTAINING AN EXHIBIT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF COUNTER-CLAIMANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT] re Notice of Under Seal Filing #106 (Duvall, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III(an individual), Nona Marvisa Gaye (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Order Application To File Documents Under Seal)(Duvall, Paul)
September 4, 2014 Filing 105 JOINT REPORT of MEDIATION filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
August 29, 2014 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Amended MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's July 10, 2014 Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses re Order on Motion to Compel,,,,, #80 #88 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE'S MOTION TO REVIEW MAGISTRATE'S ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Miller, Seth)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEPOSITION OF SANDY WILBUR by Judge John A. Kronstadt. After full consideration of the papers filed in connection with the Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Deposition of Sandy Wilbur #102 , the Court finds that there is good cause to GRANT the extension requested. The parties have until 8/27/2014 complete the Deposition of Sandy Wilbur. (jp)
August 4, 2014 Filing 102 Joint STIPULATION to Continue The Deposition Of Sandy Wilbur from August 13, 2014 to August 27, 2014 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,,,, 99 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Paul H. Duvall In Support Of Joint Stipulation To Extend Time For Deposition Of Sandy Wilbur, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Extend Time For Deposition Of Sandy Wilbur)(Duvall, Paul)
July 31, 2014 Filing 101 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. FURTHER PROCEEDINGS RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES #68 . The Court and counsel confer as stated on the record. The Court takes the matter undersubmission. Court Recorder: CS 7/31/2014. (mp)
July 31, 2014 Filing 100 MINUTES OF In Camera Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. In Camera Review Hearing is held. The Court questions the counsel. The transcript is under seal and in camera.Court Recorder: CS 7/31/2014. (mp)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR COUNTERCLAIMANTS RULE 56(d) MOTION (DKT. 95) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the Ex Parte Application (the Application) (Dkt. 95). Through the Application, Defendants/Counterclaimants contend that they will suffer prejudice if they are required to file their Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (the Motion) (Dkt. 89) on August 12, 2014, as required by the Courts Standing Order. They also state that they will not be able to depose Plaintiffs expert witness, Sandy Wilbur, obtain rebuttal evidence from their expert witnesses and prepare their Opposition by that date. Counterclaimants contend that Ms. Wilbur was not identified as an expert prior to the date on which the Motion was filed. Plaintiffs oppose the Application. Dkt. 98. They contend that they have agreed to make Ms. Wilbur available for deposition on or before August 8, 2014. As a result, they contend that Counterclaimants will not suffer prejudice if the deadline for filing their Opposition remains August 12, 2014. The Motion is set to be heard on October 20, 2014. There is no showing that Plaintiffs will suffer prejudice, or that a separate motion pursuant to Rule 56(d) should be heard, so long as the time for filing the Opposition is extended to permit the deposition of Ms. Wilbur. For these reasons, the Application is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs shall make Ms. Wilbur available for deposition at a mutually convenient time on or before August 13, 2014. Counterclaimants shall file their Opposition on or before September 8, 2014. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply on or before September 22, 2014. The Motion shall remain on the calendar to be heard on October 20, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. The Court encourages counsel to work collaboratively in the future to seek to resolve such scheduling issues by stipulation. #95 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc1, ) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2014 Filing 98 OPPOSITION to Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [of Counter-Claimants For An Order To Shorten Time To Hear Counter-Claimants' Rule 56(d) Motion; to Extend Consideration of and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; #95 filed by Counter Defendant Pharrell Williams. (King, Howard)
July 29, 2014 Filing 97 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE #68 . A Telephone Hearing with all counsel on the pending motion to compel is set for 7/31/2014 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The call in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 1112#; User Password: 0767#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space & Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2014 Filing 96 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. In Camera Telephonic Hearing is set for 7/31/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg with only counsel for the Gay Defendants #80 . The call in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 7002#; User Password: 3563#. If Counsel for the Gay Defendants have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space & Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2014 Filing 95 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [of Counter-Claimants For An Order To Shorten Time To Hear Counter-Claimants' Rule 56(d) Motion; to Extend Consideration of and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; or in the Alternative, to Extend the Date for Opposition] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Ex Parte Application For an Order to Shorten Time to Hear Counter-Claimants' Rule 56(d) Motion; To Extend Consideration of and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; or in the Alternative, to Extend The Date for Opposition, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support, #3 Declaration of Paul H. Duvall in Support, #4 Declaration of Ingrid T. Monson in Support, #5 Declaration of Judith Finell in Support, #6 Proposed Order in Support)(Duvall, Paul)
July 24, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Statement (Motion related), #90 , Miscellaneous Document, #91 , Motion Related Document #93 . The following error(s) was found: Civil Events - select Other Filings - Notices - Notice of Lodging and attach the Proposed Judgment, also prepare the same for the Statement of Interested Parties. The event for document 91 should be Motions & Related Filings - Motion Related Documents and link to the motion. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 22, 2014 Filing 93 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT re MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
July 22, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF MUSIC CD re MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 (Miller, Seth)
July 22, 2014 Filing 91 PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE re: MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF SANDY WILBUR, #2 Declaration OF DONNA STOCKETT, #3 Declaration SETH MILLER, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D - Part 1, #8 Exhibit D - Part 2, #9 Exhibit D - Part 3, #10 Exhibit D - Part 4, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Miller, Seth)
July 22, 2014 Filing 90 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #89 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
July 22, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 10/20/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Miller, Seth)
July 21, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's July 10, 2014 Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses re Order on Motion to Compel,,,,, #80 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Review the Magistrate Judge's Order Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses)(Duvall, Paul)
July 18, 2014 Filing 87 MINUTES OF denying #82 Ex Parte Application for Order; Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING JULY 10, 2014 ORDER. On July 16, 2014, Defendants and Counterclaimants filed an ex parte application for an order staying this court's Order dated July 10, 2014, pending the District Judge's ruling on the Gaye Defendants' objections to the order. (Dkt. No. 82.) On July 17, 2014, Plaintiffs filed an opposition. (Dkt. No. 86.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' ex parte application for a stay of this court's Order dated July 10, 2014 is DENIED. (See Order for details.)Court Recorder: CS 7/18/2014. (mp)
July 17, 2014 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Staying Magistrate's July 10, 2014, Order Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Notice of Motion Regarding Objections to Magistrate's Order #82 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Seth)
July 17, 2014 Filing 85 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Telephonic hearing regarding Defendants and Counter-Claimants' Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Magistrate's July 10, 2014 order Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants Notice of Motion Regarding Objections to Magistrate's Order #82 is set for Friday, July 18, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. The call-in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 7002#; User password: 7514#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space & Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 16, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Staying Magistrate's July 10, 2014, Order Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Notice of Motion Regarding Objections to Magistrate's Order #82 [NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING MAGISTRATE'S JULY 10, 2014 ORDER PENDING DISTRICT COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER] (Duvall, Paul)
July 16, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's July 10, 2014 Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses re Order on Motion to Compel,,,,, #80 [OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES] filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Objections to Magistrate's Order re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses)(Duvall, Paul)
July 16, 2014 Filing 82 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Staying Magistrate's July 10, 2014, Order Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Notice of Motion Regarding Objections to Magistrate's Order filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Magistrate's July 10, 2014, Order Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Objections to Magistrate's Order, #2 Declaration of Paul H. Duvall In Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application, #3 Proposed Order Re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Magistrate's July 10, 2014 Order Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Objections to Magistrate's Order)(Duvall, Paul)
July 15, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING AUGUST 28, 2014, MEDIATION WITH JUDGE MATZ (RET.) filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting in part and denying in part #68 Motion to Compel. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES. On June 13, 2014, Plaintiffs filed a motion to compel further responses to Document Request Nos. 5 and 15-19. (Dkt. Nos. 68-69.) On June 24, 2014, the parties filed supplemental memoranda. (Dkt. Nos. 70-71.) This matter is appropriate for adjudication without oral argument. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART asfollows: 1. On or before July 21, 2014, the Gaye Defendants shall produce documents responsive to Document Request Nos. 5 and 17-18 to the extent set forth above. 2. On or before July 21, 2014, the Gaye Defendants shall submit Entries 1-5, 10-12, 25-26, 29-30, 36-51, 53-57, 59-60, 62-65, 67-69, 71, 73-78 and 81 to the Clerk, Marine Pogosyan, who can be reached at (213) 894-5419. The documents may be submitted in hard copy or electronically. However, each document must be clearly labeled with the corresponding entry number on the privilege log. If submitted electronically, it is sufficient if each document can be accessed by a link to the corresponding entry on the privilege log. 3. In all other respects, Plaintiffs' motion is denied. (See Order for details.) (mp)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING DATE FOR NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OR JOINT REPORT RE SETTLEMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On July 9, 2014, the Court approved the parties' request to continue the last day to complete mediation. Dkt. 78. If a settlement is reached, the parties are ordered to file a notice of settlement, with a proposed date by which the matter will be dismissed on or before September 5, 2014. If a notice of settlement is not filed, counsel shall file a joint report by September 5, 2014, regarding the status of settlement and whether a second session would be productive. The joint report shall not disclose the substantive contents of any settlement communications between the parties. #78 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES #75 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The following scheduling dates previously set by the Court will be reset as follows: August 29, 2014: Last day to participate in settlement conference/mediation; October 31, 2014: Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff; October 31, 2014, Initial Expert Disclosures; November 10, 2014 Rebuttal Expert Disclosures; December 4, 2014: Expert Discovery Cutoff; December 22, 2014: Last day to hear motions; January 26, 2015: Final Pretrial Conference / Motions in Limine at 3:00 p.m. February 6, 2015: Status Conference re Exhibits at 3:00 p.m. (lom) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lom).
July 7, 2014 Filing 77 TEXT ONLY NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #68 scheduled for July 8, 2014 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. A minute order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 1, 2014 Filing 76 DECLARATION re Stipulation to Continue #75 DECLARATION OF SETH MILLER IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Miller, Seth)
July 1, 2014 Filing 75 STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL AND RELATED DATES filed by Plaintiffs, et al. Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Seth)
June 30, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #71 [SPECIFICALLY CORRECTING THE NAME OF THE COURT ON THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. BUSCH (attached as #1 to Document 71) THAT WAS INCORRECTLY STATED] (Duvall, Paul)
June 25, 2014 Filing 73 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The document is accepted as filed RE: MOTION to Supplement MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS NONA MARVISA GAYE AND FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE re MOTION to Co #70 . (kl)
June 25, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Supplement MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS NONA MARVISA GAYE AND FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE re MOTION to Co #70 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Supplement (Motion Related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kl)
June 24, 2014 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE #68 filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, Counter Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Non Marvisa Gaye's Supplemental Memorndum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' First Set of Production of Documents)(Duvall, Paul)
June 24, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS AND COUNTER-CLAIMANTS NONA MARVISA GAYE AND FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE re MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE #68 , Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #69 filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Miller, Seth)
June 13, 2014 Filing 69 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE #68 filed by Plaintiff Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Miller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Declaration of Richard S. Busch, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C)(Miller, Seth)
June 13, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SET OF DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE filed by Plaintiffs Pharrelll Williams. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Miller, Seth)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER(S) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that the Court has amended one or more of its Standing Orders. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the Order(s). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Stipulation for Protective Order #63 . Upon stipulation of the parties and consideration of the representation of the parties and the matters presented to the Court, the Court enters this Order to provide for protection of the respective parties' proprietary data for purposes of discovery and pre-trial in this proceeding. (See Order for details.) (mp)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, granting Stipulation to Complete Mediation. #64 . It is hereby ordered that the last date to complete mediation is June 30, 2014. If a settlement is reached, the parties are ordered to file a notice of settlement, with a proposed date by which the matter will be dismissed. If asettlement is not reached, counsel shall file a joint report no later than July 30, 2014, regarding the status of settlement and whether a second session would be productive. The joint report shall not disclose the substantive contents of any settlement communications between the parties. (shb)
April 8, 2014 Filing 64 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Time to Complete Mediation from April 30, 2014 to June 30, 2014 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Complete Mediation, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Mediation Completion Date to June 30, 2014)(Duvall, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Filing 63 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants Geffen Records, Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Paula Maxine Patton, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Clifford Harris, Jr(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Robin Thicke(pty:cd))(Miller, Seth)
March 26, 2014 Filing 62 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Bridgeport Music Inc filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Pharrelll Williams(an individual), Universal Music Distribution, Clifford Harris, Jr, Geffen Records, Star Trek Entertainment, Interscope Records, Paula Maxine Patton, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Pharrell Williams, Robin Thicke, UMG Recordings.(Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Geffen Records(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Clifford Harris, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Clifford Harris, Jr(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Interscope Records(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Paula Maxine Patton(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Star Trek Entertainment(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Robin Thicke(pty:pla), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Robin Thicke(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party UMG Recordings(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Universal Music Distribution(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Pharrell Williams(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Pharrelll Williams(pty:cd), Attorney Seth A Miller added to party Pharrelll Williams(pty:pla))(Miller, Seth)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Stipulation to Reset Mediation, #60 . Good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ordered that the last date tocomplete mediation is April 30, 2014. If a settlement is reached, the parties are ordered to file a notice of settlement, with a proposed date by which the matter will be dismissed. If a settlement is not reached, counsel shall file a joint report no later than April 28, 2014, regarding the status of settlement and whether a second sessionwould be productive. The joint report shall not disclose the substantive contents ofany settlement communications between the parties. (shb)
January 27, 2014 Filing 60 STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiffs and Counterdefendants Geffen Records, Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Paula Maxine Patton, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Stephen)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, GRANTING Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)),, #57 , Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc., EMI April, Inc. and Jobete Music Co., Inc. terminated. (shb)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND LAST DATE TO AMEND OR ADD PARTIES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Schedule set by the Court in this matter (Doc. No. 54) is amended to provide that the Parties in this action may have up to and including January 13, 2014, to amend their pleadings or add parties with respect to the EMI Third-Party Defendants and their parents, affiliated, and/or subsidiaries., re Stipulation to Continue,, #56 (bp)
January 13, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) [Voluntary Notice of Dismissal of Counterclaim Against EMI Third-Party Defendants] as to EMI April, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Counterclaim Against EMI Third-Party Defendants, #2 Proposed Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Counterclaim Against EMI Third-Party Defendants)(Duvall, Paul)
January 9, 2014 Filing 56 Joint STIPULATION to Continue The Deadline for the Parties to Amend Their Pleadings or Add Parties In This Action with Respect to the EMI Third Party Defendants from January 10, 2014 to January 13, 2014 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard S. Busch in Support of Joint Stipulation to Extend Last Date to Amend or Add Parties, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Last Date to Amend or Add Parties)(Duvall, Paul)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/31/14. (ir)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ON COURT/JURY TRIAL by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court sets the following trial dates: Jury Trial - November 18, 2014 at 9:00 a.m.; Status Conference re Exhibits - November 14, 2014 at 3:00 p.m.; and Final Pretrial Conference - November 3, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for all parties shall comply with this Courts standing orders with respect to documents to be prepared and filed in connection with the Final Pretrial Conference. (ake)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING ACQUISITION, INC.; EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.; AND JOBETE MUSIC CO., INC. TO RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Third Party Defendants may have up to and including January 13, 2014, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Counterclaim in this action. There will be no further extensions. (jloz)
December 30, 2013 Filing 51 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 13, 2014 re Counterclaim, #14 filed by Third-Party Defendants EMI April, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Niborski, #2 Proposed Order)(Niborski, Michael)
December 16, 2013 Filing 54 MINUTES: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The scheduling conference is held. The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case and the parties' December 6, 2013 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: (See document for further details) by Judge John A. Kronstadt Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (ir)
December 16, 2013 Filing 50 ANSWER to Counterclaim, #36 ANSWER TO DEFENDANT MARVIN GAYE III'S COUNTERCLAIMS; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Geffen Records, Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Paula Maxine Patton, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams.(Rothschild, Stephen)
December 13, 2013 Filing 49 ANSWER to Counterclaim, #14 ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE'S COUNTERCLAIMS; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Geffen Records, Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Paula Maxine Patton, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke(an individual), UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams.(Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Geffen Records(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Interscope Records(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Paula Maxine Patton(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Star Trek Entertainment(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Robin Thicke(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party UMG Recordings(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Universal Music Distribution(pty:cd), Attorney Stephen D Rothschild added to party Pharrell Williams(pty:cd))(Rothschild, Stephen)
December 6, 2013 Filing 48 REPORT of JOINT RULE 16(B) REPORT filed by Third Party Defendants EMI April, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc., Counter Defendants Geffen Records, Clifford Harris, Jr, Clifford Harris, Jr, Clifford Harris, Jr, Interscope Records, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Paula Maxine Patton, Star Trek Entertainment, Robin Thicke, Robin Thicke, Robin Thicke, UMG Recordings, Universal Music Distribution, Pharrell Williams, Pharrelll Williams, Pharrelll Williams, Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. (Rothschild, Stephen)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING ACQUISITIONS, INC.; EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.; and JOBETE MUSIC CO., INC. TO RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, based on the concurrently filed Stipulation, and for good cause shown, Third-Party Defendants SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING ACQUISITION, INC.; EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.; and JOBETE MUSIC CO., INC. may have up to and including December 20, 2013 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Counterclaim in this action. #46 , by Judge John A. Kronstadt (bp)
November 27, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jobete Music Co., Inc. answer now due 12/20/2013; Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc. answer now due 12/20/2013; EMI April, Inc. answer now due 12/20/2013, filed by Third Party Defendants Jobete Music Co., Inc.; Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc.; EMI April, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Niborski, #2 Proposed Order)(Niborski, Michael)
November 26, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Niborski on behalf of Third Party Defendants Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc., EMI April, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. (Attorney Michael J Niborski added to party Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Michael J Niborski added to party EMI April, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Michael J Niborski added to party Jobete Music Co., Inc.(pty:3pd))(Niborski, Michael)
November 21, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE DEFENDANT MARVIN GAYE III'S COUNTERCLAIM (DKT. 36) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please take notice that the following deficiencies have been found with your electronically filed document: 1. the names of additional parties were not added properly to the docket; and 2. the caption does not reflect accurately all parties. Defendant shall submit to the Court's Docket Quality Analyst ("DQA") (Sharon Hall-Brown at sharon_hall-brown@cacd.uscourts.gov) by November 22, 2013, a PDF version of the entire Counterclaim with the corrected title page which names correctly all parties consistent with each caption, i.e., complaint, counterclaim, crossclaim, etc. The DQA shall replace the corrected caption page of the Counterclaim in Dkt. 36 and amend the docket so that all parties are named properly. Any future initiating document that is e-filed incorrectly will be stricken. #36 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, GRANTING Stipulation to Continue the Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/2/13 #34 . The currently set scheduling conference of December 2, 2013 is continued to December 16, 2013 at 1:30 p.m.; and 2. The parties' joint report shall be filed no later than December 6, 2013. (ir)
November 20, 2013 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Counter-Claimant Marvin Gaye, III, re Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) #38 served on November 19, 2013. (Philips, Paul)
November 20, 2013 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Marvin Gaye, III, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #37 served on November 19, 2013. (Philips, Paul)
November 20, 2013 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Counter-Claimant Marvin Gaye, III, re Counterclaim #36 served on November 19, 2013. (Philips, Paul)
November 20, 2013 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Marvin Gaye, III, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #35 served on November 19, 2013. (Philips, Paul)
November 19, 2013 Filing 38 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Marvin Gaye, III. (Philips, Paul)
November 19, 2013 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Counter-Claimant Marvin Gaye, III, (Philips, Paul)
November 19, 2013 Filing 36 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendants Clifford Harris, Jr, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams; Jury Demand, filed by Counter-Claimant Marvin Gaye, III.(Philips, Paul) (Main Document 36 replaced on 11/22/2013) (shb).
November 19, 2013 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Marvin Gaye, III.(Philips, Paul)
November 19, 2013 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference from December 2, 2013 to December 16, 2013 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference, #16 filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing The Scheduling Conference Currently Set for December 2, 2013)(Duvall, Paul)
November 19, 2013 Filing 33 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response of Marvin Gaye III to Complaint filed by Defendant Marvin Gaye, III.(Attorney Paul N Philips added to party Marvin Gaye, III(pty:dft))(Philips, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 32 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT EMI APRIL, INC. - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 8, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 31 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT GEFFEN RECORDS - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 8, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 30 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT INTERSCOPE RECORDS - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 12, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 29 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT JOBETE MUSIC CO., INC. - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 8, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 28 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON COUNTER-DEFENDANT MORE WATER FROM NAZARETH PUBLISHING, INC. - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 12, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 27 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT PAULA MAXINE PATTON, an individual, DBA HADDINGTON MUSIC - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 8, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 26 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/ Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING ACQUISITION, INC. - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 8, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 25 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, ON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT STAR TRAK ENTERTAINMENT - DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 12, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 24 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT UMG RECORDINGS, INC.- DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 8, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 23 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, UPON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL MUSIC DISTRIBUTION-- DOCUMENTS SERVED: Defendants Frankie Christian Gayes and Nona Marvisa Gayes Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Complaint; Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Order Setting Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties; Amended Proof of Service By Mail of Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye and Nona Marvisa Gaye Counterclaims; Summons; Complaint; Summons In a Civil Action; Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification as to Interested Parties; Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program; Initial Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt; Order Re Pilot Program for Under Seal Documents served on November 12, 2013. (Duvall, Paul)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard S. Busch on behalf of Defendants Nona Marvisa Gaye and Frankie Christian Gaye, designating Mark L. Block as local counsel. (lt)
November 12, 2013 Filing 21 APPLICATION for attorney Richard S. Busch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants/Cross-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Attorney Paul H Duvall added to party Frankie Christian Gaye(pty:cc), Attorney Paul H Duvall added to party Nona Marvisa Gaye(pty:cc))(Duvall, Paul)
October 31, 2013 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim, #14 as to Counter Defendants More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. (shb)
October 31, 2013 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, [AMENDED] PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEFENDANTS FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE COUNTERCLAIMS served on 10/30/2013. (Duvall, Paul)
October 31, 2013 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Counter-Claimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, by Mail of Frankie Christian Gaye's and Nona Marvisa Gaye's Counterclaim served on 10/30/2013. (Duvall, Paul)
October 30, 2013 Filing 17 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye, (Block, Mark)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Scheduling Conference is set for December 2, 2013 at 1:30 pm, with the Joint Report, which shall include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates, to be filed no later than November 22, 2013. (ake)
October 30, 2013 Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (Duvall, Paul)
October 30, 2013 Filing 14 DEFENDANTS' FRANKIE CHRISTIAN GAYE AND NONA MARVISA GAYE COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendants Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams, More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc; Jury Demand, filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye.(Attorney Mark L Block added to party Frankie Christian Gaye(pty:dft), Attorney Mark L Block added to party Nona Marvisa Gaye(pty:dft))(shb) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/1/2013) (shb).
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt ORDERING Defendant's counterclaim, Report on the Filing of an action regarding copyright, certificate of interested parties, defendant's supplemental information, demand for jury trial submitted by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye received on 10/29/2013 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (shb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2013: #1 counterclaim) (shb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2013: #2 Counterclaim received) (shb).
October 29, 2013 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Frankie Christian Gaye, Nona Marvisa Gaye.(Attorney Paul H Duvall added to party Frankie Christian Gaye(pty:dft), Attorney Paul H Duvall added to party Nona Marvisa Gaye(pty:dft))(Duvall, Paul)
October 28, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams, upon Defendant Marvin Gaye, III acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/23/2013, answer due 11/13/2013. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Paul N. Philips, Attorney. (Rothschild, Stephen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. upon Nona Marvisa Gaye waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/30/2013, answer due 10/29/2013. Waiver of Service signed by Richard S. Busch, Esq.. (Rothschild, Stephen)
September 30, 2013 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. upon Frankie Christian Gaye waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/30/2013, answer due 10/29/2013. Waiver of Service signed by Richard S. Busch, Esq.. (Rothschild, Stephen)
September 9, 2013 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PILOT PROGRAM FOR UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS by Judge John A Kronstadt: This Court is participating in a pilot program regarding the submission of sealed documents. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via email to the Judges Chambers email at: jak_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov consistent with this Order. (ake)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A Kronstadt: Please read this Order carefully. It governs this case and differs in some respect from the Local Rules. The Initial Standing Order can also be found on the Court's Website under Judge Kronstadt's Procedures and Schedules, which is always the most recent and updated version. (ake)
August 15, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 15, 2013 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. (et)
August 15, 2013 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AS TO Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams. (et) (mg).
August 15, 2013 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Bridgeport Music Inc, Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. (et)
August 15, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Bridgeport Music Inc, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Frankie Christian Gaye, Marvin Gaye, III, Nona Marvisa Gaye. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.), filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Harris, Jr, Robin Thicke, Pharrelll Williams.(et) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharrell Williams et al v. Bridgeport Music Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Paula Maxine Patton
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Geffen Records
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Michelle Beth Goodman
Represented By: Amanda R Farfel
Represented By: Peter I Ostroff
Represented By: Rollin A Ransom
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Interscope Records
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Michelle Beth Goodman
Represented By: Amanda R Farfel
Represented By: Peter I Ostroff
Represented By: Rollin A Ransom
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: UMG Recordings
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Michelle Beth Goodman
Represented By: Amanda R Farfel
Represented By: Peter I Ostroff
Represented By: Rollin A Ransom
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Pharrell Williams
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: More Water From Nazareth Publishing Inc
Represented By: Kathleen M Sullivan
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Daniel C Posner
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Star Trek Entertainment
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Michelle Beth Goodman
Represented By: Amanda R Farfel
Represented By: Peter I Ostroff
Represented By: Rollin A Ransom
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Universal Music Distribution
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Michelle Beth Goodman
Represented By: Amanda R Farfel
Represented By: Peter I Ostroff
Represented By: Rollin A Ransom
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robin Thicke an individual doing business as I Like'em Thicke Music
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Paula Maxine Patton individually doing business as Haddington Music
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: T. I.
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Harris, Jr
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Thicke
Represented By: Kathleen M Sullivan
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Daniel C Posner
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharrelll Williams
Represented By: Kathleen M Sullivan
Represented By: Mark E Haddad
Represented By: Stephen D Rothschild
Represented By: Daniel C Posner
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Seth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: EMI April, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Niborski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jobete Music Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Niborski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sony/ATV Music Publishing Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Niborski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Los Angeles County CSSD - Interstate
Represented By: Danit Weinberg Ferd
Represented By: Alexandra Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Gaye, III
Represented By: Paul N Philips
Represented By: Paul H Duvall
Represented By: Matthew Tyler Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nona Marvisa Gaye
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Represented By: Mark L Block
Represented By: Paul H Duvall
Represented By: Martin R Glick
Represented By: Sara R Ellis
Represented By: Daniel B Asimow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgeport Music Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie Christian Gaye
Represented By: Richard Steven Busch
Represented By: Mark L Block
Represented By: Paul H Duvall
Represented By: Martin R Glick
Represented By: Sara R Ellis
Represented By: Daniel B Asimow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?