Dana Suttles v. Patrick R Donahue
Plaintiff: Dana L Suttles
Defendant: Patrick R Donahue
Case Number: 2:2013cv06598
Filed: September 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, 49 , IT IS ADJUDGED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is hereby entered for Defendant Patrick R. Donahoe, Postmaster General. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (kh)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Order to Show Cause 6 is discharged. Plaintiff shall file a new proof of service no later than 1/7/2014. (vdr)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/26/2013. (vdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dana Suttles v. Patrick R Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana L Suttles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?