G & G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Naomi Lynn Mojica et al
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Defendant: Naomi Lynn Mojica and Rene Mojica
Case Number: 2:2013cv06734
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Presiding Judge: William D. Keller
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK: Judgment in favor of Plaintiff, G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, and against Defendant, Jorge Gomez, individually and dba Rauls Market aka Rauls Taqueria, entered on September 23, 2014, be and the same is hereby renewe d in the amounts as set forth below: Renewal of money judgment: a. Total judgment - $1,520.00; b. Costs after judgment - $0.00; c. Subtotal (add a and b) - $1,520.00; d. Credits - $0.00; e. Subtotal (subtract d from c) - & #036;1,520.00; f. Interest after judgment (.12%) - $35.39; g. Fee for filing renewal of application - $0.00; h. Total renewed judgment (add e, f and g) $1,555.39. Related to: REQUEST for Order for RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT, 38 . (shb)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than February 27, 2014 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant. (pg)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than December 6, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/6/2013. (pg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Naomi Lynn Mojica et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Lynn Mojica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Mojica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?