Brett Trenier v. HMS Host, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brett Trenier
Defendant: Host International, Inc., HMS Host, Inc. and Does 1-50, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Alexander S. Polsky
Case Number: 2:2013cv07008
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Complaint With Prejudice #131 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that The case is dismissed with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
August 1, 2017 Filing 131 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
July 10, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court has received a Notice of Settlement, filed July 7, 2017 (docket #129 ). The Court VACATES all pending dates. The parties are ordered to file a Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing the action on or before July 28 2017 or, in the alternative a Joint Status Report. Failure to comply with the Court's Order shall be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 7, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Pedersen, Neil)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Continue ADR Cut-off Deadline and to order Case to Private Mediation #127 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that (1) The ADR Cut-Off deadline is continued from 7/5/2017 to 7/7/2017; and (2) The selected ADR Procedure is changed from ADR Procedure No. 1 to ADR Procedure No. 3. (jp)
June 19, 2017 Filing 127 STIPULATION to Continue (1) ADR Cut-Off Deadline from July 5, 2017 to July 7, 2017; (2) change the selected ADR procedure from ADR Procedure No. 1 to ADR Procedure No. 3 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: re: ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM #23 , #120 , #121 Defendant's motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff's request for punitive damages. (rfi)
June 12, 2017 Filing 125 MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING Hearing held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT RE PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIM - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS (filed 5/22/2017) #120 #121 Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on the motion(s) and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
June 10, 2017 Filing 124 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 Plaintiff's Response to Host's Objections to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Supplemental Declaration in Response to Host's Objections to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief)(Jackson, Armond)
June 8, 2017 Filing 123 OBJECTIONS to Supplement(Motion related) #121 / Objections to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Pearson, Matthew)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Set deadlines and hearings (Confidential Settlement Statement due by 6/22/2017, Settlement Conference set for 6/29/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott.) (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
May 22, 2017 Filing 121 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jackson, Armond)
May 22, 2017 Filing 120 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. on Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Puntitive Damage Claim (Rosenthal, Margaret)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER FOR CIVIL JURY TRIAL by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell - SEE LAST PAGE FOR PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Motions in Limine to be filed by 7/31/2017. Last date for hearing on motions is 7/3/2017 at 1:30 PM [Deadline to file motions for summary judgment has expired.]. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/5/2017. Motions in Limine set for hearing on 8/21/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2017 at 3:00 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2017 at 8:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (cw)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 1 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/5/2017. (cw)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Scheduling of Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott #116 . [See document for details.] (san)
May 1, 2017 Filing 116 MINUTES OF Status Conference re Mandate held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: A hearing on the punitive damages claim is set 6/12/2017, at 1:30 PM; Jury Trial is set 9/5/2017, at 8:30 AM. The parties are ordered to appear for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott no later than 7/5/2017. *See Order for further details.* Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (cw)
May 1, 2017 Filing 115 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew D Pearson counsel for Defendant Host International, Inc.. Adding Matthew D. Pearson as counsel of record for Host International, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew D Pearson added to party Host International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pearson, Matthew)
May 1, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Neil Pedersen counsel for Plaintiff Brett Trenier. Changing firm name to Pedersen Law, APLC. Filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Pedersen, Neil)
May 1, 2017 Filing 113 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neil Pedersen counsel for Plaintiff Brett Trenier. Adding Armond M. Jackson as counsel of record for Brett Trenier for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Pedersen, Neil)
April 5, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Release of Abstract of Judgment #110 , Release of Abstract of Judgment #111 . The following error(s) was found: Document submitted as Miscellaneous Document [RELEASE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT). ***Courtesy notice: If both documents were due to a Satisfaction of judgment, please file a formal Satisfaction of Judgment, to be docketed under its specific event, located under the category: Miscellaneous filings (Other Documents): SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT***. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 111 Release of Abstract of Judgment Recorded with San Bernardino County Recorder re: Abstract of Judgment issued #106 , Abstract of Judgment issued, #105 (Inesta, Nancy)
April 4, 2017 Filing 110 Release of Abstract of Judgment Recorded with Los Angeles County Recorder re: Abstract of Judgment issued #106 , Abstract of Judgment issued, #105 (Inesta, Nancy)
March 30, 2017 Filing 109 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court sets this matter for a Status Conference on 5/1/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 27, 2017 Filing 108 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #95 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order #107 , CCA # 14-56537. The judgment of this Court, entered 3/3/2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure (jp)
March 3, 2017 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #95 filed by Brett Trenier. CCA # 14-56537. REVERSED and REMANDED.(mat)
February 17, 2015 Filing 106 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Defendant HMS Host, Inc. and against Brett Trenier in the principal amount of $35,042.31, interest of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 RE: Judgment #82 . (gk)
January 30, 2015 Filing 105 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of plaintiff HMS Host, Inc. and against Brett Trenier in the principal amount of $ 35,042.31, interest in the amount of $ 0.00, attorneys fees of $ 0.00, costs of $ 0.00. RE: Judgment #82 . (jp)
January 28, 2015 Filing 104 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy Inesta counsel for Defendant Host International, Inc.. Damon M. Brown is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Inesta, Nancy)
January 27, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date of Writ/Abstract is incorrect (refer to docket). Please return this form with the corrected document when returned to the clerk's office for filing. (jp)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES #88 , #89 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Defendants motion for attorneys fees is DENIED. The hearing set for October 20, 2014 is VACATED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (kss) .
October 6, 2014 Filing 101 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys' Fees #89 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
October 2, 2014 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Brett Trenier Court Reporter. Transcript portion requested: Other: 8/18/14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Jackson, Armond)
September 29, 2014 Filing 99 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 35,042.31 in favor of HMS Host, Inc, et al. and against Brett Trenier. RE: #93 (mb)
September 29, 2014 Filing 98 Opposition re: MOTION for Attorney Fees #88 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Brett Trenier, #2 Declaration Armond M. Jackson, #3 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Armond)
September 18, 2014 Filing 97 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-56537, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #95 as to Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (car)
September 17, 2014 Filing 96 DECLARATION in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys' Fees #89 Supplemental Declaration of Damon M. Brown in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
September 17, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #80 , Judgment, #82 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14469671 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Docketing Statement, #2 Representation Statement, #3 Order, #4 Judgment)(Jackson, Armond)
September 16, 2014 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Damon M. Brown in Support of APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Brett Trenier #93 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C, #2 Exhibit D to G)(Brown, Damon)
September 16, 2014 Filing 93 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Brett Trenier filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 9/26/2014 at 11:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Brown, Damon)
September 15, 2014 Filing 92 BILL OF COSTS Deficiency Notice Filed. The following deficiency was noted on the Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs #86 : (1) Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Applications/Clerk to Tax Costs. (2) L.R. 54-2.1: Scheduled for incorrect day of week. Bill of Costs hearings are held on Thursdays and Fridays. Counsel is to re-notice the corrected hearing information. (jp)
September 15, 2014 Filing 91 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell re: MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys' Fees #89 #88 . The matter was calendar for a court holiday. The Court, on its own motion, continues the motion to Monday, 10/20/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 12, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. correcting MOTION for Attorney Fees #88 , Notice (Other) #86 , Declaration (non-motion) #87 and Proposed Order (Inesta, Nancy)
September 12, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/13/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Inesta, Nancy)
September 12, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants Motion for Attorneys Fee, #2 Declaration Declaration of Damon M. Brown, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, B, C, and D to Declaration of Damon M. Brown, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E and F to Declaration of Damon M. Brown, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Inesta, Nancy)
September 11, 2014 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Damon M. Brown ISO Award of Costs filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
September 11, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. Application to Clerk to Tax Costs & Proposed Bill of Costs (Brown, Damon)
September 8, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/18/2014 at 1:47 p.m. re Transcript #84 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 8, 2014 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/18/2014 at 1:47 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra Ponce, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/29/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2014. (Ponce, Myra)
September 5, 2014 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Host International, Inc. Court Reporter. Court will contact Mario Campos at mcampos@bakerlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: August 18, 2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Inesta, Nancy)
August 29, 2014 Filing 82 JUDGMENT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Brett Trenier take nothing from Host International, Inc., that the action be dismissed on the merits with prejudice, that judgment for Defendant is granted and final, and that Defendant shall recover from Plaintiff its costs of suit. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
August 21, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re: [Proposed] Judgment re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #80 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #23 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (jloz)
August 18, 2014 Filing 79 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Matter called. Counsel state their appearances for the record. Court questions counsel as stated in court and on the record on above motion(s) and invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to follow. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (jloz)
August 5, 2014 Filing 78 Objection to New Evidence Presented in Reply re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Jackson, Armond)
August 4, 2014 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Margaret Rosenthal in Support of Reply to MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
August 4, 2014 Filing 76 REPLY to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Evidence in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
August 4, 2014 Filing 75 REPLY to Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues and Additional Disputed Facts Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
August 4, 2014 Filing 74 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
August 4, 2014 Filing 73 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
August 4, 2014 Filing 72 Evidentiary Objections to Declarations of Brett Trenier and Armond Jackson and in support of Host International's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re: In Camera Document 70 . The Court has conducted an in camera inspection of Privilege Host 106 and 107. The memo from Megan Zipp to Tammy McClintock on 106 should be produced in its entirety. The forwarded message on 106 and 107 containing a communication between corporate counsel and Tammy Oxenham is an attorney-client privileged communication. (san)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Discovery Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Four #49 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #61 . ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR THIS COURT TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO COMPEL EEO-1 REPORTS (Docket No. 49 and 61). Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application To Compel Production of EEO-1 Reports is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Host International, Inc. ("Host") represents that there are no such reports prior to 2007. It should serve a verification under oath and subject to penalty of perjury that such is the case by August 4, 2014. Host agreed to provide EEO-1 Reports after 2007 but now seeks relief from that agreement because of alleged non-compliance with the Protective Order by Plaintiff. The Court rejects that argument and ORDERS Host to complete production of any EEO-1 Reports from 2007 to the present not yet produced by August 4, 2014. (mp)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE DEFENDANT HOST INTERNATIONAL, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURTS ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott denying #64 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration #52 , #64 . [See Order for details.] (san)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: denying #59 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Injunction Relief and Sanctions. (rfi)
July 31, 2014 Filing 66 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel #52 #64 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Armond M. Jackson, #2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Armond)
July 31, 2014 Filing 65 Opposition Denying Request for Judicial Notice re: Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Immediate Injunctive Relief #59 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Jackson, Armond)
July 30, 2014 Filing 64 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel #52 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy Inesta, #2 Proposed Order)(Inesta, Nancy)
July 30, 2014 Filing 63 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Immediate Injunctive Relief #59 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Inesta, Nancy)
July 30, 2014 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Immediate Injunctive Relief #59 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Armond)
July 30, 2014 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Discovery Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Four #49 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Damon Brown, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Damon)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott granting #46 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Uphold Confidentiality Designations. [See Order for details.] (san)
July 29, 2014 Filing 59 Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Immediate Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Damon Brown, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Damon)
July 29, 2014 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Protective Order for /to Uphold Confidential Designation of Documents and Information Pursuant to the Parties' Protective Order #56 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
July 28, 2014 Filing 57 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for /to Uphold Confidential Designation of Documents and Information Pursuant to the Parties' Protective Order #56 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
July 28, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for /to Uphold Confidential Designation of Documents and Information Pursuant to the Parties' Protective Order filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Damon Brown, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Damon)
July 28, 2014 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING OF SEPARATELY BOUND EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Vol. I of II), #3 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING OF SEPARATELY BOUND EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Vol. II of II), #4 PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES AND ADDITIONAL DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Jackson, Armond)
July 28, 2014 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Uphold Confidentiality Designations #46 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Armond M. Jackson, #2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Armond)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR THIS COURT TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO COMPEL EEO-1 REPORTS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott granting in part and denying in part #49 Ex Parte Application for Order. [See Order for details.] (san)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE PLAINTIFF BRENT TRENIERS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott granting in part and denying in part #32 Motion to Compel. [See Order for details.] (san)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE PLAINTIFF BRENT TRENIER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF HMS HOST, INC. by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: denying #31 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories. [See Order for details.] (san)
July 25, 2014 Filing 50 Defendant's Limited OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Discovery Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Four #49 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
July 24, 2014 Filing 49 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant's Discovery Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Four filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Ex Parte Application Requesting Order to Compel Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Four, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application on Motion Compelling Defendants Discovery Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Four)(Jackson, Armond)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Plaintiff Brett Trenier apparently has agreed to stipulate to shorten time on hearing Defendant Host International, Inc's Motion To Uphold Confidentiality Designations ("Motion"). The Court will rule on the Motion expeditiously without hearing, before August 4, 2014. The Court needs a response from Plaintiff by Monday, July 28, 2014 to the Ex Parte Application #46 . **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.** (ch)
July 24, 2014 Filing 47 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of HMS Host, Inc. #31 , MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant #32 . The hearing is hereby VACATED. A ruling will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (san) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 22, 2014 Filing 46 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Uphold Confidentiality Designations filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Damon Brown, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Damon)
July 17, 2014 Filing 45 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 On the Court's own motion, the hearing date is continued to Monday, 8/18/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. All parties are ORDERED to appear on that date and time.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: denying #35 Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing the Motion for Summary Judgment. (rfi)
July 16, 2014 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Damon M. Brown IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of HMS Host, Inc. #31 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
July 15, 2014 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of HMS Host, Inc. #31 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
July 15, 2014 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant #32 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Inesta, Nancy)
July 15, 2014 Filing 40 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing #35 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Damon M. Brown, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Damon)
July 15, 2014 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of HMS Host, Inc. #31 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Jackson, Armond)
July 15, 2014 Filing 38 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of HMS Host, Inc. #31 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Jackson, Armond)
July 15, 2014 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant #32 filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Armond M. Jackson)(Jackson, Armond)
July 15, 2014 Filing 36 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Alexander S. Polsky: Mediation held on 6/27/14. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Polsky, Alexander)
July 14, 2014 Filing 35 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Armond M. Jackson, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Armond M. Jackson, #3 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Armond)
July 13, 2014 Filing 34 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.: Mediation held on June 27, 2014. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Inesta, Nancy)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that: The Parties' Stipulation #30 is APPROVED. The hearing on Defendant Host International Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment #23 is continued to August 11, 2014 and the deadlines to file the opposition and reply briefs to correspond to the new hearing date pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 56 and Section 8(b) of this Courts Standing Order. (jp)
July 3, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. Motion set for hearing on 7/29/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration Armond Jackson, #3 Declaration Damon Brown, #4 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Armond)
July 3, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of HMS Host, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier. Motion set for hearing on 7/29/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration Armond Jackson, #3 Declaration Damon Brown, #4 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Armond)
July 2, 2014 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment from August 4, 2014 to August 11, 2014 Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Inesta, Nancy)
July 1, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. correcting Appendix, #28 regarding the Declaration of Silvia Hernandez (Inesta, Nancy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 28 APPENDIX filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 CORRECTED COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4I, #2 Exhibit 5 - 5A-7, #3 Exhibit 5B - 5E-2, #4 Exhibit 5F - 5J)(Inesta, Nancy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 27 STATEMENT of /Corrected Statement of Undisputed Facts MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Inesta, Nancy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. correcting Statement (Motion related) #24 , Appendix #25 (Inesta, Nancy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 25 APPENDIX filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 4I, #2 Exhibit 5 to 5A-7, #3 Exhibit 5B to 5E-2, #4 Exhibit 5F to 5J)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
June 17, 2014 Filing 24 STATEMENT of UNDISPUTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW MOTION for Summary Judgment #23 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
June 16, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Continue #21 , The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled. Discovery cut-off is 8/4/2014., Last date for hearing on motions is 8/11/2014 at 1:30 pm, Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/8/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2014., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/18/2014., Jury Trial set for 10/14/2014 at 8:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell., Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2014 at 3:00 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
April 25, 2014 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial date from September 23, 2014 to October 14, 2014 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Margaret Rosenthal, #2 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re Stipulation for Protective Order #19 . (san)
April 8, 2014 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
February 6, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Alexander S. Polsky has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
January 31, 2014 Filing 17 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Alexander S. Polsky may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.(Inesta, Nancy)
January 16, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of address by Damon M Brown attorney for Defendant Host International, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Brown, Damon)
January 16, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of address by Nancy Inesta attorney for Defendant Host International, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Inesta, Nancy)
January 16, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of address by Margaret Rosenthal attorney for Defendant Host International, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL JURY TRIAL ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Trial Estimate: 4 days. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2013. Discovery cut-off is 7/14/2014. Motions in Limine to be filed by 8/18/2014. Last date for hearing on motion is 7/21/2014 at 1:30 pm. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/11/2014. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/28/2014. Hearing on Motions in Limine set for hearing on 9/15/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2014 at 3:00 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2014 at 8:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (rfi)
December 9, 2013 Filing 11 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Counsel states their appearances for the record. Court conducts Scheduling Conference. Counsel inform the Court that their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-14 is the Attorney Settlement Officer Panel.The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed no later than July 28, 2014. Civil Jury Trial Order to follow. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi)
December 2, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Damon M Brown on behalf of Defendant Host International, Inc. (Attorney Damon M Brown added to party Host International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brown, Damon)
December 2, 2013 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Host International, Inc... (Inesta, Nancy)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND JOINT REPORT by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2013 at 1:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at BRO_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (rfi)
September 25, 2013 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Host International, Inc., of court generated documents received after filing Notice of Removal and Notice to the State court of removal of action to Federal court served on 09/20/2013 and 09/23/2013. (Inesta, Nancy)
September 20, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(esa)
September 20, 2013 Filing 4 DECLARATION of LAURA BABIN in support of Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc. (esa) (mg).
September 20, 2013 Filing 3 DECLARATION of MEGAN ZIPP in support of Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendant Host International, Inc. (esa) (mg).
September 20, 2013 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Host International, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent HMSHost Corporation, Other Affiliate Autogrill SpA, Other Affiliate Autogrill Group, Inc. for Host International, Inc. (esa) (mg).
September 20, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of CA, Los Angeles County, case number BC516831 with conformed copies of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, discovery to Magistrate Judge John E McDermott; (Filing fee $ 400 PAID ); filed by defendant Host International, Inc.(esa) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2013: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg).
September 20, 2013 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Brett Trenier, upon Defendant HMS Host, Inc. served on 8/22/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Inc, Agent of Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
September 20, 2013 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint #1 filed by defendant Host International, Inc.(esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brett Trenier v. HMS Host, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Alexander S. Polsky
Represented By: Alexander S Polsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Host International, Inc.
Represented By: Damon M Brown
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Represented By: Nancy Inesta
Represented By: Matthew D Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMS Host, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Trenier
Represented By: Neil Pedersen
Represented By: Armond Marced Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?