United States of America et al v. Metic Transplantation Lab Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Schellenberg, Justin Dooley and United States of America
Defendant: Metic IC Inc, Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc and University of Southern California
Case Number: 2:2013cv07039
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Filing 139 SCHEDULING NOTICE OF DENYING AS MOOT by Judge S. James Otero. The Court Denies as moot the APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs [ECF #118], the MOTION for Attorney Fees [ECF #119] and the Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs [ECF #132]. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #129 filed by Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. CCA # 17-56085. This appeal isvoluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal.A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (lom)
October 5, 2017 Filing 137 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Attorney Fees, #119 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
August 9, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE of Settlement by Parties Pending USDOJ Consent filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
August 8, 2017 Filing 135 The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. [ecf #119], set for hearing on August 14, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2017 Filing 134 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #119 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2017 Filing 133 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56085 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #129 as to Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (lom)
July 28, 2017 Filing 132 Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg, United States of America re: Judgment, #116 , filed by Defendants University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
July 26, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #127 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Clerk to Tax Cost (CV-59). The correct efiling event is found: Motions and Related Filings; Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/ Petitions/Requests - Clerk to Tax Cost (CV-59). It is important that you use the correct event, as it is reviewed by the Clerk to Tax Cost. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 25, 2017 Filing 130 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #129 . (Shapiro, Adam)
July 25, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,, #61 , Order on Motion for Protective Order #81 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #115 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20236966.) (Shapiro, Adam)
July 24, 2017 Filing 128 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #119 Relators' Opposition to Defendants Motion for Attorneys Fees filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Berger in Support of Opposition, #2 Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro in Support of Opposition, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #5 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #6 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #7 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #8 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #9 Exhibit 7- Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #10 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #11 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #12 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #13 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #14 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #15 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #16 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #17 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #18 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #19 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #20 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #21 Exhibit 19 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #22 Exhibit 20 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #23 Exhibit 21 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #24 Exhibit 22 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #25 Exhibit 23 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #26 Exhibit 24 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #27 Exhibit 25 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #28 Exhibit 26 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #29 Exhibit 27 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #30 Exhibit 28 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro, #31 Exhibit 29 - Declaration of Adam M. Shapiro)(Shapiro, Adam)
July 21, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE of Amended Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
July 21, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Withdrawal #125 . The following error(s) was found: Notice of WITHDRAWAL of Application to Clerk to Tax Costs. HOWEVER, an "amended" bill of costs attached within. Filer withdrew previous application, therefore the "AMENDED" application with the new amounts to be taxed should not have been efiled as one pdf image within the notice of withdrawal but efiled under its own separate event, * with the pdf identified as the "AMENDED" application to clerk to tax costs. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 21, 2017 Filing 125 Notice of Withdrawal of Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #117 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
July 18, 2017 Filing 124 OBJECTION TO re: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg #117 filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Shapiro, Adam)
July 12, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #119 AS TO THE LOCATION OF THE COURTHOUSE AND COURTROOM (Hardiman, Mark)
July 12, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #119 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is incorrect as to courtroom, courthouse street address. Please refer to the courts notice of November 1, 2016, docket no. 72 for correct location information. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 11, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. correcting Declaration (Motion related), #120 of Jeffrey B. Coopersmith ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2017 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Jeffrey B. Coopersmith in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #119 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark S. Hardiman, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Radke, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hardiman, Mark)
July 11, 2017 Filing 118 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg re: Judgment, #116 , filed by defendants Metic IC Inc, Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2017 Filing 117 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg filed by Defendants University of Southern California, Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Attorney Mark S Hardiman added to party Yuichi Iwaki(pty:dft), Attorney Mark S Hardiman added to party Metic Transplantation Lab Inc(pty:dft)) (Hardiman, Mark)
June 27, 2017 Filing 116 JUDGMENT by Judge S. James Otero: Defendants Metic Transplantation Lab, Inc., Yuichi Iwaki, and the University of Southern Californias Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56(A) on all causes of action asserted in the Second Amended Complaint is granted. Justin Dooley and James Schellenberg takes nothing, that the action be dismissed in its entirety, and that Defendants recover their costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)
June 27, 2017 Filing 115 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' CONSOLIDATED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 56(A) #85 . The trial and pretrial dates set for August 8, 2017 and August 7, 2017, espectively, are vacated and set aside. A separate judgment shall issue. (lc)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:This matter is before the Court on its own initiative. The Court CONTINUES the pretrial conference, currently scheduled for July 24, 2017, to Monday, August 7, 2017 9:00 a.m. andthe Trial is continued from August 8, 2017, to Tuesday, August 15, 2017 9:00 a.m. The parties' obligations with respect to the filing of pretrial and trial documents shall take into account the new pretrial conference and trial dates. (lc)
June 2, 2017 Filing 113 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: This matter is before the Court 90 days #110 . The Court has reviewed the conflicts cited by both sides and its own congested trial calendar, and finds good cause to continue the trial in this matter from Tuesday, July 25, 2017 to Tuesday, August 8, 2017 at 9:00am. The Court is unable to accommodate the requested ninety-day continuance, and is does not find good cause to continue the trial forthree months. The pretrial conference is continued from Monday, July 10, 2017 until Monday, July 24, 2017 9:00 a.m. Mr. Hardiman is excused from attending the July 24, 2017 pretrial conference in light of his conflicting trial in Prime Healthcare Services. The parties are ORDERED to file their pretrial documents in accordance with these new trial and pretrial conference dates. (lc)
June 1, 2017 Filing 112 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from July 25, 2017 to October 24, 2017 #110 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
June 1, 2017 Filing 111 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from July 25, 2017 to October 24, 2017 #110 filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Townsend, Emanuel)
May 30, 2017 Filing 110 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from July 25, 2017 to October 24, 2017 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendant's Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration in Support of Defendant's Ex Parte Application, #3 Declaration in Support of Defendant's Ex Parte Application, #4 Proposed Order) (Hardiman, Mark)
May 2, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole Phillis on behalf of Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc (Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Yuichi Iwaki(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Metic Transplantation Lab Inc(pty:dft))(Phillis, Nicole)
May 1, 2017 Filing 108 JOINT STATEMENT of Response Relators' Statement of Additional Facts Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2017 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Jeffrey B. Coopersmith Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2017 Filing 106 REPLY Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attorney Jeffrey B Coopersmith added to party University of Southern California(pty:dft))( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2017 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samantha E Funk counsel for Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. Samantha E. Funk is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Metic and Iwaki. (Funk, Samantha)
April 27, 2017 Filing 104 The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. [ECF #85], set for hearing on May 15, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 24, 2017 Filing 103 OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #3 Proposed Order REGARDING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE BY DEFENDANTS, #4 STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #5 Declaration of Justin Dooley in Support of Opposition, #6 Declaration of Travis Armstrong in Support of Opposition, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Travis Armstrong, #8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Travis Armstrong, #9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Travis Armstrong, #10 Declaration of Paul Warner in Support of Opposition, #11 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Paul Warner, #12 Declaration of Justin T. Berger in Support of Opposition, #13 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #14 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #15 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #16 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #17 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #18 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #19 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #20 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #21 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #22 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #23 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #24 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #25 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #26 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #27 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #28 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #29 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #30 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #31 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #32 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #33 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #34 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #35 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #36 Exhibit 24 [Part A] to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #37 Exhibit 24 [Part B] to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #38 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #39 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #40 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #41 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #42 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #43 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #44 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #45 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #46 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #47 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #48 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #49 Exhibit 36 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #50 Exhibit 37 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #51 Exhibit 38 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #52 Exhibit 39 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #53 Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #54 Exhibit 41 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #55 Exhibit 42 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #56 Exhibit 43 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #57 Exhibit 44 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #58 Exhibit 45 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #59 Exhibit 46 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #60 Exhibit 47 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #61 Exhibit 48 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #62 Exhibit 49 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #63 Exhibit 50 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #64 Exhibit 51 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #65 Exhibit 52 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #66 Exhibit 53 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #67 Exhibit 54 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger, #68 Exhibit 55 to Declaration of Justin T. Berger)(Berger, Justin)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE by Judge S. James Otero. For good cause shown, the Pretrial Conference is continued from 5/22/17 to Monday July 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. and the Jury Trial is continued from 6/6/17 to Tuesday, July 25, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge S. James Otero. (smo)
April 18, 2017 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Samantha Funk in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 #94 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 18, 2017 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Jeffrey B. Coopersmith in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 #94 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 18, 2017 Filing 99 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 #94 Jointly with USC filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2017 Filing 98 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE BY NINETY DAYS re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 #94 filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Shapiro, Adam)
April 14, 2017 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Mark Hardiman in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 #94 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2017 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Samantha Funk in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 #94 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2017 Filing 95 DECLARATION of Jeffrey B. Coopersmith in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 #94 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2017 Filing 94 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on September 19, 2017 filed by Defendant Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendants Statement (Motion related), #86 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed statement of Uncontroverted Fact and Conclusions of Law should have been submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 10, 2017 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Samantha Funk in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Cheryl Storey in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Dr. Yasire Qazi in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Dr. Allen Norin in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Yuichi Iwaki in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Dr. Leann Baxter-Lowe in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 86 JOINT STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Fact and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #85 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 85 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(A); and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) ( Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS #83 by Judge S. James Otero: The Defendants may jointly file a 30 page motion for summary judgment; Relators may file one 30 page response; and Defendants may jointly file a 10 pagereply. (lc)
April 3, 2017 Filing 83 STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Motion for Summary Judgment, Response and Reply filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Funk, Samantha)
April 3, 2017 Filing 82 Effective April 10, 2017, Judge McDermott will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 630 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 630 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER RE DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott #77 . The Motion is GRANTED. [See Order for details.] (san)
February 14, 2017 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition Subpoenas #77 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
February 14, 2017 Filing 79 Supplemental Memorandum to Joint Stipulation re: Motion for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg re: MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition Subpoenas #77 (Shapiro, Adam)
February 14, 2017 Filing 78 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam Shapiro counsel for Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. Adding Adam M. Shapiro as counsel of record for Justin Dooley & James Schellenberg for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff/Relators Justin Dooley and James Schellenberg. (Attorney Adam Shapiro added to party Justin Dooley(pty:pla), Attorney Adam Shapiro added to party James Schellenberg(pty:pla))(Shapiro, Adam)
February 7, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition Subpoenas filed by Defendant University of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Radke, Jonathan)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION FOR DISCOVERY PERIOD #75 by Judge S. James Otero. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation Extending Discovery Period, and for the reasons set forth therein, the Court now orders as follows: 1. Expert Disclosures are due March 15, 2017; 2. Expert Rebuttals are due March 29, 2017; 3. The discovery cut-off date is extended to March 31, 2017; 4. The motion cut-off date is extended to May 15, 2017 at 10:00 a.m.; 5. All other pre-trial and trial dates remain unchanged. FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, IT IS SO ORDERED. (jy)
January 23, 2017 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to March 31, 2017 filed by Plaintiff Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Townsend, Emanuel)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. re Stipulation for Protective Order #73 . (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
November 30, 2016 Filing 73 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Protective Order)(Attorney Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend added to party Justin Dooley(pty:pla), Attorney Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend added to party James Schellenberg(pty:pla))(Townsend, Emanuel)
November 1, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge S. James Otero. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Otero will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 10C on the 10th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 10C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 6, 2016 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Linda A Kontos counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Linda A. Kontos is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Kontos, Linda)
September 6, 2016 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Linda A Kontos counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Brian Villarreal is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Kontos, Linda)
September 6, 2016 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zoila Hinson counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Zoila E. Hinson as counsel of record for United States for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States. (Attorney Zoila Hinson added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Hinson, Zoila)
August 19, 2016 Filing 68 SCHEDULING NOTICE OF VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE: by Judge S. James Otero. Having reviewed the Status Report Regarding Expert Witnesses [ECF #16], the Court vacates the Status Conference set for hearing on 8/22/16. No appearance is required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 15, 2016 Filing 67 STATUS REPORT Regarding Expert Witnesses filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
July 5, 2016 Filing 66 AMENDED MINUTES RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge S. James Otero:The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: Tuesday, June 6, 2017 9:00 a.m.Pretrial Conference: Monday, May 22, 2017 9:00 a.m. Motion Cutoff: April 3, 2017 10:00 a.m. Discovery Cutoff: March 6, 2017. Last Date to Amend: Friday, August 5, 2016. Reference of the above case to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Program is vacated. Settlement is referred to Private Mediation for all further proceedings. The Court sets a Status Conference on Monday, August 22, 2016 8:30 a.m. regarding the types of experts, categories of experts and the number of experts that the parties anticipate calling for trial. The parties shall file a joint status report by August 15, 2016, regarding this issue.All discovery disputes are to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case. Parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order. (lc) Modified on 7/21/2016 (lc). Modified on 7/21/2016 (lc).
July 5, 2016 Filing 65 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero. Matter called. The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: Tuesday, June 6, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m. Pretrial Conference: Monday, May 22, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m. Motion Cutoff: Monday, April 3, 2017 @ 10:00 a.m. Discovery Cutoff: Monday, March 6, 2017. Last Date to Amend: Friday, August 5, 2016. See minute order for further details. Court Reporter: Carol Zurborg. (jy)
July 5, 2016 Filing 64 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #53 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant University of Southern California.(Hardiman, Mark)
July 5, 2016 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #53 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc.(Funk, Samantha)
June 20, 2016 Filing 62 Joint Case Management Conference Statement and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg (Berger, Justin)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS RELATORS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 9(B) #55 ; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AND STRIKE ALLEGATIONS IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 9(B), 12(B)(6) AND 12(F) #56 by Judge S. James Otero. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant University of Southern California's Motion to Dismiss Relators Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(b) and GRANTS Defendants Metic Transplantation Lab, Inc. and Yuichi Iwaki's Motion to Dismiss Claims and Strike Allegations in Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(6) and 12(f). Should Relators choose to further amend their operative pleading to correct the deficiencies noted above, they may do so by filing a Third Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this Order. Defendants will have fourteen (14) days from either the date Relators file their Third Amended Complaint or the expiration of this fourteen-day period to respond. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
June 1, 2016 Filing 60 The Court finds the following motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION to Dismiss Relators Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants University of Southern California (dkt. 55) and the MOTION to Dismiss Kickback allegations and allegations that defendants billed for tests never actually performed filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc (dkt. 56), set for hearing on June 6, 2016. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 23, 2016 Filing 59 REPLY to Response in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Kickback allegations and allegations that defendants billed for tests never actually performed #56 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Funk, Samantha)
May 23, 2016 Filing 58 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators Second Amended Complaint #55 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardiman, Mark)
May 16, 2016 Filing 57 RELATORS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE ALLEGATIONS IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators Second Amended Complaint #55 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Kickback allegations and allegations that defendants billed for tests never actually performed #56 filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Berger, Justin)
May 6, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Kickback allegations and allegations that defendants billed for tests never actually performed filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Funk, Samantha)
May 6, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants University of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Hardiman, Mark)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/20/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 7/5/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
April 22, 2016 Filing 53 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California amending Amended Complaint #8 , filed by Plaintiff/Relator James Schellenberg, Justin Dooley(Berger, Justin)
April 8, 2016 Filing 52 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS #37 , #39 .ShouldRelators choose to amend their First Amended Complaint to correct the deficiencies noted above, they may do so by filing a Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this Order. Defendants will have fourteen (14) days from either the date Relators file their Second Amended Complaint or the expiration of this fourteen-day period to respond. (lc)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge S. James Otero: GRANTED CONDITIONED ALL DATES SET SHALL REMAIN #49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Samantha E. Funk on behalf of Defendants, designating John R. Tate as local counsel. (lt)
April 5, 2016 Filing 50 The Court finds the following motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION to Dismiss Defendants All Plaintiffs Metic IC Inc, Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. [#37], and the MOTION to Dismiss Relators' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants University of Southern California. [#39], set for hearing on April 18, 2016. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 4, 2016 Filing 49 APPLICATION for attorney Samantha E. Funk to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Defendant Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Receipt for Payment of PHV Application) (Attorney John R Tate added to party Yuichi Iwaki(pty:dft), Attorney John R Tate added to party Metic IC Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John R Tate added to party Metic Transplantation Lab Inc(pty:dft)) (Tate, John) Modified on 4/5/2016 (lt).
April 4, 2016 Filing 48 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants All Plaintiffs #37 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2016 Filing 47 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators' First Amended Complaint #39 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
March 28, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #43 to Defendant University of Southern California's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Berger, Justin)
March 28, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #44 to Defendant Metic Transplantation Lab, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Berger, Justin)
March 28, 2016 Filing 44 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants All Plaintiffs #37 filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Berger, Justin)
March 28, 2016 Filing 43 to Defendant University of Southern California's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators' First Amended Complaint #39 filed by Plaintiffs Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg. (Berger, Justin)
March 25, 2016 Filing 42 STATEMENT of Interest as to an Issue Raised in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators' First Amended Complaint #39 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Villarreal, Brian)
March 17, 2016 Filing 41 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants All Plaintiffs #37 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Hardiman, Mark)
March 16, 2016 Filing 40 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators' First Amended Complaint #39 filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Relators' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants University of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attorney Mark S Hardiman added to party University of Southern California(pty:dft)) (Hardiman, Mark)
March 15, 2016 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants All Plaintiffs Metic IC Inc, Yuichi Iwaki, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeffrey B Coopersmith added to party Yuichi Iwaki(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Coopersmith added to party Metic IC Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Coopersmith added to party Metic Transplantation Lab Inc(pty:dft)) (Coopersmith, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Stipulation #34 that defendant University of Southern California deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be extended to March 15, 2016 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
January 25, 2016 Filing 35 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant University of Southern California, identifying None. (Radke, Jonathan)
January 21, 2016 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 15, 2016 re Amended Complaint #8 filed by Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint University of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jonathan Radke added to party University of Southern California(pty:dft))(Radke, Jonathan)
January 19, 2016 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff James Schellenberg, Justin Dooley. upon Yuichi Iwaki waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/15/2016, answer due 3/15/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey B. Coopersmith. (Berger, Justin)
January 19, 2016 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff James Schellenberg, Justin Dooley. upon Metic Transplantation Lab Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/15/2016, answer due 3/15/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey B. Coopersmith. (Berger, Justin)
January 19, 2016 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff James Schellenberg, Justin Dooley. upon Metic IC Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/15/2016, answer due 3/15/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey B. Coopersmith. (Berger, Justin)
January 15, 2016 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Schellenberg, Justin Dooley, upon Defendant University of Southern California served on 1/6/2016, answer due 1/27/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Angie Rigor, Legal Dept. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Berger, Justin)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #27 , for the following reasons: Incorrect event selected; Correct event is Service of summons and complaint. Title page missing. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word"to narrow the selection process. (lc)
January 14, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #27 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Service of summons and complaint. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 13, 2016 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Justin Dooley, James Schellenberg, First Amended Complaint; Order; Certificate & Notice of Interested Parties; Civil Cover Sheet; served on January 6, 2016. (Berger, Justin) Modified on 1/15/2016 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 1/15/16 ORDER).
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by not later than February 22, 2016 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to thecourt's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
December 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE REQUEST BY THE UNITED STATES TO UNSEAL FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #24 by Judge S. James Otero. The United States of America (the "Government") having declined to intervene in this action pursuant to the False Claims Act, 31 U.S.C. 3730(b)(4)(B), the Court now orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED that the First Amended Complaint is unsealed and shall be served upon the defendants, by the relators. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
December 3, 2015 Filing 24 REQUEST to Unseal Document Request by the United States to Unseal First Amended Complaint filed by United States United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Request by United States to Unseal First Amended Complaint) (Villarreal, Brian)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Amended Document (Non-Motion) #21 , for the following reasons: here is no initiating document filed with this proposed order. (lc)
December 2, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Document (Non-Motion) #21 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. pdf is a proposed order for Judge's signature.Proposed order should have been submitted as separate attachment to a main document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 2, 2015 Filing 21 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Amendment to Notice (Other) #19 Amended [Proposed] Order re Election by the U.S. to Decline Intervention and Unsealing of Complaint (Villarreal, Brian) (STRICKEN PER 12/3/15 ORDER). Modified on 12/3/2015 (lc).
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re Election by the United States to Decline Intervention and Unsealing of Complaint, by Judge S. James Otero. IT IS ORDERED that 1. The Complaint is unsealed and shall be served upon the defendants, by the relators; 2. The seal is lifted in this action as to this Order and the Notice of Election by the Government to Decline Intervention, both of which the relators will serve upon the defendants with the Complaint; 3. The seal is lifted as to all papers and records filed or lodged in this action after the date of this Order; 4. All other contents of the Court's file in this action shall remain under seal and shall not be made public or served upon any defendant or other party or person [See document for all details] (mat)
November 23, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Election by the United States to Decline Intervention. (mat)
April 2, 2014 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES AND CIVIL PENALTIES FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FALSE CLAIMS ACT. DEMAND FOR JURY TRAIL. (mat) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/9/2015) (lc). Modified on 12/9/2015 (lc).
September 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Yuichi Iwaki, Metic IC Inc, Metic Transplantation Lab Inc, University of Southern California.Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Justin Dooley. [Summons not Issued on 9/23/2013.] (et) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2015) (mat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Metic Transplantation Lab Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Schellenberg
Represented By: Adam M Shapiro
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend
Represented By: Justin T Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dooley
Represented By: Adam M Shapiro
Represented By: Niall P McCarthy
Represented By: Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend
Represented By: Justin T Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Linda A Kontos
Represented By: Brian P Villarreal
Represented By: Zoila Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metic IC Inc
Represented By: John R Tate
Represented By: Samantha E Funk
Represented By: Jeffrey B Coopersmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuichi Iwaki
Represented By: John R Tate
Represented By: Mark S Hardiman
Represented By: Samantha E Funk
Represented By: Jeffrey B Coopersmith
Represented By: Nicole Phillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metic Transplantation Lab Inc
Represented By: John R Tate
Represented By: Mark S Hardiman
Represented By: Samantha E Funk
Represented By: Jeffrey B Coopersmith
Represented By: Nicole Phillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Southern California
Represented By: Mark S Hardiman
Represented By: Jeffrey B Coopersmith
Represented By: Jonathan Radke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?