Nacimiento Water Company, Inc. v. International Fidelity Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Nacimiento Water Company, Inc.
Defendant: Does and International Fidelity Insurance Co.
Counter Claimant: International Fidelity Insurance Co.
Counter Defendant: Jonatkim Enterprises, Carole E. King, John E. King, Nacimiento Water Company, Inc., Roes and SMS Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv07959
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Wilner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 JUDGMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Pursuant to the Order granting summary judgment herein 127 , Judgment is hereby awarded and shall be entered in favor of Defendant International Fidelity Insurance Company and against Plaintiff Nacimiento Wate r Company, Inc. on the Complaint on file herein. International Fidelity Insurance Company's counterclaim for declaratory relief against Nacimiento Water Company, Inc. is dismissed as moot. Defendant may recover costs of court according to the applicable rules. Any defendant motion for attorney fees shall be filed in accordance with the applicable rules. (lom)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT IFIC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 112 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. For the reasons stated above, IFIC's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (See attached document for details.) (lom)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JUDGMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Judgment be entered against INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. and in favor OAK SHORES SPE, LLC; 2. IFIC take nothing against OAK SHORES; and that, OAK SHORES shall recover costs from IFIC according to proof. (lc)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING CROSS-DEFENDANT OAK SHORES SPE, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 78 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc) Modified on 3/19/2015 (lc).
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING Cross-Defendant Oak Shores SPE, LLC MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS 54 . Oak Shores request for attorney fees is DENIED by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc). Modified on 11/4/2014. (lc).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nacimiento Water Company, Inc. v. International Fidelity Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Co.
Represented By: Teresa L Polk
Represented By: Ali Salamirad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: International Fidelity Insurance Co.
Represented By: Teresa L Polk
Represented By: Ali Salamirad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jonatkim Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Carole E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nacimiento Water Company, Inc.
Represented By: Greg A Coates
Represented By: Tana L. Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SMS Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nacimiento Water Company, Inc.
Represented By: Greg A Coates
Represented By: Tana L. Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?