CH2O Inc v. Meras Engineering Inc
Plaintiff: CH2O Inc
Defendant: Meras Engineering Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv08418
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A. Kronstadt
Presiding Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Second Amended Judgment (Dkt. 597 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of CH2O and against the Houweling's Defendants with respect to direct and literal infringement of claims 1, 2 and 7 of U.S. Patent No. 6,767,470. FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of CH2O and against the Houweling's Defendants for the Houweling's Defendants' infringement of claims 1, 2 and 7 of t he 470 patent, in the following amount: Damages for infringement: $2,500,000; Supplemental damages: $176,651; Prejudgment interest, calculated through April 24, 2020: $626,351; TOTAL JUDGMENT: $3,303,002. (SEE SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 531 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DKT. 481) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion is GRANTED IN PART. CH20 shall lodge a proposed order consistent with this Order on or before May 8, 2017. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (DKT. 471 ); DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL ON DAMAGES OR REMITTITUR (DKT. 473 ); DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL ON INFRINGEMENT (DKT. 475 ); DEFENDANTS' MO TION TO AMEND THE JUDGMENT AND RELIEVE HNL HOLDINGS, LTD. AND HOUWELING'S NURSERIES, LTD. FROM LIABILITY (DKT. 478 ); PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DKT. 481 ); PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENHANCED DAMAGES (DKT. 482 ); PLAI NTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES (DKT. 480 ); PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW IN PLAINTIFF'S FAVOR ON DEFENDANTS' DEFENSES OF PATENT INVALIDITY DUE TO ANTICIPATION AND OBVIOUSN ESS (DKT. 470 ) held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. Court directs counsel to confer and file a joint report by March 8, 2017, which shall include whether: (i) all parties agree to a further mediation session; (ii) the name of the agreed upon private neutral or three nominees from each party to include a resume and hourly rate; and (iii) whether a ruling on all or some of the motions would be beneficial before or after the mediation. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (ah)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. JUDGMENT is hereby entered in this matter as follows: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of CH2O and against Defendants with respect to direct and literal infringement of claims 1, 2 and 7 of U.S. Patent No. 6,767,470 ("the '470 patent"). (SEE JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS by Judge John A. Kronstadt 41 . Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CH2O Inc v. Meras Engineering Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CH2O Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marchese
Represented By: Michael M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meras Engineering Inc
Represented By: Craig M Stainbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?