Penavico Shenzhen Logistics Ltd v. DGS Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Penavico Shenzhen Logistics Ltd
Defendant: Patrick Jacob, Does and DGS Logistics LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv08757
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F. Mumm
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. SETTLEMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II., The Court therefore CONTINUES the Order to Show Cause deadline toMonday, May 12, 2014. No hearing will be held. The parties shall respond inwriting. (lc)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. SETTLEMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: parties to SHOW CAUSE in writing by Monday, March 31, 2014, why they have not finalized settlement. No hearing will be held. The Court will discharge this Order upon the filing of a stipulated dismissal or written response demonstrating good cause for the delay. (lc). Modified on 3/24/2014 (lc).
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT DGS LOGISTICS,LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE 12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION AND RELATED DOCUMENTS 15 , 16 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc). Modified on 1/21/2014 (lc).
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION 13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc). Modified on 1/17/2014. (lc).(STRICKEN PER 1/17/14 ORDER).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penavico Shenzhen Logistics Ltd v. DGS Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Jacob
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGS Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penavico Shenzhen Logistics Ltd
Represented By: Sam Xiong-Jie Wu
Represented By: Bruce Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?