Chrome Hearts, LLC v. Ross Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Chrome Hearts, LLC
Defendant: Does and Ross Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv00260
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J. Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Upon Stipulation 46 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this entire action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs associated with this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. The Court Orders that the terms of the parties Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order Regarding Non-Disclosure of Confidential Information shall govern the handling of such documents produced or disclosed by the parties in this case. 40 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/11/2014. (yb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chrome Hearts, LLC v. Ross Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrome Hearts, LLC
Represented By: Brent H Blakely
Represented By: Cindy W Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?