Helmet Venture Inc. v. Jafrum International Inc et al

Defendant: Does and Jafrum International Inc
Plaintiff: Helmet Venture Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01307
Filed: February 20, 2014
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Presiding Judge: R. Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. It is Ordered that Tegol, Inc. shall appear on 9/12/16, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom of the Honorable R. Gary Klausner, U.S. District Judge, and then and there shall show cause, if there be any, why Tegol should not be adjudged in contempt by reason of the facts certified herein. (See document for further details.) (sp)
December 15, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSOLIDATED JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. On September 4, 2015, this Court entered judgment against Plaintiff and in Defendant's favor for attorneys' fees in the amount of $35,1010.50 (Dkt. 52) On December 4, 2015, this Court en tered judgment against Plaintiff and in Defendant's favor for additional attorneys' fees in the amount of $7,729.50. (Dkt. 59.) The Court now enters this consolidated, final judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that th is Consolidated Judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Jafrum International, Inc., that Plaintiff Helmet Venture, Inc. take nothing, and that Jafrum International, Inc. recover its reasonable attorneys' fees in the total amount of $42,831.00., in favor of Helmet Venture Inc. against Jafrum International Inc in the principal amount of $42,831.00, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $42,831.00. (bp)
December 4, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Jafrum International,Inc. that Plaintiff Helmet Venture, Inc. take nothing, and that Jafrum International, Inc. recover its reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $7,729.50 58 . (pso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helmet Venture Inc. v. Jafrum International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jafrum International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helmet Venture Inc.
Represented By: Evan G Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?