Shame On You Productions Inc et al v. Elizabeth Banks et al
Plaintiff: Shame On You Productions Inc
Defendant: Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC, Focus World Inc, Elizabeth Banks, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC, Does 1-10 inclusive, Does 3-10, Broken Road Productions, Inc., Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Brillco Inc, Todd Garner, Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Steven Brill and Max Handelman
Case Number: 2:2014cv03512
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Margaret M Morrow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE re Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 15-56372. Pursuant to the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. 505, attorneys' fees in the amount of $94,242.00 are awarded in favor of Defendants-Appellees and against Shame On You Productions, Inc. This order amends the court's mandate #220 . (mat)
September 7, 2018 Filing 226 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen R Mick counsel for Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World Inc, Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC, Max Handelman, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC. Devin J. Stone is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Lakeshore Entertainment LLC, et al.. (Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party Focus World Inc(pty:dft))(Mick, Stephen)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 15-56372. The court granted Defendants - Appellees motion for attorneys fees on appeal and referred the determination of an appropriate amount of fees on appeal to the Appellate Commissioner. The question of an appropriate amount of fees on appeal is referred to the Circuit Mediator, who will contact the parties. The Circuit Mediator is requested to inform the Appellate Commissioner of the conclusion of the mediation. (shb)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 15-56372. Defendants-Appellees motion for attorneys fees on appeal (Docket EntryNo. 56) is granted. (shb)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #213 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 16-55024 and 16-56311. Pursuant to the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. 505, attorney's fees in the amount of $16,905 are awarded in favor of Defendants-Appellees and against Shame On You Productions, Inc. This order amends the court's mandate. [See document for all details.] (mat)
July 13, 2018 Filing 222 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 , and Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #213 , CCA # 16-55024 and 16-56311. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered June 21, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion #221 For the foregoing reasons, the district court's judgment is affirmed. SOYP shall bear costs on appeal. Fed. R. App. P. 39(a)(2). AFFIRMED.](mat)
June 21, 2018 Filing 221 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 16-55024, 16-56311. Plaintiff-Appellant Shame On You Productions (SOYP)brought an unsuccessful suit for copyright infringement and breach of implied contract against Defendants-Appellees (Defendants) associated with the film Walk of Shame, alleging that it was copied from a screenplay given to two ofthe Defendants seven years prior to the films release. After both claims were dismissed, Defendants moved for attorneys fees and costs, which the district court granted. SOYP appeals, arguing that the district court erred inawarding fees. We Affirm. (shb)
May 26, 2017 Filing 220 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #187 CCA # 15-56372. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered May 03, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $104.20. [See USCA Memorandum #218 AFFIRMED.] (mat)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 15-56372. Shame on You Productions, Inc.'s motion for stay of the issuance of the mandate pending application for writ of certiorari is denied. The mandate will issue seven days after the entry of this order. (mat)
May 3, 2017 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 15-56372. The decision for the District Court is AFFIRMED. (mat)
December 6, 2016 Filing 217 CORRECTED ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #213 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 16-55024, 16-56311. The December 5, 2016 order is amended to to read as follows: The appellant's motion (Docket Entry No. 15) to further stay appellate proceedings in case No. 16-55024 pending the courts decision in the related merits appeal, case No. 15-56372, is granted. The court sua sponte consolidates case Nos. 16-55024 and 16-56311. Appeal Nos. 16-55024 and 16-56311 are stayed until May 31, 2017. [See document for all details] (mat)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal #205 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #213 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 16-55024, and 16-56311. The appellant's motion to further stay appellate proceedings in case No. 16-55024 pending the courts decision in the related merits appeal, case No. 16-56372, is granted. The court sua sponte consolidates case Nos. 16-55024 and 16-56311. Appeal Nos. 16-55024 and 16-56311 are stayed until May 31, 2017. [See document for all details] (mat)
September 9, 2016 Filing 215 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-56311, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #213 as to Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (mat)
September 9, 2016 Filing 214 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 . (Coate, Charles)
September 9, 2016 Filing 213 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Appeal of Motion Hearing with html form, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees #200 , Order,,, #212 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18521854.) (Coate, Charles)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER (1) Granting in Part Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and (2) Granting in Part Defendants' Motion for Sanctions by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #180 : For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendants' Motion for Fees and Costs in part. Attorneys' fees are awarded to Defendants in the amount of $315,669.75 and costs are awarded to Defendants in the amount of $3,825.15, for a total of $319,494.90 against Plaintiff. The Court imposes sanctions of $4,345.50 on Charles Coate under 28 U.S.C. 1927; he will be jointly and severally liable with Plaintiff for this amount of fees. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 1, 2016 Filing 210 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Incto Miscellaneous Document, #209 re: Defendants' Ex Parte Request re: Final Order (Coate, Charles)
July 29, 2016 Filing 209 REQUEST FOR FINAL ORDER ON FEES filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC, Max Handelman, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A re Request for Final Order on Fees, #2 Exhibit B re Request for Final Order on Fees, #3 Exhibit C re Request for Final Order on Fees)(Stone, Devin)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. CCA # 16-55024. On December 7, 2015, the district court circulated an unsigned tentative ruling regarding appellees' motion for attorney's fees and costs. The district court held a hearing later that same day, and stated on the record that a final order would issue. After the hearing, the district courts December 7, 2015 minute order stated that the motion for fees and costs was granted in part and denied in part, and that a final order would issue. See district court docket entry No. 200. No final order regarding the amount of attorney's fees was ever entered by the district court. [See document for further information].(car)
January 5, 2016 Filing 208 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55024, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 as to Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (mat)
January 5, 2016 Filing 207 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 (Coate, Charles)
January 5, 2016 Filing 206 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #205 . (Coate, Charles)
January 5, 2016 Filing 205 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Appeal of Motion Hearing with html form, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees #200 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17038420.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Coate, Charles)
December 22, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12-07-2015 AT 10:02 A.M. re Transcript #203 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 22, 2015 Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT for MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS/SANCTIONS proceedings held on Monday, December 7, 2015, at 10:02 A.M. Court Reporter: Debi Read, CSR at Readit3949@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (rd)
December 11, 2015 Filing 202 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Theresa Johnson at tjohnson@abramscoate.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Johnson, Theresa)
December 8, 2015 Filing 201 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $3,064.65 in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against DEFENDANTS All Plaintiffs re: Judgment #173 , #183 (nl)
December 7, 2015 Filing 200 MINUTES OF Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees #180 Hearing held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court grants in part and denies in part the motion for attorney fees. A final order will issue.Court Reporter: Debra Read. (ah)
December 3, 2015 Filing 199 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Michael M. Plotkin on behalf of Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc (Coate, Charles)
November 23, 2015 Filing 198 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #180 filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC, Max Handelman, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC. (Stone, Devin)
November 16, 2015 Filing 197 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to Declarations of Stephen R. Mick and Devin J. Stone re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #180 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
November 16, 2015 Filing 196 OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #180 and Request for Sanctions; Declaration of Charles M. Coate filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT THE FILING OF PAPERS IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITS #193 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Plaintiff is permitted to file an opposition with memorandum of points and authorities NOT to exceed 35 pages. Defendants may file a reply NOT to exceed 35 pages. (ah)
November 2, 2015 Filing 194 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT FILING IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITS re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation RE: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND ITS COUNSEL #193 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
October 30, 2015 Filing 193 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation RE: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND ITS COUNSEL filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coate, Charles)
October 15, 2015 Filing 192 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, JULY 27, 2015 11:04 A.M. re Transcript #191 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2015 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, JULY 27, 2015 11:04 A.M. Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporterr before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2016. (Nirenberg, C)
September 10, 2015 Filing 190 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56372, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 as to plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (car)
September 9, 2015 Filing 189 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B" (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit "B" (Part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit "C")(Coate, Charles)
September 9, 2015 Filing 188 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #187 . (Coate, Charles)
September 9, 2015 Filing 187 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Appeal of Judgment #173 , Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Continue,,, #172 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-16413061 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B" (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit "B" (Part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit "C")(Coate, Charles)
September 8, 2015 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc Court Reporter. Court will contact Theresa E. Johnson at tjohnson@abramscoate.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: July 27, 2015 Hearing on Mx for Judgment on Pleadings, etc.. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Coate, Charles)
September 4, 2015 Filing 185 OBJECTIONS to APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against DEFENDANTS All Plaintiffs re: Judgment #173 , #183 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
September 4, 2015 Filing 184 NOTICE ERRATA filed by DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. RE EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF DEVIN STONE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR FEES (Stone, Devin)
August 31, 2015 Filing 183 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against DEFENDANTS All Plaintiffs re: Judgment #173 , filed by DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. Application set for hearing on 9/11/2015 at 10:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Stone, Devin)
August 31, 2015 Filing 182 DECLARATION of DEVIN STONE IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #180 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Devin Stone In Support of Motion for Fees)(Stone, Devin)
August 31, 2015 Filing 181 DECLARATION of STEPHEN R. MICK IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #180 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Stephen R. Mick In Support of Motion for Fees, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Stephen R. Mick In Support of Motion for Fees, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Stephen R. Mick In Support of Motion for Fees)(Stone, Devin)
August 31, 2015 Filing 180 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion for Attorneys' Fees) (Stone, Devin)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) Order Striking Motion for Fees and Costs and Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Notice (Other), #174 , Declaration, #176 , Declaration, #175 , APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC #177 . Incorrect events selected for motion, declaration and proposed order. Correct events: Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings -Motions - ATTORNEY FEES. Civil Events- Motions and Related Filings- Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - DECLARATION Motion related. See Local Rule 54-2 for Application to Tax Costs. Hearings on Tax Costs are not held before Judge Morrow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah)
August 28, 2015 Filing 178 [STRICKEN] PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION FOR FEES filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp. re: Notice (Other), #174 (Stone, Devin) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ah).
August 28, 2015 Filing 177 [STRICKEN] APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC filed by DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. Application set for hearing on 12/7/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Stone, Devin) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ah).
August 28, 2015 Filing 176 [STRICKEN]DECLARATION of DEVIN STONE re Notice (Other), #174 OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Devin Stone In Support of Motion for Fees)(Stone, Devin) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ah).
August 28, 2015 Filing 175 [STRICKEN] DECLARATION of STEPHEN R. MICK re Notice (Other), #174 OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Stephen R. Mick In Support of Motion for Fees, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Stephen R. Mick In Support of Motion for Fees, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Stephen R. Mick In Support of Motion for Fees)(Stone, Devin) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ah).
August 28, 2015 Filing 174 [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS filed by DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. LAKESHORE ENTERTAIMENT GROUP, LLC, LAKESHORE ENTERTAINMENT CORP., FILMDISTRICT PICTURES, LLC, FOCUS FEATURES, LLC, SIDNEY KIMMEL ENTERTAINMENT, INC. STEVEN BRILL, ELIZABETH BANKS AND MAX HANDELMAN NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS (Stone, Devin) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ah).
August 14, 2015 Filing 173 JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, Related to: Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Continue, #172 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ah)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO PLAINTIFF'S FEDERAL COPYRIGHT CLAIM AND DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER STATE LAW CLAIM; DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT DATES AS MOOT #110 #151 #153 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Garner's and Broken Roads motion to dismiss is granted as to the copyright infringement claim with prejudice. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Shame on You's implied-in-fact contract claim, and dismisses that claim without prejudice to its refiling in state court. The remaining defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings on the federal copyright claim is also granted with prejudice. the court denies Garner's and Broken Road's motion to continue the case management dates as moot. (ah)
July 27, 2015 Filing 171 MINUTES OF Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC.'s MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #110 Defendant Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner's MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #151 ; MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule #153 held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court takes the motions under submission. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg. (ah)
July 15, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner. correcting Reply (Motion related), #169 (Aronoff, David)
July 13, 2015 Filing 169 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule By Approximately Six Months from September 8, 2015 to March 8, 2016 Re: Stipulation and Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #104 #153 filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Garner In Support of Motion to Continue The Trial Date And Pretrial Schedule By Approximately Six Months)(Aronoff, David)
July 13, 2015 Filing 168 Evidentiary Objections re: MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Defendants Todd Garner and Broken Road Productions, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) #151 To Declaration of Charles M. Coate Submitted In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner. (Aronoff, David)
July 13, 2015 Filing 167 REPLY In Support MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Defendants Todd Garner and Broken Road Productions, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) #151 filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner. (Aronoff, David)
July 6, 2015 Filing 166 OPPOSITION to re: MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule By Approximately Six Months from September 8, 2015 to March 8, 2016 Re: Stipulation and Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #104 #153 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
July 6, 2015 Filing 165 OPPOSITION to re: MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Defendants Todd Garner and Broken Road Productions, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) #151 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Johnson, Theresa)
July 6, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE of Change of other firm name or address information by Theresa E Johnson attorney for Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. Changing FIRM NAME, ADDRESS, AND EMAIL ADDRESSES. Filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
July 6, 2015 Filing 163 NOTICE of Change of other firm name or address information by Charles Michael Coate attorney for Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. Changing FIRM NAME, ADDRESS, AND EMAIL ADDRESSES. Filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Ex Parte Application to Compel Mediation #160 as Moot by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. On June 24, 2015, the court issued an order extending the mediation cut-off to August 24, 2015. In light of this, the court denies the ex parte application as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 IN CHAMBERS Order Continuing Case Management Dates by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2015 08:30 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (ah)
June 24, 2015 Filing 160 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Mediation and Continuing Mediation Cut-Off filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Theresa)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 IN CHAMBERS: Order Denying Ex Parte Application to Expedite #154 ; Setting Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #110 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. The court declines to advance the hearing on the motion to dismiss. The court places the hearing on the remaining defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings back on calendar for July 27, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. (ah)
May 29, 2015 Filing 158 OBJECTIONS to Joinder (Motion Related),,, #156 , Joinder (Motion Related),, #157 AND REQUEST TO STRIKE filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 29, 2015 Filing 157 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Defendants Todd Garner and Broken Road Productions, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) #151 , MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule By Approximately Six Months from September 8, 2015 to March 8, 2016 Re: Stipulation and Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #104 #153 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Hearing Dates on Defendants' (1) Motion to Continue The Trial, And (2) Motion to Dismiss #154 filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman. (Stone, Devin)
May 29, 2015 Filing 156 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Defendants Todd Garner and Broken Road Productions, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) #151 , MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule By Approximately Six Months from September 8, 2015 to March 8, 2016 Re: Stipulation and Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #104 #153 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Hearing Dates on Defendants' (1) Motion to Continue The Trial, And (2) Motion to Dismiss #154 filed by Defendants Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC. (Attorney Devin Stone added to party Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Devin Stone added to party Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC(pty:dft))(Stone, Devin)
May 28, 2015 Filing 155 OPPOSITION TO re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Hearing Dates on Defendants' (1) Motion to Continue The Trial, And (2) Motion to Dismiss #154 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 27, 2015 Filing 154 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Hearing Dates on Defendants' (1) Motion to Continue The Trial, And (2) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Aronoff On Behalf of Defendants Todd Garner And Broken Road Productions, Inc. Regarding (1) Ex Parte Application To Expedite Hearing, (2) Motion to Continue The Trial, and (3) Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Aronoff, David)
May 27, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule By Approximately Six Months from September 8, 2015 to March 8, 2016 Re: Stipulation and Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #104 filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aronoff, David)
May 27, 2015 Filing 152 Certification And NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner, (Aronoff, David)
May 27, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Defendants Todd Garner and Broken Road Productions, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Broken Road Productions, Inc., Todd Garner. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney David Aronoff added to party Broken Road Productions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Aronoff added to party Todd Garner(pty:dft))(Aronoff, David)
May 22, 2015 Filing 150 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc, upon Defendant Todd Garner served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Todd Garner, an individual, as Doe 2 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 20, 2015 Filing 149 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc, upon Defendant Broken Road Productions, Inc. served on 5/12/2015, answer due 6/2/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven L. Shapiro, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Coate, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 IN CHAMBERS Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #110 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court continues the hearing on the motion until such time as Garner and Broken Road have been served or have appeared and filed an answer to the first amended complaint. See order for details. (ah)
May 14, 2015 Filing 147 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc, of Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosures per F.R.C.P. Rule 26 served on 05/14/2015. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Ex Parte Application to Advance #112 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. On February 25, 2015, defendants filed an ex parte application to advance the hearing on their motion for judgment on the pleadings. In light of the scheduled hearing date of May 18, 2015, defendants' ex parte application is denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 11, 2015 Filing 145 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #135 filed by Defendant Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman.(Mick, Stephen)
May 11, 2015 Filing 144 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #135 filed by Defendant Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC.(Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party Steven Brill(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party Brillco Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party FilmDistrict Pictures LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC(pty:dft))(Mick, Stephen)
May 8, 2015 Filing 143 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #135 as to Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, Broken Road Productions, Inc., Does 3-10, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC, Todd Garner, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC. (bm)
May 7, 2015 Filing 142 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #135 filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 5, 2015 Filing 141 OBJECTION AND REQUEST TO STRIKE UNTIMELY REPLY AND EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS FILED BY LAKESHORE IN SUPPORT OF re: MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings #110 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 4, 2015 Filing 140 OBJECTIONS to Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #134 (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Charles Coate) filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
May 4, 2015 Filing 139 REPLY in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings #110 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
April 29, 2015 Filing 137 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc, re Motion Hearing,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions on Discovery Matters,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, #136 served on 04/29/2015. (Johnson, Theresa)
April 28, 2015 Filing 136 MINUTES OF HEARING ON (1) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA ("FIRST MOTION"); AND (2) MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY, ISSUE, TERMINATING, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS ("SECOND MOTION") held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian:; granting in part and denying in part #120 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part #121 Motion to Compel. 1. The Court granted in part and denied in part the First Motion: c) The Court also ordered plaintiffs counsel forthwith to personally serve this minute order on Broken Road Productions, Inc.'s registered agent for service of process and to file a proof of service so reflecting. 2. The Court granted in part and denied in part the Second Motion: c) The Court ordered that the law firm representing Focus World (a division of Focus Features, LLC), Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC, and Lakeshore Entertainment Corp. in this action shall pay to plaintiffs' counsel sanctions in the amount of $4,275 within fourteen (14) days. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE AND FULL DETAILS Court Recorder: C/S 4/28/2015. (dml)
April 27, 2015 Filing 135 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Todd Garner (as Doe 1), Broken Road Productions, Inc. (as Doe 2), Elizabeth Banks, Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, Does, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World Inc, Max Handelman, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc (Coate, Charles)
April 27, 2015 Filing 134 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LAKESHORE ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC'S re: MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings #110 ; Declarations of Charles M. Coate and Dan Rosen filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting Leave to Amend Its Complaint #115 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Shame on You's ex parte application for an order seeking leave to amend the complaint to substitute Garner and Broken Road as Does 1 and 2 and to add allegations concerning their involvement in the production "Walk of Shame" is granted. Shame on You is directed to file its first amended complaint on or before April 28, 2015, and to serve Garner and Broken Road promptly. (ah)
April 22, 2015 Filing 138 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT A to the Supplemental Declaration of Devin J. Stone in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (mat)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTSAPPLICATION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #131 Application to Seal document. 1. The Motion is GRANTED; 2. The Clerk of this Court is direct to file and maintain under seal the following document: Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Devin Stone in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (Business Contract and Financial Records related to the film Walk of Shame). (hr)
April 21, 2015 Filing 131 Defendants' Application to File Supplemental Documents Under Seal in Connection with Opposition to Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp. re: Declaration (Motion related),, #130 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Devin)
April 21, 2015 Filing 130 DECLARATION of DEVIN STONE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS MOTION for Sanctions Evidentiary, Issue, Terminating, and Monetary Sanctions of $4,275.00 Against Defendants Focus World, a Division of Focus Features, LLC; Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC; and Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.; and Their Counsel of Reco #120 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Supplemental Declaration of Devin Stone ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions)(Stone, Devin)
April 14, 2015 Filing 129 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Issued to Broken Road Productions, Inc.; Declaration of Charles M. Coate #121 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
April 14, 2015 Filing 128 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION for Sanctions Evidentiary, Issue, Terminating, and Monetary Sanctions of $4,275.00 Against Defendants Focus World, a Division of Focus Features, LLC; Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC; and Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.; and Their Counsel of Reco #120 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
April 8, 2015 Filing 127 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT F TO DECLARATION OF DEVIN STONE in support of defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion for sanctions(Financial records related to the film Walk of Shame) (lc)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #125 Application to Seal. The Clerk of this Court is direct to file and maintain under seal the following document: Exhibit F to Declaration of Devin Stone in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (Financial records related to the film Walk of Shame). (hr)
April 7, 2015 Filing 125 Application to File Under Seal Document in Support (Pursuant to Pilot Program Instructions) re: Response in Opposition to Motion,, #124 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Devin)
April 7, 2015 Filing 124 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Sanctions Evidentiary, Issue, Terminating, and Monetary Sanctions of $4,275.00 Against Defendants Focus World, a Division of Focus Features, LLC; Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC; and Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.; and Their Counsel of Reco #120 filed by Defendants FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World Inc, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Devin Stone, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Stone, Devin)
April 3, 2015 Filing 123 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/16/15 re Transcript #122 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2015 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/16/15. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS Certified Transcription, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2015. (ha)
March 31, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Issued to Broken Road Productions, Inc.; Declaration of Charles M. Coate filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Johnson, Theresa)
March 30, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Evidentiary, Issue, Terminating, and Monetary Sanctions of $4,275.00 Against Defendants Focus World, a Division of Focus Features, LLC; Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC; and Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.; and Their Counsel of Record Barnes & Thornburg For Failure to Comply with Court Order Regarding Production of Documents ; Declaration of Charles M. Coate filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Johnson, Theresa)
March 27, 2015 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Charles M. Coate in Reply to Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to (1) Amend Complaint to Add Broken Road Productions, Inc. as Doe Defendant 1 and Todd Garner as Doe Defendant 2; (2) an Order Modifying the Scheduling Order to Permit Amendment of Complaint; Alternatively, (3) for a #115 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
March 27, 2015 Filing 118 Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for (1) Leave to Amend Complaint to add Broken Road Productions, Inc. as Doe Defendant 1 and Todd Garner as Doe Defendant 2; (2) An Order Modifying the Scheduling Order to Permit Amendment of Complaint; Alternatively, (3) For an Order Shortening Time on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to (1) Amend Complaint to Add Broken Road Productions, Inc. as Doe Defendant 1 and Todd Garner as Doe Defendant 2; (2) an Order Modifying the Scheduling Order to Permit Amendment of Complaint; Alternatively, (3) for a #115 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
March 25, 2015 Filing 117 STIPULATION to CORRECT ERRONEOUSLY DENOMINATED PARTY DEFENDANT IN COMPLAINT AND ANSWER Answer to Complaint,, #15 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Theresa)
March 25, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE OF LODGING filed lodging [PROPOSED] AMENDED COMPLAINT re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to (1) Amend Complaint to Add Broken Road Productions, Inc. as Doe Defendant 1 and Todd Garner as Doe Defendant 2; (2) an Order Modifying the Scheduling Order to Permit Amendment of Complaint; Alternatively, (3) for a #115 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Amended Complaint)(Johnson, Theresa)
March 25, 2015 Filing 115 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to (1) Amend Complaint to Add Broken Road Productions, Inc. as Doe Defendant 1 and Todd Garner as Doe Defendant 2; (2) an Order Modifying the Scheduling Order to Permit Amendment of Complaint; Alternatively, (3) for an Order Shortening Time on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Theresa)
March 10, 2015 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC Court Smart (CS). Court will contact DEVIN STONE at devin.stone@btlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Scheduling Conference. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Stone, Devin)
February 25, 2015 Filing 113 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Briefing Schedule on MJOP #112 & For Hrg Without Argument filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Coate, Charles)
February 25, 2015 Filing 112 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reschedule Briefing Schedule on MJOP filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Devin)
February 25, 2015 Filing 111 DECLARATION of DEVIN STONE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings #110 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Devin Stone ISO Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Part 1 of 2 to the Declaration of Devin Stone ISO Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B-Part 2 of 2 to the Declaration of Devin Stone ISO Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Stone, Devin)
February 25, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings filed by DEFENDANTS Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed re Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Stone, Devin)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #107 and DECLARATION OF DEVIN STONE #108 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. The hearing date of March 23, 2015 was closed on December 17, 2014. To view date and time for civil motions for Judge Morrow, please visit the "Judges Procedures and Schedule" page. Click Motion Calendar to view all the closed dates. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 23, 2015 Filing 108 [STRICKEN] DECLARATION of Devin Stone in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #107 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (part 1), #3 Exhibit B (part 2))(Stone, Devin) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ah).
February 23, 2015 Filing 107 [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Devin) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ah).
February 23, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC of Lodging DVD - Movie "Walk of Shame". (Stone, Devin)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: re Stipulation to Continue #98 . Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2015 08:30 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (ah)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) SETTING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT STEVEN BRILL; (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (DOCKET NO. #61 ); AND (3) DENYING PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS (DOCKET NOS. #61 , #82 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: 1. Defendant Steven Brill shall appear for deposition on March 10, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. at the offices of Plaintiff's Counsel. 2. In light of the foregoing order and the orders issued by this Court on February 6, 2015, and January 16, 2015, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions is moot to the extent it seeks substantive relief and is denied as such. 3. To the extent Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions and defendants' opposition thereto seek sanctions, such requests are denied as it is the Court's view that all counsel share blame for their failure to agree upon a deposition schedule without court intervention and accordingly, that an award of sanctions against either side would be unjust. (hr)
February 11, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE RESPONSIVE NOTICE RE: DEPOSITION OF STEVEN BRILL PER FEBRUARY 6, 2015 ORDER filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
February 10, 2015 Filing 102 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120), #99 , Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120), #100 . The following error(s) was found: INCORRECT DATE FORMAT ; LIST NAME OF COURT REPORTER OR IF DIGITALLY RECORDED, LIST COURTSMART; ITEMS #19 & 20 SHOULD BE BLANK. YOU MAY LIST MORE THAN 1 HEARING DATE ON ORDER FORM. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 10, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of STEVEN BRILL on March 11, 2015, March 10, 2015, March 9, 2015 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.. (Stone, Devin)
February 10, 2015 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Devin Stone at devin.stone@btlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 2/4/2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Stone, Devin)
February 10, 2015 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Corp. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Devin Stone at devin.stone@btlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 1/16/2015. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Stone, Devin)
February 10, 2015 Filing 98 STIPULATION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT DATES PER COURT'S FEBRUARY 4, 2015 ORDER filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Theresa)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) (1) VACATING HEARING ON AND SUBMITTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS (DOCKET NO. 61); (2) SETTING DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS BANKS AND HANDELMAN; (3) DIRECTING DEFENSE TO FILE NOTICE REGARDING DATES ON WHICH DEFENDANT BRILL IS AVAILABLE FOR DEPOSITION; AND (4) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSIVE NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of #61 . The hearing calendared for February 10, 2015 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. 2. Defendant Elizabeth Banks shall appear for deposition on February 26, 2015 at the time and location previously noticed. 3. Defendant Max Handelman shall appear for deposition on February 27, 2015 at the time and location previously noticed. 4. By not later than 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, February 10, 2015, defense counsel shall file a notice specifying three dates between March 2 and March 13 on which Steven Brill and his counsel are available for deposition and an indication as to the defense's order of preference. 5. By not later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 12, 2015, plaintiff's counsel shall file a responsive notice advising the Court whether plaintiff's counsel is available on each of the dates proffered by defense counsel for the deposition of Steven Brill and an indication as to plaintiff's order of preference. (hr)
February 6, 2015 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Devin J. Stone re Notice (Other) #95 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stone, Devin)
February 6, 2015 Filing 95 NOTICE to Magistrate Regarding Depositions (Further) filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
February 6, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSIVE NOTICE RE: FEBRUARY 2, 2015 ORDER filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION AS MOOT #89 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. In light of the parties' telephone conference with the court on February 4, 2015, the court denies Plaintiff's ex parte application to extend the discovery cut-off date as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 4, 2015 Filing 92 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court indicates that it is willing to extend all case management dates by approximately 60 days, and directs the parties to file a joint stipulation proposing new dates. Court Reporter: N/A. (ah)
February 4, 2015 Filing 91 Opposition in Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting a Unilateral Extension of Discovery Cut-Off as to Plaintiff Only ; Declaration of Charles M. Coate #89 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Devin Stone)(Stone, Devin)
February 4, 2015 Filing 90 REPORT of Regarding Deposition Dates filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
February 3, 2015 Filing 89 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting a Unilateral Extension of Discovery Cut-Off as to Plaintiff Only ; Declaration of Charles M. Coate filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) (1) DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE NOTICE OR STIPULATION; AND (2) CONDITIONALLY DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE RESPONSIVE NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: 1. By not later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, February 4, 2015: defense counsel shall file either (a) a notice specifying at least six dates before February 27, 2015 on which (i) defendant Banks and her counsel are available for deposition; (ii) defendant Handelman and his counsel are available for deposition; and (iii) defendant Brill and his counsel are available for deposition; or (b) a stipulation by defense counsel and plaintiff's counsel embodying the parties' agreement to conduct the depositions of the foregoing defendants on specified dates/times before February 27, 2015. 2. In the event defense counsel files a notice (as opposed to a stipulation), plaintiff's counsel, by not later than 12:00 p.m. on Friday February 6, 2015, shall file a responsive notice advising the Court of which date(s), among those proffered in defense counsel's notice, that plaintiff's counsel is available to depose each such deponent/desires to depose each such deponent. (hr)
January 26, 2015 Filing 87 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of #61 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
January 26, 2015 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Philip Korn counsel for Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman. Filed by Defendants Gregory P. Korn. (Korn, Gregory)
January 16, 2015 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Devin Stone in Support of Steven Brill's Opposition to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of #61 filed by Defendant Steven Brill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Stone, Devin)
January 16, 2015 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of #61 filed by Defendant Steven Brill. (Stone, Devin)
January 16, 2015 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Devin Stone in Support of Opposition of Elizabeth Banks' and Max Handelman's Opposition to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of #61 filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Stone, Devin)
January 16, 2015 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of #61 filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman. (Stone, Devin)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE ON PLAINTIFF'S EIGHT (8) DISCOVERY MOTIONS ("PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS") (DOCKET NOS. [43-50]); ORDER APPROVING PARTIES' STIPULATIONS REGARDING RESOLUTION THEREOF; ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ORDER DENYING REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Counsel indicated they had no objection to the entry of a Protective Order in the form attached to the Court's January 12, 2015 minute order. The Court indicated that such Protective Order would be issued this date. Counsel agreed/stipulated to resolve all of their material outstanding disputes regarding Plaintiff's Motions on terms summarized in the attached chart. The Court approved such stipulation and so ordered. The Court concluded that Plaintiff's Motions were moot, denied them without prejudice as such, and vacated the further briefing schedule and hearing thereon. The Court further denied the parties' requests for sanctions for the reasons stated on the record. (Attachments: #1 Chart) (dml)
January 16, 2015 Filing 80 TEXT ENTRY ONLY: Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at JC_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. See order for details. (hr)
January 14, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman. correcting Declaration (Motion related),,,,, #66 (Stone, Devin)
January 13, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Opposition to Ex Parte Application #60 . (lom)
January 13, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike #58 . (lom)
January 12, 2015 Filing 75 STATEMENT of DEFENDANT SIDNEY KIMMEL ENTERTAINMENT, INC. IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #49 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 74 STATEMENT of DEFENDANT STEVEN BRILL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Steven Brill's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #45 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 73 STATEMENT of DEFENDANT LAKESHORE ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #46 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 72 STATEMENT of DEFENDANT FOCUS FEATURES, LLC IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 71 STATEMENT of DEFENDANTBRILLCO, INC IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Brillco, Inc.'s Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #48 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 70 STATEMENT of DEFENDANT FILMDISTRICT PICTURES, LLC IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #47 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 69 STATEMENT of DEFENDANT MAX HANDELMAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION to Compel Defendant Max Handelman's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #44 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 68 STATEMENT of DEFENDANT ELIZABETH BANKS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Elizabeth Banks' Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #43 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 67 DECLARATION of DEVIN STONE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #47 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Steven Brill's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #45 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Brillco, Inc.'s Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #48 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #46 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #49 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #2 Exhibit B In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #3 Exhibit C In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #4 Exhibit D In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #5 Exhibit E In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #6 Exhibit F In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #7 Exhibit G In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #8 Exhibit H In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #9 Exhibit I In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #10 Exhibit J In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #11 Exhibit K In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #12 Exhibit L In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #13 Exhibit M In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel)(Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 66 DECLARATION of DEVIN STONE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Compel Defendant Elizabeth Banks' Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #43 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Max Handelman's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #44 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #2 Exhibit B In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #3 Exhibit C In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #4 Exhibit D In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #5 Exhibit E In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #6 Exhibit F In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #7 Exhibit G In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #8 Exhibit H In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #9 Exhibit I In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #10 Exhibit J In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #11 Exhibit K In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #12 Exhibit L In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #13 Exhibit M In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel, #14 Exhibit N In Support of Opposition to Motions to Compel)(Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 65 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #46 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #47 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #49 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Steven Brill's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #45 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Brillco, Inc.'s Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #48 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Filing 64 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Defendant Elizabeth Banks' Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #43 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Max Handelman's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #44 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DOCKET NO. #58 ); (2) SETTING AND DIRECTING COUNSEL TO APPEAR FOR STATUS CONFERENCE/MEET AND CONFER SESSION; AND (3) RE ATTACHED TENTATIVE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: 1. Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Ex Parte Application to Deny or Strike Plaintiff's Eight Motions to Compel is denied without prejudice. 2. Counsel are directed to appear for a status conference/meet and confer session this Friday, January 16, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20 of the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. 3. Attached hereto is a Protective Order the Court is tentatively inclined to issue in this action. Any party who has an objection thereto or wishes to propose a modification thereto, shall file such proposed objection/modification by Thursday, January 15, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. See order for further details. (Attachments: #1 Tentative Protective Order) (hr)
January 9, 2015 Filing 62 Amendment to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of #61 Amended Exhibits "A," "B," and "I" filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
January 9, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, and Steven Brill , and Request for Sanctions Against Defendants and Their Counsel Devin Stone, Stephen Mick, and Barnes & Thornburgh LLP in the Amount of $4,275.00; Declaration of Charles M. Coate filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Johnson, Theresa)
January 9, 2015 Filing 60 OPPOSITION in Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 , MOTION to Compel Defen #58 ; Declaration of Theresa E. Johnson filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
January 8, 2015 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Devin J. Stone In Support EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 , MOTION to Compel Defen #58 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Declaration J)(Stone, Devin)
January 8, 2015 Filing 58 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike re MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #46 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #47 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Elizabeth Banks' Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #43 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #49 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Steven Brill's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #45 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Max Handelman's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #44 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Brillco, Inc.'s Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #48 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Devin)
January 7, 2015 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Devin J. Stone re Report #56 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stone, Devin)
January 7, 2015 Filing 56 Half of Joint Status REPORT of Meet and Confer Efforts filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Stone, Devin)
January 7, 2015 Filing 55 STATEMENT of DECLARATION IN LIEU OF JOINT STATEMENT RE: NARROWED ISSUES RE: PENDING MOTIONS TO COMPEL (In Response to Magistrate's Order) MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #46 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #47 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Elizabeth Banks' Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #43 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #49 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Steven Brill's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #45 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Max Handelman's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #44 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Brillco, Inc.'s Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #48 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE MOTIONS TO COMPEL (DOCKET NO. #51 ); (2) DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT; (3) CONTINUING HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS (DOCKET NOS. 43-50); AND (4) SETTING FURTHER BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: 1. Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Ex Parte Application to Strike Plaintiff's Eight Motions to Compel is denied. 2. The parties to the eight pending motions to compel are directed forthwith to meet and confer in good faith regarding the same and to narrow, to the degree possible based upon a good faith meet and confer, the matters currently in dispute. 3. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by not later than January 7, 2015 4. Defendants shall file their oppositions to any non-mooted portions of the motions to compel by not later than January 12, 2015. 5. Plaintiff shall file their replies by not later than January 16, 2015. 6. The hearings on any non-mooted portions of the motions to compel are continued to January 27, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (hr)
December 19, 2014 Filing 53 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LAKESHORE ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL; DECLARATION OF THERESA E. JOHNSON in Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff's Eight Motions to Compel for Extreme Failure to Comply with the Local Rules re MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's R #51 filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Coate, Charles)
December 19, 2014 Filing 52 DECLARATION of DEVIN STONE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff's Eight Motions to Compel for Extreme Failure to Comply with the Local Rules re MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's R #51 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A In Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Compel, #2 Exhibit B In Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Compel, #3 Exhibit C In Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Compel, #4 Exhibit D In Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Compel, #5 Exhibit E In Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Compel, #6 Exhibit F In Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Compel, #7 Exhibit G In Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Compel)(Stone, Devin)
December 19, 2014 Filing 51 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Plaintiff's Eight Motions to Compel for Extreme Failure to Comply with the Local Rules re MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #50 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #46 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #47 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Elizabeth Banks' Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #43 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #49 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Steven Brill's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #45 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Max Handelman's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #44 , MOTION to Compel Defendant Brillco, Inc.'s Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions #48 filed by DEFENDANT Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application to Strike Plaintiff's Eight Motions to Compel)(Stone, Devin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Focus Features, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 18, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 18, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Brillco, Inc.'s Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 18, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 16, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 16, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Steven Brill's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 16, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Max Handelman's Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 16, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Elizabeth Banks' Production of Documents and Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, and for Monetary Sanctions filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Coate, Charles)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Plaintiff to Produce its Screenplay #33 and Denying Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Staying Discovery #40 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court orders Shame on You to produce a copy of Rosen's screenplay for each defendant on or before December 17, 2014. Defendants are ordered to produce any interim drafts of Brill's screenplay in their possession on or before December 22, 2014. (ah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Devin Stone in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Local Rule 37-1 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Plaintiff's Compliance with Court's Prior Order #40 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stone, Devin)
December 11, 2014 Filing 40 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Local Rule 37-1 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Plaintiff's Compliance with Court's Prior Order filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Devin)
December 8, 2014 Filing 37 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY STEPHEN R. MICK in place of attorney MICHAEL J. KUMP filed by DEFENDANT Elizabeth Banks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Request for Approval of Substitution for Elizabeth Banks)(Attorney Devin Stone added to party Elizabeth Banks(pty:dft))(Stone, Devin)
December 8, 2014 Filing 36 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY STEPHEN R. MICK in place of attorney MICHAEL J. KUMP filed by DEFENDANT Max Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Request for Approval of Substitution for Max Handelman)(Attorney Devin Stone added to party Max Handelman(pty:dft))(Stone, Devin)
December 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Margaret M. Morrow granting #36 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Max Handelman, Defendant, to substitute Stephen R. Mich, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Michael J. Kump (bm)
December 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Margaret M. Morrow granting #37 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Elizabeth Banks, Defendant, to substitute Stephen R. Mich, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Michael J. Kump. (bm)
November 7, 2014 Filing 35 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Comply With Court's Directive to Exchange Screenplay #33 and Response by Plaintiff Seeking Reciprocal Order Compelling Defendants to Produce all Defendant Walk of Shame Screenplays and Development Notes; Declaration of Charles M. Coate filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Coate, Charles)
November 6, 2014 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Devin Stone in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Comply With Court's Directive to Exchange Screenplay #33 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stone, Devin)
November 6, 2014 Filing 33 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Comply With Court's Directive to Exchange Screenplay filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stone, Devin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 9:05 A.M. re Transcript #31 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2014 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 9:05 A.M. Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. NIRENBERG, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2015. (Nirenberg, C)
November 3, 2014 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to DEFENDANT Lakeshore Entertainment Corp. Court Reporter. Court will contact Devin Stone at devin.stone@btlaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on 09/29/2014. Opening Statement by Plaintiff on 09/29/2014. Opening Statement by Defendant on 09/29/2014. Closing Argument by Plaintiff on 09/29/2014. Closing Argument by Defendant on 09/29/2014. Opinion of the Court on 09/29/2014. Jury Instructions on 09/29/2014. Testimony of: 09/29/2014. Other: 09/29/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Stone, Devin)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 04/27/2015. (ah)
September 29, 2014 Filing 28 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2015 08:30 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2015 05:00 PM. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg. (ah)
September 11, 2014 Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow previously scheduled for 09/15/2014 9:00 am has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 5, 2014 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6-8 days, filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc.. (Johnson, Theresa)
July 16, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, identifying Shame on You Productions, Inc., Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman, Steven Brill, Brillco, Inc., Focus World, Inc., Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC, Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Kump, Michael)
July 16, 2014 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Max Handelman.(Attorney Michael J Kump added to party Elizabeth Banks(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kump added to party Max Handelman(pty:dft))(Kump, Michael)
July 3, 2014 Filing 23 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc. Amendment to Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) #14 (Johnson, Theresa)
July 2, 2014 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc, upon Defendant Max Handelman served on 6/10/2014, answer due 7/16/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Max Handelman in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Johnson, Theresa)
July 2, 2014 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shame On You Productions Inc, upon Defendant Elizabeth Banks served on 6/10/2014, answer due 7/16/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elizabeth Banks in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Johnson, Theresa)
June 30, 2014 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Elizabeth Banks answer now due 7/16/2014; Max Handelman answer now due 7/16/2014, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Shame On You Productions Inc.(Johnson, Theresa)
June 30, 2014 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World Inc, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, identifying Lakeshore Entertainment Group, LLC, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Filmdistrict Pictures, LLC, Focus World, Inc., Sidney Kimmel Entertainment, LLC, Brillco, Inc., Steven Brill. (Stone, Devin)
June 26, 2014 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) #17 . Defendant is directed to comply with Local Rule 7.1-1 on or before 06/30/2014. Failure to comply will result in the court striking defendant's answer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 25, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #15 . (bm)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/5/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (ah)
June 23, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by DEFENDANTS Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World Inc, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC.(Attorney Devin Stone added to party Steven Brill(pty:dft), Attorney Devin Stone added to party Brillco Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Devin Stone added to party FilmDistrict Pictures LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Devin Stone added to party Focus World Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Devin Stone added to party Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Devin Stone added to party Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC(pty:dft))(Stone, Devin)
June 3, 2014 Filing 14 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Shame On You Productions Inc. (Johnson, Theresa)
June 3, 2014 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC answer now due 6/23/2014; Steven Brill answer now due 6/23/2014; Brillco Inc answer now due 6/23/2014; FilmDistrict Pictures LLC answer now due 6/23/2014; Focus World Inc answer now due 6/23/2014; Lakeshore Entertainment Corp. answer now due 6/23/2014; Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC answer now due 6/23/2014, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC.(Mick, Stephen)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING STIPULATION TO EXTEND #11 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. The court strikes the stipulation to extend for the following reason: Incorrect event selected. Correct event: Civil Events - Other Filings - Stipulations - Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2014 Filing 11 [STRICKEN] APPLICATION for Extend Time to File Answer to 6/23/2014 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC. (Attorney Stephen R Mick added to party Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC(pty:dft))(Mick, Stephen) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ah).
May 8, 2014 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 7, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
May 7, 2014 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Elizabeth Banks, Steven Brill, Brillco Inc, FilmDistrict Pictures LLC, Focus World Inc, Max Handelman, Lakeshore Entertainment Corp., Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC, Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC. (et)
May 7, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 7, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
May 7, 2014 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF SHAME ON YOU PRODUCTIONS, INC., identifying ELIZABETH BANKS; MAX HANDELMAN; STEVEN BRILL; BRILLCO, INC.; FOCUS WORLD, INC.; SIDNEY KIMMEL ENTERTAINMENT, LLC; FILMDISTRICT PICTURES, LLC; LAKESHORE ENTERTAINMENT CORP.; LAKESHORE ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC. (Attorney Theresa E Johnson added to party SHAME ON YOU PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla))(Johnson, Theresa)
May 7, 2014 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF SHAME ON YOU PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 7, 2014 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SHAME ON YOU PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 7, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FEES PAID filed by PLAINTIFF SHAME ON YOU PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Johnson, Theresa)
May 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by PLAINTIFF SHAME ON YOU PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attorney Charles Michael Coate added to party SHAME ON YOU PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla))(Coate, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shame On You Productions Inc et al v. Elizabeth Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus World, A Division of Focus Features, LLC
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus World Inc
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Banks
Represented By: Gregory Philip Korn
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Represented By: Michael J Kump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Kimmel Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 3-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Road Productions, Inc.
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Entertainment Corp.
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brillco Inc
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Garner
Represented By: David Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Entertainment Group LLC
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FilmDistrict Pictures LLC
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Brill
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Handelman
Represented By: Gregory Philip Korn
Represented By: Stephen R Mick
Represented By: Devin Stone
Represented By: Michael J Kump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shame On You Productions Inc
Represented By: Michael M Plotkin
Represented By: Theresa E Johnson
Represented By: Charles Michael Coate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?