Frank Dufour v. Robert Allen et al

Defendant: Robert Allen, Aurora Loan Services, D.A.H.A.R., Does, Education Success Incorporated, Enlightened Millionaire Institute, L.C., Enlightened Wealth Institute International L.C., Enlightened Wealth Institute L.C., Freedom Mortgage, Giddens & Giddens, Green Planet Services, Jay B. Amons, Emily Merkley, Midland Mortgage Company, Millennium Bank, N.A., National Acceptance Corporation, Opteum Financial Services, Thomas Painter, Charlie Payne, Prosper Holdings Incorporated, R.A.H.A.D, Sherson Lehman and Steven Usry
Plaintiff: Frank Dufour
Cross Defendant: PROSPER, INC
Case Number: 2:2014cv05616
Filed: July 19, 2014
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Suzanne H. Segal
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 258 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Second Request for Default Judgment Against Defendant Giddens & Giddens 253 Second Request for Default Judgment Against Defendant Charlie Payne 254 . The Court DENIES plaintiff's requests for entry of default judgment. However, the Court denies plaintiff's requests WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewal. In any future requests for entry of default judgment plaintiff is instructed to clearly set forth why, accepting the allegations in the operative complaint as true, he is entitled to prevail on his claims against defendants Payne and Giddens. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
March 31, 2016 251 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REVIEW MAGISTRATE JUDGE SEGAL'S ORDER ENTERED FEBRUARY 24, 2016 (Dkt. 247, filed March 3, 2016) by Judge Christina A. Snyder denying 247 MOTION for Review: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court DENIES plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 14, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the Court's prior order granting summary judgment in favor of defendantMillennium Bank, N.A. 229 . The Court VACATES those portions of its prior order concluding that plaintiff's claims for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing and for constructive trust were barred by the applicable statutes of limitation. Court Reporter: Debi Read. (gk)
March 19, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DEFENDANT PROSPER, INCS MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT (Dkt. No. 151, filed February 17, 2015) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS Prospers motion to voluntarily dismiss the Cross-Complaint without prejudice, and without conditions. 151 (pj)
September 29, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendant Freedom Home Mortgage Corporation's Motion for Sanctions 37 is DENIED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Dufour v. Robert Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allen
Represented By: William Kelly Nash
Represented By: David W Tufts
Represented By: Scott W Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.A.H.A.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Success Incorporated
Represented By: William Kelly Nash
Represented By: David W Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enlightened Millionaire Institute, L.C.
Represented By: Christopher A Jones
Represented By: Charles L Perschon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enlightened Wealth Institute International L.C.
Represented By: Christopher A Jones
Represented By: Charles L Perschon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enlightened Wealth Institute L.C.
Represented By: Christopher A Jones
Represented By: Charles L Perschon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage
Represented By: Artin Betpera
Represented By: Howard D Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giddens & Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Planet Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay B. Amons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Frederick C Moore
Represented By: Leslie Thorpe Riasanovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Christopher A Jones
Represented By: Charles L Perschon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opteum Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Painter
Represented By: Christopher A Jones
Represented By: Charles L Perschon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosper Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Scott W Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.A.H.A.D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherson Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Usry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Dufour
Represented By: Andrew J Kulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PROSPER, INC
Represented By: William Kelly Nash
Represented By: David W Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?