Fredger Alexander et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Landry, Timothy Stack, Ronald Cade, Bennie Boatwright, Sandra Valle, Ruthann Scott, Sean Karmody, George Leiva, Stephen Yurochko, James Edwards, Fredger Alexander, Arturo Ramos, Roscoe Jolla, Spiro Roditis, Francis Bolan, Steven Dorsey, Jeffrey Fischer, Eva Perry, Francisco Lopez, Timothy Kim, Georgia Odom, Charles Thomas, Jee Kim, Alfonso Reyes, Nicholas Lee, Maggie Sherman, Christy Chase, Laura Preasmyer, Leon Ortega, Deshaun Hall, Frank Ciezadlo, Francois Wise, Gregg Webber, Matthew McNulty, Veronica Padilla, Bridget Pickett, Michael Tirella, Nathaniel Hampton, Darryl Shum, Adam Green, William Segee, Branden Mamrot, Chris Chavarria, Hugo Valdez, Marcella Collins, Eric Briggs, David Cordova, Michael Calhoun, Tony Im, Sean McGee, Pedro Llanes, Taaj Muhammed, Sharon Kroger, Miguel Gomez, Robert Felix and Eric Mollinedo
Defendant: City of Los Angeles and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Steven Pearl
Case Number: 2:2014cv05645
Filed: July 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Filing 59 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #55 , CCA # 15-56969. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered April 30, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #58 AFFIRMED.] (mat)
April 30, 2018 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,,, #55 filed by Francisco Lopez, Steven Dorsey, Darryl Shum, Francois Wise, Leon Ortega, David Cordova, Sean McGee, Tony Im, Bennie Boatwright, Eva Perry, Arturo Ramos, Taaj Muhammed, Francis Bolan, Miguel Gomez, Sharon Kroger, Deshaun Hall, Marcella Collins, Jee Kim, Ruthann Scott, Frank Ciezadlo, Charles Thomas, James Edwards, Michael Calhoun, Adam Green, George Leiva, Pedro Llanes, Stephen Yurochko, Bridget Pickett, Spiro Roditis, Roscoe Jolla, Christy Chase, Maggie Sherman, Robert Felix, Nathaniel Hampton, Sandra Valle, Sean Karmody, Timothy Kim, Ronald Cade, Jeffrey Fischer, Nicholas Lee, Chris Chavarria, Matthew McNulty, Christopher Landry, Gregg Webber, Georgia Odom, Eric Briggs, Eric Mollinedo, Veronica Padilla, William Segee, Hugo Valdez, Timothy Stack, Branden Mamrot, Laura Preasmyer, Alfonso Reyes, Michael Tirella, Steven Pearl. CCA # 15-56969. AFFIRMED. (mat)
December 24, 2015 Filing 57 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56969, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #55 as to ALL PLAINTIFFS EXCEPT FREDGER ALEXANDER. (car)
December 22, 2015 Filing 56 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,,, #55 . (Petersen, Gregory)
December 22, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS EXCEPT FREDGER ALEXANDER - Bennie Boatwright, Francis Bolan, Eric Briggs, Ronald Cade, Michael Calhoun, Christy Chase, Chris Chavarria, Frank Ciezadlo, Marcella Collins, David Cordova, Steven Dorsey, James Edwards, Robert Felix, Jeffrey Fischer, Miguel Gomez, Adam Green, Deshaun Hall, Nathaniel Hampton, Tony Im, Roscoe Jolla, Sean Karmody, Jee Kim, Timothy Kim, Sharon Kroger, Christopher Landry, Nicholas Lee, George Leiva, Pedro Llanes, Francisco Lopez, Branden Mamrot, Sean McGee, Matthew McNulty, Eric Mollinedo, Taaj Muhammed, Georgia Odom, Leon Ortega, Veronica Padilla, Steven Pearl, Eva Perry, Bridget Pickett, Laura Preasmyer, Arturo Ramos, Alfonso Reyes, Spiro Roditis, Ruthann Scott, William Segee, Maggie Sherman, Darryl Shum, Timothy Stack, Charles Thomas, Michael Tirella, Hugo Valdez, Sandra Valle, Gregg Webber, Francois Wise, Stephen Yurochko. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Party,,, #31 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-16991285.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order dismissing all but the first named plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Service List)(Petersen, Gregory)
November 23, 2015 Filing 54 JUDGMENT RE: APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #53 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: 1. The Court has reviewed Judge George H. King's Judgment and Order Re: Approval of Settlement Agreement Judgment And Dismissal with Prejudice, attached as Exhibit "A" to the City's Notice of Lodging. Judge King's Judgment and Order approved the settlement agreement between the City of Los Angeles and twenty individual plaintiffs, including Plaintiff Fredger Alexander ("Settlement Agreement"), attached as Exhibit B to the Notice of Lodging. 2. In accordance with Judge King's Order, Judgment is hereby entered in this action and the action is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
November 20, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re: [Proposed] Judgment re Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice re Order #52 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment re Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Extend Stay #51 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall as follows: The matter is STAYED until 12/15/2015. (jp)
October 15, 2015 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND STAY by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation #49 of the parties, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby orders as follows: (1) The matter is stayed until 9/30/2015. (jp)
July 17, 2015 Filing 49 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement Approval filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES ORDER RULING ON THE PARTIES' STIPULATION by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court approves the Stipulation and stays the matter for 60 days. If the parties need more time to finalize the settlement, future stipulations should describe why additional time is needed. (jp)
May 21, 2015 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Finalization of Settlement filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation for 90-day Stay Pending Finalization of Settlement)(Yoo, Danny)
May 19, 2015 Filing 48 MINUTES OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. King: Counsel are present and the appropriate representatives. Court conducts confidential settlement conference with counsel and the parties. The above stated cases have reached a global settlement. The terms of the settlement are placed on the record. Any pending motions shall be TAKEN OFF CALENDAR by the moving party. It remains the responsibility and duty of counsel to move the District Judge for each individual case by way of stipulation to be presented to them to vacate and stay any pending deadline dates for ninety (90) days. Fees and costs motions shall be heard by Chief Judge King. Counsel shall file the appropriate stipulation and order to dismiss the following cases: CV 14-5655-PA; CV 14-5678-JAK; CV 14-5654 JAK; CV14-5641-R; CV 14-5685-DMG; CV 14-5636-RGK; CV 14-5632-PSG; CV 14-5671-R; CV14-5690-R; CV 14-5644-R; CV 14-5696-RGK; CV 14-5638-R. Court Reporter: Khowoonsun (Koni) Chong. (bm)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AS MOOT AND VACATING MAY 12, 2015 HEARING by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal #41 . Pursuant to Defendant's request, the Motion to Compel is DENIED as MOOT and the May 12, 2015 hearing is VACATED. See Order for further details. (bpo)
May 8, 2015 Filing 44 Notice of Withdrawal of Request to Compel, #41 filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 28, 2015 Filing 43 REPLY in Support of First REQUEST to Compel Discovery Responses #41 , Plaintiff's Deposition, and Terminating Sanctions filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua A. Goodman in Support of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Counsel's Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 21, 2015 Filing 42 OPPOSITION to First REQUEST to Compel Discovery Responses #41 filed by Plaintiff Fredger Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Declaration J. Adam Clayton)(Petersen, Gregory)
April 14, 2015 Filing 41 First REQUEST to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. Request set for hearing on 5/12/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
April 2, 2015 Filing 40 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven Pearl: Mediation held on March 24, 2015. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Killefer, Gail)
March 31, 2015 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) re: Settlement filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven Pearl has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
February 3, 2015 Filing 37 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Steven G. Pearl may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Fredger Alexander(Petersen, Gregory)
January 26, 2015 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Geoffrey S Sheldon counsel for Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. Daniel Aguilera is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Re Plaintiffs' Motion Referring Parties to ADR Procedure No. 2 Pursuant to L.R. 16-15.4 #34 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall that This action is referred to ADR Procedure No. 2 to utilize the Court's Mediation Panel and conduct coordinated ADR proceedings with any of the related actions wherein the same or similar Orders have been entered. Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, the parties must obtain the consent of a Panel Mediator who will conduct the mediation, and file form ADR-2, Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator. The Parties are to have completed ADR proceedings on or before 3/31/2015. This Order supersedes any previous Order by this Court regarding the referral to ADR Proceedings. (jp)
January 16, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for /TO REFER CASE TO ADR PROCEEDING NO. 2 [NO HEARING REQUESTED filed by Plaintiff Fredger Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
January 2, 2015 Filing 33 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Alter Judgment,,, Motion for Relief,, #32 filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS Fredger Alexander. (Petersen, Gregory)
December 23, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Dismiss Party,,, #31 . , MOTION for Relief from This Court's November 25, 2014 Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Dismiss [all but the first named plaintiff] re Order on Motion to Dismiss Party,,, #31 filed by Plaintiffs Fredger Alexander. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MISJOINDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Fredger Alexander #18 and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, dismisses all but the first named Plaintiff Fredger Alexander from this action without prejudice. Defendant also moves to strike paragraphs 5, 16, 18, and 21 from the Complaint, which relate to Plaintiffs' collective action allegations. Because the Court finds that Plaintiffs are misjoined, i.e., that their claims do not arise out of the same transaction or series of transactions, the Court STRIKES Paragraphs 5, 16, 18, and 21 from the Complaint. Defendant's Requests for Judicial Notice are DENIED. Defendant does not identify the specific, relevant "adjudicative facts" not subject to reasonable dispute. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 25, 2014 Filing 30 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court and counsel confer. The Court states the oral tentative ruling. Counsel respond to the tentative ruling. Following oral argument, the Court advises counsel that Defendant's Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss, etc. #18 is taken under submission and a written order will issue. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (gk)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 1 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Case ordered referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for such settlement proceedings as the judge may conduct or direct. (vv)
November 12, 2014 Filing 28 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Magistrate for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 10, 2014 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander #18 REPLY filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 10, 2014 Filing 26 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander #18 REPLY filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 4, 2014 Filing 25 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Following discussions with the parties, the Court sets the following:ADR-1 Form shall be filed on or before 11/12/2014. Fact discovery shall be completed on or before 4/30/2015. Expert discovery shall be completed on or before 5/30/2015. Settlement conference shall be held on or before 8/28/2015. Motions shall be set for oral argument on or before 7/28/2015 at 10:00 AM.Pre Trial Conference is set on 10/26/2015 at 2:30 PM. Jury Trial is set on 11/17/2015 at 10:00 AM. (est. 7 days)Defendants Motion to dismiss/misjoinder to dismiss #16 filed on October 27, 2014 is hereby withdrawn. The Defendants motion for misjoinder to dismiss all individually named plaintiffs exceptFredger Alexander #18 will remain on calendar for November 25, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. (vv) (Main Document 25 replaced on 11/5/2014) (vv). Modified on 11/5/2014 (gk).
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting #22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jerry Adam Clayton on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Gregory G. Petersen as local counsel. (lt)
November 3, 2014 Filing 23 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander #18 filed by Plaintiff Fredger Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Petersen, Gregory)
November 3, 2014 Filing 22 First APPLICATION for attorney Jerry "Adam" Clayton to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14721324 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Fredger Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
October 28, 2014 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES.. (Abrena, Jolina)
October 28, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. correcting MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander #16 , Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief, #17 (Yoo, Danny)
October 28, 2014 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander #18 filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Yoo, Danny)
October 28, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Misjoinder to dismiss all individually named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander)(Yoo, Danny)
October 27, 2014 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander #16 filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Yoo, Danny)
October 27, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander All Plaintiffs Motion for Misjoinder to Dismiss all Individually Named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Misjoinder to dismiss all individually named Plaintiffs except Fredger Alexander)(Yoo, Danny)
September 12, 2014 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Fredger Alexander. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,, #3 (Petersen, Gregory)
September 10, 2014 Filing 14 City of Los Angeles NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES, (Attorney Geoffrey S Sheldon added to party CITY OF LOS ANGELES(pty:dft))(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Court's own motion, this case is set for a Scheduling Conference on 11/4/2014 11:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Counsel shall file a Rule 26(f) discovery plan within 14 days after the conference of counsel. See document for details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 20, 2014 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,, #1 for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq. filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Attorney Brian P Walter added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Walter, Brian)
August 15, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Branden Mamrot pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to City of Los Angeles. (Petersen, Gregory)
August 14, 2014 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fredger Alexander, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 7/30/2014, answer due 8/20/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Vizcarra - City Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Petersen, Gregory)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-05645 CBM(SSx). (rn)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Gary A. Feess, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 04-08492 GAF(AJWx) (rn)
July 21, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 21, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
July 21, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Fredger Alexander, Bennie Boatwright, Francis Bolan, Eric Briggs, Ronald Cade, Michael Calhoun, Christy Chase, Chris Chavarria, Frank Ciezadlo, Marcella Collins, David Cordova, Steven Dorsey, James Edwards, Robert Felix, Jeffrey Fischer, Miguel Gomez, Adam Green, Deshaun Hall, Nathaniel Hampton, Tony Im, Roscoe Jolla, Sean Karmody, Jee Kim, Timothy Kim, Sharon Kroger, Christopher Landry, Nicholas Lee, George Leiva, Pedro Llanes, Francisco Lopez, Branden Mamrot, Sean McGee, Matthew McNulty, Eric Mollinedo, Taaj Muhammed, Georgia Odom, Leon Ortega, Veronica Padilla, Eva Perry, Bridget Pickett, Laura Preasmyer, Arturo Ramos, Alfonso Reyes, Spiro Roditis, Ruthann Scott, William Segee, Maggie Sherman, Darryl Shum, Timothy Stack, Charles Thomas, Michael Tirella, Hugo Valdez, Sandra Valle, Gregg Webber, Francois Wise, Stephen Yurochko. Related Case(s): 2:04-cv-8592-GAF-AJW (See document for further details) (ghap) (mg).
July 21, 2014 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Fredger Alexander, Bennie Boatwright, Francis Bolan, Eric Briggs, Ronald Cade, Michael Calhoun, Christy Chase, Chris Chavarria, Frank Ciezadlo, Marcella Collins, David Cordova, Steven Dorsey, James Edwards, Robert Felix, Jeffrey Fischer, Miguel Gomez, Adam Green, Deshaun Hall, Nathaniel Hampton, Tony Im, Roscoe Jolla, Sean Karmody, Jee Kim, Timothy Kim, Sharon Kroger, Christopher Landry, Nicholas Lee, George Leiva, Pedro Llanes, Francisco Lopez, Branden Mamrot, Sean McGee, Matthew McNulty, Eric Mollinedo, Taaj Muhammed, Georgia Odom, Leon Ortega, Veronica Padilla, Eva Perry, Bridget Pickett, Laura Preasmyer, Arturo Ramos, Alfonso Reyes, Spiro Roditis, Ruthann Scott, William Segee, Maggie Sherman, Darryl Shum, Timothy Stack, Charles Thomas, Michael Tirella, Hugo Valdez, Sandra Valle, Gregg Webber, Francois Wise, Stephen Yurochko. (ghap) (mg).
July 21, 2014 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (ghap)
July 21, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Los Angeles, Does 1 through 10, inclusive.Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal.(Filing fee $ 400:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Stephen Yurochko, Jee Kim, Timothy Kim, Francis Bolan, Eva Perry, Fredger Alexander, Francisco Lopez, Laura Preasmyer, Michael Calhoun, Eric Mollinedo, George Leiva, Nathaniel Hampton, Arturo Ramos, Frank Ciezadlo, Sandra Valle, Marcella Collins, Spiro Roditis, Robert Felix, Roscoe Jolla, Veronica Padilla, Leon Ortega, Taaj Muhammed, Adam Green, Eric Briggs, William Segee, David Cordova, Charles Thomas, Michael Tirella, Alfonso Reyes, Bridget Pickett, Branden Mamrot, Francois Wise, Maggie Sherman, Nicholas Lee, Hugo Valdez, Chris Chavarria, Georgia Odom, Miguel Gomez, Ronald Cade, Timothy Stack, Pedro Llanes, Sean Karmody, Matthew McNulty, Sean McGee, Darryl Shum, Tony Im, Ruthann Scott, Deshaun Hall, Bennie Boatwright, Steven Dorsey, Gregg Webber, James Edwards, Sharon Kroger, Jeffrey Fischer, Christy Chase, Christopher Landry. (ghap) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredger Alexander et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Landry
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Stack
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Cade
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Boatwright
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Valle
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthann Scott
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Karmody
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Leiva
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Yurochko
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edwards
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredger Alexander
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Ramos
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roscoe Jolla
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spiro Roditis
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Bolan
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dorsey
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Fischer
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Perry
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Lopez
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Kim
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Odom
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Thomas
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jee Kim
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Reyes
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Lee
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Sherman
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Chase
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Preasmyer
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Ortega
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshaun Hall
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ciezadlo
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Wise
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Webber
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McNulty
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Padilla
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Pickett
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tirella
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Hampton
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Shum
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Green
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Segee
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branden Mamrot
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Chavarria
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Valdez
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Collins
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Briggs
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cordova
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Calhoun
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Im
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean McGee
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Llanes
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taaj Muhammed
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Kroger
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Gomez
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Felix
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mollinedo
Represented By: J Adam Clayton
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Steven Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Daniel P Aguilera
Represented By: Geoffrey S Sheldon
Represented By: Danny Young-In Yoo
Represented By: Wayne H Song
Represented By: Brian P Walter
Represented By: Jolina A Abrena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?