Ricardo Acosta et al v. City of Los Angeles
Plaintiff: Steve Sainz, Martin Martinez, Lee Jensen, Robert Olmos, Keith Horeczko, Kevin Pierce, Ben McPheeters, Maryann Culpepper, Walter Lopez, Osbaldo Ramos, Mika Kuroiwa, Ismael Contreras, Robert Bermudez, Edgar Ramos, Miguel Gutierrez, Christopher Campagna, Angie Whetstone, Arturo Yanez, Cory Meisner, John Martinez, Steve Grimes, Jonathan Goode, Tarriel Hopper, Gilberto Gaxiola, Nelson Scroggins, Matthew Bakotich, Debbie Luker, Guillermo Mixer, Maria Marquez, Gorgonio Medina, Jr., Richard A. Mendoza, Mark Pravongviengkham, Corey Dillard, Christopher McPheeters, James Stoa, Renee Minnick, Bradley Nielson, Rodolfo Lemos, Andres Cardenas, Michael Barrios, Vickie Lyn Nguyen, Ricardo Acosta, Joshua Riggs, David Tello, Angel Sambrano, Melvin Durant, Dennis Shaw, Danny Mendez, Jeffrey Martin, Arthur Duran, Nicholas Rothenmich, Juan Paz, Medrardo Carranza, Rebecca Martin, David Manning, Michael Pytel, Jose Delgado, Gabriel Holguin, Jose Padilla, Anthony Tejada, Marlon Prodigalidad, Tim Branley, Lolita Bermudez, Michael Munjekovich, Steve Vera, James Harper, Jeffrey Vach, Thomas Willers, Jesse Estrada, Jr., Guy Juneau, David Jamieson, Vicent Henson, James Carroll, Bret Banachowski, Andre Dixon, Mark Cleary, Doreen Wilson, Richard Carney, Maricela Ibanez, Theadore McHenry, Samuel Arnold, Daniel Logan, Steven Lecours, Enrique Robledo, David Ashley, Dale Lopez, Ofelia Tello, Tyrone Moore, Ernest Sparkman, Robert Smey, Steven Zaby, Javier Vargas, Michelle Thomas, Paul Von Lutzow, Andre Wright, Mathhew Cundiff, Dave Ross, Hal Dexter Jones, Ruben Cardenas, Thomas Bergren, Brett Deoloveira, Keith Davis, Catherine Durant, Anthony Cole, Rudy Gonzalez, Mario Cubillo, Christopher No, Paul Clements, Jeffrey Sandwell, William Limtiaco, Julio Martinez, Timothy Wunderlich, Alfredo Rosales, Gary Verge, Carlos Valdez, Adam Moore, Robert Canizales, Ara Hollenback, Jorge Martinez, Scott Ogata, Michael Johnson, Alfonso Alfaro, Rick Rodgers, Christopher Allen, Marc Tessier, Del Bourgeois, Daniel Suarez, Art Talamante, Salvatore De Bella, Arnold Porter, Jamal Dawouldi, Gregorio De La Rosa, Ramon Zepeda, Daivd Craig, Michael Chapman, Owen Mills, Paul Fedynich, Timothy Lai, Alicia Hollenback, Eric Melendez, Corey Harmon, Chris Kliever, Steven Sieker, Jane Russom, Brian Joachimstaler, Jose Herrera, Jeffrey Pelczar, Juan Cruz, Mark Rene Chavez, Kurt Thurston, David Redd, Tim O'Gorman, Luis Bonilla, Fred Williams, Joseph Adragna, Trevor Jackson, Dominick Fuentes, Kyle Remolino, Michael Shea, Sonia Banuelos, Gary Ferrato, Andrew Paredes, Louis Marin, John Calzada, Nicholas Hartman, Arthur Grein, Edward Kellogg, William Driver, Frank Montelongo, James Lopez, James Mark Arenas, Richard Gurolla, John Ayala, Darryl McGreggor, Stephen Underwood, Jesus Hernandez-Soto, Robert Coats, Eric Crosson, Timothy McLauglin, Jeanette Lawrence, Brad Mossie, Jorge Gutierrez, Cheri Doolittle, Gregg Jacobus, Morris Batts, Elva Coats, Thomas Redshaw, Rachel Rodriguez, John Key, Matthew Casalicchio, Stephanie Tuller, Stephen Wilson, Jerome Calhoun, Ruben Vega, Benjamin Gutierrez, Brian Peel, Charles Howard, Julia Peat, Ricardo Gutierrez, Aldwin Vicencio, Chris Marshall, Darren Scira, Bobby Romo and Michael Estrada
Defendant: City of Los Angeles and Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Not Yet Classified: Steven Pearl
Case Number: 2:2014cv05690
Filed: July 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Andrew J Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Filing 48 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #43 , CCA # 15-55964. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered April 30, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #47 , AFFIRMED.] (mat)
April 30, 2018 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,,, #43 filed by Brett Deoloveira, Alfonso Alfaro, Medrardo Carranza, Paul Clements, Jerome Calhoun, Maryann Culpepper, Jamal Dawouldi, Del Bourgeois, James Mark Arenas, Robert Canizales, Thomas Bergren, Keith Davis, Mario Cubillo, Mathhew Cundiff, Bret Banachowski, Christopher Allen, Morris Batts, James Carroll, Daivd Craig, David Ashley, Richard Carney, Ruben Cardenas, Michael Barrios, Lolita Bermudez, John Calzada, Juan Cruz, Salvatore De Bella, Joseph Adragna, Luis Bonilla, Gregorio De La Rosa, Jose Delgado, Corey Dillard, Samuel Arnold, Matthew Casalicchio, Robert Coats, Michael Chapman, Eric Crosson, Anthony Cole, Andres Cardenas, Andre Dixon, Matthew Bakotich, Mark Rene Chavez, Tim Branley, John Ayala, Mark Cleary, Robert Bermudez, Ismael Contreras, Sonia Banuelos, Christopher Campagna, Elva Coats. CCA # 15-55964. AFFIRMED. (mat)
July 20, 2015 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Order on Motion to Strike, #30 , as to (Except for Ricardo Acosta) all plaintiffs and Joseph Adragna Court Reporter. Court will contact Linnda Hing at Linnda@Lawnet.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Petersen, Gregory)
June 23, 2015 Filing 45 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-55964, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #43 as to Plaintiffs. (mat)
June 19, 2015 Filing 44 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,,, #43 . (Petersen, Gregory)
June 19, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Adragna, Alfonso Alfaro, Christopher Allen, James Mark Arenas, Samuel Arnold, David Ashley, John Ayala, Matthew Bakotich, Bret Banachowski, Sonia Banuelos, Michael Barrios, Morris Batts, Thomas Bergren, Lolita Bermudez, Robert Bermudez, Luis Bonilla, Del Bourgeois, Tim Branley, Jerome Calhoun, John Calzada, Christopher Campagna, Robert Canizales, Andres Cardenas, Ruben Cardenas, Richard Carney, Medrardo Carranza, James Carroll, Matthew Casalicchio, Michael Chapman, Mark Rene Chavez, Mark Cleary, Paul Clements, Elva Coats, Robert Coats, Anthony Cole, Ismael Contreras, Daivd Craig, Eric Crosson, Juan Cruz, Mario Cubillo, Maryann Culpepper, Mathhew Cundiff, Keith Davis, Jamal Dawouldi, Salvatore De Bella, Gregorio De La Rosa, Jose Delgado, Brett Deoloveira, Corey Dillard, Andre Dixon. Appeal of Order on Motion to Strike, #30 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-15945730 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dismissal Order, #2 Service List)(Petersen, Gregory)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF RICARDO ACOSTA AND REQUEST FOR COURT APPROVAL by Judge Manuel L. Real: The Court hereby ORDERS that the dismissal of this action is fair and appropriate due to the Plaintiff's failure to respond to discovery and/or failure to prosecute this action. The Joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed by the Parties' Counsel #41 is hereby approved. This case is dismissed with prejudice. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
May 21, 2015 Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
March 31, 2015 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) re: Settlement filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
March 31, 2015 Filing 39 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven Pearl: Mediation held on March 24, 2015. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Killefer, Gail)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on AUGUST 10, 2015 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before JULY 20, 2015, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is noMotion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before AUGUST 3, 2015. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as SEPTEMBER 8, 2015 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch)
February 10, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven Pearl has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
February 3, 2015 Filing 36 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Steven G. Pearl may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Acosta(Petersen, Gregory)
January 26, 2015 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Geoffrey S Sheldon counsel for Defendant City of Los Angeles. Daniel Aguilera is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
January 16, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for /TO REFER CASE TO ADR PROCEEDING NO. 2 [NO HEARING REQUESTED filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
January 9, 2015 Filing 33 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Relief, #32 filed by All Plaintiffs Ricardo Acosta. (Petersen, Gregory)
December 8, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from his Court's November 6,2014 Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Dismiss [all but the first named plaintiff] re Order on Motion to Strike, #30 filed by PLAINTIFFS Ricardo Acosta. Motion set for hearing on 2/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
November 21, 2014 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS ALL INDIVIDUALLY NAMED PLAINTIFFS EXCEPT RICARDO ACOSTA by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion To Strike, Or In The Alternative, To Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta is GRANTED #12 . (pj)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AT LEAST $13,659.40 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS UNDER FRCP 11 #20 by Judge Manuel L. Real: (pj)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Strike, Or In the Alternative, to Dismiss #12 and Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion for Sanctions #20 set for hearing on November 3, 2014 at 10:00 A.M., are suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties, without the need for oral argument; therefore, the said Motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed, and the hearing date of November 3, 2014 at 10:00 A.M. is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. (lom)
October 23, 2014 Filing 27 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.. (Goodman, Joshua)
October 23, 2014 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta #12 In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiffs Ricardo Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Petersen, Gregory)
October 20, 2014 Filing 25 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Sanctions as to Plaintiffs under FRCP 11 for at least $13,659.40 in Monetary Sanctions #20 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in support of the City of Los Angeles' Reply to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions under FRCP 11)(Goodman, Joshua)
October 17, 2014 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta #12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
October 17, 2014 Filing 23 REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta #12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
October 10, 2014 Filing 22 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Sanctions as to Plaintiffs under FRCP 11 for at least $13,659.40 in Monetary Sanctions #20 , MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta #12 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Adragna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Petersen, Gregory)
September 29, 2014 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Sanctions as to Plaintiffs under FRCP 11 for at least $13,659.40 in Monetary Sanctions #20 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 29, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions as to Plaintiffs under FRCP 11 for at least $13,659.40 in Monetary Sanctions filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 11/3/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey S. Sheldon in support of The City of Los Angeles' Motion for Sanctions under FRCP 11, #2 Proposed Order Granting The City of Los Angeles' Motion for Sanctions under FRCP 11)(Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 29, 2014 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles, re MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta #12 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief #13 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, #18 served on 9/29/14. (Sheldon, Geoffrey)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion, Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Strike, Or in the Alternative to Dismiss #12 set for hearing on November 10, 2014 is ADVANCED to MONDAY, NOVEMBER 3, 2014 AT 10:00 A.M. Judge Real hears civil motions on the 1st and 3rd Mondays of each month at 10:00 a.m. November 10, 2014 is not a proper motion date. Defendants shall personally serve this Minute Order and the underlying motion papers on Plaintiff or their attorney of record, and file proof of service of same. (lom)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV14-5631 R(AJWx). Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV14-05690 R(AJWx). Signed by Judge Manuel L. Real (mg)
September 12, 2014 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Acosta. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 (Petersen, Gregory)
September 11, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles, (Goodman, Joshua)
September 9, 2014 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta #12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Goodman, Joshua)
September 9, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Motion set for hearing on 11/10/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss All Individually Named Plaintiffs Except Ricardo Acosta)(Attorney Joshua Andrew Goodman added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Andrew Goodman added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Goodman, Joshua)
September 8, 2014 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ricardo Acosta, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 8/19/2014, answer due 9/9/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Vizcarra - City Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Petersen, Gregory)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D Pregerson. Counsel are referred to the courts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INSTRUCTIONS) (jc)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. The address is "http"//www.cacd.uscourts.gov". It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. Concerning Mandatory Courtesy Copies, the Court requires delivery to Room 244-J (blue back optional) only the following filed documents, no later than the next business day after filing: (1) Courtesy copies of any e-filed initiating Complaints or Notices of Removal are to be delivered within 48 hours of said filing. [Exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed] (2) All noticed motions and related documents (2 copies); (3) All ex parte applications and related documents (2 copies); and [Exhibits and attachment must be separately tabbed]. (bp)
July 28, 2014 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Gary A. Feess, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 04-08592 GAF(AJWx) (rn)
July 21, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 21, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
July 21, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs. Related Case(s): 2:04cv8592-GAF-AJW, 2:07cv6782 GAF-AJW [See document for further information] (car) (mg).
July 21, 2014 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (car)
July 21, 2014 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs (car) (mg).
July 21, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Los Angeles. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs. (car) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricardo Acosta et al v. City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sainz
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Martinez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Jensen
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Olmos
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Horeczko
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pierce
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben McPheeters
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Culpepper
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Lopez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osbaldo Ramos
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mika Kuroiwa
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Contreras
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bermudez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Ramos
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Gutierrez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Campagna
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Whetstone
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Yanez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Meisner
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Martinez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Grimes
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Goode
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarriel Hopper
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Gaxiola
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Scroggins
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bakotich
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Luker
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Mixer
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Marquez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gorgonio Medina, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Mendoza
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Pravongviengkham
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Dillard
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McPheeters
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stoa
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Minnick
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Nielson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Lemos
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Cardenas
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Barrios
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Lyn Nguyen
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Acosta
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Riggs
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tello
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Sambrano
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Durant
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Shaw
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Mendez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Martin
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Duran
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rothenmich
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Paz
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medrardo Carranza
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Martin
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Manning
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pytel
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Delgado
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Holguin
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Padilla
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tejada
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Prodigalidad
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Branley
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lolita Bermudez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Munjekovich
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Vera
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harper
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Vach
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Willers
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Estrada, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Juneau
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jamieson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicent Henson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carroll
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Banachowski
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Dixon
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cleary
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Wilson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Carney
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricela Ibanez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theadore McHenry
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Arnold
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Logan
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lecours
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Robledo
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ashley
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Lopez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ofelia Tello
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Moore
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Sparkman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smey
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Zaby
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Vargas
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Thomas
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Von Lutzow
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Wright
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathhew Cundiff
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Ross
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal Dexter Jones
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Cardenas
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bergren
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Deoloveira
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Davis
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Durant
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cole
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Gonzalez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Cubillo
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher No
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Clements
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Sandwell
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Limtiaco
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Martinez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wunderlich
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Rosales
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Verge
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Valdez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Moore
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Canizales
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ara Hollenback
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Martinez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Ogata
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Alfaro
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Rodgers
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Tessier
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Bourgeois
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Suarez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Talamante
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore De Bella
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Porter
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Dawouldi
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio De La Rosa
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Zepeda
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daivd Craig
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chapman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Mills
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Fedynich
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Lai
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Hollenback
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Melendez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Harmon
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Kliever
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Sieker
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Russom
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Joachimstaler
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Herrera
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pelczar
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Cruz
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rene Chavez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Thurston
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Redd
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim O'Gorman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Bonilla
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Williams
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Adragna
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Jackson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Fuentes
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Remolino
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shea
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Banuelos
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ferrato
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Paredes
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Marin
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Calzada
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hartman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Grein
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Kellogg
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Driver
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Montelongo
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lopez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mark Arenas
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gurolla
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ayala
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl McGreggor
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Underwood
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Hernandez-Soto
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Coats
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Crosson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy McLauglin
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Lawrence
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Mossie
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Gutierrez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Doolittle
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Jacobus
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Batts
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elva Coats
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Redshaw
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Rodriguez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Key
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Casalicchio
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Tuller
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wilson
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Calhoun
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Vega
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Gutierrez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Peel
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Howard
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Peat
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Gutierrez
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldwin Vicencio
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Marshall
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Scira
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Romo
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Estrada
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Richard L Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Geoffrey S Sheldon
Represented By: Daniel P Aguilera
Represented By: Wayne H Song
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Goodman
Represented By: Brian P Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Steven Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?