Edmond Price Price v. Amy Miller
Petitioner: Edmond Paul Price
Respondent: Amy Miller
Case Number: 2:2014cv06307
Filed: August 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A. Kronstadt
Presiding Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, Related to: Memorandum & Opinion 52 . Pursuant to the court's Opinion and Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition in this matter is denied on the merits with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mp)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Pursuant to the Opinion and Order 21 , IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (kl)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/15/2014. On August 12, 2014, Petitioner filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. For the reasons discussed below, it a ppears that the one year statute of limitations has expired. The court, therefore, orders Petitioner to show cause, on or before September 15, 2014, why this court should not recommend dismissal of the petition with prejudice based on expiration of the one-year statute of limitations. (See Order for details.) (mp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmond Price Price v. Amy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edmond Paul Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?