Carlene Longest v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Junxiu "Alex" Cai, Lifen "Regina" Cai and Carlene Longest
Defendant: Green Tree Insurance Agency, Inc. and Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv08150
Filed: October 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE plaintiffs' motion to certify California and Florida classes challenging defendants' force-placed insurance practices. Plaintiff shall have until J uly 30, 2015 to file supplemental briefing addressing (1) ascertainability and (2) damages. Defendants shall have until August 13, 2015 to file a response to plaintiffs' submission. Briefing from both parties shall only address the two aforementioned issues, and shall not exceed 15 pages 45 . (pg)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re Amended Stipulation for Protective Order 42 . See document for details. (yb)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. 14, filed Dec. 17, 2014) held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court DENIES defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs first amended complaint, and defendants are hereby ORDERED toanswer. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (pj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlene Longest v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junxiu "Alex" Cai
Represented By: Caleb L H Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifen "Regina" Cai
Represented By: Caleb L H Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlene Longest
Represented By: Hannah Belknap
Represented By: Bradley Christopher Buhrow
Represented By: Caleb L H Marker
Represented By: Christopher P Ridout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?