United States et al v. James Elmer Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: United States and Stephen Yagman
Defendant: Unknown Named Defendants, James Elmer Mitchell, Irving Lewis Libby, Jr., Porter Johnston Goss, United States of America Central Intelligence Agency, Jose A. Rodriguez, Jr., John Bruce Jessen, John Choon Yoo, David Spears Addington, William James Haynes, II, George John Tenet, United States of America, John A. Rizzo, Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, Scott Muller and Michael Vincent Hayden
Case Number: 2:2014cv09771
Filed: December 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Filing 122 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #118 , CCA # 16-55346. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered February 14, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #121 AFFIRMED.] (mat)
February 14, 2018 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #118 filed by Stephen Yagman. CCA # 16-55346. The decision of the District Court is affirmed. (gk)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #118 filed by Stephen Yagman. CCA # 16-55346. Appellant's emergency motion for injunctive relief (Docket Entry No. 70) is denied. To the extent appellant seeks the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus, appellant has not demonstrated that this case warrants such relief. See Bauman v. U.S. Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, to the extent the motion for injunctive relief also constitutes a mandamus petition, that petition is denied. (car)
March 7, 2016 Filing 119 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55346, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #118 as to Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (mat)
March 4, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff-Relator Stephen Yagman. Appeal of Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,, Order on Motion to Set Aside Default,, #117 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17409087.) (Reichmann, Joseph)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY MITCHELL AND JESSEN AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; MOTIONS TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND TO DISMISS BY MITCHELL, JESSEN AND ASSOCIATES; PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #54 #77 #78 #105 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of the foregoing, MJAs motion to set aside the entry of default is GRANTED; the motions to dismiss filed by Mitchell and Jessen, the United States, and MJA are GRANTED with prejudice; and Yagmans motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for details.) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (kti)
March 3, 2016 Filing 116 LOCAL RULE 83-9 REQUEST FOR RULING WITHOUT FURTHER DELAY ON MOTIONS, DOCS. 77 AND 78, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON AUGUST 27, 2015, DOC. 88, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 , filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
February 12, 2016 Filing 115 PLAINTIFF'S RULE 28(J) ANALOG (3D) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #105 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
February 12, 2016 Filing 114 RULE 28(J) ANALOG RE: WATERBOARDING AS TORTURE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #105 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 , filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff/Relators First Amended Complaint #105 presently scheduled for hearing on January 29, 2016, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2016 Filing 112 PLAINTIFF RELATOR'S RULE 28(j) ANALOG IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITIONS TO ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #105 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 , filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
January 15, 2016 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, re Reply (Motion related), #110 served on 1/15/16. (Grady, Shawnda)
January 15, 2016 Filing 110 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #105 filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities. (Grady, Shawnda)
January 9, 2016 Filing 109 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #105 ERRATA TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF MJA DEFAULT AND TO DISMISS, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
January 8, 2016 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss part of defendant Mitchello, Jessen's Motion to Set Aside its Default, (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEPHEN YAGMAN)(Reichmann, Joseph)
January 8, 2016 Filing 107 OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #105 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Yagman)(Reichmann, Joseph)
December 21, 2015 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #105 served on December 18, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda)
December 18, 2015 Filing 105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Grady, Shawnda)
December 2, 2015 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen, James Elmer Mitchell. (Grady, Shawnda)
November 25, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE AND REQUEST filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman , NOTICE OF NON-FILING IN DELAWARE CHANCERY COURT; REQUEST FOR DECISION ON OUTSTANDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 88 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 , Status Report #102 (Reichmann, Joseph)
November 10, 2015 Filing 102 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen, James Elmer Mitchell. (Grady, Shawnda)
October 29, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as CV14-09771 DMG (PJWx). (mg)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee:ORDER RE OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT #96 . The Court may set aside an entry of default for good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c).Such a motion must comply with the Local Rules for the filing of motions.Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates may file a properly noticed motion to set aside entry of default pursuant to Rule55. (lc)
September 28, 2015 Filing 99 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman re: Errata #98 , Miscellaneous Document, #97 , Response in Opposition to Motion,, #96 (Reichmann, Joseph)
September 28, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion,, #96 (Grady, Shawnda)
September 28, 2015 Filing 97 OBJECTION TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #95 , Response in Opposition to Motion,, #96 , APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities #94 (Reichmann, Joseph)
September 28, 2015 Filing 96 OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities #94 filed by Defendants James Elmer Mitchell, James Elmer Mitchell, Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda)
September 23, 2015 Filing 95 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities (lc)
September 22, 2015 Filing 94 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
September 22, 2015 Filing 93 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman, upon Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities served on 5/2/2015, answer due 5/26/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Elmer Mitchell, partner in or principal of business named in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reichmann, Joseph)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court, having reviewed Plaintiff/Relator' response #91 to the Court's Order to Show Cause ("OSC") #90 , hereby DISCHARGES the OSC. Plaintiff/Relator shall file proof of service within 7 days of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2015 Filing 91 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagmanto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #90 (Reichmann, Joseph)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION.Plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before October 5, 2015 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities.No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a written response on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities if a written response demonstrating good cause is not filed by the date indicated above. (lc)
September 17, 2015 Filing 89 RULE 28(J) ANALOG IN OPPOSITION TO ALL MOTIONS TO DISMISS, UNDER SUBMISSION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants James Elmer Mitchells and John Bruce Jessens Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #77 and United States of America's Motion to Dismiss #78 presently scheduled for hearing on August 28, 2015, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2015 Filing 87 RULE 28(J) ANALOG ON ISSUE OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 86 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 , and Reply on Relator's Motion to Strike Government's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
August 13, 2015 Filing 85 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen, John Bruce Jessen, James Elmer Mitchell, James Elmer Mitchell. (Grady, Shawnda)
August 12, 2015 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #83 served on 8/12/2015. (McAuliffe, Robert)
August 12, 2015 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Dkt. 80, Request to Strike filed by Plaintiff United States. (McAuliffe, Robert)
August 11, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE OF LODGING filed BY PLAINTIFF-RELATOR, STEPHEN YAGMAN, re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),, #81 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 , Miscellaneous Document #80 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reichmann, Joseph)
August 7, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #80 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request:strike. Missing Proposed order was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 7, 2015 Filing 80 REQUEST TO STRIKE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #78 (Reichmann, Joseph)
August 7, 2015 Filing 79 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
July 30, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff United States. Motion set for hearing on 8/28/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (McAuliffe, Robert)
July 20, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity). Motion set for hearing on 8/28/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Grady, Shawnda)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MITCHELLS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND DENYING ORDER SHORTENING TIME AS MOOT #70 #72 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Mitchells motion for a stay of discoveryis GRANTED; discovery is hereby stayed until this case is at issue and due dates for responses to any discovery requests already served is extended until 30 days after this case is at issue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Mitchells ex parte application for order shortening time [Doc. # 72] is DENIED as moot. (shb)
July 10, 2015 Filing 75 PLAINTIFF RELATOR'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME WITHIN WHICH THEIR MOTION MAY BE HEARD re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen #70 to July 10, 2015 #72 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
July 10, 2015 Filing 74 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen #70 to July 10, 2015 #72 served on July 2, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda)
July 6, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #66 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected and No link to filer (only shows attorney). The correct event is: Response. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 1, 2015 Filing 72 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen #70 to July 10, 2015 filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Grady, Shawnda)
July 1, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiffs Miscellaneous Document #67 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Withdrawal of (Document or Motion). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 1, 2015 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
July 1, 2015 Filing 69 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER VACATING JUNE 29, 2015 MINUTE ORDER #64 AND DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MOOT #37 , #41 , #51 . Nevertheless, in the interests of justice and to avoid further unnecessary motion practice, IT IS ORDERED that this Courts minute order of June 29, 2015 striking the filing of the First Amended Complaint [Doc. # 64] is hereby VACATED. Counsel is advised, however, that hereafter listing an email address in the Identifying Information Section of a Notice of Appearance Form G-123 is consent to electronic service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to dismiss filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell [Doc. # 37], Plaintiff United States [Doc. # 41], and Defendant John Bruce Jessen [Doc. # 51] are DENIED without prejudice as moot. Defendants shall file their responses to the FirstAmended Complaint within 21 days after the date of this Order. (lc)
June 30, 2015 Filing 68 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff Relator's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Order for Defendant John Bruce Jessen's Notice of Motion and Motion in Opposition to Request for Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #51 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #37 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #41 , First MOTION to Dismiss Case #39 , filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exjibit 1 to Plaintiff Relator's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss)(Reichmann, Joseph)
June 30, 2015 Filing 67 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCS. 65 & 66 (IN PART) filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman , re: Miscellaneous Document #66 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #65 (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 29, 2015 Filing 66 RESPONSE TO JUNE 29 MINUTE ORD. re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #64 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #61 , Response #62 (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 29, 2015 Filing 65 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Order for Defendant John Bruce Jessen's Notice of Motion and Motion in Opposition to Request for Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #51 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #37 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #41 , First MOTION to Dismiss Case #39 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER STRIKING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #60 .The First Amended Complaint filed June 24, 2015 is hereby stricken from the record, without prejudice to the filing of a FAC by stipulation or properly noticed motion. (lc) Modified on 7/1/2015 (lc). (VACATED PER 7/1/15 MINUTES).
June 25, 2015 Filing 62 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagmanto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #61 (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Relator shall show cause in writing no later than July 3, 2015, why the FAC should not be stricken for failure to comply with Rule 15(a). Response(s), if any, by defendants may be filed by July 9, 2015. Failure to timely respond to this Order shall be deemed consent to the striking of the FAC. (See order for details.) (kti)
June 24, 2015 Filing 60 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS MITCHELL AND JESSEN All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, #1 , filed by PLAINTIFF-RELATOR Stephen Yagman (Reichmann, Joseph) Modified on 6/29/2015 (lc).
June 23, 2015 Filing 59 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER RE DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION #56 . IT IS ORDERED that the hearing on the motion for summary adjudication is vacated #54 , to be reset upon the Courts ruling on the currently pending motions to dismiss. If necessary, after the ruling on the pending motions to dismiss, the Court shall also reset a briefing schedule for the motion for summary adjudication. (lc) Modified on 6/23/2015 (lc).
June 22, 2015 Filing 63 RELATOR STEPHEN YAGMAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MITCHELL'S AND JESSEN'S EXPARTE APPLICATION #56 FOR ORDER TAKING OFF CALENDAR OR CONTINUING RELATOR'S SUMMARY ADJUDICATION MOTION (DOC. 54) filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6)(lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: #6 part 7, #7 part 8, #8 part 9, #9 part 10, #10 part 11, #11 part 12) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: #12 part 13, #13 part 14, #14 part 15, #15 part 16, #16 part 17, #17 part 18) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: #18 part 19, #19 part 20, #20 part 21, #21 part 22, #22 part 23, #23 part 24) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: #24 part 25, #25 part 26, #26 part 27, #27 part 28, #28 part 29) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: #29 part 30, #30 part 31, #31 part 32, #32 part 33, #33 part 34) (lc). (DOCKETED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER CV 14-9771 DMG (MANx)- per MINUTES, DOCKET NO. 59 re wrong case number on the opposition). Modified on 6/29/2015 (lc). Modified on 6/29/2015 (lc).
June 22, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman of Opposition to Ex Parte Application. (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 19, 2015 Filing 56 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grady, Shawnda)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the Court's procedures and schedules on the Court's website, parties must clear a hearing date with the court clerk prior to filing a motion for summary judgement. The Court hereby continues the motions to dismiss #37 #41 #51 and motion for summary adjudication #54 to July 24, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to UNCONTROVERTED FACTS (1)-(30) filed by PLAINTIFF/RELATOR STEPHEN YAGMAN Stephen Yagman. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Supplement STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, #2 Proposed Order)(Reichmann, Joseph)
June 10, 2015 Filing 58 EXHIBIT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to UNCONTROVERTED FACTS (1)-(30) #54 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5)(lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: #5 part 6, #6 part 7, #7 part 8, #8 part 9, #9 part 10) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: #10 part 11, #11 part 12, #12 part 13, #13 part 14, #14 part 15) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: #15 part 16, #16 part 17, #17 part 18, #18 part 19, #19 part 20) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: #20 part 21, #21 part 22, #22 part 23, #23 part 24, #24 part 25) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: #25 part 26, #26 part 27, #27 part 28, #28 part 29, #29 part 30) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: #30 part 31, #31 part 32, #32 part 33, #33 part 34) (lc).
June 10, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman of SENATE SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE COMMITTEE STUDY OF THE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY'S DETENTION AND INTERROGATION PROGRAM. (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 9, 2015 Filing 52 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT JOHN BRUCE JESSEN #49 . Plaintiffs Amended Request to Enter Default of Defendant John Bruce Jessen is DENIED without prejudice to be refiled if supported with a signed return receipt or evidence of proper service. (lc)
June 8, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Defendant John Bruce Jessen's Notice of Motion and Motion in Opposition to Request for Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawnda M. Grady, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of John Bruce Jessen, #4 Proposed Order)(Grady, Shawnda)
June 8, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Resubmitted REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT JOHN BRUCE JESSEN John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity) #49 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Filer cites no return receipt required. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. (lc)
June 6, 2015 Filing 49 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT JOHN BRUCE JESSEN John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity) filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 5, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. No signed certified mail return receipt with signature of defendant or authorized agent. USPS Tracking sheet shows acceptance, but no name and no signature in the acceptance box (blank). (lc)
June 4, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shawnda M Grady on behalf of Defendant John Bruce Jessen (Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party John Bruce Jessen(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda)
June 3, 2015 Filing 46 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity) filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT JAMES ELMER MITCHELLS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON HIS MOTION TO ADJOURN SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #42 by Judge Dolly M. Gee (lc)
June 2, 2015 Filing 44 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TOCONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #38 . Notwithstanding that no defendant has yet filed an answer, a Scheduling Conference was erroneously set in this matter on July 10, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. The July 10, 2015 Scheduling Conference is hereby VACATED and will be reset when the case is at issue. Defendant JamesElmer Mitchell's Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference [Doc. # 38] is DENIED as moot. The July 10, 2015 hearing is VACATED. (lc)
June 2, 2015 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Stephen Yagman, upon Defendant John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity) served on 5/2/2015, answer due 5/23/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon as an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Reichmann, Joseph)
June 2, 2015 Filing 42 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to June 18, 2015 filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
June 2, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff United States. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum and Declarations of Martha Glover and Robert McAuliffe in Support of United States' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(McAuliffe, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States. correcting First MOTION to Dismiss Case #39 (McAuliffe, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff United States. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum and Declarations of Martha Glover and Robert McAuliffe in Support of United States' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(McAuliffe, Robert)
June 1, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conferernce from July 10, 2015 to September 1, 2015 filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
June 1, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Henry F. Schuelke, III on behalf of Defendant James Elmer Mitchell, designating Shawnda M. Grady as local counsel. (lt)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ariel S Glasner on behalf of ames Elmer Mitchell, designating Shawnda M. Grady as local counsel. (lom)
May 27, 2015 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert McAuliffe counsel for Plaintiff United States. Adding Robert McAuliffe as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Robert McAuliffe added to party United States(pty:pla))(McAuliffe, Robert)
May 26, 2015 Filing 33 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2015 at 11:00 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: PILOT PROJECT RE SEALED DOCUMENTS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (See order for details.) (kti)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (See order for details.) (kti)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 14-03 filed on May 22, 2015. Accordingly, the scheduling conference presently set June 29, 2015 before Judge Walter is hereby continued to July 10, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Gee. See a separate scheduling conference order for details. (See order for details.) (kti)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Judge John F. Walter. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV14-09771 DMG (MANx). (mg)
May 20, 2015 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), re APPLICATION for attorney Ariel S. Glasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759988 paid.) #27 served on May 20, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda)
May 20, 2015 Filing 27 APPLICATION for attorney Ariel S. Glasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759988 paid.) filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grady, Shawnda)
May 20, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shawnda M Grady on behalf of Defendant James Elmer Mitchell (Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party James Elmer Mitchell(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda)
May 20, 2015 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), re APPLICATION for attorney Henry F. Schuelke, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759940 paid.) #24 served on May 20, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda)
May 20, 2015 Filing 24 APPLICATION for attorney Henry F. Schuelke, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759940 paid.) filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party James Elmer Mitchell(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Text Entry Order by Judge John F. Walter: Government's Lodged Under Seal Filing is denied without prejudice to filing a noticed Motion. [Case unsealed - under seal filings require an order of Court] The documents will not be filed and will be returned to Government counsel.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 4/27/2015 (sr).
April 24, 2015 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants. (jp)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/29/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 6/15/2015. (jp)
April 23, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #19 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
April 23, 2015 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Reichmann counsel for Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. Adding JOSEPH REICHMANN as attorney as counsel of record for STEPHEN YAGMAN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff STEPHEN YAGMAN. (Attorney Joseph Reichmann added to party Stephen Yagman(pty:pla))(Reichmann, Joseph)
April 23, 2015 Filing 18 DISMISSAL OF SOME DEFENDANTS filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman (Reichmann, Joseph)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO UNSEAL ACTION by Judge John F. Walter: Based on plaintiffs motion for an order that this action be unsealed #15 . IT IS ORDERED that this action be, and it hereby is, unsealed. (gk)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO UNSEAL ACTION by Judge John F. Walter: Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Action #15 is GRANTED, and this action is UNSEALED. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk)
March 30, 2015 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO UNSEAL ACTION. (jloz)
March 24, 2015 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT - JOINT STATEMENT Re: L.R. 7-3 Conference. UNDER SEAL. (jp)
March 24, 2015 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of STEPHEN YAGMAN Re: Joint Statement Re: L.R. 7-3 Conference. UNDER SEAL. (jp)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. All counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, etc. See document for details. (gk)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION by Judge John F. Walter: After reviewing Pro se Plaintiff Stephen Yagman's Ex Parte Application to Unseal Action #9 , the Court finds that the requested relief is not sufficiently urgent to justify an ex parte application and it is denied without prejudice to filing a regularly noticed motion. Before filing such a motion, Plaintiff and counsel for the Defendant shall comply with Local Rule 7-3 and paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Amended Standing Order filed today. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk)
February 27, 2015 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT - REPLY ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal Case #9 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (jloz) Modified on 4/24/2015 (gk).
February 24, 2015 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal Case filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman.(jloz)
February 23, 2015 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT - STATUS REPORT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA REGARDING CALCULATION OF THE INITIAL 60-DAY PERIOD DURING WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY ELECT TO INTERVENE. (jloz)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SELF REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se. Persons appearing before this Court are not required to retain the services of a lawyer or obtain the advice of counsel. Individual litigants may represent themselves pro se, but corporations and associations must be represented by counsel. (See order for further details). (shb)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of CivilProcedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, the General Orders of the Central District and the Judges Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court for the Central Districtof California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov). (See order for further details). (shb)
December 22, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 22, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (esa)
December 22, 2014 Filing 3 RELATED CASE STATEMENT filed by plaintiff Stephen Yagman. Related Case(s): NONE (esa)
December 22, 2014 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF INTEREST PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (esa)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants David Spears Addington, Porter Johnston Goss, Michael Vincent Hayden, William James Haynes, II, John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), Irving Lewis Libby, Jr, James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity), Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, Scott Muller, John A. Rizzo, Jose A. Rodriguez, Jr, George John Tenet, United States of America, United States of America Central Intelligence Agency, Unknown Named Defendants, John Choon Yoo.Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: #1 CV 71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States et al v. James Elmer Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Elmer Mitchell
Represented By: Ariel S Glasner
Represented By: Shawnda M Grady
Represented By: Henry F Schuelke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Lewis Libby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter Johnston Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bruce Jessen
Represented By: Ariel S Glasner
Represented By: Shawnda M Grady
Represented By: Henry F Schuelke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Choon Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Spears Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William James Haynes, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George John Tenet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities
Represented By: Ariel S Glasner
Represented By: Shawnda M Grady
Represented By: Henry F Schuelke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vincent Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Robert McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Yagman
Represented By: Joseph Reichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?