MICHAEL SKIDMORE v. LED ZEPPELIN et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: MICHAEL SKIDMORE
Defendant: Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc and LED ZEPPELIN
Unknown: Michael L Eidel and Matthew S Olesh
Case Number: 2:2015cv03462
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: R. Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alicia G. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2016 247 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 246 Non-Resident Attorney Alfred J. Fluehr APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Michael Skidmore, as Trustee for Randy Craig Wolfe Trust, designating Glen L. Kulik as local counsel. (bp)
June 15, 2016 246 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alfred J. Fluehr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 6/13/2016, Receipt No. 097317993176) filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kulik, Glen)
June 15, 2016 244 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Use Sound Recordings to Prove Access filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 6/16/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Brief on Using Sound Recordings to Prove Access, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Brief on Sound Recordings and Access) (Malofiy, Francis)
June 14, 2016 245 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day; Rulings on Motions in Limine 134 135 136 137 138 139 140 141 142 143 144 145 146 147 149 150 151 held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2016 08:30 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. See order for specifics. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil/C. Nirenberg. (ah)
June 14, 2016 243 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alfred J. Fluehr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17993176) 240 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Form is out-of-date. Attorney failed to use current form and Proposed Order. Form was updated and amended as of May 1, 2016. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
June 14, 2016 242 Supplemental Exhibit List for Trial filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE.. (Malofiy, Francis)
June 13, 2016 241 DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL Exhibit List filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.. (Anderson, Peter)
June 13, 2016 240 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alfred J. Fluehr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17993176) filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kulik, Glen)
June 13, 2016 239 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion to Reconsider Ruling as to MIL # 3 (Doc. 232) filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
June 13, 2016 238 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice re Spirit Album (Doc. 225) filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
June 13, 2016 237 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice re Probate Files (Doc. 227) filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
June 13, 2016 236 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REQUEST to Use Music Equipment at Trial 229 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
June 13, 2016 235 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, 159 231 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
June 13, 2016 234 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Failing to Disclose Conflict of Interest 230 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
June 13, 2016 233 Featured Case ORDER STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment 159 231 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Failing to Disclose Conflict of Interest 230 for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Motions are not timely. Memorandum of Points and Authorities on Docket Entry 230 exceed this Court's 20 page limit. (ah)
June 12, 2016 232 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude recordings of Taurus different from copyrighted 1967 transcription 136 ***Plaintiff's Brief in Further Support of Admissibility of Taurus Recordings*** filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
June 12, 2016 231 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DKT. 233 ) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, 159 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis) Modified on 6/13/2016 (ah).
June 11, 2016 230 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DKT. 233 ) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Failing to Disclose Conflict of Interest filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Alternative Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis) Modified on 6/13/2016 (ah).
June 10, 2016 229 REQUEST to Use Music Equipment at Trial filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Request set for hearing on 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis)
June 10, 2016 228 DECLARATION of Glen L. Kulik re Request for Judicial Notice 227 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F-I, # 4 Exhibit J-M)(Kulik, Glen)
June 10, 2016 227 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (with Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Kulik, Glen)
June 10, 2016 226 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Kulik, Glen)
June 10, 2016 225 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE that the Spirit Album Taurus Appeared On Charted for 32 Weeks, As High As 31, on Billboard's Top LP's Chart filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
June 8, 2016 224 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF JAMES PATRICK PAGE AND ROBERT PLANT AND JOHN PAUL JONES 220 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (ah)
June 7, 2016 223 TRIAL BRIEF filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration re Documents Cited in Trial Brief)(Anderson, Peter)
June 7, 2016 222 STATEMENT - Joint Statement of the Case to be Read to Jury filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE (Kulik, Glen)
May 24, 2016 221 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Compel Attendance and Testimony 220 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
May 17, 2016 220 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Compel Attendance and Testimony filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis)
May 17, 2016 219 Featured Case NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING Letter to Judge Re Non-Payment by Counsel for deposition transcripts submitted by Non-Party received on 5/16/16 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: L.R. 83-2.5. No letters to the Judge. (pso)
May 12, 2016 218 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FORLEAVE TO DEPOSE NEWLY DISCOVERED WITNESS OR ALTERNATIVELY TO HAVEWITNESS TESTIFY BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner 207 . Note changes made by the Court. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
May 12, 2016 217 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE TRIAL TECHNOLOGY by Judge R. Gary Klausner 208 . Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
May 11, 2016 216 Featured Case ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING FEBRUARY 11, 2016 DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DOES NOT APPLY TO EXPERT DEPOSITIONS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' Application is GRANTED and that: The February 11, 2016 discovery cut-off in this action does not apply to expert depositions, which are instead governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26; and Defendants may proceed with their depositions of plaintiff's experts as noticed by defendants on May 3, 2016 (or at such other dates, times and placed as counsel for the parties may agree beforehand in writing). (bp)
May 11, 2016 215 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Depose Newly Discovered Witness or Alternatively to have Witness Testify by Video Conference at Trial 207 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
May 11, 2016 214 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Determine Trial Techology 208 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
May 11, 2016 213 Featured Case ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Reply (Motion related) 212 for the following reasons: Requires leave of Court. (ah)
May 10, 2016 212 [STRICKEN] REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Confirming February 11, 2016 Discovery Cut-Off Does Not Apply to Expert Depositions 210 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter) Modified on 5/11/2016 (ah).
May 10, 2016 211 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Confirming February 11, 2016 Discovery Cut-Off Does Not Apply to Expert Depositions 210 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
May 9, 2016 210 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Confirming February 11, 2016 Discovery Cut-Off Does Not Apply to Expert Depositions filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBITS 1-5, # 2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Peter)
May 9, 2016 209 Featured Case SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court has reviewed plaintiff's Motion to Determine Trial Techology 208 , and Motion to Depose Newly Discovered Witness or Alternatively to have Witness Testify by Video Conference at Trial 207 . The Court construes both motions as ex parte applications. Defendants' opposition, if any, shall be filed no later than 2:00 pm on Wednesday, May 11, 2016. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 6, 2016 208 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Determine Trial Techology filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis)
May 6, 2016 207 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Depose Newly Discovered Witness or Alternatively to have Witness Testify by Video Conference at Trial filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis)
April 28, 2016 206 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 04/25/2016 - 9:08 A.M. re Transcript 205 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Montgomery, Shayna) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 28, 2016 205 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/25/2016 - 9:08 A.M. Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery, E-mail: shaynamontgomery@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2016. (Montgomery, Shayna)
April 27, 2016 204 Featured Case SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Jury Trial in this matter has been continued from 05/10/2016 at 9:00 am to 06/14/2016 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 25, 2016 203 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner re: Amended Ruling on Defendants' Motion inLimine No. 4 137 . Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
April 25, 2016 202 MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Case called. Court and counsel confer. Prior to the trial date, the parties shall submit a joint statement of the case. The joint statement should not exceed one paragraph. Each day of trial, counsel shall submit to the Court a list of witnesses, in the order they will be called. Court and counsel confer regarding voir dire, jury impanelment, trial hours, and introducing exhibits. Time limits for opening statements will be given to counsel on the first day of trial. The Court informs counsel that it intends to impose time limites of 10 hours per side. The Court issues tentative rulings on motions in limine. granting 134 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 135 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 136 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 137 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 138 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 139 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 140 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 141 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 145 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 146 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 147 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting 149 Motion in Limine to Preclude; denying 150 Motion in Limine to Preclude; denying 151 Motion in Limine to Preclude; Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery. (bp) Modified on 4/28/2016 (sw).
April 24, 2016 201 DECLARATION of Peter J. Anderson re Witness List 198 , Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order 200 , Exhibit List 199 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 24, 2016 200 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pretrial Conference Order with Exhibit 1 - Joint Exhibit List)(Malofiy, Francis)
April 24, 2016 199 Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pretrial Conference Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
April 24, 2016 198 Witness List filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE.. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 23, 2016 197 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE.. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 22, 2016 196 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.. (Anderson, Peter)
April 22, 2016 195 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 194 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Exclude plaintiff's complaints from jury 147 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 193 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude evidence and argument re insurance and indemnity 146 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 192 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Exclude evidence and argument as to drinking and drug use 145 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 191 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude claimed 1973 discussion 144 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 190 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude witnesses plaintiff failed to disclose 143 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 189 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude pre-May 31, 2011 Revenues and Foreign Revenues 142 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 188 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude evidence and argument as to plaintiffs and the Randy Craig Wolfe Trusts use of funds 141 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 187 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude evidence and argument as to plaintiffs and the Randy Craig Wolfe Trusts use of funds 140 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 186 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Denny Somach 139 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner Music Group Corp. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 185 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude claims and theoretical claims of copying other works and settlements 138 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 184 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Dr. Alexander Stewart, Erik Johnson, Brian Bricklin and Kevin Hanson 137 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 183 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude recordings of Taurus different from copyrighted 1967 transcription 136 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 182 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude hearsay statements in newspapers, magazines and books 135 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 21, 2016 181 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude hearsay as to statements by Randy Wolfe 134 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 20, 2016 180 Plaintiff's Short Expert Narratives and Qualifications filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE (Malofiy, Francis)
April 20, 2016 179 DEFENDANTS' SHORT NARRATIVE STATEMENT RE EXPERTS filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc (Anderson, Peter)
April 18, 2016 178 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE.. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 18, 2016 177 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.. (Anderson, Peter)
April 17, 2016 176 DECLARATION of Erik Johnson In Support of Plaintiff's Responses (ECF 169, 170) to Defendants' MILs 3 & 4 MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude recordings of Taurus different from copyrighted 1967 transcription 136 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Dr. Alexander Stewart, Erik Johnson, Brian Bricklin and Kevin Hanson 137 ***Refiled with Ink Signature*** filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 16, 2016 175 DECLARATION of Erik Johnson In Support of Plaintiff's Responses (ECF 169, 170) to Defendants' MILs 3 & 4 MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude recordings of Taurus different from copyrighted 1967 transcription 136 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Dr. Alexander Stewart, Erik Johnson, Brian Bricklin and Kevin Hanson 137 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 16, 2016 174 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude pre-May 31, 2011 Revenues and Foreign Revenues 142 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 173 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Exclude evidence and argument as to drinking and drug use 145 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 172 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude witnesses plaintiff failed to disclose 143 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 171 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude claimed 1973 discussion 144 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 170 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Dr. Alexander Stewart, Erik Johnson, Brian Bricklin and Kevin Hanson 137 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Alexander Stewart)(Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 169 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude recordings of Taurus different from copyrighted 1967 transcription 136 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Alexander Stewart)(Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 168 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude evidence and argument as to plaintiffs and the Randy Craig Wolfe Trusts use of funds 141 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 167 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude evidence and argument as to plaintiffs and the Randy Craig Wolfe Trusts use of funds 140 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 166 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Denny Somach 139 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 165 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude claims and theoretical claims of copying other works and settlements 138 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 164 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude hearsay statements in newspapers, magazines and books 135 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 163 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude hearsay as to statements by Randy Wolfe 134 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
April 15, 2016 162 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Preclude Defense Damages Expert 151 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 15, 2016 161 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Preclude Evidence, Testimony, Argument of Wolfe Inheritance 150 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 15, 2016 160 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude Evidence, Testimony, Argument of Trust's Validity and/or Legitimacy 149 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 8, 2016 159 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 97 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Right of Attribution claim and as to all claims against John Paul Jones, Super Hype Publishing, Inc., and Warner Music Group Corp. The Court also GRANTS Defendants' request to limit Plaintiff's damages to 50% of the recovery (his share as a beneficial owner). The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Copyright Infringement claim against the remaining Defendants. (lom)
April 4, 2016 158 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Witness List, # 2 Exhibit LIst)(Malofiy, Francis)
April 4, 2016 157 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
April 4, 2016 156 DECLARATION of Peter J. Anderson re Defendants' Witness and Exhibit Lists, filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Witness List, # 2 Defendants' Exhibit List)(Anderson, Peter)
March 31, 2016 155 OBJECTION in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 ; Objections to Plaintiff's Late Filings re Submitted Motion, filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
March 30, 2016 154 Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Francis Malofiy Opposing Evidentiary Objections, # 2 Hand-Signed Declaration of Bruce Pates, # 3 Hand-Signed Declaration of Denny Somach, # 4 Hand-Signed Declaration of Brian Bricklin, # 5 Hand-Signed Declaration of Erik Johnson, # 6 Hand-Signed Declaration of Mark Andes, # 7 Hand-Signed Declaration of Michael Skidmore, # 8 Hand-Signed Declaration of Kevin Hanson)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 28, 2016 153 Featured Case ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw Admissions 152 , for the following reasons: Motion cut-off date was February 25, 2016. (lom)
March 26, 2016 152 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 153 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw Admissions filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis) Modified on 3/28/2016 (lom).
March 25, 2016 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Preclude Defense Damages Expert filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 25, 2016 150 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Preclude Evidence, Testimony, Argument of Wolfe Inheritance filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 25, 2016 149 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude Evidence, Testimony, Argument of Trust's Validity and/or Legitimacy filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 25, 2016 148 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DECRIPTION OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 147 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Exclude plaintiff's complaints from jury filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 146 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude evidence and argument re insurance and indemnity filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Exclude evidence and argument as to drinking and drug use filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 144 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude claimed 1973 discussion filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 143 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude witnesses plaintiff failed to disclose filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 142 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude pre-May 31, 2011 Revenues and Foreign Revenues filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 141 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude evidence and argument as to plaintiffs and the Randy Craig Wolfe Trusts use of funds filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 140 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude evidence and argument as to plaintiffs and the Randy Craig Wolfe Trusts use of funds filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 139 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Denny Somach filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 138 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude claims and theoretical claims of copying other works and settlements filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 137 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Dr. Alexander Stewart, Erik Johnson, Brian Bricklin and Kevin Hanson filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude recordings of Taurus different from copyrighted 1967 transcription filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude hearsay statements in newspapers, magazines and books filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude hearsay as to statements by Randy Wolfe filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 25, 2016 133 Featured Case ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: DENYING 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Add Defendants. Denied by Order of the Court. (pso)
March 23, 2016 132 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The settlement conference is conducted off the record. A settlement is not reached. Counsel are to contact the Clerk, Marine Pogosyan, at (213) 894-5419 if counsel agree a second session of settlement conference is productive. Court Recorder: cs 3/23/2016. (mp)
March 23, 2016 131 Featured Case SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Amended Complaint 98 , and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint 97 , calendared for hearing on March 28, 2016, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 14, 2016 130 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, 31 98 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Declaration of Francis Malofiy, Esquire)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 14, 2016 129 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ferrara Reply Declaration, # 2 Freeman Reply Declaration, # 3 Anderson Reply Declaration, # 4 Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence, # 5 Response to Plaintiff's Alleged Uncontroverted Facts)(Anderson, Peter)
March 11, 2016 128 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF First APPLICATION to file document Depositions of Defendants under seal 120 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 10, 2016 127 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 9 TO THE DECLARATION OF GLEN L. KULIK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND ADD DEFENDANTS (DKT. 102 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff's Application to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 through 9 to the Declaration of Glen L. Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Add Defendants is GRANTED. (ah)
March 8, 2016 126 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion,, 118 (Kulik, Glen)
March 8, 2016 125 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Expert Audio and Video re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 122 (Malofiy, Francis)
March 8, 2016 124 DECLARATION of Francis Malofiy In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 ***Refiled with Exhibits*** filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-21 to Malofiy Declaration)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 8, 2016 123 DECLARATION of Denny Somach In opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Malofiy, Francis)
March 8, 2016 122 First NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE of Audio and Video Exhibits in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Malofiy, Francis)
March 8, 2016 121 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF First APPLICATION to file document Depositions of Defendants under seal 120 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE.(Malofiy, Francis)
March 8, 2016 120 First APPLICATION to file document Depositions of Defendants under seal filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE.(Malofiy, Francis)
March 7, 2016 119 DECLARATION of Plaintiff's Declarants in opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Hansen Declaration, # 2 Pates Declaration, # 3 Ferguson Declaration, # 4 Skidmore Declaration, # 5 Mike Lee Declaration, # 6 Robert Lee Declaration, # 7 Andes Declaration, # 8 Hanson Declaration)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 7, 2016 118 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Genuine Issues, # 2 Longo Declaration, # 3 Andrea Wolfe Declaration, # 4 Janet Wolfe Declaration, # 5 Linda Mensch Declaration, # 6 David Waterbury Declaration, # 7 Malofiy Declaration, # 8 Stewart Declaration, # 9 Johnson Declaration, # 10 Bricklin Declaration, # 11 Knight Declaration)(Malofiy, Francis)
March 7, 2016 117 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (attaching CD of audio exhibits re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 115 (Kulik, Glen)
March 7, 2016 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, 31 98 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, 31 [Filed again to attach Proposed Order attached] 101 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration)(Anderson, Peter)
March 7, 2016 115 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE of CD containing audio exhibits. (Kulik, Glen)
March 4, 2016 114 Featured Case DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying 110 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File (bp)
March 3, 2016 113 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Summary Judgment Motion 110 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
March 2, 2016 112 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants under seal 102 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Kulik, Glen)
March 2, 2016 111 DECLARATION OF GLEN L. KULIK IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A ONE-WEEK EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Summary Judgment Motion 110 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Kulik, Glen)
March 2, 2016 110 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Summary Judgment Motion filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kulik, Glen)
March 1, 2016 108 NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER RE APPLICATION TO SEAL EXHIBITS re APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants under seal 102 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
March 1, 2016 107 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants under seal 102 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration re Exhibit 9)(Anderson, Peter)
March 1, 2016 106 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants under seal 102 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
February 29, 2016 109 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amendment (Motion related),, 105 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: This document is to be submitted as an attachment to a "Notice of Lodging.". In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 25, 2016 105 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute 97 ; Amended Proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law. filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
February 25, 2016 104 DECLARATION of Glen L. Kulik in Support of APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants under seal 102 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Kulik, Glen)
February 25, 2016 103 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants under seal 102 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibits 4-6, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 7, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, # 5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 9)(Kulik, Glen)
February 25, 2016 102 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants under seal filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document)(Kulik, Glen)
February 25, 2016 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, 31 [Filed again to attach Proposed Order attached] filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kulik, Glen)
February 25, 2016 100 DECLARATION of Francis Malofiy in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, 31 98 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Kulik, Glen)
February 25, 2016 99 DECLARATION of Glen L. Kulik in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, 31 98 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Kulik, Glen)
February 25, 2016 98 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint, 31 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Kulik, Glen)
February 25, 2016 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Amended Complaint and each claim therein , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to issues not in substantial dispute filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of J Page, # 3 Declaration of R Plant, # 4 Declaration of J P Jones, # 5 Declaration of L Ferrara, # 6 Exhibits 1-2, # 7 Declaration of R Mathes, # 8 Declaration of H Freeman, # 9 Exhibits 3-7, # 10 Declaration of P Anderson, # 11 Declarations 8-26, # 12 proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 13 proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment, # 14 proposed Judgment, # 15 Notice of Lodging of Audio Exhibits, # 16 Notice of Manual Filing) (Anderson, Peter)
February 5, 2016 95 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner 91 . DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (pso)
February 4, 2016 96 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Sealed Document, 93 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 4, 2016 94 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 80 . SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a settlement conference on March 23, 2016, 1:30 p.m., at 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles, California, in Courtroom "B"- 8th floor. On or before March 16, 2016, each party shall deliver or fax to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg at (213) 894-2934 a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement. EACH PARTY SHALL APPEAR AT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN PERSON, absent Court permission to participate telephonically. The appearing party, or party representative, is to have authority to settle the case. (See Order for details.) (mp)
February 3, 2016 93 SEALED DOCUMENT FIFTH AMENDMENT TO TRUST AGREEMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, 90 , APPLICATION to file document Fifth Amendment to Randy Craig Wolfe Trust, under seal 84 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.(Anderson, Peter)
February 3, 2016 92 OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/25/2016 91 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
February 2, 2016 91 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/25/2016 filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis Malofiy In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, # 2 Declaration of Francis Malofiy on Multi-Tracks in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, # 3 Declaration of Glen Kulik in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, # 4 Proposed Order) (Malofiy, Francis)
January 29, 2016 90 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting 84 APPLICATION to Seal Document Re: APPLICATION to file document Fifth Amendment to Randy Craig Wolfe Trust, under seal 84 . The Court having considered the Application of defendants James Patrick Page, Robert Anthony Plant, John Paul Jones, Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Super Hype Publishing, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rhino Entertainment Company and Warner Music Group Inc. for leave to file under seal, and the submission of plaintiff Michael Skidmore, and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Application be and hereby is granted and the following document is ordered filed under seal: "Fifth Amendment to Randy Craig Wolfe Trust Dated February 26, 2002." (mp)
January 29, 2016 89 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: denying 83 Motion to Compel. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. On January 12, 2016, Defendants filed a motion to compel Plaintiff to provide further responses to Document Request Nos. 9, 10 and 18, and Interrogatory No. 2. (Dkt. Nos. 83-86.) On January 19, 2016, Defendants filed a supplemental memorandum. (Dkt. No. 87.) The motion is appropriate for adjudication without oral argument. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to compel discovery is DENIED. (See Order for details.) (mp)
January 29, 2016 88 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Discovery 83 scheduled for February 2, 2016 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. A separate minute order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 19, 2016 87 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel compliance with Requests for Production and response to Interrogatory 83 , SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Anderson, Peter)
January 12, 2016 86 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. re pending Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation re Motion to Compel)(Anderson, Peter)
January 12, 2016 85 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Fifth Amendment to Randy Craig Wolfe Trust, under seal 84 filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document)(Anderson, Peter)
January 12, 2016 84 APPLICATION to file document Fifth Amendment to Randy Craig Wolfe Trust, under seal filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter)
January 12, 2016 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel compliance with Requests for Production and response to Interrogatory filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 2/2/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation)(Anderson, Peter)
December 28, 2015 82 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. re Stipulation for Protective Order 81 . (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
December 24, 2015 81 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.(Anderson, Peter)
October 15, 2015 80 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) 77 . This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Rosenberg for settlement. Plaintiff's counsel shall contact Magistrate Judge Rosenberg's deputy clerk, Marine Pogosyan, (213) 894-5419, to obtain available dates for a settlement conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall contact Magistrate Judge Rosenberg's deputy clerk with enough time so that the settlement conference date is early enough to comply with any deadlines imposed by the District Judge or the Local Rules of this District. After obtaining available dates from Magistrate Judge Rosenberg's deputy clerk, counsel for the parties shall confer with each other and select one of the settlement conference date selected by parties. Please note that all settlement conferences begin at 1:30 p.m. and are usually conducted on a Tuesday or Wednesday. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mp)
August 17, 2015 79 Featured Case ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2016 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2016 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr)
August 17, 2015 78 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2015. Discovery cut-off 2/11/2016. Motions due by 2/25/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2016 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2016 09:00 AM.Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (cr)
August 12, 2015 77 Featured Case ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 1 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Rosenberg for Settlement Conference. (sw)
August 10, 2015 76 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before The Honorable Alicia G. Rosenberg for settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Malofiy, Francis)
August 10, 2015 75 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15 court days, filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.. (Anderson, Peter)
July 31, 2015 74 Featured Case ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 73 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Francis Malofiy on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Skidmore, designating Glen L. Kulik as local counsel. (pso)
July 30, 2015 73 APPLICATION for attorney Francis Malofiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16178019 paid.) filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Glen L Kulik added to party MICHAEL SKIDMORE(pty:pla)) (Kulik, Glen)
July 28, 2015 72 Featured Case NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Scheduling Conference, calendared for hearing on 08/24/2015 at 9:00 am, has been ADVANCED TO 08/17/2015 at 9:00 AM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 27, 2015 71 Featured Case STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner, (bp)
May 21, 2015 70 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A scheduling conference has been placed on calendar for August 24, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Not later than 5 court days prior to the Scheduling Conference, counsel are ordered to confer and electronically file (joint) Form ADR-1 (and proposed order, Form ADR 12), selecting one of the three settlement options available. (sw)
May 20, 2015 69 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 31 filed by defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.(Anderson, Peter)
May 20, 2015 68 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 31 filed by Defendant John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, LED ZEPPELIN.(Attorney Helene M Freeman added to party LED ZEPPELIN(pty:dft))(Freeman, Helene)
May 15, 2015 67 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael L Eidel counsel for Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc. Michael Eidel, Matthew S. Olesh is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Super Hype Publishing, Inc., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rhino Entertainment Company, James Patrick Page, Robert Anthony Plant and John Paul Jones. (Eidel, Michael)
May 14, 2015 66 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 63 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Helene M. Freeman on behalf of Defendants James Page, Robert Plant and John Jones, designating Peter J. Anderson as local counsel. (lt)
May 14, 2015 65 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Helene M. Freeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15714930 paid.) 63 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signature on Application. Local counsel did not sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
May 13, 2015 64 Request for Refund filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc re: APPLICATION for attorney Helene M. Freeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15714930 paid.) 63 (Anderson, Peter)
May 13, 2015 63 APPLICATION for attorney Helene M. Freeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15714930 paid.) filed by defendants John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party John Paul Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT (pty:dft), Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party James Patrick Page(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter)
May 12, 2015 62 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 11, 2015 61 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney MATTHEW S OLESH for Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc, LED ZEPPELIN. re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et)
May 11, 2015 60 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Michael L Eidel for Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, John Paul Jones, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, James Patrick Page, Rhino Entertainment Company, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., Warner Music Group Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc, LED ZEPPELIN. re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et)
May 11, 2015 59 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Francis A Malofiy for Plaintiff MICHAEL SKIDMORE. re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et)
May 11, 2015 56 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Pennsylvania Eastern
May 8, 2015 58 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
May 8, 2015 57 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:14-cv-03089-JS, from USDC Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Philadelphia). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:15-cv-03462-RGK (AGRx). (et)
May 6, 2015 55 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER IS GRANTED IN PART AS THE DEFENDANTS SEEK TO HAVE THIS CASE TRANSFERRED TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, WESTERN DIVISION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE THIS CASE SHALL BE TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, WESTERN DIVISION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/6/2015. 5/6/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
May 6, 2015 54 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/6/2015. 5/6/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
March 19, 2015 53 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 52 Transcript - PDF, 3/20/2015 Entered and Copies Emailed. (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
March 19, 2015 52 TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT held on 2/4/2015, before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter/Transcriber DRUMMOND TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2015. (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
February 16, 2015 51 Declaration re 41 Response in Opposition to Motion, on Submission of Evidence of Defendants' Jurisdictional Contacts by MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2, # 2 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Part 2) & 4)(MALOFIY, FRANCIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
February 5, 2015 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2015 re 36 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by JOHN PAUL JONES, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, JAMES PATRICK PAGE (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
January 20, 2015 49 Featured Case ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 1/22/2015 IS RESCHEDULED TO 2/4/2015 AT 2:00 P.M.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/20/2015. 1/21/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
January 13, 2015 48 Featured Case ORDERED THAT ORAL AGRUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 1/16/2015 IS RESCHEDULED TO 1/22/2015 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/13/2015. 1/14/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
January 12, 2015 47 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW S. OLESH on behalf of ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC. with Certificate of Service(OLESH, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
December 18, 2014 46 Featured Case ORDERED THAT A MOTION HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER IS SET FOR 1/16/2015 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/18/2014. 12/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
December 10, 2014 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
December 10, 2014 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
December 10, 2014 43 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPOR OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 42 Praecipe/Request (EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/11/2014 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
November 24, 2014 42 REQUEST for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiff's Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Transfer by MICHAEL SKIDMORE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 11/25/2014 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
November 24, 2014 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 35 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ***OMNIBUS RESPONSE*** filed by MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Table of Contents, # 4 Table of Authorities)(MALOFIY, FRANCIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
November 6, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES IS APPROVED. THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AND SERVE HIS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER IS EXTENDED TO 11/24/2014. THE TIME FOR DEFNEDANTS TO FILE AND SERVE THEIR REPLY IS EXTENDED TO 12/10/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/6/2014. 11/6/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
November 5, 2014 39 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 35 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ***Stipulation Between the Parties to Extend the Deadlines to Respond and Reply*** filed by MICHAEL SKIDMORE..(MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 11/6/2014 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 27, 2014 38 Declaration re 36 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 35 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint of Michael Eidel, Esquire by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 27, 2014 37 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motions to Dismiss or Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 27, 2014 36 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT.Memorandum of Law, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of James Patrick Page, # 3 Declaration of John Paul Jones, # 4 Declaration of Robert Anthony Plant)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 27, 2014 35 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION to Transfer Directed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC..Memorandum of Law, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Peter J. Anderson, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Peter J. Anderson, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Peter J. Anderson, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Peter J. Anderson, # 6 Declaration of Paul Robinson, # 7 Declaration of Scott McDowell)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 10, 2014 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ: Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2014 (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 10, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER (DOC'S 27 AND 28 ) ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REASSERTION AS TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/10/2014. 10/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 9, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' PENDING MOTIONS IS SET FOR 10/10/2014 AT 02:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/9/2014. 10/9/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
October 8, 2014 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., LED ZEPPELIN, filed by MICHAEL SKIDMORE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBITS.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
September 22, 2014 30 Declaration re 27 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer , 28 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer of Michael Eidel, Esquire by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
September 17, 2014 29 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motions to Dismiss or Transfer by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
September 17, 2014 28 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION to Transfer filed by JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT.Memorandum, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Declaration of James Patrick Page, # 4 Declaration of John Paul Jones, # 5 Declaration of Robert Anthony Plant)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
September 17, 2014 27 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION to Transfer filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC..Memorandum, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Declaration of Paul Robinson, # 4 Declaration of Peter J. Anderson, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Peter J. Anderson, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Peter J. Anderson, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Peter J. Anderson)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
September 16, 2014 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including WMG Acquisition Corp., WMG Holdings Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Access Industries, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC..(EIDEL, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
September 11, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF PETER J. ANDERSON IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/11/2014. 9/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
September 10, 2014 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Peter J. Anderson, Esq. filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC..Certificate of Service.(EIDEL, MICHAEL) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 107686. Modified on 9/12/2014 (sg, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 27, 2014 23 Featured Case ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR HELENE M. FREEMAN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/27/2014.8/27/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 27, 2014 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Helene M. Freeman, Esquire filed by JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT.Certificate of Service.(EIDEL, MICHAEL) $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 106741. Modified on 8/27/2014 (sg, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 20, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DOC. 2 ) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 9/22/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO ANY MOTIONS DEFENDANTS MIGHT FILE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REASSERTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/20/2014. 8/21/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 20, 2014 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., LED ZEPPELIN.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, # 4 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 19, 2014 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas J. Crean re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report upon Jeremy Kaplan, Legal Dept., who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corp. by Personal on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/2014 (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/20/2014 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 19, 2014 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Albert G. mentz re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report upon Amy McLaren, Manager, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Warner Music Group Corporation by Personal on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/2014 (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/20/2014 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 19, 2014 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Albert G. Mentz re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report upon Amy McLaren, Manager, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. by Personal on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/2014 (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/20/2014 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 19, 2014 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Albert G. Mentz re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report upon Amy McLaren, Manager, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation by Personal on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/2014 (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/20/2014 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 19, 2014 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Albert G. Mentz re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report upon Amy McLaren, Manager, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Rhino Entertainment by Personal on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/2014(MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/20/2014 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corp. by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Rhino Entertainment by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Warner Chappell Music, Inc. by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Warner Music Group Corp. by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Elena Bou who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Super Hype Publishing, Inc. by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Super Hype Publishing Inc. by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf on John Paul Jones by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of Robert Anthony Plant by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Jeo Bertie who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of James Patrick Page by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
August 5, 2014 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint, Disclousure Statement, Report re: Copyright Case upon Joe Bertie by Personal Service on 7-31-14, answer due 8/21/14. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 8/6/2014 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
July 21, 2014 Alias Summons Issued as to LED ZEPPELIN, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, JOHN PAUL JONES, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., and WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., FORWARDED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL. (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
July 21, 2014 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Alias Summons for defendants Led Zeppelin, James Patrick Page, Robert Anthony Plant, John Paul Jones, Super Hype Publishing, Inc., and Warner Music Group Corp. by MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (MALOFIY, FRANCIS) Modified on 7/21/2014 (nd, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
July 10, 2014 Summons Issued as to ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, RHINO ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, WARNER/CHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/10/2014 (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
May 31, 2014 3 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (ks, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
May 31, 2014 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MICHAEL SKIDMORE.(ks, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
May 31, 2014 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (ks, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
May 31, 2014 6 Summonses Issued as to JOHN PAUL JONES, JAMES PATRICK PAGE, ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT, SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., LED ZEPPELIN. Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/2/14 (ks, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]
May 31, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 102000.), filed by MICHAEL SKIDMORE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form)(ks, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/11/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICHAEL SKIDMORE v. LED ZEPPELIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul Jones
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Represented By: Helene M Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT ANTHONY PLANT
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Represented By: Helene M Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Patrick Page
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Represented By: Helene M Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Entertainment Company
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPER HYPE PUBLISHING, INC.
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group Corp
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner/Chappell Music Inc
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LED ZEPPELIN
Represented By: Helene M Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael L Eidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Matthew S Olesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SKIDMORE
Represented By: Francis A Malofiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?