Curtis Patton v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Patton
Defendant: Does and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv03813
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Fitzgerald
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that final judgment in this action (SEE ATTACHMENT OF THIS JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). As the prevailing party, Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is t o recover from Plaintiff Francisca Guillen its costs of suit as provided by law. Now that the matter has been tried to conclusion, the website established to provide notice (www.DTclassaction.com) should be removed from the Internet within 7 days. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Under Seal 87 . For the reasons stated herein, defendant is ordered to show cause, in writing, by 5/26/2017. *See Order for details.* (cw)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Note changes to page 8. This order does not authorize the parties to file documents under seal. If any party seeks to file a document under seal they must follow Local Rule 79-5). re Stipulation for Protective Order 25 . (sbou)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Patton v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L Dengler
Represented By: Lindbergh Porter, Jr
Represented By: Mary D Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Patton
Represented By: Mike M Arias
Represented By: Mikael Hans Stahle
Represented By: Elise R Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?