Joseph Daniel Lasica v. America Online, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Daniel Lasica
Defendant: America Online, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv04230
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F. Mumm
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, 63 . Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by the Parties on June 8, 2016 (Dkt. 63), this action is dismissed with prejudice. All previously set dates and deadlines are hereby vacated and taken off calendar (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.). (pj)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, re: Stipulation for Protective Order, 39 . (mz)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)VACATING DEFENDANTS MOTION TODISMISS by Judge George H. Wu: On June 29, 2015, Defendant America Online, Inc. (Defendant) moved to dismiss theoperative pleading in this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), (5), and (6). Seegenerally Mot. to Dismiss, Docket No. 13. Plaintiff Joseph Daniel Lasica (Plaintiff) filed a FirstAmended Complaint (FAC) on July 14, 2015, within twenty-one days after the service of Defendants Motion to Dismiss. See generally F AC, Docket No. 20; see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 (A party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course within... 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b).). In light of Plaintiffs FAC, the Court finds that Defendants Motion to Dismiss is MOOT. The motion hearing on July 27, 2015 is hereby vacated and taken off calendar. (pj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Daniel Lasica v. America Online, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Online, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D Litvack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Daniel Lasica
Represented By: J Conor Corcoran
Represented By: Christopher A Lilly
Represented By: Arvin Y Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?