Chris Masillionis v. Silver Wheaton Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Chris Masillionis
Defendant: Peter Barnes, Gary Brown, Silver Wheaton Corp. and Randy V.J. Smallwood
Case Number: 2:2015cv05146
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court hereby awards attorneys fees of 30% of the Settlement Fund, or $12,450,000, reimbursement of expenses of $1,090,186.76, and awards Plaintiffs $12,500 each, f or a total of $87,500, all of which the Court finds reasonable. In reaching this determination, the Court has considered (1) the results achieved; (2) the risk of litigation; (3) the skill required and the quality of work; (4) the contingent nature of the fee and the financial burden carried by the plaintiffs; and (5) awards made in similar cases. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (yl)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MINUTES RE [REDACTED] PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO (A) MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND (B) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Hearing Held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiffs motion to modify the Scheduling Order and for leave to file the proposed SAC is hereby GRANTED 191 . The parties and Deloitte are directed to meet and confer regarding any further extension of the case schedule necessitated by the filing of the proposed SAC. (lc). Modified on 3/27/2018 .(lc). Modified on 3/27/2018 (lc).
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class 91 is GRANTED. Lead Plaintiff Joe Elek and Named Plaintiffs Thomas Bartsch, Larry Brandow, Diana Choi, Ben Potaracke, Jedrzej Borowczyk, and Charles Remmel appointed class representatives. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott re Joint REQUEST for Protective Order for Discovery 100 . [See Order for details.] (san)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT 61 Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court DENIES defendants motion to dismiss the CAC. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Masillionis v. Silver Wheaton Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Wheaton Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy V.J. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Masillionis
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?