Kristin Biorn v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Biorn
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv07102
Filed: September 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases 87 . Plaintiffs motions to consolidate are GRANTED. The Court orders the consolidation of Case Nos. 2:15-cv-09397-CAS and 2:15-cv-07102- CAS. All further filings in these cases shall be made under Case No. 2:15-cv-07102-CAS. The Clerk shall administratively close Case No. 2:15-cv-09397-CAS. The parties shall file a joint, proposed scheduling order forthwith. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 52 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (es)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts I, VI, VII, and VIII 18 . Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Claims pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) is DENIED. The hearing date of 11/23/2015 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristin Biorn v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Biorn
Represented By: Cherisse Heidi Alcantara Cleofe
Represented By: Paul R Kiesel
Represented By: Matthew A Young
Represented By: Helen E Zukin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Micaela P Banach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?